EP2794726 - SILICONE HYDROGELS COMPRISING DESIRABLE WATER CONTENT AND OXYGEN PERMEABILITY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 21.01.2022 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 07.01.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.01.2022 | Revocation of patent | published on 23.02.2022 [2022/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Johnson & Johnson Vision Care, Inc. 7500 Centurion Parkway Jacksonville, FL 32256 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2014/44] | For all designated states Johnson & Johnson Vision Care Inc. 7500 Centurion Parkway Jacksonville, FL 32256 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ALLI, Azaam 3489 Advantage Lane Jacksonville, Florida 32277 / US | 02 /
FORD, James D. 515 Nassau Court Orange Park, Florida 32003 / US | 03 /
JOSLIN, Scott L. 732 Mill Stream Road Ponte Vedra Beach, Florida 32082 / US | [2014/44] | Representative(s) | Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [2014/44] | Application number, filing date | 12815933.2 | 20.12.2012 | [2016/43] | WO2012US70899 | Priority number, date | US201161579683P | 23.12.2011 Original published format: US 201161579683 P | US201161579693P | 23.12.2011 Original published format: US 201161579693 P | US201213720277 | 19.12.2012 Original published format: US201213720277 | [2014/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013096600 | Date: | 27.06.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2794726 | Date: | 29.10.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.06.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2794726 | Date: | 26.10.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.06.2013 | Classification | IPC: | C08G77/442, C08F283/12, C08F290/06 | [2014/44] | CPC: |
C08F283/124 (EP,RU,US);
C08F283/12 (US);
C08F290/06 (US);
C08F290/068 (EP,RU,US);
C08G77/442 (EP,RU,US);
G02B1/043 (RU,US)
| C-Set: |
C08F283/124, C08F220/56 (US,EP);
C08F283/124, C08F226/10 (US,EP);
C08F283/124, C08F226/10, C08F230/08, C08F220/20, C08F222/102 (EP,US,RU);
C08F290/068, C08F220/56 (US,EP); | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/44] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SILIKONHYDROGELE MIT GEWÜNSCHTEM WASSERGEHALT UND SAUERSTOFFDURCHLÄSSIGKEIT | [2014/44] | English: | SILICONE HYDROGELS COMPRISING DESIRABLE WATER CONTENT AND OXYGEN PERMEABILITY | [2014/44] | French: | HYDROGELS DE SILICONE COMPRENANT UNE TENEUR EN EAU ET UNE PERMÉABILITÉ À L'OXYGÈNE SOUHAITABLES | [2014/44] | Entry into regional phase | 17.07.2014 | National basic fee paid | 17.07.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.07.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.07.2014 | Examination requested [2014/44] | 02.03.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.09.2015 | Observations by third parties | 19.02.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.06.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.07.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.08.2016 | Observations by third parties | 07.09.2016 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 07.09.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 07.09.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.09.2016 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 21.09.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP16195164.5 / EP3181614 | EP21210220.6 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.02.2016 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
25.07.2017
29.08.2017
ADMISSIBLE Schneider, Peter Obere Karspüle 41 37073 Göttingen / DE Opponent's representative dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [2018/17] |
Former [2017/35] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
25.07.2017
