EP2805372 - METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION OF A PROTON EXCHANGE MEMBRANE FOR A FUEL CELL BY MEANS OF SOLVENT-CASTING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.07.2016 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 21.11.2018 [2018/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Commissariat à l'Énergie Atomique et aux Énergies Alternatives 25, Rue Leblanc Bâtiment "Le Ponant D" 75015 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2014/48] | For all designated states Commissariat à l'Énergie Atomique et aux Énergies Alternatives 25, rue Leblanc Bâtiment "Le Ponant D" 75015 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MOLMERET, Yannick 5 Allée du Cret F-38320 Eybens / FR | 02 /
MORIN, Arnaud 4 Rue Saint François de Sales F-38100 Grenoble / FR | [2014/48] | Representative(s) | Cabinet Laurent & Charras Le Contemporain 50 Chemin de la Bruyère 69574 Dardilly Cedex / FR | [2014/48] | Application number, filing date | 12816766.5 | 21.12.2012 | [2015/38] | WO2012FR53044 | Priority number, date | FR20120050518 | 18.01.2012 Original published format: FR 1250518 | [2014/48] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013107956 | Date: | 25.07.2013 | Language: | FR | [2013/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2805372 | Date: | 26.11.2014 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.07.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2805372 | Date: | 16.09.2015 | Language: | FR | [2015/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.07.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H01M8/10 | [2014/48] | CPC: |
H01M8/1039 (EP,US);
B29C39/003 (US);
H01M8/1018 (EP,US);
H01M8/1023 (EP,US);
B29K2027/16 (US);
B29L2031/3468 (US);
H01M2008/1095 (EP,US);
H01M2300/0082 (US);
H01M8/1081 (EP,US);
H01M8/1086 (EP,US);
H01M8/1088 (EP,US);
Y02E60/50 (EP);
Y02P70/50 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/48] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER PROTONENAUSTAUSCHMEMBRAN FÜR EINE BRENNSTOFFZELLE MITTELS LÖSUNGSMITTELGUSS | [2014/48] | English: | METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION OF A PROTON EXCHANGE MEMBRANE FOR A FUEL CELL BY MEANS OF SOLVENT-CASTING | [2014/48] | French: | PROCEDE DE PREPARATION D'UNE MEMBRANE ECHANGEUSE DE PROTONS POUR PILE A COMBUSTIBLE PAR COULEE EVAPORATION | [2014/48] | Entry into regional phase | 26.06.2014 | National basic fee paid | 26.06.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.06.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.09.2013 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 26.06.2014 | Examination requested [2014/48] | 04.12.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.06.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.07.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 30.07.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 30.07.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.06.2015 | Opposition(s) | 17.06.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 21.12.2012 | AL | 16.09.2015 | AT | 16.09.2015 | BG | 16.09.2015 | CY | 16.09.2015 | CZ | 16.09.2015 | DK | 16.09.2015 | EE | 16.09.2015 | ES | 16.09.2015 | FI | 16.09.2015 | HR | 16.09.2015 | LT | 16.09.2015 | LV | 16.09.2015 | MC | 16.09.2015 | MK | 16.09.2015 | MT | 16.09.2015 | NL | 16.09.2015 | PL | 16.09.2015 | RO | 16.09.2015 | RS | 16.09.2015 | SE | 16.09.2015 | SI | 16.09.2015 | SK | 16.09.2015 | SM | 16.09.2015 | TR | 16.09.2015 | NO | 16.12.2015 | GR | 17.12.2015 | IE | 21.12.2015 | LU | 21.12.2015 | BE | 31.12.2015 | CH | 31.12.2015 | LI | 31.12.2015 | IS | 16.01.2016 | PT | 18.01.2016 | [2018/47] |
