EP2798719 - POWER RESERVE APPARATUS, POWER SYSTEM, AND ELECTRIC VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 31.07.2015 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.07.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.09.2015 [2015/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | [2014/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUGENO, Naoyuki c/o Sony Energy Devices Corporation 1-1 Shimosugishita Takakura Hiwada-machi Koriyama-shi Fukushima 963-0531 / JP | 02 /
SATO, Morihiko c/o Sony Energy Devices Corporation 1-1 Shimosugishita Takakura Hiwada-machi Koriyama-shi Fukushima 963-0531 / JP | 03 /
UMETSU, Koji c/o Sony Energy Devices Corporation 1-1 Shimosugishita Takakura Hiwada-machi Koriyama-shi Fukushima 963-0531 / JP | [2014/45] | Representative(s) | Müller Hoffmann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB St.-Martin-Straße 58 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/45] | Müller - Hoffmann & Partner Patentanwälte St.-Martin-Strasse 58 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12814004.3 | 17.12.2012 | WO2012JP83176 | Priority number, date | JP20110282839 | 26.12.2011 Original published format: JP 2011282839 | [2014/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2013099782 | Date: | 04.07.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/27] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2798719 | Date: | 05.11.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.07.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.12.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H02J7/00, H01M10/44 | [2014/45] | CPC: |
B60L58/12 (EP,US);
H02J7/0014 (EP,CN,US);
B60L58/22 (EP,US);
H01M10/441 (EP,CN,US);
H01M10/46 (EP,CN,US);
H01M10/482 (EP,CN,US);
H02J50/10 (US);
H02J50/60 (US);
H02J7/0016 (US);
H02J7/0019 (US);
H02J7/342 (US);
H01M2010/4271 (EP,CN,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/45] | Title | German: | LEISTUNGSRESERVEVORRICHTUNG, STROMVERSORGUNGSSYSTEM UND ELEKTRISCHES FAHRZEUG | [2014/45] | English: | POWER RESERVE APPARATUS, POWER SYSTEM, AND ELECTRIC VEHICLE | [2014/45] | French: | APPAREIL DE RÉSERVE DE PUISSANCE, SYSTÈME D'ALIMENTATION ET VÉHICULE ÉLECTRIQUE | [2014/45] | Entry into regional phase | 26.05.2014 | National basic fee paid | 26.05.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.05.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.05.2014 | Examination requested [2014/45] | 14.03.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/36] | 17.04.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time [2015/36] | 17.04.2015 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1} | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]DE19533543 (RAY O VAC CORP [US]) [A] 1-23* the whole document *; | [XY]DE102008043593 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 1,15 * paragraphs [0004] , [0005] , [0027] - paragraph [0032]; figures 2-6 * [Y] 2-10,16,18-20,22,23; | [A]WO2011034957 (NAT SEMICONDUCTOR CORP [US], et al) [A] 1-23 * the whole document *; | [Y]WO2011070517 (PANACIS INC [CA], et al) [Y] 10 * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0026] *; | [Y]US2011140662 (LI GUOXING [US]) [Y] 10 * paragraph [0017]; figure 1 *; | [Y]US2011241622 (LI GUOXING [US], et al) [Y] 2-9,18-20,22,23 * paragraph [0004] - paragraph [0075] *; | [Y]DE102010029460 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [Y] 2-4,6,16 * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0046] * | by applicant | JP2008035680 |