EP2797912 - AZETIDINE-SUBSTITUTED QUINOXALINE-TYPE PIPERIDINE COMPOUNDS AND USES THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.03.2017 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Purdue Pharma L.P. One Stamford Forum 201 Tresser Boulevard Stamford, CT 06901-3431 / US | [2016/13] |
Former [2016/04] | For all designated states Purdue Pharma L.P. One Stamford Forum 201 Tresser Boulevard Stamford, CT 06901-3431 / US | ||
For all designated states SHIONOGI & CO., LTD. 1-8, Doshomachi 3-chome Chuo-ku Osaka 541-0045 / JP | |||
Former [2014/45] | For all designated states Purdue Pharma LP One Stamford Forum 201 Tresser Boulevard Stamford, CT 06901-3431 / US | ||
For all designated states Shionogi & Co., Ltd. 1-8, Doshomachi 3-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-0045 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAFESSE, Laykea 8 Windward Way Robbinsville, NJ 08690 / US | 02 /
TSUNO, Naoki c/o Shionogi & Co., Ltd. 1-1, Futabacho 3-chome Toyonaka-shi Osaka 561-0825 / JP | 03 /
ZHOU, Xiaoming 22 Dogwood Drive Plainsboro, NJ 08536 / US | [2014/45] | Representative(s) | Vos, Derk Maiwald GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/45] | Vos, Derk Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12813964.9 | 30.11.2012 | [2016/21] | WO2012IB02689 | Priority number, date | US201161565836P | 01.12.2011 Original published format: US 201161565836 P | [2014/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013080036 | Date: | 06.06.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2797912 | Date: | 05.11.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.06.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2797912 | Date: | 25.05.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.06.2013 | Classification | IPC: | C07D401/14, A61K31/498, A61P25/04 | [2014/45] | CPC: |
C07D413/14 (EP,US);
A61P1/10 (EP);
A61P1/12 (EP);
A61P1/14 (EP);
A61P11/06 (EP);
A61P13/02 (EP);
A61P25/04 (EP);
A61P25/08 (EP);
A61P25/16 (EP);
A61P25/22 (EP);
A61P25/24 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P25/36 (EP);
A61P3/04 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/45] | Extension states | BA | 06.06.2014 | ME | 06.06.2014 | Title | German: | AZETIDIN-SUBSTITUIERTE QUINOXALIN-TYP PIPERIDIN-VERBINDUNGEN UND IHRE VERWENDUNGEN | [2016/03] | English: | AZETIDINE-SUBSTITUTED QUINOXALINE-TYPE PIPERIDINE COMPOUNDS AND USES THEREOF | [2014/45] | French: | COMPOSÉS PIPÉRIDINE DE TYPE QUINOXALINE SUBSTITUÉS PAR AZÉTIDINE ET LEUR UTILISATION | [2016/03] |
Former [2014/45] | AZETIDINSUBSTITUIERTE QUINOXALIN-PIPERIDINVERBINDUNGEN UND VERWENDUNGEN DAVON | ||