Former [2018/45] | HU | 21.12.2012 | |
AT | 16.09.2015 | ||
BG | 16.09.2015 | ||
CY | 16.09.2015 | ||
CZ | 16.09.2015 | ||
DK | 16.09.2015 | ||
EE | 16.09.2015 | ||
ES | 16.09.2015 | ||
FI | 16.09.2015 | ||
HR | 16.09.2015 | ||
LT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LV | 16.09.2015 | ||
MC | 16.09.2015 | ||
MK | 16.09.2015 | ||
MT | 16.09.2015 | ||
NL | 16.09.2015 | ||
PL | 16.09.2015 | ||
RO | 16.09.2015 | ||
RS | 16.09.2015 | ||
SE | 16.09.2015 | ||
SI | 16.09.2015 | ||
SK | 16.09.2015 | ||
SM | 16.09.2015 | ||
TR | 16.09.2015 | ||
NO | 16.12.2015 | ||
GR | 17.12.2015 | ||
IE | 21.12.2015 | ||
LU | 21.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
CH | 31.12.2015 | ||
LI | 31.12.2015 | ||
IS | 16.01.2016 | ||
PT | 18.01.2016 | ||
Former [2018/31] | HU | 21.12.2012 | |
AT | 16.09.2015 | ||
BG | 16.09.2015 | ||
CY | 16.09.2015 | ||
CZ | 16.09.2015 | ||
DK | 16.09.2015 | ||
EE | 16.09.2015 | ||
ES | 16.09.2015 | ||
FI | 16.09.2015 | ||
HR | 16.09.2015 | ||
LT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LV | 16.09.2015 | ||
MC | 16.09.2015 | ||
MK | 16.09.2015 | ||
MT | 16.09.2015 | ||
NL | 16.09.2015 | ||
PL | 16.09.2015 | ||
RO | 16.09.2015 | ||
RS | 16.09.2015 | ||
SE | 16.09.2015 | ||
SI | 16.09.2015 | ||
SK | 16.09.2015 | ||
SM | 16.09.2015 | ||
NO | 16.12.2015 | ||
GR | 17.12.2015 | ||
IE | 21.12.2015 | ||
LU | 21.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
CH | 31.12.2015 | ||
LI | 31.12.2015 | ||
IS | 16.01.2016 | ||
PT | 18.01.2016 | ||
Former [2017/39] | HU | 21.12.2012 | |
AT | 16.09.2015 | ||
BG | 16.09.2015 | ||
CY | 16.09.2015 | ||
CZ | 16.09.2015 | ||
DK | 16.09.2015 | ||
EE | 16.09.2015 | ||
ES | 16.09.2015 | ||
FI | 16.09.2015 | ||
HR | 16.09.2015 | ||
LT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LV | 16.09.2015 | ||
MC | 16.09.2015 | ||
MT | 16.09.2015 | ||
NL | 16.09.2015 | ||
PL | 16.09.2015 | ||
RO | 16.09.2015 | ||
RS | 16.09.2015 | ||
SE | 16.09.2015 | ||
SI | 16.09.2015 | ||
SK | 16.09.2015 | ||
SM | 16.09.2015 | ||
NO | 16.12.2015 | ||
GR | 17.12.2015 | ||
IE | 21.12.2015 | ||
LU | 21.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
CH | 31.12.2015 | ||
LI | 31.12.2015 | ||
IS | 16.01.2016 | ||
PT | 18.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | AT | 16.09.2015 | |
CZ | 16.09.2015 | ||
DK | 16.09.2015 | ||
EE | 16.09.2015 | ||
ES | 16.09.2015 | ||
FI | 16.09.2015 | ||
HR | 16.09.2015 | ||
LT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LV | 16.09.2015 | ||
MC | 16.09.2015 | ||
NL | 16.09.2015 | ||
PL | 16.09.2015 | ||
RO | 16.09.2015 | ||
RS | 16.09.2015 | ||
SE | 16.09.2015 | ||
SI | 16.09.2015 | ||
SK | 16.09.2015 | ||
NO | 16.12.2015 | ||
GR | 17.12.2015 | ||
IE | 21.12.2015 | ||
LU | 21.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
CH | 31.12.2015 | ||
LI | 31.12.2015 | ||
IS | 16.01.2016 | ||
