EP2794134 - PROCESS FOR OBTAINING ENERGY FROM ORGANIC-CONTAINING WASTE MATERIALS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.01.2018 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.02.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.06.2019 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 24.07.2019 [2019/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Commerzialbank Mattersburg im Burgenland Aktiengesellschaft Judengasse 11 7210 Mattersburg / AT | [2014/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Philipp, Franz Josef Kreitenweg 11 A-7212 Forchtenstein / AT | [2014/44] | Representative(s) | Patentanwälte Barger, Piso & Partner Operngasse 4 P.O. Box 96 1010 Wien / AT | [2017/10] |
Former [2014/44] | Patentanwälte Barger, Piso & Partner Mahlerstrasse 9 1010 Wien / AT | Application number, filing date | 12819051.9 | 20.12.2012 | [2017/10] | WO2012AT50202 | Priority number, date | AT20110001860 | 21.12.2011 Original published format: AT 18602011 | [2014/44] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2013090967 | Date: | 27.06.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/26] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2794134 | Date: | 29.10.2014 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.06.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2794134 | Date: | 08.03.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.05.2014 | Classification | IPC: | B09B3/00 | [2014/44] | CPC: |
B09B3/29 (EP,US);
C10L5/48 (US);
B09B3/25 (EP,US);
B09B3/40 (EP,US);
Y02E50/10 (EP,US);
Y02E50/30 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/10] |
Former [2014/44] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | 24.11.2014 | ME | 24.11.2014 | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ENERGIEGEWINNUNG AUS ORGANIKHALTIGEN ABFALLSTOFFEN | [2014/44] | English: | PROCESS FOR OBTAINING ENERGY FROM ORGANIC-CONTAINING WASTE MATERIALS | [2014/44] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION D'ÉNERGIE À PARTIR DE DÉCHETS À TENEUR EN MATIÈRES ORGANIQUES | [2014/44] | Entry into regional phase | 21.07.2014 | National basic fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.11.2014 | Examination requested [2015/01] | 21.02.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.05.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.09.2016 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 29.09.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.01.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 20.01.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.01.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.05.2016 | Opposition(s) | 11.12.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | MC | 08.03.2017 | MT | 08.03.2017 | SM | 08.03.2017 | [2019/30] |
Former [2018/43] | MT | 08.03.2017 | |
SM | 08.03.2017 | ||
Former [2018/01] | SM | 08.03.2017 | Cited in | International search | [AD]DE3329771 (LINDEMANN ROLF W [DE]); | [AD]US5087375 (WEINWURM PETER [CA]); | [A]US2010137126 (PHILIPP FRANZ JOSEF [DE]) | by applicant | DE3329771 | AT389474B | US5087375 | CH688990 | DE102007006137 |