EP2738890 - CLAD ELECTRODE FOR SPARK PLUG, AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.06.2018 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.06.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.07.2018 [2018/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tanaka Kikinzoku Kogyo K.K. 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6422 / JP | [2014/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NOMURA, Yukimasa c/o TANAKA KIKINZOKU KOGYO K.K. Technical Center 2-73 Shin-machi Hiratsuka-shi Kanagawa 254-0076 / JP | 02 /
IMAI, Masamitsu c/o TANAKA KIKINZOKU KOGYO K.K. Technical Center 2-73 Shin-machi Hiratsuka-shi Kanagawa 254-0076 / JP | 03 /
TANAKA, Kunihiro c/o TANAKA KIKINZOKU KOGYO K.K. Technical Center 2-73 Shin-machi Hiratsuka-shi Kanagawa 254-0076 / JP | [2014/23] | Representative(s) | Weickmann & Weickmann PartmbB Postfach 860 820 81635 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/23] | Dey, Michael, et al Weickmann & Weickmann Patentanwälte Postfach 860820 81635 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12818380.3 | 24.07.2012 | WO2012JP68656 | Priority number, date | JP20110164890 | 28.07.2011 Original published format: JP 2011164890 | [2014/23] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013015262 | Date: | 31.01.2013 | Language: | JA | [2013/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2738890 | Date: | 04.06.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 31.01.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.02.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H01T13/20, H01T13/39, H01T21/02 | [2015/14] | CPC: |
H01T13/39 (EP,US);
H01T13/20 (EP,KR,US);
H01T21/02 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2014/23] | H01T13/20 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/23] | Title | German: | PLATTIERTE ELEKTRODE FÜR EINE ZÜNDKERZE UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2014/23] | English: | CLAD ELECTRODE FOR SPARK PLUG, AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING THE SAME | [2014/23] | French: | ÉLECTRODE À GAINAGE POUR BOUGIE D'ALLUMAGE ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION ASSOCIÉ | [2014/23] | Entry into regional phase | 10.02.2014 | Translation filed | 10.02.2014 | National basic fee paid | 10.02.2014 | Search fee paid | 10.02.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.02.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.02.2014 | Examination requested [2014/23] | 18.09.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.09.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.01.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/28] | 02.03.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/28] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.09.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]DE10101976 (DENSO CORP [JP]) [X] 1 * page 3, line 4 - page 3, line 65; figures 1-3 * [I] 2-8; | [XI]US4581558 (TAKAMURA KOZO [JP], et al) [X] 1 * column 2, line 40 - column 4, line 19; figures 1-6 * [I] 2-8; | [A]DE10252736 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1-8 * paragraph [0019]; figure 2b * | International search | [X]JPS58121583 (NIPPON DENSO CO); | [Y]JPH02312176 (NIPPON DENSO CO); | [A]JPH03225784 (NIPPON DENSO CO) |