PT | 18.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | AT | 16.09.2015 | |
CZ | 16.09.2015 | ||
DK | 16.09.2015 | ||
EE | 16.09.2015 | ||
ES | 16.09.2015 | ||
FI | 16.09.2015 | ||
HR | 16.09.2015 | ||
LT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LV | 16.09.2015 | ||
MC | 16.09.2015 | ||
NL | 16.09.2015 | ||
PL | 16.09.2015 | ||
RO | 16.09.2015 | ||
RS | 16.09.2015 | ||
SE | 16.09.2015 | ||
SK | 16.09.2015 | ||
NO | 16.12.2015 | ||
GR | 17.12.2015 | ||
IE | 21.12.2015 | ||
LU | 21.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
CH | 31.12.2015 | ||
LI | 31.12.2015 | ||
IS | 16.01.2016 | ||
PT | 18.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/45] | AT | 16.09.2015 | |
CZ | 16.09.2015 | ||
DK | 16.09.2015 | ||
EE | 16.09.2015 | ||
ES | 16.09.2015 | ||
FI | 16.09.2015 | ||
HR | 16.09.2015 | ||
LT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LV | 16.09.2015 | ||
MC | 16.09.2015 | ||
NL | 16.09.2015 | ||
PL | 16.09.2015 | ||
RO | 16.09.2015 | ||
RS | 16.09.2015 | ||
SE | 16.09.2015 | ||
SK | 16.09.2015 | ||
NO | 16.12.2015 | ||
GR | 17.12.2015 | ||
IE | 21.12.2015 | ||
LU | 21.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
IS | 16.01.2016 | ||
PT | 18.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | AT | 16.09.2015 | |
CZ | 16.09.2015 | ||
DK | 16.09.2015 | ||
EE | 16.09.2015 | ||
ES | 16.09.2015 | ||
FI | 16.09.2015 | ||
HR | 16.09.2015 | ||
LT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LV | 16.09.2015 | ||
MC | 16.09.2015 | ||
NL | 16.09.2015 | ||
PL | 16.09.2015 | ||
RO | 16.09.2015 | ||
RS | 16.09.2015 | ||
SE | 16.09.2015 | ||
SK | 16.09.2015 | ||
NO | 16.12.2015 | ||
GR | 17.12.2015 | ||
LU | 21.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
IS | 16.01.2016 | ||
PT | 18.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/34] | AT | 16.09.2015 | |
CZ | 16.09.2015 | ||
EE | 16.09.2015 | ||
ES | 16.09.2015 | ||
FI | 16.09.2015 | ||
HR | 16.09.2015 | ||
LT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LV | 16.09.2015 | ||
MC | 16.09.2015 | ||
NL | 16.09.2015 | ||
PL | 16.09.2015 | ||
RO | 16.09.2015 | ||
RS | 16.09.2015 | ||
SE | 16.09.2015 | ||
SK | 16.09.2015 | ||
NO | 16.12.2015 | ||
GR | 17.12.2015 | ||
LU | 21.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
IS | 16.01.2016 | ||
PT | 18.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/33] | AT | 16.09.2015 | |
CZ | 16.09.2015 | ||
EE | 16.09.2015 | ||
ES | 16.09.2015 | ||
FI | 16.09.2015 | ||
HR | 16.09.2015 | ||
LT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LV | 16.09.2015 | ||
MC | 16.09.2015 | ||
NL | 16.09.2015 | ||
PL | 16.09.2015 | ||
RO | 16.09.2015 | ||
RS | 16.09.2015 | ||
SE | 16.09.2015 | ||
SK | 16.09.2015 | ||
NO | 16.12.2015 | ||
GR | 17.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
IS | 16.01.2016 | ||
PT | 18.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 16.09.2015 | |
CZ | 16.09.2015 | ||
EE | 16.09.2015 | ||
ES | 16.09.2015 | ||
FI | 16.09.2015 | ||
HR | 16.09.2015 | ||
LT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LV | 16.09.2015 | ||
NL | 16.09.2015 | ||
PL | 16.09.2015 | ||
RO | 16.09.2015 | ||
RS | 16.09.2015 | ||
SE | 16.09.2015 | ||
SK | 16.09.2015 | ||
NO | 16.12.2015 | ||
GR | 17.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