Former [2014/45] | COMPOSÉS DE PIPÉRIDINE DE TYPE QUINOXALINE SUBSTITUÉE PAR UNE AZÉTIDINE ET LEURS UTILISATIONS | Entry into regional phase | 06.06.2014 | National basic fee paid | 06.06.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.06.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.06.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.06.2014 | Examination requested [2014/45] | 11.08.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.12.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.01.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.04.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 06.04.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.04.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.08.2015 | Opposition(s) | 28.02.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.11.2012 | AL | 25.05.2016 | AT | 25.05.2016 | BE | 25.05.2016 | BG | 25.05.2016 | CY | 25.05.2016 | CZ | 25.05.2016 | DK | 25.05.2016 | EE | 25.05.2016 | FI | 25.05.2016 | HR | 25.05.2016 | IS | 25.05.2016 | LT | 25.05.2016 | LV | 25.05.2016 | MC | 25.05.2016 | MK | 25.05.2016 | NL | 25.05.2016 | PL | 25.05.2016 | RO | 25.05.2016 | RS | 25.05.2016 | SE | 25.05.2016 | SI | 25.05.2016 | SK | 25.05.2016 | SM | 25.05.2016 | TR | 25.05.2016 | NO | 25.08.2016 | GR | 26.08.2016 | PT | 26.09.2016 | CH | 30.11.2016 | IE | 30.11.2016 | LI | 30.11.2016 | LU | 30.11.2016 | MT | 30.11.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/45] | HU | 30.11.2012 | |
AT | 25.05.2016 | ||
BE | 25.05.2016 | ||
BG | 25.05.2016 | ||
CY | 25.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 25.05.2016 | ||
DK | 25.05.2016 | ||
EE | 25.05.2016 | ||
FI | 25.05.2016 | ||
HR | 25.05.2016 | ||
IS | 25.05.2016 | ||
LT | 25.05.2016 | ||
LV | 25.05.2016 | ||
MC | 25.05.2016 | ||
MK | 25.05.2016 | ||
NL | 25.05.2016 | ||
PL | 25.05.2016 | ||
RO | 25.05.2016 | ||
RS | 25.05.2016 | ||
SE | 25.05.2016 | ||
SI | 25.05.2016 | ||
SK | 25.05.2016 | ||
SM | 25.05.2016 | ||
TR | 25.05.2016 | ||
NO | 25.08.2016 | ||
GR | 26.08.2016 | ||
PT | 26.09.2016 | ||
CH | 30.11.2016 | ||
IE | 30.11.2016 | ||
LI | 30.11.2016 | ||
LU | 30.11.2016 | ||
MT | 30.11.2016 | ||
Former [2018/43] | HU | 30.11.2012 | |
AT | 25.05.2016 | ||
BE | 25.05.2016 | ||
BG | 25.05.2016 | ||
CY | 25.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 25.05.2016 | ||
DK | 25.05.2016 | ||
EE | 25.05.2016 | ||
FI | 25.05.2016 | ||
HR | 25.05.2016 | ||
IS | 25.05.2016 | ||
LT | 25.05.2016 | ||
LV | 25.05.2016 | ||
MC | 25.05.2016 | ||
MK | 25.05.2016 | ||
NL | 25.05.2016 | ||
PL | 25.05.2016 | ||
RO | 25.05.2016 | ||
RS | 25.05.2016 | ||
SE | 25.05.2016 | ||
SI | 25.05.2016 | ||
SK | 25.05.2016 | ||
SM | 25.05.2016 | ||
NO | 25.08.2016 | ||
GR | 26.08.2016 | ||
PT | 26.09.2016 | ||
CH | 30.11.2016 | ||
IE | 30.11.2016 | ||
LI | 30.11.2016 | ||
LU | 30.11.2016 | ||
MT | 30.11.2016 | ||
Former [2018/38] | HU | 30.11.2012 | |
AT | 25.05.2016 | ||
BE | 25.05.2016 | ||
BG | 25.05.2016 | ||
CY | 25.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 25.05.2016 | ||
DK | 25.05.2016 | ||
EE | 25.05.2016 | ||
FI | 25.05.2016 | ||
HR | 25.05.2016 | ||
IS | 25.05.2016 | ||
LT | 25.05.2016 | ||
LV | 25.05.2016 | ||
MC | 25.05.2016 | ||
MK | 25.05.2016 | ||
NL | 25.05.2016 | ||
PL | 25.05.2016 | ||
RO | 25.05.2016 | ||
RS | 25.05.2016 | ||
SE | 25.05.2016 | ||
