EP2736420 - APPARATUS FOR SECURING AN OBJECT TO BONE, INCLUDING THE PROVISION OF A SUTURE ASSEMBLY FOR SECURING AN OBJECT TO BONE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2014/23] | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR SECURING AN OBJECT TO BONE, INCLUDING THE PROVISION AND USE OF A NOVEL SUTURE ASSEMBLY FOR SECURING AN OBJECT TO BONE | ||
[2018/28] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.08.2019 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 14.09.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.07.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Linvatec Corporation 11311 Concept Boulevard Largo, FL 33773 / US | [2018/42] |
Former [2014/23] | For all designated states Linvatec Corporation 11311 Concept Boulevard Largo, FL 33773 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MCDEVITT, Dennis 9511 Centerwood Drive Raleigh, NC 27617 / US | 02 /
NOVAK, Vincent 2013 Coralbells Court Longmont, CO 80503 / US | [2014/23] | Representative(s) | DREISS Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedrichstraße 6 70174 Stuttgart / DE | [2018/42] |
Former [2014/23] | Müller & Schubert Patentanwälte Innere Wiener Straße 13 81667 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12816923.2 | 26.07.2012 | [2018/42] | WO2012US48363 | Priority number, date | US201161511862P | 26.07.2011 Original published format: US 201161511862 P | US201213398589 | 16.02.2012 Original published format: US201213398589 | [2014/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013016552 | Date: | 31.01.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2736420 | Date: | 04.06.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.01.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2736420 | Date: | 17.10.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 31.01.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.05.2015 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/04, A61F2/08 | [2015/26] | CPC: |
A61B17/0401 (EP);
A61B17/1796 (EP);
A61F2/0811 (EP);
A61B17/0482 (EP);
A61B2017/00429 (EP);
A61B2017/0406 (EP);
A61B2017/0409 (EP);
A61B2017/0474 (EP);
A61B2017/0475 (EP);
A61B2017/0496 (EP);
A61B2017/06185 (EP);
A61F2/0805 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2014/23] | A61B17/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/23] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR BEFESTIGUNG EINES OBJEKTS AN EINEM KNOCHEN EINSCHLIESSLICH BEREITSTELLUNG EINER NAHTANORDNUNG ZUR BEFESTIGUNG EINES OBJEKTS AN EINEM KNOCHEN | [2018/28] | English: | APPARATUS FOR SECURING AN OBJECT TO BONE, INCLUDING THE PROVISION OF A SUTURE ASSEMBLY FOR SECURING AN OBJECT TO BONE | [2018/28] | French: | APPAREIL DE FIXATION D'UN OBJET À UN OS, COMPRENANT LA MISE EN PLACE D'UN ENSEMBLE DE SUTURE POUR FIXER UN OBJET À UN OS | [2018/28] |
Former [2014/23] | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR BEFESTIGUNG EINES OBJEKTS AN EINEM KNOCHEN EINSCHLIESSLICH BEREITSTELLUNG UND VERWENDUNG EINER NEUEN NAHTANORDNUNG ZUR BEFESTIGUNG EINES OBJEKTS AN EINEM KNOCHEN | ||
Former [2014/23] | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR SECURING AN OBJECT TO BONE, INCLUDING THE PROVISION AND USE OF A NOVEL SUTURE ASSEMBLY FOR SECURING AN OBJECT TO BONE | ||