IS | 16.01.2016 | ||
PT | 18.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/23] | CZ | 16.09.2015 | |
EE | 16.09.2015 | ||
ES | 16.09.2015 | ||
FI | 16.09.2015 | ||
HR | 16.09.2015 | ||
LT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LV | 16.09.2015 | ||
NL | 16.09.2015 | ||
RO | 16.09.2015 | ||
RS | 16.09.2015 | ||
SE | 16.09.2015 | ||
SK | 16.09.2015 | ||
NO | 16.12.2015 | ||
GR | 17.12.2015 | ||
IS | 16.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/22] | CZ | 16.09.2015 | |
EE | 16.09.2015 | ||
ES | 16.09.2015 | ||
FI | 16.09.2015 | ||
HR | 16.09.2015 | ||
LT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LV | 16.09.2015 | ||
NL | 16.09.2015 | ||
RS | 16.09.2015 | ||
SE | 16.09.2015 | ||
NO | 16.12.2015 | ||
GR | 17.12.2015 | ||
IS | 16.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/20] | ES | 16.09.2015 | |
FI | 16.09.2015 | ||
HR | 16.09.2015 | ||
LT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LV | 16.09.2015 | ||
NL | 16.09.2015 | ||
RS | 16.09.2015 | ||
SE | 16.09.2015 | ||
NO | 16.12.2015 | ||
GR | 17.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/14] | FI | 16.09.2015 | |
HR | 16.09.2015 | ||
LT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LV | 16.09.2015 | ||
NL | 16.09.2015 | ||
RS | 16.09.2015 | ||
SE | 16.09.2015 | ||
NO | 16.12.2015 | ||
GR | 17.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | FI | 16.09.2015 | |
HR | 16.09.2015 | ||
LT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LV | 16.09.2015 | ||
RS | 16.09.2015 | ||
SE | 16.09.2015 | ||
NO | 16.12.2015 | ||
GR | 17.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | FI | 16.09.2015 | |
LT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LV | 16.09.2015 | ||
NO | 16.12.2015 | ||
GR | 17.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/08] | LT | 16.09.2015 | |
NO | 16.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | LT | 16.09.2015 | Cited in | International search | [XI]EP1449886 (UBE INDUSTRIES [JP]) [X] 1,6,8,14,15 * paragraphs [0176] , [0195] , [0199] * [I] 2,3,7,9-13; | [XI]WO9940025 (ACEP INC [CA], et al) [X] 1,6,8 * example 16 * [I] 2,3,7,14,15; | [A]WO9737396 (UNIV CASE WESTERN RESERVE [US]) [A] 1-10 * claims 1-4 * | [XI] - BOOR SINGH ET AL, "Polymer Electrolytes Based on Room Temperature Ionic Liquid: 2,3-Dimethyl-1-octylimidazolium Triflate", THE JOURNAL OF PHYSICAL CHEMISTRY B, (20050901), vol. 109, no. 34, doi:10.1021/jp051673c, ISSN 1520-6106, pages 16539 - 16543, XP055039948 [X] 1,6 * the whole document * [I] 2,3,7,14,15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jp051673c | by applicant | US2008031746 | - HE R; LI Q; XIAO G; BJERRUM NJ, "Proton conductivity of phosphoric acid doped polybenzimidazole and its composites with inorganic proton conductors", J. OF MEMB. SCI., (2003), vol. 226, doi:doi:10.1016/j.memsci.2003.09.002, pages 169 - 184, XP004473659 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.memsci.2003.09.002 | - BASCHUK JJ; LI X., "Carbon monoxide poisoning ofproton exchange membranefuel cells", INT. J. ENERGY RES., (2001), vol. 25, pages 695 - 713 | - LEE ET AL., IND. ENG. CHEM. RES., (2005), vol. 44, pages 7617 - 7626 | - CASCIOLA ET AL., JOURNAL OF POWER SOURCES, (2006), vol. 162, pages 141 - 145 |