SI | 25.05.2016 | ||
SK | 25.05.2016 | ||
SM | 25.05.2016 | ||
NO | 25.08.2016 | ||
GR | 26.08.2016 | ||
PT | 26.09.2016 | ||
CH | 30.11.2016 | ||
IE | 30.11.2016 | ||
LI | 30.11.2016 | ||
LU | 30.11.2016 | ||
Former [2018/30] | HU | 30.11.2012 | |
AT | 25.05.2016 | ||
BE | 25.05.2016 | ||
CY | 25.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 25.05.2016 | ||
DK | 25.05.2016 | ||
EE | 25.05.2016 | ||
FI | 25.05.2016 | ||
HR | 25.05.2016 | ||
IS | 25.05.2016 | ||
LT | 25.05.2016 | ||
LV | 25.05.2016 | ||
MC | 25.05.2016 | ||
MK | 25.05.2016 | ||
NL | 25.05.2016 | ||
PL | 25.05.2016 | ||
RO | 25.05.2016 | ||
RS | 25.05.2016 | ||
SE | 25.05.2016 | ||
SI | 25.05.2016 | ||
SK | 25.05.2016 | ||
SM | 25.05.2016 | ||
NO | 25.08.2016 | ||
GR | 26.08.2016 | ||
PT | 26.09.2016 | ||
CH | 30.11.2016 | ||
IE | 30.11.2016 | ||
LI | 30.11.2016 | ||
LU | 30.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/51] | AT | 25.05.2016 | |
BE | 25.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 25.05.2016 | ||
DK | 25.05.2016 | ||
EE | 25.05.2016 | ||
FI | 25.05.2016 | ||
LT | 25.05.2016 | ||
LV | 25.05.2016 | ||
NL | 25.05.2016 | ||
PL | 25.05.2016 | ||
RO | 25.05.2016 | ||
RS | 25.05.2016 | ||
SE | 25.05.2016 | ||
SI | 25.05.2016 | ||
SK | 25.05.2016 | ||
SM | 25.05.2016 | ||
NO | 25.08.2016 | ||
GR | 26.08.2016 | ||
PT | 26.09.2016 | ||
CH | 30.11.2016 | ||
IE | 30.11.2016 | ||
LI | 30.11.2016 | ||
LU | 30.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/43] | AT | 25.05.2016 | |
BE | 25.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 25.05.2016 | ||
DK | 25.05.2016 | ||
EE | 25.05.2016 | ||
FI | 25.05.2016 | ||
LT | 25.05.2016 | ||
LV | 25.05.2016 | ||
NL | 25.05.2016 | ||
PL | 25.05.2016 | ||
RO | 25.05.2016 | ||
RS | 25.05.2016 | ||
SE | 25.05.2016 | ||
SI | 25.05.2016 | ||
SK | 25.05.2016 | ||
SM | 25.05.2016 | ||
NO | 25.08.2016 | ||
GR | 26.08.2016 | ||
PT | 26.09.2016 | ||
CH | 30.11.2016 | ||
LI | 30.11.2016 | ||
LU | 30.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 25.05.2016 | |
BE | 25.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 25.05.2016 | ||
DK | 25.05.2016 | ||
EE | 25.05.2016 | ||
FI | 25.05.2016 | ||
LT | 25.05.2016 | ||
LV | 25.05.2016 | ||
NL | 25.05.2016 | ||
PL | 25.05.2016 | ||
RO | 25.05.2016 | ||
RS | 25.05.2016 | ||
SE | 25.05.2016 | ||
SI | 25.05.2016 | ||
SK | 25.05.2016 | ||
SM | 25.05.2016 | ||
NO | 25.08.2016 | ||
GR | 26.08.2016 | ||
PT | 26.09.2016 | ||
CH | 30.11.2016 | ||
LI | 30.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | AT | 25.05.2016 | |
BE | 25.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 25.05.2016 | ||
DK | 25.05.2016 | ||
EE | 25.05.2016 | ||
FI | 25.05.2016 | ||
LT | 25.05.2016 | ||
LV | 25.05.2016 | ||
NL | 25.05.2016 | ||
PL | 25.05.2016 | ||
RO | 25.05.2016 | ||
RS | 25.05.2016 | ||
SE | 25.05.2016 | ||
SK | 25.05.2016 | ||
SM | 25.05.2016 | ||
NO | 25.08.2016 | ||
GR | 26.08.2016 | ||
PT | 26.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | BE | 25.05.2016 | |
