EP2794099 - HYDROCONVERSION CATALYST COMPRISING AT LEAST A ZEOLITE, VIII AND VIB GROUP METALS, AND PREPARATION THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2014/44] | CATALYST USABLE IN HYDROCONVERSION AND INCLUDING AT LEAST ONE ZEOLITE AND GROUP VIII AND VIB METALS, AND PREPARATION OF THE CATALYST | ||
[2019/01] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.03.2020 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.04.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.12.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IFP Energies nouvelles 1 & 4 avenue de Bois-Préau 92500 Rueil-Malmaison / FR | For all designated states Total Raffinage France 2 place Jean Millier La Défense 92400 Courbevoie / FR | [2017/44] |
Former [2014/44] | For all designated states IFP Energies nouvelles 1 & 4, avenue de Bois-Préau 92852 Rueil-Malmaison Cedex / FR | ||
For all designated states Total Raffinage France 2 place Jean Millier La Défense 92400 Courbevoie / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SIMON, Laurent 34 rue Louis Goux Les Jardins Mirabeau F-69100 Villeurbanne / FR | 02 /
GUICHARD, Bertrand 385 rue Pascal F-38140 Izeaux / FR | 03 /
LAPISARDI, Grégory 44 rue Saint Mathieu F-69008 Lyon / FR | 04 /
DULOT, Hughes 3 rue Raymond Qeneau 92500 Reuil Malmaison / FR | 05 /
DE GRANDI, Valentina 15 rue de la Mailleraye 76600 Le Havre / FR | 06 /
MINOUX, Delphine rue des Hautes Hurées 21 B-1400 Nivelles / BE | 07 /
DATH, Jean-Pierre rue d'Ath 53 B-7970 Beloeil / BE | [2014/44] | Representative(s) | IFP Energies nouvelles Département Propriété Industrielle Rond Point de l'échangeur de Solaize BP3 69360 Solaize / FR | [2019/19] | Application number, filing date | 12813900.3 | 27.11.2012 | [2019/19] | WO2012FR00488 | Priority number, date | FR20110004025 | 22.12.2011 Original published format: FR 1104025 | [2014/44] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013093229 | Date: | 27.06.2013 | Language: | FR | [2013/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2794099 | Date: | 29.10.2014 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.06.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2794099 | Date: | 08.05.2019 | Language: | FR | [2019/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.06.2013 | Classification | IPC: | B01J29/076, B01J29/16, B01J29/78, B01J35/00, B01J37/00, B01J37/02, B01J37/28, B01J37/26, C10G47/20, B01J27/14, B01J31/00, B01J37/20 | [2014/44] | CPC: |
B01J37/20 (EP,RU,US);
B01J29/076 (EP,RU,US);
B01J31/34 (RU,US);
B01J29/064 (EP,US);
B01J29/166 (EP,RU,US);
B01J29/7815 (EP,RU,US);
B01J31/0209 (EP,RU,US);
B01J31/04 (EP,RU,US);
B01J35/30 (EP,RU,US);
B01J37/0009 (EP,US);
B01J37/0203 (EP,RU,US);
B01J37/0205 (EP,RU,US);
B01J37/26 (EP,RU,US);
B01J37/28 (EP,RU,US);
C10G47/20 (EP,RU,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/44] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KATALYSATOR ZUR HYDROCONVERSION ENTHALTEND MINDESTENS EINEN ZEOLITH, VIII UND VIB METALLE UND DESSEN HERSTELLUNG | [2019/01] | English: | HYDROCONVERSION CATALYST COMPRISING AT LEAST A ZEOLITE, VIII AND VIB GROUP METALS, AND PREPARATION THEREOF | [2019/01] | French: | CATALYSEUR UTILISABLE EN HYDROCONVERSION COMPRENANT AU MOINS UNE ZÉOLITHE ET DES METAUX DES GROUPES VIII ET VIB ET PREPARATION DU CATALYSEUR | [2014/44] |
Former [2014/44] | KATALYSATOR ZUR VERWENDUNG IN EINER HYDROKONVERSION MIT MINDESTENS EINEM ZEOLITH SOWIE GRUPPE-VIII- UND VIB-METALLEN UND HERSTELLUNG DES KATALYSATORS | ||
Former [2014/44] | CATALYST USABLE IN HYDROCONVERSION AND INCLUDING AT LEAST ONE ZEOLITE AND GROUP VIII AND VIB METALS, AND PREPARATION OF THE CATALYST | Entry into regional phase | 22.07.2014 | National basic fee paid | 22.07.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.07.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.07.2014 | Examination requested [2014/44] | 13.02.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.03.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.09.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 09.11.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.12.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.03.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 26.03.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.03.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.03.2018 | Opposition(s) | 11.02.