Former [2014/23] | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE FIXATION D'UN OBJET À UN OS, COMPRENANT LA MISE EN PLACE ET L'UTILISATION D'UN NOUVEL ENSEMBLE DE SUTURE POUR FIXER UN OBJET À UN OS | Entry into regional phase | 26.02.2014 | National basic fee paid | 26.02.2014 | Search fee paid | 26.02.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.02.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.02.2014 | Examination requested [2014/23] | 10.12.2014 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1} | 12.12.2014 | Request for decision received: Claims | 22.12.2014 | Result of request for decision (Claims): Request accepted | 11.12.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.07.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.09.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 10.09.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.09.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.07.2018 | Opposition(s) | 18.07.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 26.07.2012 | AL | 17.10.2018 | AT | 17.10.2018 | CY | 17.10.2018 | CZ | 17.10.2018 | DK | 17.10.2018 | EE | 17.10.2018 | FI | 17.10.2018 | HR | 17.10.2018 | LT | 17.10.2018 | LV | 17.10.2018 | MC | 17.10.2018 | MK | 17.10.2018 | MT | 17.10.2018 | NL | 17.10.2018 | PL | 17.10.2018 | RO | 17.10.2018 | RS | 17.10.2018 | SE | 17.10.2018 | SI | 17.10.2018 | SK | 17.10.2018 | SM | 17.10.2018 | TR | 17.10.2018 | BG | 17.01.2019 | NO | 17.01.2019 | GR | 18.01.2019 | IS | 17.02.2019 | PT | 17.02.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 26.07.2012 | |
AL | 17.10.2018 | ||
AT | 17.10.2018 | ||
CY | 17.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 17.10.2018 | ||
DK | 17.10.2018 | ||
EE | 17.10.2018 | ||
FI | 17.10.2018 | ||
HR | 17.10.2018 | ||
LT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LV | 17.10.2018 | ||
MC | 17.10.2018 | ||
MT | 17.10.2018 | ||
NL | 17.10.2018 | ||
PL | 17.10.2018 | ||
RO | 17.10.2018 | ||
RS | 17.10.2018 | ||
SE | 17.10.2018 | ||
SI | 17.10.2018 | ||
SK | 17.10.2018 | ||
SM | 17.10.2018 | ||
TR | 17.10.2018 | ||
BG | 17.01.2019 | ||
NO | 17.01.2019 | ||
GR | 18.01.2019 | ||
IS | 17.02.2019 | ||
PT | 17.02.2019 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 26.07.2012 | |
AL | 17.10.2018 | ||
AT | 17.10.2018 | ||
CY | 17.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 17.10.2018 | ||
DK | 17.10.2018 | ||
EE | 17.10.2018 | ||
FI | 17.10.2018 | ||
HR | 17.10.2018 | ||
LT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LV | 17.10.2018 | ||
MC | 17.10.2018 | ||
NL | 17.10.2018 | ||
PL | 17.10.2018 | ||
RO | 17.10.2018 | ||
RS | 17.10.2018 | ||
SE | 17.10.2018 | ||
SI | 17.10.2018 | ||
SK | 17.10.2018 | ||
SM | 17.10.2018 | ||
TR | 17.10.2018 | ||
BG | 17.01.2019 | ||
NO | 17.01.2019 | ||
GR | 18.01.2019 | ||
IS | 17.02.2019 | ||
PT | 17.02.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 17.10.2018 | |
AT | 17.10.2018 | ||
CY | 17.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 17.10.2018 | ||
DK | 17.10.2018 | ||
EE | 17.10.2018 | ||
FI | 17.10.2018 | ||
HR | 17.10.2018 | ||
LT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LV | 17.10.2018 | ||
MC | 17.10.2018 | ||
NL | 17.10.2018 | ||
PL | 17.10.2018 | ||
RO | 17.10.2018 | ||
RS | 17.10.2018 | ||
SE | 17.10.2018 | ||
SI | 17.10.2018 | ||
SK | 17.10.2018 | ||
SM | 17.10.2018 | ||
TR | 17.10.2018 | ||
BG | 17.01.2019 | ||