CZ | 25.05.2016 | ||
DK | 25.05.2016 | ||
EE | 25.05.2016 | ||
FI | 25.05.2016 | ||
LT | 25.05.2016 | ||
LV | 25.05.2016 | ||
NL | 25.05.2016 | ||
PL | 25.05.2016 | ||
RO | 25.05.2016 | ||
RS | 25.05.2016 | ||
SE | 25.05.2016 | ||
SK | 25.05.2016 | ||
NO | 25.08.2016 | ||
GR | 26.08.2016 | ||
PT | 26.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | CZ | 25.05.2016 | |
DK | 25.05.2016 | ||
EE | 25.05.2016 | ||
FI | 25.05.2016 | ||
LT | 25.05.2016 | ||
LV | 25.05.2016 | ||
NL | 25.05.2016 | ||
RO | 25.05.2016 | ||
RS | 25.05.2016 | ||
SE | 25.05.2016 | ||
NO | 25.08.2016 | ||
GR | 26.08.2016 | ||
PT | 26.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | DK | 25.05.2016 | |
FI | 25.05.2016 | ||
LT | 25.05.2016 | ||
LV | 25.05.2016 | ||
NL | 25.05.2016 | ||
RS | 25.05.2016 | ||
SE | 25.05.2016 | ||
NO | 25.08.2016 | ||
GR | 26.08.2016 | ||
PT | 26.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/52] | FI | 25.05.2016 | |
LT | 25.05.2016 | ||
LV | 25.05.2016 | ||
NL | 25.05.2016 | ||
RS | 25.05.2016 | ||
SE | 25.05.2016 | ||
NO | 25.08.2016 | ||
GR | 26.08.2016 | ||
PT | 26.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/51] | FI | 25.05.2016 | |
LT | 25.05.2016 | ||
LV | 25.05.2016 | ||
NL | 25.05.2016 | ||
RS | 25.05.2016 | ||
NO | 25.08.2016 | ||
GR | 26.08.2016 | ||
PT | 26.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | FI | 25.05.2016 | |
LT | 25.05.2016 | ||
LV | 25.05.2016 | ||
NL | 25.05.2016 | ||
RS | 25.05.2016 | ||
NO | 25.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | FI | 25.05.2016 | |
LT | 25.05.2016 | ||
NL | 25.05.2016 | ||
NO | 25.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | LT | 25.05.2016 | |
NO | 25.08.2016 | Cited in | International search | [AD]WO2010010458 (PURDUE PHARMA LP [US], et al) [AD] 1-62 * example - * * page 119; tables 1,2 * * claims 1, 2, 7, 33-39, 43, 47, 48 * | by applicant | WO9946260 | WO9950254 | WO0190102 | WO2005028451 | WO03062234 | US2005256000 | US7355045 | US6562319 | WO2005075459 | US6635653 | US2010022519 | US2010216726 | US5698155 | US3845770 | US3916899 | US3536809 | US3598123 | US4008719 | US5674533 | US5059595 | US5591767 | US5120548 | US5073543 | US5639476 | US5354556 | US5733566 | US6136839 | US2011178090 | - HENDERSON ET AL., "The orphan opioid receptor and its endogenous ligand - nociceptin/orphanin FQ", TRENDS PHARMACOL. SCI., (1997), vol. 18, no. 8, doi:doi:10.1016/S0165-6147(97)90645-3, pages 293 - 300, XP004085920 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0165-6147(97)90645-3 | - CAIRA ET AL., "Preparation and Crystal Characterization of a Polymorph, a Monohydrate, and an Ethyl Acetate Solvate of the Antifungal Fluconazole", J. PHARMACEUT. SCI., (2004), vol. 93, no. 3, doi:doi:10.1002/jps.10541, pages 601 - 611, XP002653534 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/jps.10541 | - VAN TONDER ET AL., "Preparation and Physicochemical Characterization of 5 Niclosamide Solvates and I Hemisolvate", AAPS