EP2798127 - WEAR PAD ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.07.2019 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.08.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.03.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, MK | published on 05.08.2020 [2020/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Caterpillar Inc. 100 N.E. Adams Street Peoria, IL 61626-9510 / US | [2018/36] |
Former [2014/45] | For all designated states Caterpillar Inc. 100 N.E. Adams Street Peoria, IL 61626-9510 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHEEHAN, Paul, Anthony 11 Juniper Close Leicester Forest East LE3 3JX / GB | 02 /
FORRESTER, Adrian, Paul 18 Hastings Meadow Close Leicester LE9 2DR / GB | [2014/45] | Representative(s) | BRP Renaud & Partner mbB Rechtsanwälte Patentanwälte Steuerberater Königstraße 28 70173 Stuttgart / DE | [2018/36] |
Former [2014/45] | Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 12814058.9 | 14.12.2012 | [2018/36] | WO2012US69683 | Priority number, date | GB20110022481 | 30.12.2011 Original published format: GB 201122481 | [2014/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013101501 | Date: | 04.07.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2798127 | Date: | 05.11.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.07.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2798127 | Date: | 05.09.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.07.2013 | Classification | IPC: | E02F9/28 | [2014/45] | CPC: |
E02F9/2883 (EP,RU,US);
E02F3/40 (GB);
B60S9/00 (RU);
E02F3/36 (RU);
E02F3/8152 (GB);
E02F9/085 (GB)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/45] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERSCHLEISSSCHUTZANORDNUNG | [2014/45] | English: | WEAR PAD ASSEMBLY | [2014/45] | French: | ENSEMBLE DE TAMPON D'USURE | [2014/45] | Entry into regional phase | 06.06.2014 | National basic fee paid | 06.06.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.06.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.06.2014 | Examination requested [2014/45] | 19.09.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.08.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.11.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.03.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.07.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.03.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.07.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 27.07.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.07.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.08.2016 | Opposition(s) | 06.06.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 14.12.2012 | AL | 05.09.2018 | AT | 05.09.2018 | CY | 05.09.2018 | CZ | 05.09.2018 | DK | 05.09.2018 | EE | 05.09.2018 | ES | 05.09.2018 | FI | 05.09.2018 | HR | 05.09.2018 | IT | 05.09.2018 | LT | 05.09.2018 | LV | 05.09.2018 | MC | 05.09.2018 | MK | 05.09.2018 | NL | 05.09.2018 | PL | 05.09.2018 | RO | 05.09.2018 | RS | 05.09.2018 | SE | 05.09.2018 | SI | 05.09.2018 | SK | 05.09.2018 | SM | 05.09.2018 | TR | 05.09.2018 | BG | 05.12.2018 | NO | 05.12.2018 | GR | 06.12.2018 | GB | 14.12.2018 | IE | 14.12.2018 | LU | 14.12.2018 | MT | 14.12.2018 | BE | 31.12.2018 | CH | 31.12.2018 | FR | 31.12.2018 | LI | 31.12.2018 | IS | 05.01.2019 | PT | 05.01.2019 | [2020/31] |
Former [2020/30] | HU | 14.12.2012 | |
AL | 05.09.2018 | ||
AT | 05.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 05.09.2018 | ||
DK | 05.09.2018 | ||
EE | 05.09.2018 | ||
ES | 05.09.2018 | ||
FI | 05.09.2018 | ||
HR | 05.09.2018 | ||
IT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LV | 05.09.2018 | ||
MC | 05.09.2018 | ||
NL | 05.09.2018 | ||
PL | 05.09.2018 | ||