Schneider, Peter Obere Karspüle 41 37073 Göttingen / DE Opponent's representative Schreiber, Christoph dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 DE-50667 Köln / DE | 01.09.2017 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 11.01.2018 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 29.11.2018 | Date of oral proceedings | 08.01.2019 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 08.01.2019 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 14.01.2022 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2022/08] | Appeal following opposition | 11.03.2019 | Appeal received No. T0741/19 | 23.04.2019 | Statement of grounds filed | 14.01.2022 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor withdrawn | 14.01.2022 | Date of oral proceedings | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 20.12.2012 | AL | 26.10.2016 | AT | 26.10.2016 | BE | 26.10.2016 | CY | 26.10.2016 | CZ | 26.10.2016 | DK | 26.10.2016 | EE | 26.10.2016 | ES | 26.10.2016 | FI | 26.10.2016 | HR | 26.10.2016 | LT | 26.10.2016 | LV | 26.10.2016 | MC | 26.10.2016 | MK | 26.10.2016 | NL | 26.10.2016 | PL | 26.10.2016 | RO | 26.10.2016 | RS | 26.10.2016 | SE | 26.10.2016 | SI | 26.10.2016 | SK | 26.10.2016 | SM | 26.10.2016 | TR | 26.10.2016 | LU | 20.12.2016 | MT | 20.12.2016 | CH | 31.12.2016 | LI | 31.12.2016 | BG | 26.01.2017 | NO | 26.01.2017 | GR | 27.01.2017 | IS | 26.02.2017 | PT | 27.02.2017 | [2020/34] |
Former [2018/45] | HU | 20.12.2012 | |
AT | 26.10.2016 | ||
BE | 26.10.2016 | ||
CY | 26.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2016 | ||
DK | 26.10.2016 | ||
EE | 26.10.2016 | ||
ES | 26.10.2016 | ||
FI | 26.10.2016 | ||
HR | 26.10.2016 | ||
LT | 26.10.2016 | ||
LV | 26.10.2016 | ||
MC | 26.10.2016 | ||
MK | 26.10.2016 | ||
NL | 26.10.2016 | ||
PL | 26.10.2016 | ||
RO | 26.10.2016 | ||
RS | 26.10.2016 | ||
SE | 26.10.2016 | ||
SI | 26.10.2016 | ||
SK | 26.10.2016 | ||
SM | 26.10.2016 | ||
TR | 26.10.2016 | ||
LU | 20.12.2016 | ||
MT | 20.12.2016 | ||
CH | 31.12.2016 | ||
LI | 31.12.2016 | ||
BG | 26.01.2017 | ||
NO | 26.01.2017 | ||
GR | 27.01.2017 | ||
IS | 26.02.2017 | ||
PT | 27.02.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | HU | 20.12.2012 | |
AT | 26.10.2016 | ||
BE | 26.10.2016 | ||
CY | 26.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2016 | ||
DK | 26.10.2016 | ||
EE | 26.10.2016 | ||
ES | 26.10.2016 | ||
FI | 26.10.2016 | ||
HR | 26.10.2016 | ||
LT | 26.10.2016 | ||
LV | 26.10.2016 | ||
MC | 26.10.2016 | ||
MK | 26.10.2016 | ||
NL | 26.10.2016 | ||
PL | 26.10.2016 | ||
RO | 26.10.2016 | ||
RS | 26.10.2016 | ||
SE | 26.10.2016 | ||
SI | 26.10.2016 | ||
SK | 26.10.2016 | ||
SM | 26.10.2016 | ||
LU | 20.12.2016 | ||
MT | 20.12.2016 | ||
CH | 31.12.2016 | ||
LI | 31.12.2016 | ||
BG | 26.01.2017 | ||
NO | 26.01.2017 | ||
GR | 27.01.2017 | ||
IS | 26.02.2017 | ||
PT | 27.02.2017 | ||
Former [2018/30] | HU | 20.12.2012 | |
AT | 26.10.2016 | ||
BE | 26.10.2016 | ||
CY | 26.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2016 | ||
DK | 26.10.2016 | ||
EE | 26.10.2016 | ||
ES | 26.10.2016 | ||
FI | 26.10.2016 | ||
HR | 26.10.2016 | ||
LT | 26.10.2016 | ||
LV | 26.10.2016 | ||
MC | 26.10.2016 | ||
MK | 26.10.2016 | ||
NL | 26.10.2016 | ||
PL | 26.10.2016 | ||
RO | 26.10.2016 | ||
RS | 26.10.2016 | ||
SE | 26.10.2016 | ||
SI | 26.10.2016 | ||
SK | 26.10.2016 | ||
SM | 26.10.2016 | ||
LU | 20.12.2016 | ||
CH | 31.12.2016 | ||
LI | 31.12.2016 | ||
BG | 26.01.2017 | ||
NO | 26.01.2017 | ||
GR | 27.01.2017 | ||
IS | 26.02.2017 | ||
PT | 27.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 26.10.2016 | |
BE | 26.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2016 | ||
DK | 26.10.2016 | ||
EE | 26.10.2016 | ||
ES | 26.10.2016 | ||
FI | 26.10.2016 | ||
HR | 26.10.2016 | ||
LT | 26.10.2016 | ||
LV | 26.10.2016 | ||
MC | 26.10.2016 | ||
NL | 26.10.2016 | ||
PL | 26.10.2016 | ||
RO | 26.10.2016 | ||
RS | 26.10.2016 | ||
SE | 26.10.2016 | ||
SI | 26.10.2016 | ||
SK | 26.10.2016 | ||
SM | 26.10.2016 | ||
LU | 20.12.2016 | ||
CH | 31.12.2016 | ||
LI | 31.12.2016 | ||
BG | 26.01.2017 | ||
NO | 26.01.2017 | ||
GR | 27.01.2017 | ||
IS | 26.02.2017 | ||
PT | 27.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/42] | AT | 26.10.2016 | |
BE | 26.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2016 | ||
DK | 26.10.2016 | ||
EE | 26.10.2016 | ||
ES | 26.10.2016 | ||
FI | 26.10.2016 | ||
HR | 26.10.2016 | ||
LT | 26.10.2016 | ||
LV | 26.10.2016 | ||
MC | 26.10.2016 | ||
NL | 26.10.2016 | ||
PL | 26.10.2016 | ||
RO | 26.10.2016 | ||