PHARM. SCI. TECH., (2004), vol. 5, no. 1 | - BINGHAM ET AL., "Over one hundred solvates of sulfathiazole", CHEM. COMM., (2001), pages 603 - 604 | - "Drug and Enzyme Targeting, Part A", COLOWICK ET AL., Methods in Enzymology, ACADEMIC PRESS, (1985), vol. 112 | - "Design and Application of Prodrugs", BUNDGAARD, A Textbook of Drug Design and Development, HARWOOD ACADEMIC PUBLISHERS, (1991), pages 113 - 191 | - BUNDGAARD ET AL., "C) Means to Enhance Penetration (1) Prodrugs as a means to improve the delivery of peptide drugs", ADV. DRUG DELIVERY REVS., (1992), vol. 8, doi:doi:10.1016/0169-409X(92)90014-H, pages 1 - 38, XP023764110 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0169-409X(92)90014-H | - BUNDGAARD ET AL., "Glycolamide Esters as Biolabile Prodrugs of Carboxylic Acid Agents: Synthesis, Stability, Bioconversion, and Physicochemical Properties", J PHARMACEUT. SCI., (1988), vol. 77, no. 4, doi:doi:10.1002/jps.2600770402, pages 285 - 298, XP000944531 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/jps.2600770402 | - KAKEYA ET AL., "Studies on Prodrugs of Cephalosporins. I. Synthesis and Biological Properties of Glycyloxygenzoyloxymethyl and Glycylaminobenzoyloxymethyl Esters of 7?-[2-(2-Aminothiazol-4-yl)-(Z)-2-methoxyiminoacetamido]3-methyl-3-cephem-4-carboxylic Acid", CHEM. PHARM. BULL., (1984), vol. 32, pages 692 - 698 | - "The Preparation and Characterization of Tritiated Neurochemicals", FILER ET AL., Isotopes in the Physical and Biomedical Sciences, Vol. 1, Labeled Compounds (Part A, (1987), vol. 1, pages 155 - 192 | - "Pharmacodynamics: Mechanisms of Drug Action and the Relationship Between Drug Concentration and Effect", ROSS ET AL., Goodman & Gilman's The Pharmacological Basis of Therapeutics, MCGRAW-HILL, (2001), pages 31 - 43 | - TORTOLANI ET AL., "A Convenient Synthesis to N-Aryl-Substituted 4-Piperidones", ORG. LETT., (1999), vol. 1, pages 1261 - 1262 | - DUDASH ET AL., "Synthesis and evaluation of 3-anilino-quinoxalinones as glycogen phosphorylase inhibitors", BIOORG. MED. CHEM. LETT., (2005), vol. 15, no. 21, doi:doi:10.1016/j.bmcl.2005.07.021, pages 4790 - 4793, XP025313928 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.bmcl.2005.07.021 | - "Hydrogenation of Nitro Compounds", Hydrogenation Methods, ACADEMIC PRESS, (1985), pages 104 - 116 | - "The Zinin Reduction of Nitroarenes", ORG. REACTIONS, (1973), vol. 20, pages 455 - 481 | - "Thionyl Chloride", PIZEY, Synthetic Reagents, JOHN WILEY & SONS, (1974), vol. 1, pages 321 - 357 | - PERREGAARD ET AL., "Studies on Organophosphorus Compounds XVIII*. Oxidation of Tertiary Alicyclic Amines with Elemental Sulfur in Hexa-methylphosphoric Triamide (HMPA). Oxidative Rearrangements of Hexahy-Droazepines and Octahydroazocines to bis(3-Pyrrolyl)Polysulfides", BULL. SOC. CHIM. BELG., (1977), vol. 86, pages 679 - 691 | - BERDINI ET AL., "A Modified Palladium Catalyzed Reductive Amination Procedure", TETRAHEDRON, (2002), vol. 58, doi:doi:10.1016/S0040-4020(02)00530-6, pages 