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/16] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 09.11.2018 | Request for further processing filed | 09.11.2018 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 23.11.2018 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 27.11.2012 | AL | 08.05.2019 | AT | 08.05.2019 | CY | 08.05.2019 | CZ | 08.05.2019 | EE | 08.05.2019 | ES | 08.05.2019 | FI | 08.05.2019 | HR | 08.05.2019 | IT | 08.05.2019 | LT | 08.05.2019 | LV | 08.05.2019 | MC | 08.05.2019 | MK | 08.05.2019 | MT | 08.05.2019 | PL | 08.05.2019 | RO | 08.05.2019 | RS | 08.05.2019 | SE | 08.05.2019 | SI | 08.05.2019 | SK | 08.05.2019 | SM | 08.05.2019 | TR | 08.05.2019 | BG | 08.08.2019 | NO | 08.08.2019 | GR | 09.08.2019 | IS | 08.09.2019 | PT | 08.09.2019 | GB | 27.11.2019 | IE | 27.11.2019 | LU | 27.11.2019 | CH | 30.11.2019 | LI | 30.11.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 27.11.2012 | |
AL | 08.05.2019 | ||
AT | 08.05.2019 | ||
CY | 08.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 08.05.2019 | ||
EE | 08.05.2019 | ||
ES | 08.05.2019 | ||
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
HR | 08.05.2019 | ||
IT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LV | 08.05.2019 | ||
MC | 08.05.2019 | ||
MT | 08.05.2019 | ||
PL | 08.05.2019 | ||
RO | 08.05.2019 | ||
RS | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
SI | 08.05.2019 | ||
SK | 08.05.2019 | ||
SM | 08.05.2019 | ||
TR | 08.05.2019 | ||
BG | 08.08.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | ||
GR | 09.08.2019 | ||
IS | 08.09.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
GB | 27.11.2019 | ||
IE | 27.11.2019 | ||
LU | 27.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 27.11.2012 | |
AL | 08.05.2019 | ||
AT | 08.05.2019 | ||
CY | 08.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 08.05.2019 | ||
EE | 08.05.2019 | ||
ES | 08.05.2019 | ||
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
HR | 08.05.2019 | ||
IT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LV | 08.05.2019 | ||
MC | 08.05.2019 | ||
PL | 08.05.2019 | ||
RO | 08.05.2019 | ||
RS | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
SI | 08.05.2019 | ||
SK | 08.05.2019 | ||
SM | 08.05.2019 | ||
TR | 08.05.2019 | ||
BG | 08.08.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | ||
GR | 09.08.2019 | ||
IS | 08.09.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
GB | 27.11.2019 | ||
IE | 27.11.2019 | ||
LU | 27.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
Former [2021/31] | AL | 08.05.2019 | |
AT | 08.05.2019 | ||
CY | 08.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 08.05.2019 | ||
EE | 08.05.2019 | ||
ES | 08.05.2019 | ||
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
HR | 08.05.2019 | ||
IT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LV | 08.05.2019 | ||
MC | 08.05.2019 | ||
PL | 08.05.2019 | ||
RO | 08.05.2019 | ||
RS | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
SI | 08.05.2019 | ||
SK | 08.05.2019 | ||
SM | 08.05.2019 | ||
TR | 08.05.2019 | ||
BG | 08.08.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | ||
GR | 09.08.2019 | ||
IS | 08.09.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
GB | 27.11.2019 | ||
IE | 27.11.2019 | ||
LU | 27.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 08.05.2019 | |
AT | 08.05.2019 | ||
CY | 08.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 08.05.2019 | ||
EE | 08.05.2019 | ||
ES | 08.05.2019 | ||
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
HR | 08.05.2019 | ||
IT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LV | 08.05.2019 | ||
MC | 08.05.2019 | ||
PL | 08.05.2019 | ||
RO | 08.05.2019 | ||
RS | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
SI | 08.05.2019 | ||
SK | 08.05.2019 | ||
SM | 08.05.2019 | ||
TR | 08.05.2019 | ||
BG | 08.08.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | ||
GR | 09.08.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
GB | 27.11.2019 | ||
IE | 27.11.2019 | ||
LU | 27.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/48] | AL | 08.05.2019 | |
AT | 08.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 08.05.2019 | ||
EE | 08.05.2019 | ||
ES | 08.05.2019 | ||
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
HR | 08.05.2019 | ||
IT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LV | 08.05.2019 | ||
MC | 08.05.2019 | ||
PL | 08.05.2019 | ||
RO | 08.05.2019 | ||
RS | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
SI | 08.05.2019 | ||
SK | 08.05.2019 | ||
SM | 08.05.2019 | ||
TR | 08.05.2019 | ||
BG | 08.08.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | ||
GR | 09.08.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
GB | 27.11.2019 | ||
IE | 27.11.2019 | ||