RO | 05.09.2018 | ||
RS | 05.09.2018 | ||
SE | 05.09.2018 | ||
SI | 05.09.2018 | ||
SK | 05.09.2018 | ||
SM | 05.09.2018 | ||
TR | 05.09.2018 | ||
BG | 05.12.2018 | ||
NO | 05.12.2018 | ||
GR | 06.12.2018 | ||
GB | 14.12.2018 | ||
IE | 14.12.2018 | ||
LU | 14.12.2018 | ||
MT | 14.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
CH | 31.12.2018 | ||
FR | 31.12.2018 | ||
LI | 31.12.2018 | ||
IS | 05.01.2019 | ||
PT | 05.01.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 05.09.2018 | |
AT | 05.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 05.09.2018 | ||
DK | 05.09.2018 | ||
EE | 05.09.2018 | ||
ES | 05.09.2018 | ||
FI | 05.09.2018 | ||
HR | 05.09.2018 | ||
IT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LV | 05.09.2018 | ||
MC | 05.09.2018 | ||
NL | 05.09.2018 | ||
PL | 05.09.2018 | ||
RO | 05.09.2018 | ||
RS | 05.09.2018 | ||
SE | 05.09.2018 | ||
SI | 05.09.2018 | ||
SK | 05.09.2018 | ||
SM | 05.09.2018 | ||
TR | 05.09.2018 | ||
BG | 05.12.2018 | ||
NO | 05.12.2018 | ||
GR | 06.12.2018 | ||
GB | 14.12.2018 | ||
IE | 14.12.2018 | ||
LU | 14.12.2018 | ||
MT | 14.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
CH | 31.12.2018 | ||
FR | 31.12.2018 | ||
LI | 31.12.2018 | ||
IS | 05.01.2019 | ||
PT | 05.01.2019 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AL | 05.09.2018 | |
AT | 05.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 05.09.2018 | ||
DK | 05.09.2018 | ||
EE | 05.09.2018 | ||
ES | 05.09.2018 | ||
FI | 05.09.2018 | ||
HR | 05.09.2018 | ||
IT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LV | 05.09.2018 | ||
MC | 05.09.2018 | ||
NL | 05.09.2018 | ||
PL | 05.09.2018 | ||
RO | 05.09.2018 | ||
RS | 05.09.2018 | ||
SE | 05.09.2018 | ||
SI | 05.09.2018 | ||
SK | 05.09.2018 | ||
SM | 05.09.2018 | ||
BG | 05.12.2018 | ||
NO | 05.12.2018 | ||
GR | 06.12.2018 | ||
GB | 14.12.2018 | ||
IE | 14.12.2018 | ||
LU | 14.12.2018 | ||
MT | 14.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
CH | 31.12.2018 | ||
FR | 31.12.2018 | ||
LI | 31.12.2018 | ||
IS | 05.01.2019 | ||
PT | 05.01.2019 | ||
Former [2020/04] | AL | 05.09.2018 | |
AT | 05.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 05.09.2018 | ||
DK | 05.09.2018 | ||
EE | 05.09.2018 | ||
ES | 05.09.2018 | ||
FI | 05.09.2018 | ||
HR | 05.09.2018 | ||
IT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LV | 05.09.2018 | ||
MC | 05.09.2018 | ||
NL | 05.09.2018 | ||
PL | 05.09.2018 | ||
RO | 05.09.2018 | ||
RS | 05.09.2018 | ||
SE | 05.09.2018 | ||
SI | 05.09.2018 | ||
SK | 05.09.2018 | ||
SM | 05.09.2018 | ||
BG | 05.12.2018 | ||
NO | 05.12.2018 | ||
GR | 06.12.2018 | ||
GB | 14.12.2018 | ||
IE | 14.12.2018 | ||
LU | 14.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
CH | 31.12.2018 | ||
FR | 31.12.2018 | ||
LI | 31.12.2018 | ||
IS | 05.01.2019 | ||
PT | 05.01.2019 | ||
Former [2020/03] | AL | 05.09.2018 | |
AT | 05.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 05.09.2018 | ||
DK | 05.09.2018 | ||
EE | 05.09.2018 | ||
ES | 05.09.2018 | ||
FI | 05.09.2018 | ||
HR | 05.09.2018 | ||
IT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LV | 05.09.2018 | ||
MC | 05.09.2018 | ||
NL | 05.09.2018 | ||
PL | 05.09.2018 | ||
RO | 05.09.2018 | ||
RS | 05.09.2018 | ||
SE | 05.09.2018 | ||
SI | 05.09.2018 | ||
SK | 05.09.2018 | ||
SM | 05.09.2018 | ||
BG | 05.12.2018 | ||
NO | 05.12.2018 | ||
GR | 06.12.2018 | ||
GB | 14.12.2018 | ||
IE | 14.12.2018 | ||
LU | 14.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
FR | 31.12.2018 | ||
IS | 05.01.2019 | ||
PT | 05.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 05.09.2018 | |
AT | 05.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 05.09.2018 | ||
DK | 05.09.2018 | ||
EE | 05.09.2018 | ||
ES | 05.09.2018 | ||
