EP2733123 - SELECTIVE HYDROGENATION APPARATUS FOR BIOLOGICALLY APPLICABLE LIQUID [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 29.06.2018 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.06.2018 | Refusal of application | published on 01.08.2018 [2018/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MIZ Co., Ltd. 16-5, Zengyo 1-chome Fujisawa-shi Kanagawa 251-087 / JP | [2014/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SATOH, Fumitake c/o MIZ Co. LTD. 16-5 Zengyo 1-chome Fujisawa-shi Kanagawa 251-0871 / JP | 02 /
SEO, Tomoki c/o MIZ Co. LTD. 16-5 Zengyo 1-chome Fujisawa-shi Kanagawa 251-0871 / JP | 03 /
KUROKAWA, Ryousuke c/o MIZ Co. LTD. 16-5 Zengyo 1-chome Fujisawa-shi Kanagawa 251-0871 / JP | 04 /
SATOH, Bunpei c/o MIZ Co. LTD. 16-5 Zengyo 1-chome Fujisawa-shi Kanagawa 251-0871 / JP | [2014/21] | Representative(s) | Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Artur-Ladebeck-Strasse 51 33617 Bielefeld / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/21] | Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Artur-Ladebeck-Strasse 51 33617 Bielefeld / DE | Application number, filing date | 12815085.1 | 08.05.2012 | WO2012JP61759 | Priority number, date | JP20110156952 | 15.07.2011 Original published format: JP 2011156952 | [2014/21] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013011732 | Date: | 24.01.2013 | Language: | JA | [2013/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2733123 | Date: | 21.05.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 24.01.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.11.2014 | Classification | IPC: | C02F1/68, B01F1/00, B01F5/06, A61K33/00, A61P39/06, B01F15/00, B01F15/02, B01F3/04, C01B3/08, B01F13/00 | [2014/46] | CPC: |
A61P39/06 (EP);
C02F1/68 (EP,KR,US);
A47J31/44 (US);
B01F23/20 (KR);
B01F23/23 (EP,US);
B01F23/2366 (US);
B01F23/23764 (EP,US);
B01F33/50111 (EP,US);
B01F35/32021 (EP,US);
B01F35/7162 (EP,US);
B01J7/02 (US);
B01J8/00 (US);
C01B3/08 (EP,US);
C02F1/685 (EP,US);
C02F1/687 (US);
|
Former IPC [2014/21] | C02F1/68, B01F1/00, B01F5/06, A61K33/00, A61P39/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/21] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR SELEKTIVEN HYDRIERUNG EINER BIOLOGISCH AUFBRINGBAREN FLÜSSIGKEIT | [2014/21] | English: | SELECTIVE HYDROGENATION APPARATUS FOR BIOLOGICALLY APPLICABLE LIQUID | [2014/21] | French: | APPAREIL D'HYDROGÉNATION SÉLECTIVE POUR UN LIQUIDE D'APPLICATION BIOLOGIQUE | [2014/21] | Entry into regional phase | 30.10.2013 | Translation filed | 30.10.2013 | National basic fee paid | 30.10.2013 | Search fee paid | 30.10.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.10.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.10.2013 | Examination requested [2014/21] | 26.05.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.10.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.02.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.06.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2018/31] | 06.04.2018 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2018/31] | Appeal following examination | 02.08.2016 | Appeal received No. T2229/16 | 28.09.2016 | Statement of grounds filed | 21.09.2017 | Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M04) [2017/38] | 23.01.2018 | Date of receipt of observations in an appeal [2018/04] | 06.04.2018 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant was rejected | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.10.2015 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP2002172317 (SATO KIYOSHI) [X] 1,3 * the whole document *; | [Y]JP2005007380 (EPIA KK) [Y] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [Y]US2005036941 (BAE IN TAE [US], et al) [Y] 1,4,5 * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0046]; figures 1-7 *; | [X]JP2007134600 (DAINIPPON SCREEN MFG) [X] 1,4,5 * abstract *; | [X]US7252771 (KOPINKE FRANZ-DIETER [DE], et al) [X] 1-5 * figure 1; examples 1-4; claims 1-5, 10, 17 *; | [X]EP1867607 (SHIGA SEIKI [JP]) [X] 1,2,4,5 * paragraph [0082] - paragraph [0090]; figure 16; claims 1,4 * * paragraphs [0071] , [0 72] *; | [X]JP2010124808 (YADA NAOYUKI) [X] 1,4,5 * abstract *; | [Y]US2010209338 (MIKI TAKESHI [JP], et al) [Y] 1-6 * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0085] *; | [X]JP4652479B (MIZU KK) [X] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [XP]WO2012056923 (MIZ CO LTD [JP], et al) [XP] 1-6 * the whole document *; | EP2508484 [ ] (MIZ CO LTD [JP]) [ ] * paragraph [0029]; example -; claim 1 *; | EP2508485 [ ] (MIZ CO LTD [JP]) [ ] * the whole document * | International search | [A]JP2004243151 (TANAKA YOSHIRO, et al); | [A]JP2006255613 (SHIGA SEIKI); | [A]WO2010103894 (MIZ CO LTD [JP], et al); | [A]JP2010207802 (SHIGA KINOSUI KENKYUSHO KK) | by applicant | JP2007167696 | JP20090221567 |