EP2795018 - IMPROVED SAFETY DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.02.2017 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.12.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cheddie, Daniel Aaron 1 Turnford Villas, High Road Turnford, Broxbourne Hertfordshire EN10 6BE / GB | [2014/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2014/44] | Representative(s) | Kay, Ross Marcel Laudens Blackwell House Guildhall Yard London EC2V 5AE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/44] | Laudens Blackwell House Guildhall Yard London EC2V 5AE / GB | Application number, filing date | 12818553.5 | 17.12.2012 | WO2012GB53166 | Priority number, date | GB20110021787 | 19.12.2011 Original published format: GB 201121787 | GB20120019798 | 02.11.2012 Original published format: GB 201219798 | [2014/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013093442 | Date: | 27.06.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2795018 | Date: | 29.10.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.06.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.06.2013 | Classification | IPC: | E04G21/32 | [2014/44] | CPC: |
E04G21/3276 (EP,US);
E04G21/3233 (GB);
E04G1/38 (US);
A62B35/0037 (US);
E04G5/001 (US);
E04G5/046 (US);
E04G21/3261 (GB)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/44] | Title | German: | VERBESSERTE SICHERHEITSVORRICHTUNG | [2014/44] | English: | IMPROVED SAFETY DEVICE | [2014/44] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE SÉCURITÉ AMÉLIORÉ | [2014/44] | Entry into regional phase | 09.07.2014 | National basic fee paid | 09.07.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.07.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.07.2014 | Examination requested [2014/44] | 26.02.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.02.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.08.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.05.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.12.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 16.02.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.06.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.10.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.02.2017 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 16.02.2022 | Request for further processing filed | 16.02.2022 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 24.02.2022 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 22.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 22.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 21.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 21.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]US4078633 (FAHY MICHAEL B); | [A]GB2357112 (MCINULTY JASON PAUL [GB]); | [X]GB2454596 (GRIFFITHS RALPH [GB]); | [X]US2010012427 (JULLIARD XAVIER [FR]) | by applicant | GB2102858 | US2009188174 |