EP2720600 - ARTICULATING OPHTHALMIC SURGICAL PROBE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.07.2017 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.06.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HR | published on 22.07.2020 [2020/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Alcon Research, Ltd. 6201 South Freeway Fort Worth, TX 76134-2099 / US | [2014/21] |
Former [2014/17] | For all designated states Alcon Research, Ltd. 6201 South Freeway, MS-TB4-8 Fort Worth, TX 76134-2099 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YU, Xiaoyu 3769 Torrey View Court San Diego, California 92130 / US | 02 /
MCCOLLAM, Christopher 1036 Oak Glen Irvine, California 92618 / US | 03 /
AULD, Jack 28282 El Sur Laguna Niguel, California 92677 / US | [2014/17] | Representative(s) | Hanna Moore + Curley Garryard House 25-26 Earlsfort Terrace Dublin 2, D02 PX51 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/38] | Hanna, Peter William Derek, et al Hanna Moore + Curley Garryard House 25/26 Earlsfort Terrace Dublin 2, D02 PX51 / IE | ||
Former [2014/17] | Hanna, Peter William Derek, et al Hanna Moore & Curley 13 Lower Lad Lane Dublin 2 / IE | Application number, filing date | 12819772.0 | 01.08.2012 | [2016/38] | WO2012US49160 | Priority number, date | US201161514751P | 03.08.2011 Original published format: US 201161514751 P | [2014/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013019859 | Date: | 07.02.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2720600 | Date: | 23.04.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.02.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2720600 | Date: | 21.09.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 07.02.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.12.2014 | Classification | IPC: | A61B1/00, A61B1/06, A61B1/005, A61F9/007 | [2015/02] | CPC: |
A61F9/00736 (EP,KR,US);
A61F9/00 (RU);
A61B1/06 (KR);
A61B1/00073 (EP,KR,US);
A61B1/00165 (EP,KR,US);
A61B1/0052 (EP,KR,US);
|
Former IPC [2014/17] | A61B1/00, A61B1/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/17] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GELENKIGE AUGENCHIRURGISCHE SONDE | [2014/17] | English: | ARTICULATING OPHTHALMIC SURGICAL PROBE | [2014/17] | French: | SONDE CHIRURGICALE OPHTALMIQUE ARTICULÉE | [2014/17] | Entry into regional phase | 20.01.2014 | National basic fee paid | 20.01.2014 | Search fee paid | 20.01.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.01.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.01.2014 | Examination requested [2014/17] | 25.06.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.09.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.01.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.06.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.06.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 29.06.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.06.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.09.2015 | Opposition(s) | 22.06.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 01.08.2012 | AL | 21.09.2016 | AT | 21.09.2016 | CY | 21.09.2016 | CZ | 21.09.2016 | EE | 21.09.2016 | FI | 21.09.2016 | HR | 21.09.2016 | LT | 21.09.2016 | LV | 21.09.2016 | MC | 21.09.2016 | MK | 21.09.2016 | RO | 21.09.2016 | RS | 21.09.2016 | SE | 21.09.2016 | SI | 21.09.2016 | SK | 21.09.2016 | SM | 21.09.2016 | BG | 21.12.2016 | NO | 21.12.2016 | IS | 21.01.2017 | [2020/30] |
Former [2019/51] | HU | 01.08.2012 | |
AL | 21.09.2016 | ||
AT | 21.09.2016 | ||
CY | 21.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 21.09.2016 | ||
EE | 21.09.2016 | ||
FI | 21.09.2016 | ||
LT | 21.09.2016 | ||
LV | 21.09.2016 | ||
MC | 21.09.2016 | ||
MK | 21.09.2016 | ||
RO | 21.09.2016 | ||
RS | 21.09.2016 | ||
SE | 21.09.2016 | ||
SI | 21.09.2016 | ||
SK | 21.09.2016 | ||
SM | 21.09.2016 | ||
BG | 21.12.2016 | ||
NO | 21.12.2016 | ||
IS | 21.01.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 01.08.2012 | |