NO | 17.01.2019 | ||
GR | 18.01.2019 | ||
IS | 17.02.2019 | ||
PT | 17.02.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 17.10.2018 | |
AT | 17.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 17.10.2018 | ||
DK | 17.10.2018 | ||
EE | 17.10.2018 | ||
FI | 17.10.2018 | ||
HR | 17.10.2018 | ||
LT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LV | 17.10.2018 | ||
MC | 17.10.2018 | ||
NL | 17.10.2018 | ||
PL | 17.10.2018 | ||
RO | 17.10.2018 | ||
RS | 17.10.2018 | ||
SE | 17.10.2018 | ||
SI | 17.10.2018 | ||
SK | 17.10.2018 | ||
SM | 17.10.2018 | ||
TR | 17.10.2018 | ||
BG | 17.01.2019 | ||
NO | 17.01.2019 | ||
GR | 18.01.2019 | ||
IS | 17.02.2019 | ||
PT | 17.02.2019 | ||
Former [2020/14] | AL | 17.10.2018 | |
AT | 17.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 17.10.2018 | ||
DK | 17.10.2018 | ||
EE | 17.10.2018 | ||
FI | 17.10.2018 | ||
HR | 17.10.2018 | ||
LT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LV | 17.10.2018 | ||
MC | 17.10.2018 | ||
NL | 17.10.2018 | ||
PL | 17.10.2018 | ||
RO | 17.10.2018 | ||
RS | 17.10.2018 | ||
SE | 17.10.2018 | ||
SI | 17.10.2018 | ||
SK | 17.10.2018 | ||
SM | 17.10.2018 | ||
BG | 17.01.2019 | ||
NO | 17.01.2019 | ||
GR | 18.01.2019 | ||
IS | 17.02.2019 | ||
PT | 17.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AL | 17.10.2018 | |
AT | 17.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 17.10.2018 | ||
DK | 17.10.2018 | ||
EE | 17.10.2018 | ||
FI | 17.10.2018 | ||
HR | 17.10.2018 | ||
LT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LV | 17.10.2018 | ||
NL | 17.10.2018 | ||
PL | 17.10.2018 | ||
RO | 17.10.2018 | ||
RS | 17.10.2018 | ||
SE | 17.10.2018 | ||
SI | 17.10.2018 | ||
SK | 17.10.2018 | ||
SM | 17.10.2018 | ||
BG | 17.01.2019 | ||
NO | 17.01.2019 | ||
GR | 18.01.2019 | ||
IS | 17.02.2019 | ||
PT | 17.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AL | 17.10.2018 | |
AT | 17.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 17.10.2018 | ||
DK | 17.10.2018 | ||
EE | 17.10.2018 | ||
FI | 17.10.2018 | ||
HR | 17.10.2018 | ||
LT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LV | 17.10.2018 | ||
NL | 17.10.2018 | ||
PL | 17.10.2018 | ||
RO | 17.10.2018 | ||
RS | 17.10.2018 | ||
SE | 17.10.2018 | ||
SK | 17.10.2018 | ||
SM | 17.10.2018 | ||
BG | 17.01.2019 | ||
NO | 17.01.2019 | ||
GR | 18.01.2019 | ||
IS | 17.02.2019 | ||
PT | 17.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AL | 17.10.2018 | |
AT | 17.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 17.10.2018 | ||
DK | 17.10.2018 | ||
EE | 17.10.2018 | ||
FI | 17.10.2018 | ||
HR | 17.10.2018 | ||
LT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LV | 17.10.2018 | ||
NL | 17.10.2018 | ||
PL | 17.10.2018 | ||
RO | 17.10.2018 | ||
RS | 17.10.2018 | ||
SE | 17.10.2018 | ||
SM | 17.10.2018 | ||
BG | 17.01.2019 | ||
NO | 17.01.2019 | ||
GR | 18.01.2019 | ||
IS | 17.02.2019 | ||
PT | 17.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/35] | AL | 17.10.2018 | |
AT | 17.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 17.10.2018 | ||
DK | 17.10.2018 | ||
FI | 17.10.2018 | ||
HR | 17.10.2018 | ||
LT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LV | 17.10.2018 | ||
NL | 17.10.2018 | ||
PL | 17.10.2018 | ||
RS | 17.10.2018 | ||
SE | 17.10.2018 | ||
BG | 17.01.2019 | ||
NO | 17.01.2019 | ||
GR | 18.01.2019 | ||