FI | 05.09.2018 | ||
HR | 05.09.2018 | ||
IT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LV | 05.09.2018 | ||
MC | 05.09.2018 | ||
NL | 05.09.2018 | ||
PL | 05.09.2018 | ||
RO | 05.09.2018 | ||
RS | 05.09.2018 | ||
SE | 05.09.2018 | ||
SI | 05.09.2018 | ||
SK | 05.09.2018 | ||
SM | 05.09.2018 | ||
BG | 05.12.2018 | ||
NO | 05.12.2018 | ||
GR | 06.12.2018 | ||
IE | 14.12.2018 | ||
LU | 14.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
FR | 31.12.2018 | ||
IS | 05.01.2019 | ||
PT | 05.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AL | 05.09.2018 | |
AT | 05.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 05.09.2018 | ||
DK | 05.09.2018 | ||
EE | 05.09.2018 | ||
ES | 05.09.2018 | ||
FI | 05.09.2018 | ||
HR | 05.09.2018 | ||
IT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LV | 05.09.2018 | ||
MC | 05.09.2018 | ||
NL | 05.09.2018 | ||
PL | 05.09.2018 | ||
RO | 05.09.2018 | ||
RS | 05.09.2018 | ||
SE | 05.09.2018 | ||
SI | 05.09.2018 | ||
SK | 05.09.2018 | ||
SM | 05.09.2018 | ||
BG | 05.12.2018 | ||
NO | 05.12.2018 | ||
GR | 06.12.2018 | ||
IE | 14.12.2018 | ||
LU | 14.12.2018 | ||
FR | 31.12.2018 | ||
IS | 05.01.2019 | ||
PT | 05.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | AL | 05.09.2018 | |
AT | 05.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 05.09.2018 | ||
DK | 05.09.2018 | ||
EE | 05.09.2018 | ||
ES | 05.09.2018 | ||
FI | 05.09.2018 | ||
HR | 05.09.2018 | ||
IT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LV | 05.09.2018 | ||
MC | 05.09.2018 | ||
NL | 05.09.2018 | ||
PL | 05.09.2018 | ||
RO | 05.09.2018 | ||
RS | 05.09.2018 | ||
SE | 05.09.2018 | ||
SI | 05.09.2018 | ||
SK | 05.09.2018 | ||
SM | 05.09.2018 | ||
BG | 05.12.2018 | ||
NO | 05.12.2018 | ||
GR | 06.12.2018 | ||
IE | 14.12.2018 | ||
LU | 14.12.2018 | ||
IS | 05.01.2019 | ||
PT | 05.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AL | 05.09.2018 | |
AT | 05.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 05.09.2018 | ||
DK | 05.09.2018 | ||
EE | 05.09.2018 | ||
ES | 05.09.2018 | ||
FI | 05.09.2018 | ||
HR | 05.09.2018 | ||
IT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LV | 05.09.2018 | ||
MC | 05.09.2018 | ||
NL | 05.09.2018 | ||
PL | 05.09.2018 | ||
RO | 05.09.2018 | ||
RS | 05.09.2018 | ||
SE | 05.09.2018 | ||
SI | 05.09.2018 | ||
SK | 05.09.2018 | ||
SM | 05.09.2018 | ||
BG | 05.12.2018 | ||
NO | 05.12.2018 | ||
GR | 06.12.2018 | ||
LU | 14.12.2018 | ||
IS | 05.01.2019 | ||
PT | 05.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/39] | AL | 05.09.2018 | |
AT | 05.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 05.09.2018 | ||
DK | 05.09.2018 | ||
EE | 05.09.2018 | ||
ES | 05.09.2018 | ||
FI | 05.09.2018 | ||
HR | 05.09.2018 | ||
IT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LV | 05.09.2018 | ||
NL | 05.09.2018 | ||
PL | 05.09.2018 | ||
RO | 05.09.2018 | ||
RS | 05.09.2018 | ||
SE | 05.09.2018 | ||
SI | 05.09.2018 | ||
SK | 05.09.2018 | ||
SM | 05.09.2018 | ||
BG | 05.12.2018 | ||
NO | 05.12.2018 | ||
GR | 06.12.2018 | ||
LU | 14.12.2018 | ||
IS | 05.01.2019 | ||
PT | 05.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AL | 05.09.2018 | |
AT | 05.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 05.09.2018 | ||
DK | 05.09.2018 | ||
EE | 05.09.2018 | ||
ES | 05.09.2018 | ||
FI | 05.09.2018 | ||
HR | 05.09.2018 | ||
IT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LV | 05.09.2018 | ||
NL | 05.09.2018 | ||
PL | 05.09.2018 | ||
RO | 05.09.2018 | ||
RS | 05.09.2018 | ||
SE | 05.09.2018 | ||
SI | 05.09.2018 | ||
SK | 05.09.2018 | ||
SM | 05.09.2018 | ||
BG | 05.12.2018 | ||
NO | 05.12.2018 | ||
GR | 06.12.2018 | ||
IS | 05.01.2019 | ||
PT | 05.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | AL | 05.09.2018 | |