LU | 27.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/46] | AL | 08.05.2019 | |
AT | 08.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 08.05.2019 | ||
EE | 08.05.2019 | ||
ES | 08.05.2019 | ||
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
HR | 08.05.2019 | ||
IT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LV | 08.05.2019 | ||
MC | 08.05.2019 | ||
PL | 08.05.2019 | ||
RO | 08.05.2019 | ||
RS | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
SI | 08.05.2019 | ||
SK | 08.05.2019 | ||
SM | 08.05.2019 | ||
TR | 08.05.2019 | ||
BG | 08.08.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | ||
GR | 09.08.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
IE | 27.11.2019 | ||
LU | 27.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 08.05.2019 | |
AT | 08.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 08.05.2019 | ||
EE | 08.05.2019 | ||
ES | 08.05.2019 | ||
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
HR | 08.05.2019 | ||
IT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LV | 08.05.2019 | ||
MC | 08.05.2019 | ||
PL | 08.05.2019 | ||
RO | 08.05.2019 | ||
RS | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
SI | 08.05.2019 | ||
SK | 08.05.2019 | ||
SM | 08.05.2019 | ||
TR | 08.05.2019 | ||
BG | 08.08.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | ||
GR | 09.08.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
LU | 27.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/35] | AL | 08.05.2019 | |
AT | 08.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 08.05.2019 | ||
EE | 08.05.2019 | ||
ES | 08.05.2019 | ||
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
HR | 08.05.2019 | ||
IT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LV | 08.05.2019 | ||
PL | 08.05.2019 | ||
RO | 08.05.2019 | ||
RS | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
SI | 08.05.2019 | ||
SK | 08.05.2019 | ||
SM | 08.05.2019 | ||
TR | 08.05.2019 | ||
BG | 08.08.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | ||
GR | 09.08.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
LU | 27.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/34] | AL | 08.05.2019 | |
AT | 08.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 08.05.2019 | ||
EE | 08.05.2019 | ||
ES | 08.05.2019 | ||
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
HR | 08.05.2019 | ||
IT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LV | 08.05.2019 | ||
PL | 08.05.2019 | ||
RO | 08.05.2019 | ||
RS | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
SI | 08.05.2019 | ||
SK | 08.05.2019 | ||
SM | 08.05.2019 | ||
TR | 08.05.2019 | ||
BG | 08.08.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | ||
GR | 09.08.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AL | 08.05.2019 | |
AT | 08.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 08.05.2019 | ||
EE | 08.05.2019 | ||
ES | 08.05.2019 | ||
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
HR | 08.05.2019 | ||
IT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LV | 08.05.2019 | ||
PL | 08.05.2019 | ||
RO | 08.05.2019 | ||
RS | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
SI | 08.05.2019 | ||
SK | 08.05.2019 | ||
SM | 08.05.2019 | ||
TR | 08.05.2019 | ||
BG | 08.08.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | ||
GR | 09.08.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 08.05.2019 | |
AT | 08.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 08.05.2019 | ||
EE | 08.05.2019 | ||
ES | 08.05.2019 | ||
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
HR | 08.05.2019 | ||
IT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LV | 08.05.2019 | ||
RO | 08.05.2019 | ||
RS | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
SK | 08.05.2019 | ||
SM | 08.05.2019 | ||
TR | 08.05.2019 | ||
BG | 08.08.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | ||
GR | 09.08.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/14] | AL | 08.05.2019 | |
AT | 08.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 08.05.2019 | ||
EE | 08.05.2019 | ||
ES | 08.05.2019 | ||
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
HR | 08.05.2019 | ||
IT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LV | 08.05.2019 | ||
RO | 08.05.2019 | ||
RS | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
SK | 08.05.2019 | ||
SM | 08.05.2019 | ||
BG | 08.08.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | ||
GR | 09.08.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | AL | 08.05.2019 | |
AT | 08.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 08.05.2019 | ||