5669 - 5674, XP004369415 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0040-4020(02)00530-6 | - LEWIN ET AL., "Molecular Features Associated with Polyamine Modulation of NMDA Receptors", J. MED. CHEM., (1998), vol. 41, pages 988 - 995 | - GRUPP ET AL., "Protection against Hypoxia-reoxygenation in the Absence of Poly (ADP-ribose) Synthetase in Isolated Working Hearts", J MOL. CELL CARDIOL., (1999), vol. 31, pages 297 - 303 | - SHIMOHIGASHI ET AL., "Sensitivity of Opioid Receptor-like Receptor ORL I for Chemical Modification on Nociceptin, a Naturally Occurring Nociceptive Peptide", J. BIOL. CHEM., (1996), vol. 271, no. 39, pages 23642 - 23645 | - NARITA ET AL., "Identification of the G-protein Coupled ORL 1 Receptor in the Mouse Spinal Cord by [35S]-GTP?S Binding and Immunohistochemistry", BRIT. J PHARMACOL., (1999), vol. 128, pages 1300 - 1306 | - MILLIGAN, "Principles: Extending the Utility of [35S]GTP?S Binding Assays", TIPS, (2003), vol. 24, no. 2, doi:doi:10.1016/S0165-6147(02)00027-5, pages 87 - 90, XP004404399 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0165-6147(02)00027-5 | - LAZARENO, "Measurement of Agonist-stimulated [35S]GTP?S Binding to Cell Membranes", METHODS IN MOLECULAR BIOLOGY, (1999), vol. 106, pages 231 - 245 | - LANGER, "New Methods of Drug Delivery", SCIENCE, (1990), vol. 249, doi:doi:10.1126/science.2218494, pages 1527 - 1533, XP000169082 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.2218494 | - "Dental Applications", GOODSON, Medical Applications of Controlled Release, Vol. 2, Applications and Evaluation, CRC PRESS, (1984), vol. 2, pages 115 - 138 | - LANGER, SCIENCE, (1990), vol. 249, pages 1527 - 1533 | - SEFTON, "Implantable Pumps", CRC CRIT. REV. BIOMED ENG., (1987), vol. 14, no. 3, pages 201 - 240, XP009142739 | - BUCHWALD ET AL., "Long-term, Continuous Intravenous Heparin Administration by an Implantable Infusion Pump in Ambulatory Patients with Recurrent Venous Thrombosis", SURGERY, (1980), vol. 88, pages 507 - 516, XP009142781 | - SAUDEK ET AL., "A Preliminary Trial of the Programmable Implantable Medication System for Insulin Delivery", NEW ENGL. J MED., (1989), vol. 321, pages 574 - 579, XP009142740 | - "Drug Product Design and Performance", GOODSON; SMOLEN ET AL., Controlled Drug Bioavailability, JOHN WILEY & SONS, (1984), vol. 1 | - LANGER ET AL., "Chemical and Physical Structure of Polymers as Carriers for Controlled Release of Bioactive Agents: A Review", J. MACROMOL. SCI. REV. MACROMOL. CHEM., (1983), vol. C23, no. 1, pages 61 - 126 | - LEVY ET AL., "Inhibition of Calcification of Bioprosthetic Heart Valves by Local Controlled-Release Diphosphonate", SCIENCE, (1985), vol. 228, pages 190 - 192, XP009142736 | - DURING ET AL., "Controlled Release of Dopamine from a Polymeric Brain Implant: In Vivo Characterization", ANN. NEUROL., (1989), vol. 25, doi:doi:10.1002/ana.410250406, pages 351 - 356, XP009035936 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/ana.410250406 | - HOWARD ET AL., "Intracerebral drug delivery in rats with lesion-induced memory deficits", J NEUROSURG., (1989), vol. 71, doi:doi:10.3171/jns.1989.71.1.0105, pages 105 - 112, XP008091921 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.3171/jns.1989.71.1.0105 | - "Preformulation", RADEBOUGH ET AL., Remington's Pharmaceutical Sciences., 19th Ed.,, MACK PUBLISHING, (1995), vol. 2, pages 1447 - 1676 | - KING, "Tablets, Capsules, and Pills", KING, OSOL,, Remington's Pharmaceutical Sciences., 16th Ed., MACK PUBLISHING, (1980), pages 1553 - 1593 | - "Analgesic-Antipyretic and Anti-inflammatory Agents and Drugs Employed in the Treatment of Gout", INSEL ET AL., Goodman & Gilman's The Pharmacological Basis of Therapeutics, MCGRAW-HILL, (1996), pages 617 - 657 | - "Analgesic, Antipyretic and Anti-Inflammatory Drugs", HANSON, Remingtoh: The Science and Practice of Pharmacy, MACK PUBLISHING, (1995), vol. II, pages 1196 - 1221 | - HANESSIAN ET AL., "Asymmetric Synthesis of L-Azetidine-2-Carboxylic Acid and 3-Substituted Congeners - Conformationally Constrained Analogs of Phenylalanine, Naphthylalanine, and Leucine", BIOORG. MED. CHEM. LETT., (1999), vol. 9, doi:doi:10.1016/S0960-894X(99)00218-8, pages 1437 - 1442, XP004164908 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0960-894X(99)00218-8 | - ENDERS ET AL., "Asymmetric Synthesis of Substituted Azetidine Type a- and (?-Amino Acids", SYNTHESIS, (2005), vol. 20, pages 3508 - 3516 | - BRANDI ET AL., "Novel Syntheses of Azetidines and Azetidinones", CHEM. REV., (2008), vol. 108, pages 3988 - 4035 | - D'AMOUR ET AL., "A Method for Determining Loss of Pain Sensation", J PHARMACOL. EXP. THER., (1941), vol. 72, pages 74 - 79 | - BARTHO ET AL., "Involvement of capsaicin-sensitive neurons in hyperalgesia and enhanced opioid antinociception in inflammation", NAUNYN-SCHMIEDEBERG'S ARCHIVES OFPHARMACOL., (1990), vol. 342, pages 666 - 670 | - SELTZER ET AL., "A Novel Behavioral Model of Neuropathic Pain Disorders Produced in Rats by Partial Sciatic Nerve Injury", PAIN, (1990), vol. 43, doi:doi:10.1016/0304-3959(90)91074-S, pages 205 - 218, XP024377631 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0304-3959(90)91074-S | - KIM, "An Experimental Model for Peripheral Neuropathy Produced by Segmental Spinal Nerve Ligation in the Rat", PAIN, (1992), vol. 50, no. 3, doi:doi:10.1016/0304-3959(92)90041-9, pages 355 - 363, XP024378108 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0304-3959(92)90041-9 | - STEIN, "Unilateral Inflammation of the Hindpaw in Rats as a Model of Prolonged Noxious Stimulation: Alterations in Behavior and Nociceptive Thresholds", PHARMACOL. BIOCHEM. BEHAVIOR, (1988), vol. 31, pages 451 - 455 | - HARGREAVES ET AL., "A New and Sensitive Method for Measuring Thermal Nociception in Cutaneous Hyperalgesia", PAIN, (1988), vol. 32, no. 1, doi:doi:10.1016/0304-3959(88)90026-7, pages 77 - 88, XP024378083 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0304-3959(88)90026-7 |