EP2936785 - ENABLING EXTERNAL ACCESS TO MULTIPLE SERVICES ON A LOCAL SERVER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.07.2016 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.08.2016 [2016/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/44] | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget L M Ericsson (PUBL) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LI, Qiang Albert Målares Väg 6 A S-187 75 Täby / SE | 02 /
CLEVERDAL, Andreas Långsjövägen 50 S-125 30 Älvsjö / SE | 03 /
FIKOURAS, Loannis Blomsterkungsvägen 221 S-165 77 Stockholm / SE | 04 /
HOLM, Tomas Vitsippstigen 6 A S-125 54 Älvsjö / SE | 05 /
LARS-ÖRJAN, Kling Kummelvägen 17 S-152 57 Södertälje / SE | 06 /
NIEMOELLER, Joerg Skogsbacken 20 S-17241 Sundbyberg / SE | [2015/44] | Representative(s) | Ericsson Patent Development Torshamnsgatan 21-23 164 80 Stockholm / SE | [2015/44] | Application number, filing date | 12816297.1 | 24.12.2012 | [2015/44] | WO2012EP76879 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014101935 | Date: | 03.07.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2936785 | Date: | 28.10.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.07.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.07.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/12, G06F17/30, H04W4/00 | [2015/44] | CPC: |
H04L61/2567 (EP,US);
H04L47/70 (EP,US);
H04L61/2514 (EP,US);
H04L61/4511 (EP,US);
H04L61/5076 (EP,US);
H04L69/14 (US);
H04L69/329 (EP,US);
H04L9/40 (US);
H04W4/70 (EP,US);
H04L61/3025 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/44] | Title | German: | ERMÖGLICHUNG DES EXTERNEN ZUGRIFFS AUF MEHRERE DIENSTE AUF EINEM LOKALEN SERVER | [2015/44] | English: | ENABLING EXTERNAL ACCESS TO MULTIPLE SERVICES ON A LOCAL SERVER | [2015/44] | French: | AUTORISATION D'ACCÈS EXTERNE À DE MULTIPLES SERVICES SUR UN SERVEUR LOCAL | [2015/44] | Entry into regional phase | 23.06.2015 | National basic fee paid | 23.06.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.06.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.10.2014 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 23.06.2015 | Examination requested [2015/44] | 10.02.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/32] | 10.02.2016 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Claims | 18.03.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time [2016/32] | 18.03.2016 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1} | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [YDA]WO2012103938 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE], et al) [YD] 9-16,18,21-23 * page 8 - page 9 * [A] 1-8,17,19,20; | [XAYI] - "Machine-to-Machine communications (M2M); Functional architecture;ts_102690v1-1-11 clean", ETSI DRAFT; TS_102690V1-1-11 CLEAN, EUROPEAN TELECOMMUNICATIONS STANDARDS INSTITUTE (ETSI), 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS ; FRANCE, (20121219), vol. M2M, no. V1.1.11, pages 1 - 280, XP014094596 [X] 1,19 * clauses (including subclauses) 8.3.3, 8.4, 9.1, 9.2, 9,3.2.27, Annex A, * [A] 7 [Y] 9-16,18,21-23 [I] 2-6,8,17,20 | [A] - "3rd Generation Partnership Project; Technical Specification Group Services and System Aspects; System improvements for Machine-Type Communications (MTC) (Release 11)", 3GPP STANDARD; 3GPP TR 23.888, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20120918), vol. SA WG2, no. V11.0.0, pages 1 - 165, XP050649142 [A] 1-23 * clauses 4.3, 6.1, 6.18, 6.29, 6.38, 6.41, 6.50, 6.55 * | [A] - JIMENEZ ERICSSON J LOPEZ-VEGA UNIVERSITY OF GRANADA J MAENPAA G CAMARILLO ERICSSON J, "A Constrained Application Protocol (CoAP) Usage for REsource LOcation And Discovery (RELOAD); draft-jimenez-p2psip-coap-reload-02.txt", A CONSTRAINED APPLICATION PROTOCOL (COAP) USAGE FOR RESOURCE LOCATION AND DISCOVERY (RELOAD); DRAFT-JIMENEZ-P2PSIP-COAP-RELOAD-02.TXT, INTERNET ENGINEERING TASK FORCE, IETF; STANDARDWORKINGDRAFT, INTERNET SOCIETY (ISOC) 4, RUE DES FALAISES CH- 1205 G, (20120820), pages 1 - 18, XP015086918 [A] 1-23 * clauses 4 and 5 * | [A] - GULBRANDSEN TROLL TECHNOLOGIES P VIXIE INTERNET SOFTWARE CONSORTIUM L ESIBOV MICROSOFT CORP A, "A DNS RR for specifying the location of services (DNS SRV); rfc2782.txt", 20000201, (20000201), ISSN 0000-0003, XP015008565 [A] 8,11-13,17,20 * the whole document * | [A] - ROSENBAUM DIGITAL EQUIPMENT CORPORATION R, "Using the Domain Name System To Store Arbitrary String Attributes; rfc1464.txt", 19930501, (19930501), vol. RFC 1464, ISSN 0000-0003, pages 1 - 8, XP015007251 [A] 8,11-13,17,20 * clause 2 * | by applicant | US2010094978 | WO2012103938 |