EE | 08.05.2019 | ||
ES | 08.05.2019 | ||
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
HR | 08.05.2019 | ||
IT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LV | 08.05.2019 | ||
RO | 08.05.2019 | ||
RS | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
SK | 08.05.2019 | ||
BG | 08.08.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | ||
GR | 09.08.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AL | 08.05.2019 | |
AT | 08.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 08.05.2019 | ||
EE | 08.05.2019 | ||
ES | 08.05.2019 | ||
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
HR | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LV | 08.05.2019 | ||
RO | 08.05.2019 | ||
RS | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
SK | 08.05.2019 | ||
BG | 08.08.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | ||
GR | 09.08.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | AL | 08.05.2019 | |
AT | 08.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 08.05.2019 | ||
ES | 08.05.2019 | ||
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
HR | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LV | 08.05.2019 | ||
RO | 08.05.2019 | ||
RS | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
BG | 08.08.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | ||
GR | 09.08.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AL | 08.05.2019 | |
CZ | 08.05.2019 | ||
ES | 08.05.2019 | ||
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
HR | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LV | 08.05.2019 | ||
RS | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
BG | 08.08.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | ||
GR | 09.08.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 08.05.2019 | |
ES | 08.05.2019 | ||
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
HR | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LV | 08.05.2019 | ||
RS | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
BG | 08.08.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | ||
GR | 09.08.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AL | 08.05.2019 | |
ES | 08.05.2019 | ||
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
HR | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LV | 08.05.2019 | ||
RS | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | ||
GR | 09.08.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AL | 08.05.2019 | |
ES | 08.05.2019 | ||
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
HR | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | ES | 08.05.2019 | |
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | ES | 08.05.2019 | |
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | Cited in | International search | [Y]EP1577007 (COSMO OIL CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 1-16 * abstract * * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0034] * * paragraph [0042] - paragraph [0066] * * paragraph [0089] - paragraph [0107] * * paragraph [0111] - paragraph [0117] * * example 10 *; | [A]WO2006077326 (TOTAL FRANCE [FR], et al) [A] 1-16 * page 3, line 29 - page 4, line 14 * * page 5, line 3 - line 30 * * abstract * * page 8, line 8 - line 23 * * page 11, line 31 - line 34 * * example - *; | [A]EP1900430 (CHINA PETROLEUM & CHEMICAL [CN], et al) [A] 1-16 * abstract * * paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [0009] - paragraph [0016] * * paragraph [0019] * * paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0048] * * example - *; | [Y]EP2072127 (COSMO OIL CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 1-16 * abstract * * paragraph [0017] * * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0030] * * paragraph [0032] * * example - * * claim 1 *; | [A]WO2010020714 (INST FRANCAIS DU PETROLE [FR], et al) [A] 1-16 * abstract * * page 3, line 19 - page 4, line 20 * * page 8, line 29 - line 33 ** example - *; | [YD]WO2011080407 (IFP ENERGIES NOUVELLES [FR], et al) [YD] 1-16 * abstract * * page 2, line 9 - page 4, line 18 * * page 5, line 35 - page 7, line 37 * * example - * * claim - * | by applicant | FR1100043 | US5232578 | US6524470 | WO2007126419 | WO2011030807 | WO2011080407 | - GRIBOVAL, BLANCHARD; PAYEN; FOUMIER; DUBOIS, CATALYSIS TODAY, (1998), vol. 45, page 277 | - GRIBOVAL; BLANCHARD; GENGEMBRE; PAYEN; FOURNIER; DUBOIS; BEMARD, JOURNAL OF CATALYSIS, (1999), vol. 188, page 102 | - M. T. POPE, Heteropoly and Isopoly oxometalates, SPRINGER VERLAG, page 8 | - C. REICHARDT, Organic Chemistry, WILEY-VCH, (2003), pages 472 - 474 |