AT | 05.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 05.09.2018 | ||
DK | 05.09.2018 | ||
EE | 05.09.2018 | ||
ES | 05.09.2018 | ||
FI | 05.09.2018 | ||
HR | 05.09.2018 | ||
IT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LV | 05.09.2018 | ||
NL | 05.09.2018 | ||
PL | 05.09.2018 | ||
RO | 05.09.2018 | ||
RS | 05.09.2018 | ||
SE | 05.09.2018 | ||
SK | 05.09.2018 | ||
SM | 05.09.2018 | ||
BG | 05.12.2018 | ||
NO | 05.12.2018 | ||
GR | 06.12.2018 | ||
IS | 05.01.2019 | ||
PT | 05.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 05.09.2018 | |
AT | 05.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 05.09.2018 | ||
EE | 05.09.2018 | ||
ES | 05.09.2018 | ||
FI | 05.09.2018 | ||
HR | 05.09.2018 | ||
IT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LV | 05.09.2018 | ||
NL | 05.09.2018 | ||
PL | 05.09.2018 | ||
RO | 05.09.2018 | ||
RS | 05.09.2018 | ||
SE | 05.09.2018 | ||
SK | 05.09.2018 | ||
SM | 05.09.2018 | ||
BG | 05.12.2018 | ||
NO | 05.12.2018 | ||
GR | 06.12.2018 | ||
IS | 05.01.2019 | ||
PT | 05.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/23] | AL | 05.09.2018 | |
AT | 05.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 05.09.2018 | ||
EE | 05.09.2018 | ||
ES | 05.09.2018 | ||
FI | 05.09.2018 | ||
HR | 05.09.2018 | ||
IT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LV | 05.09.2018 | ||
NL | 05.09.2018 | ||
PL | 05.09.2018 | ||
RO | 05.09.2018 | ||
RS | 05.09.2018 | ||
SE | 05.09.2018 | ||
SK | 05.09.2018 | ||
BG | 05.12.2018 | ||
NO | 05.12.2018 | ||
GR | 06.12.2018 | ||
IS | 05.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/22] | AL | 05.09.2018 | |
CZ | 05.09.2018 | ||
FI | 05.09.2018 | ||
HR | 05.09.2018 | ||
IT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LV | 05.09.2018 | ||
NL | 05.09.2018 | ||
PL | 05.09.2018 | ||
RO | 05.09.2018 | ||
RS | 05.09.2018 | ||
SE | 05.09.2018 | ||
BG | 05.12.2018 | ||
NO | 05.12.2018 | ||
GR | 06.12.2018 | ||
IS | 05.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/21] | AL | 05.09.2018 | |
FI | 05.09.2018 | ||
HR | 05.09.2018 | ||
IT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LV | 05.09.2018 | ||
NL | 05.09.2018 | ||
RS | 05.09.2018 | ||
SE | 05.09.2018 | ||
BG | 05.12.2018 | ||
NO | 05.12.2018 | ||
GR | 06.12.2018 | ||
IS | 05.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/20] | AL | 05.09.2018 | |
FI | 05.09.2018 | ||
HR | 05.09.2018 | ||
LT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LV | 05.09.2018 | ||
NL | 05.09.2018 | ||
RS | 05.09.2018 | ||
SE | 05.09.2018 | ||
BG | 05.12.2018 | ||
NO | 05.12.2018 | ||
GR | 06.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AL | 05.09.2018 | |
FI | 05.09.2018 | ||
HR | 05.09.2018 | ||
LT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LV | 05.09.2018 | ||
RS | 05.09.2018 | ||
SE | 05.09.2018 | ||
BG | 05.12.2018 | ||
NO | 05.12.2018 | ||
GR | 06.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | FI | 05.09.2018 | |
HR | 05.09.2018 | ||
LT | 05.09.2018 | ||
RS | 05.09.2018 | ||
SE | 05.09.2018 | ||
BG | 05.12.2018 | ||
NO | 05.12.2018 | ||
GR | 06.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | FI | 05.09.2018 | |
LT | 05.09.2018 | ||
RS | 05.09.2018 | ||
SE | 05.09.2018 | ||
BG | 05.12.2018 | ||
NO | 05.12.2018 | ||
GR | 06.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | FI | 05.09.2018 | |
LT | 05.09.2018 | ||
NO | 05.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/07] | LT | 05.09.2018 | Cited in | International search | [A]US6041529 (RUVANG JOHN A [US]); | [IA]US2005241195 (BIERWITH ROBERT S [US]); | [A]US2006042130 (LAHOOD JAMES R [US]); | [AD]US2006145489 (SHAPIRO EDWARD [CA], et al); | [A]WO2011127536 (CQMS PTY LTD [AU], et al) | by applicant | US6386586 | US2006145489 |