EP2734909 - RICH WEB PAGE GENERATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 28.02.2020 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.07.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.02.2020 | Refusal of application | published on 01.04.2020 [2020/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Google LLC 1600 Amphitheatre Parkway Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | [2017/45] |
Former [2014/22] | For all designated states Google Inc. 1600 Amphitheatre Parkway Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DARBY, Matthew, Thomas 210 Holladay Avenue San Francesco, CA 94110 / US | 02 /
LUNDH, Fredrik Engelstrasse 1 CH-8820 Wadenswil / CH | 03 /
WISEMAN, Matthew 425 1st Street 4403 San Francisco, CA 94105 / US | [2014/22] | Representative(s) | Round, Edward Mark Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/22] | Round, Edward Mark Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 12817114.7 | 10.07.2012 | WO2012US46103 | Priority number, date | US201161510980P | 22.07.2011 Original published format: US 201161510980 P | US201213535235 | 27.06.2012 Original published format: US201213535235 | [2014/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013015983 | Date: | 31.01.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2734909 | Date: | 28.05.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.01.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 31.01.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.04.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/00, G06F17/30 | [2016/17] | CPC: |
G06F16/9535 (EP,US);
G06F16/748 (EP,US);
G06F16/435 (EP,US);
G06F16/50 (EP,US);
G06F16/535 (US);
G06F16/60 (EP,US);
G06F16/65 (US);
G06F16/70 (EP,US);
G06F16/94 (EP,US);
G06F16/9538 (US);
G06F16/958 (EP,US);
G06F3/048 (US);
G06F40/134 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2014/22] | G06F3/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/22] | Title | German: | ERSTELLUNG REICHHALTIGER WEBSEITEN | [2014/22] | English: | RICH WEB PAGE GENERATION | [2014/22] | French: | GÉNÉRATION D'UNE PAGE WEB ENRICHIE | [2014/22] | Entry into regional phase | 10.02.2014 | National basic fee paid | 10.02.2014 | Search fee paid | 10.02.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.02.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.02.2014 | Examination requested [2014/22] | 20.07.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.07.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.11.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.09.2019 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2020/14] | 24.09.2019 | Date of oral proceedings | 12.11.2019 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 15.11.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2020/14] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.07.2018 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2008201225 (MAHARAJH KAVI [CA], et al) [X] 1,2,7,8,12,13 * abstract * * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0014] * * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0021] * * paragraph [0100] - paragraph [0104] * * paragraph [0121] - paragraph [0129] * * paragraph [0148] - paragraph [0153] * * paragraph [0158] - paragraph [0162] * * paragraph [0168] - paragraph [0169] * * paragraph [0205] - paragraph [0216] * * paragraph [0240] - paragraph [0280] * * paragraph [0283] - paragraph [0314] * * paragraph [0333] - paragraph [0341] * * paragraph [0430] - paragraph [0436] * [I] 3-6,9-11,14,15; | [I]US2009063277 (BERNOSKY PHILIP [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0006] * * paragraph [0009] - paragraph [0012] * * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0024] * * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0054] * * paragraph [0057] - paragraph [0073] ** paragraph [0086] - paragraph [0099] *; | [XI]US2010293190 (KAISER DAVID H [US], et al) [X] 1,2,7,8,12,13 * abstract * * paragraph [0003] - paragraph [0006] * * paragraph [0046] - paragraph [0079] * * paragraph [0085] - paragraph [0118] * * paragraph [0127] - paragraph [0130] * * paragraph [0211] - paragraph [0231] * * paragraph [0246] - paragraph [0256] * * paragraph [0266] - paragraph [0310] * [I] 3-6,9-11,14,15 | International search | [Y]US2007061487 (MOORE JAMES F [US], et al); | [Y]US2008086689 (BERKLEY MICHAEL [US], et al); | [A]US2008209343 (MACADAAN MIKE [US], et al); | [A]US2009271289 (KLINGER THERESA [US], et al); | [A]US7680881 (KNAPP JOHN R [US], et al) |