AL | 21.09.2016 | ||
AT | 21.09.2016 | ||
CY | 21.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 21.09.2016 | ||
EE | 21.09.2016 | ||
FI | 21.09.2016 | ||
LT | 21.09.2016 | ||
LV | 21.09.2016 | ||
MC | 21.09.2016 | ||
RO | 21.09.2016 | ||
RS | 21.09.2016 | ||
SE | 21.09.2016 | ||
SI | 21.09.2016 | ||
SK | 21.09.2016 | ||
SM | 21.09.2016 | ||
BG | 21.12.2016 | ||
NO | 21.12.2016 | ||
IS | 21.01.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 01.08.2012 | |
AL | 21.09.2016 | ||
AT | 21.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 21.09.2016 | ||
EE | 21.09.2016 | ||
FI | 21.09.2016 | ||
LT | 21.09.2016 | ||
LV | 21.09.2016 | ||
MC | 21.09.2016 | ||
RO | 21.09.2016 | ||
RS | 21.09.2016 | ||
SE | 21.09.2016 | ||
SI | 21.09.2016 | ||
SK | 21.09.2016 | ||
SM | 21.09.2016 | ||
BG | 21.12.2016 | ||
NO | 21.12.2016 | ||
IS | 21.01.2017 | ||
Former [2018/47] | AL | 21.09.2016 | |
AT | 21.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 21.09.2016 | ||
EE | 21.09.2016 | ||
FI | 21.09.2016 | ||
LT | 21.09.2016 | ||
LV | 21.09.2016 | ||
MC | 21.09.2016 | ||
RO | 21.09.2016 | ||
RS | 21.09.2016 | ||
SE | 21.09.2016 | ||
SI | 21.09.2016 | ||
SK | 21.09.2016 | ||
SM | 21.09.2016 | ||
BG | 21.12.2016 | ||
NO | 21.12.2016 | ||
IS | 21.01.2017 | ||
Former [2018/18] | AT | 21.09.2016 | |
CZ | 21.09.2016 | ||
EE | 21.09.2016 | ||
FI | 21.09.2016 | ||
LT | 21.09.2016 | ||
LV | 21.09.2016 | ||
MC | 21.09.2016 | ||
RO | 21.09.2016 | ||
RS | 21.09.2016 | ||
SE | 21.09.2016 | ||
SI | 21.09.2016 | ||
SK | 21.09.2016 | ||
SM | 21.09.2016 | ||
BG | 21.12.2016 | ||
NO | 21.12.2016 | ||
IS | 21.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/52] | AT | 21.09.2016 | |
CZ | 21.09.2016 | ||
EE | 21.09.2016 | ||
FI | 21.09.2016 | ||
LT | 21.09.2016 | ||
LV | 21.09.2016 | ||
RO | 21.09.2016 | ||
RS | 21.09.2016 | ||
SE | 21.09.2016 | ||
SI | 21.09.2016 | ||
SK | 21.09.2016 | ||
SM | 21.09.2016 | ||
BG | 21.12.2016 | ||
NO | 21.12.2016 | ||
IS | 21.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/32] | AT | 21.09.2016 | |
CZ | 21.09.2016 | ||
EE | 21.09.2016 | ||
FI | 21.09.2016 | ||
LT | 21.09.2016 | ||
LV | 21.09.2016 | ||
RO | 21.09.2016 | ||
RS | 21.09.2016 | ||
SE | 21.09.2016 | ||
SK | 21.09.2016 | ||
SM | 21.09.2016 | ||
BG | 21.12.2016 | ||
NO | 21.12.2016 | ||
IS | 21.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/21] | FI | 21.09.2016 | |
LT | 21.09.2016 | ||
LV | 21.09.2016 | ||
RS | 21.09.2016 | ||
SE | 21.09.2016 | ||
NO | 21.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | FI | 21.09.2016 | |
LT | 21.09.2016 | ||
RS | 21.09.2016 | ||
SE | 21.09.2016 | ||
NO | 21.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | FI | 21.09.2016 | |
LT | 21.09.2016 | ||
NO | 21.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | LT | 21.09.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]US4911148 (SOSNOWSKI STEPHEN A [US], et al) [X] 1,15 * column 1, line 52 - page 2, line 6 * * column 3, line 40 - column 4, line 17 * * figures 1A-E,2 * [Y] 12-14 [I] 2-11; | [YA]US2004181138 (HINDRICKS GERHARD [DE], et al) [Y] 12-14 * paragraphs [0021] , [0024] , [0026] , [0031] , [0048] , [0049] * [A] 1-11,15; | [A]US2006135961 (ROSENMAN DANIEL [US], et al) [A] 1-15* paragraphs [0034] , [0035] , [0040] * | International search | [Y]US5275593 (EASLEY JAMES C [US], et al); | [A]US5381782 (DELARAMA ALAN [US], et al); | [Y]US5452836 (HUITEMA THOMAS W [US], et al); | [Y]US6019780 (LOMBARDO GIUSEPPE [US], et al); | [Y]US2002052155 (CAMPBELL JULIE A [US], et al); | [Y]US2002072720 (HAGUE CLIFFORD W [US], et al); | [Y]US2003069522 (JACOBSEN STEPHEN J [US], et al); | [Y]US2005096590 (GULLICKSON GEORGE [US], et al); | [Y]US2006135961 (ROSENMAN DANIEL [US], et al); | [Y]US2006184162 (SMITH RONALD T [US]); | [Y]US2008058761 (SPAIDE RICHARD [US]); | [Y]US7783346 (SMITH RONALD T [US], et al) | by applicant | US4911148 | US2004181138 | US2005096590 | US2009093800 |