EP2792060 - ADAPTIVE CURRENT CONTROL TIMING AND RESPONSIVE CURRENT CONTROL FOR INTERFACING WITH A DIMMER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 23.06.2017 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.06.2017 | Withdrawal of application | published on 26.07.2017 [2017/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Philips Lighting Holding B.V. High Tech Campus 45 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2016/34] |
Former [2016/01] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [2014/43] | For all designated states Cirrus Logic, Inc. 800 West 6th Street Austin, TX 78701 / US | ||
For all designated states He, Zhaohui 1132 2301 S. Mopac Expressway Austin, Texas 78746 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HE, Zhaohui 6813 Gabion Drive Austin, Texas 78749 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2014/43] | 01 /
HE, Zhaohui 1132 2301 S. Mopac Expressway Austin, Texas 78746 / US | Representative(s) | Verweij, Petronella Daniëlle, et al Signify Netherlands B.V. Intellectual Property High Tech Campus 7 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2014/43] | Freeman, Jacqueline Carol, et al WP Thompson 55 Drury Lane London WC2B 5SQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 12818709.3 | 14.12.2012 | WO2012US69949 | Priority number, date | US201161570554P | 14.12.2011 Original published format: US 201161570554 P | [2014/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2013090852 | Date: | 20.06.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/25] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2792060 | Date: | 22.10.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.06.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.08.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H02M5/257, H02M1/44 | [2014/43] | CPC: |
H05B45/385 (EP,US);
H02M1/4258 (EP,US);
H02M1/44 (EP,US);
H02M3/33507 (US);
H02M3/33523 (EP,US);
H02M5/2576 (EP,US);
H02M7/217 (US);
H05B45/10 (EP,US);
H02M1/0006 (EP,US);
H02M1/0048 (EP,US);
H02M3/33561 (US);
H02M3/33576 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/43] | Title | German: | ANPASSUNGSFÄHIGE STROMSTEUERUNGSTAKTUNG UND REAKTIVE STROMSTEUERUNG ZUR SCHNITTSTELLENBILDUNG MIT EINEM DIMMER | [2014/43] | English: | ADAPTIVE CURRENT CONTROL TIMING AND RESPONSIVE CURRENT CONTROL FOR INTERFACING WITH A DIMMER | [2014/43] | French: | SYNCHRONISATION ADAPTATIVE DE LA COMMANDE DU COURANT ET COMMANDE RÉACTIVE DU COURANT POUR L'INTERFAÇAGE AVEC UN VARIATEUR | [2014/43] | Entry into regional phase | 11.07.2014 | National basic fee paid | 11.07.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.07.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.07.2014 | Examination requested [2014/43] | 12.03.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.06.2017 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2017/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US2011291583 (SHEN FENG-MIN [TW]) [X] 1-28 * abstract * * figures 1-4 * * paragraphs [0022] - [0072] *; | [X]EP2257124 (NXP BV [NL]) [X] 1-28 * paragraphs [0009] - [0037] * * paragraphs [0060] - [0064] * * figures 3,5,7,8,12 *; | [X]WO2010011971 (CIRRUS LOGIC INC, et al) [X] 1-28 * figures 7-11 * * paragraphs [0049] - [0069] *; | [A]US2011234115 (SHIMIZU TAKAYUKI [JP], et al) [A] 1-28 * the whole document *; | [A]CN101637064 (CIRRUS LOGIC INC) [A] 1-28 * the whole document * |