EP2734967 - A RECOMMENDATION ENGINE THAT PROCESSES DATA INCLUDING USER DATA TO PROVIDE RECOMMENDATIONS AND EXPLANATIONS FOR THE RECOMMENDATIONS TO A USER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.10.2017 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.10.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.11.2017 [2017/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states OpenTable, Inc. 1 Montgomery Street, Suite 700 San Francisco, CA 94104 / US | [2014/42] |
Former [2014/41] | For all designated states Ness Computing, LLC 1 Montgomery Street, Suite 700 San Francisco, CA 94104 / US | ||
Former [2014/22] | For all designated states Ness Computing Inc. 4300 El Camino Real, Suite 100 Los Altos, California 94022 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BERNER, Christopher, Eric, Shogo 427 Acalanes Drive Apartment 14 Sunnyvale, California 94086 / US | 02 /
SCHIFF, Jeremy, Ryan 425 Golden Oak Drive Portola Valley, California 94028 / US | 03 /
REESE, Corey, Layne 425 Golden Oak Drive Portola Valley, California 94028 / US | 04 /
TWOHEY, Paul, Kenneth 340 Ventura Avenue Apartment 5 Palo Alto, California 94306 / US | [2014/22] | Representative(s) | Roberts, Gwilym Vaughan, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/22] | Dearden, Anthony James, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 12815207.1 | 19.07.2012 | WO2012US47476 | Priority number, date | US201161509999P | 20.07.2011 Original published format: US 201161509999 P | [2014/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013013091 | Date: | 24.01.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2734967 | Date: | 28.05.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.01.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 24.01.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.03.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q30/00, G06Q30/02, G06Q50/00, // G06Q30/06 | [2015/17] | CPC: |
G06Q30/0631 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2014/22] | G06Q30/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/22] | Title | German: | EMPFEHLUNGSMASCHINE ZUR VERARBEITUNG VON DATEN EINSCHLIESSLICH EMPFEHLUNGSBEREITSTELLUNGSDATEN UND ERKLÄRUNGEN FÜR EMPFEHLUNGEN AN EINEN BENUTZER | [2014/22] | English: | A RECOMMENDATION ENGINE THAT PROCESSES DATA INCLUDING USER DATA TO PROVIDE RECOMMENDATIONS AND EXPLANATIONS FOR THE RECOMMENDATIONS TO A USER | [2014/22] | French: | MOTEUR DE RECOMMANDATION QUI TRAITE DES DONNÉES COMPRENANT DES DONNÉES D'UTILISATEUR POUR FOURNIR DES RECOMMANDATIONS ET DES EXPLICATIONS DE CELLES-CI À UN UTILISATEUR | [2014/22] | Entry into regional phase | 17.01.2014 | National basic fee paid | 17.01.2014 | Search fee paid | 17.01.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.01.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.01.2014 | Examination requested [2014/22] | 22.01.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.01.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.06.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/45] | 30.06.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/45] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.01.2017 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 22.01.2016 | Request for further processing filed | 22.01.2016 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 10.02.2016 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2008214162 (RAMER JOREY [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * paragraphs [0137] - [0139] - [ 197] , [ 231] , [ 779] , [ 874]; figure 1 * * abstract *; | [X]US2007118498 (SONG XIAODAN [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * paragraphs [0032] , [0 47] , [0 56]; figures 2, 4 * * abstract *; | [A]US2009177644 (MARTINEZ RONALD [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0051] , [0 90] , [ 166] , [ 188] , [ 194]; figures 3, 8 * * abstract * | International search | [Y]US6370513 (KOLAWA ADAM K [US], et al); | [Y]US2009234664 (SCHAFFNIT WAYNE A [US], et al) |