RS | 26.10.2016 | ||
SE | 26.10.2016 | ||
SK | 26.10.2016 | ||
SM | 26.10.2016 | ||
BG | 26.01.2017 | ||
NO | 26.01.2017 | ||
GR | 27.01.2017 | ||
IS | 26.02.2017 | ||
PT | 27.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/38] | AT | 26.10.2016 | |
BE | 26.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2016 | ||
DK | 26.10.2016 | ||
EE | 26.10.2016 | ||
ES | 26.10.2016 | ||
FI | 26.10.2016 | ||
HR | 26.10.2016 | ||
LT | 26.10.2016 | ||
LV | 26.10.2016 | ||
NL | 26.10.2016 | ||
PL | 26.10.2016 | ||
RO | 26.10.2016 | ||
RS | 26.10.2016 | ||
SE | 26.10.2016 | ||
SK | 26.10.2016 | ||
SM | 26.10.2016 | ||
BG | 26.01.2017 | ||
NO | 26.01.2017 | ||
GR | 27.01.2017 | ||
IS | 26.02.2017 | ||
PT | 27.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 26.10.2016 | |
BE | 26.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2016 | ||
DK | 26.10.2016 | ||
EE | 26.10.2016 | ||
ES | 26.10.2016 | ||
FI | 26.10.2016 | ||
HR | 26.10.2016 | ||
LT | 26.10.2016 | ||
LV | 26.10.2016 | ||
NL | 26.10.2016 | ||
PL | 26.10.2016 | ||
RO | 26.10.2016 | ||
RS | 26.10.2016 | ||
SE | 26.10.2016 | ||
SK | 26.10.2016 | ||
SM | 26.10.2016 | ||
NO | 26.01.2017 | ||
GR | 27.01.2017 | ||
IS | 26.02.2017 | ||
PT | 27.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/36] | AT | 26.10.2016 | |
BE | 26.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2016 | ||
DK | 26.10.2016 | ||
EE | 26.10.2016 | ||
ES | 26.10.2016 | ||
FI | 26.10.2016 | ||
HR | 26.10.2016 | ||
LT | 26.10.2016 | ||
LV | 26.10.2016 | ||
NL | 26.10.2016 | ||
PL | 26.10.2016 | ||
RO | 26.10.2016 | ||
RS | 26.10.2016 | ||
SE | 26.10.2016 | ||
SK | 26.10.2016 | ||
NO | 26.01.2017 | ||
GR | 27.01.2017 | ||
IS | 26.02.2017 | ||
PT | 27.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/34] | AT | 26.10.2016 | |
BE | 26.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2016 | ||
DK | 26.10.2016 | ||
ES | 26.10.2016 | ||
FI | 26.10.2016 | ||
HR | 26.10.2016 | ||
LT | 26.10.2016 | ||
LV | 26.10.2016 | ||
NL | 26.10.2016 | ||
PL | 26.10.2016 | ||
RS | 26.10.2016 | ||
SE | 26.10.2016 | ||
NO | 26.01.2017 | ||
GR | 27.01.2017 | ||
IS | 26.02.2017 | ||
PT | 27.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/33] | AT | 26.10.2016 | |
BE | 26.10.2016 | ||
DK | 26.10.2016 | ||
ES | 26.10.2016 | ||
FI | 26.10.2016 | ||
HR | 26.10.2016 | ||
LT | 26.10.2016 | ||
LV | 26.10.2016 | ||
NL | 26.10.2016 | ||
PL | 26.10.2016 | ||
RS | 26.10.2016 | ||
SE | 26.10.2016 | ||
NO | 26.01.2017 | ||
GR | 27.01.2017 | ||
IS | 26.02.2017 | ||
PT | 27.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/26] | AT | 26.10.2016 | |
BE | 26.10.2016 | ||
ES | 26.10.2016 | ||
FI | 26.10.2016 | ||
HR | 26.10.2016 | ||
LT | 26.10.2016 | ||
LV | 26.10.2016 | ||
NL | 26.10.2016 | ||
PL | 26.10.2016 | ||
RS | 26.10.2016 | ||
SE | 26.10.2016 | ||
NO | 26.01.2017 | ||
GR | 27.01.2017 | ||
IS | 26.02.2017 | ||
PT | 27.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/12] | LV | 26.10.2016 | Cited in | International search | [A]US2002107324 (VANDERLAAN DOUGLAS G [US], et al) [A] 1-53 * claims 1-18 *; | [XD]US2010048847 (BROAD ROBERT ANDREW [GB]) [XD] 1-53 * claim 2; table 5 *; | [X]US2010249356 (RATHORE OSMAN [US], et al) [X] 1-53 * claim 5; table 9 *; | [A]US2011230589 (MAGGIO THOMAS L [US], et al) [A] 1-53* claims 1-11 * | by applicant | US3408429 | US3660545 | US4113224 | US4136250 | US4139513 | US4153641 | US4197266 | US4260725 | US6020445 | WO03022321 | WO03022322 | US6867245 | US2010048847 | US2010280146 | US2011237766 | - J.V. CRIVELLO; K. DIETLIKER, Photoinitiators for Free Radical Cationic & Anionic Photopolymerization, JOHN WILEY AND SONS, (1998), vol. III | - BARTON, CRC Handbook of Solubility Par., (1983), pages 85 - 87 | Opposition | WO9631792 | WO0127174 | JP2008020918 | WO2008076736 | US2010048847 | WO2010147864 | WO2011041523 | WO2013096587 | WO2013096594 | - Yu-Chin Lai, "The role of bulky polysiloxyanylalkyl methacrylates in polurethane-polysiloxane hydrogels", Journal of Applied Polymer Science, (19960000), vol. 60, pages 1193 - 1199, XP000634741 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/(SICI)1097-4628(19960523)60:8<1193::AID-APP12>3.0.CO;2-3 |