IS | 17.02.2019 | ||
PT | 17.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | AL | 17.10.2018 | |
AT | 17.10.2018 | ||
DK | 17.10.2018 | ||
FI | 17.10.2018 | ||
HR | 17.10.2018 | ||
LT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LV | 17.10.2018 | ||
NL | 17.10.2018 | ||
PL | 17.10.2018 | ||
RS | 17.10.2018 | ||
SE | 17.10.2018 | ||
BG | 17.01.2019 | ||
NO | 17.01.2019 | ||
GR | 18.01.2019 | ||
IS | 17.02.2019 | ||
PT | 17.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 17.10.2018 | |
AT | 17.10.2018 | ||
FI | 17.10.2018 | ||
HR | 17.10.2018 | ||
LT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LV | 17.10.2018 | ||
NL | 17.10.2018 | ||
PL | 17.10.2018 | ||
RS | 17.10.2018 | ||
SE | 17.10.2018 | ||
BG | 17.01.2019 | ||
NO | 17.01.2019 | ||
GR | 18.01.2019 | ||
IS | 17.02.2019 | ||
PT | 17.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/25] | AT | 17.10.2018 | |
FI | 17.10.2018 | ||
HR | 17.10.2018 | ||
LT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LV | 17.10.2018 | ||
NL | 17.10.2018 | ||
PL | 17.10.2018 | ||
RS | 17.10.2018 | ||
SE | 17.10.2018 | ||
BG | 17.01.2019 | ||
NO | 17.01.2019 | ||
GR | 18.01.2019 | ||
IS | 17.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AT | 17.10.2018 | |
FI | 17.10.2018 | ||
HR | 17.10.2018 | ||
LT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LV | 17.10.2018 | ||
NL | 17.10.2018 | ||
PL | 17.10.2018 | ||
SE | 17.10.2018 | ||
BG | 17.01.2019 | ||
NO | 17.01.2019 | ||
GR | 18.01.2019 | ||
IS | 17.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/23] | AT | 17.10.2018 | |
FI | 17.10.2018 | ||
HR | 17.10.2018 | ||
LT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LV | 17.10.2018 | ||
NL | 17.10.2018 | ||
PL | 17.10.2018 | ||
BG | 17.01.2019 | ||
NO | 17.01.2019 | ||
IS | 17.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/22] | FI | 17.10.2018 | |
LT | 17.10.2018 | ||
NL | 17.10.2018 | ||
PL | 17.10.2018 | ||
BG | 17.01.2019 | ||
NO | 17.01.2019 | ||
IS | 17.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/21] | FI | 17.10.2018 | |
LT | 17.10.2018 | ||
NL | 17.10.2018 | ||
NO | 17.01.2019 | ||
IS | 17.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/20] | LT | 17.10.2018 | |
NL | 17.10.2018 | ||
NO | 17.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/17] | NL | 17.10.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5405352 (WESTON PETER V [US]) [A] 1-14* column 5, line 67 - column 8, line 9; figures 1-6 *; | [A]US2007010857 (SUGIMOTO HIROATSU [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * paragraphs [0036] - [0043] - [0048] , [0049]; figures 1-4,9-10 *; | [XI]US2009318961 (STONE KEVIN T [US], et al) [X] 1-5,7,11-14 * paragraphs [0043] , [0053] , [0058] - [0064] - [0077] - [0078]; figures 2A,20-26,34a-c * [I] 6,8-10; | [I]US2010204730 (MAIORINO NICHOLAS [US], et al) [I] 1-9 * paragraphs [0070] , [0078] - [0079]; figures 8-10 *; | [I]US2011098727 (KAISER RYAN A [US], et al) [I] 1-14 * paragraphs [0041] - [0043] - [0061] - [0065]; figures 20-22 * | International search | [A]US5928244 (TOVEY IAN J [US], et al); | [A]US6203572 (JOHNSON DONALD H [CA], et al); | [A]US2005187577 (SELVITELLI DAVID [US], et al); | [A]US2008015594 (RITCHART MARK A [US], et al); | [A]US2011022083 (DIMATTEO KRISTIAN [US], et al) | by applicant | US2009318961 | US2010204730 | US2011098727 |