EP2739237 - SURGICAL INSTRUMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2014/24] | SURGICAL INSTRUMENT AND CONTROL METHOD THEREOF | ||
[2019/41] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.07.2020 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.09.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Olympus Corporation 2951 Ishikawa-machi, Hachioji-shi Tokyo 192-8507 / JP | [2016/40] |
Former [2014/24] | For all designated states Olympus Corporation 43-2, Hatagaya 2-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0072 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
INOUE, Shintaro c/o Olympus Corporation 2951 Ishikawa-machi Hachioji-shi Tokyo 192-8507 / JP | 02 /
KISHI, Kosuke c/o Olympus Corporation 2951 Ishikawa-machi Hachioji-shi Tokyo 192-8507 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2014/24] | 01 /
INOUE, Shintaro c/o Olympus Corporation 43-2 Hatagaya 2-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0072 / JP | ||
02 /
KISHI, Kosuke c/o Olympus Corporation 43-2 Hatagaya 2-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0072 / JP | Representative(s) | Gunzelmann, Rainer Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/24] | Gunzelmann, Rainer Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12820239.7 | 06.08.2012 | WO2012JP70576 | Priority number, date | US201161515203P | 04.08.2011 Original published format: US 201161515203 P | JP20120031959 | 16.02.2012 Original published format: JP 2012031959 | [2014/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013018935 | Date: | 07.02.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2739237 | Date: | 11.06.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.02.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 07.02.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.02.2015 | Classification | IPC: | A61B34/30, B25J13/02 | [2019/41] | CPC: |
B25J9/1612 (EP,US);
G06F3/01 (US);
A61B17/29 (EP,US);
A61B17/32002 (US);
A61B18/1402 (US);
A61B34/30 (EP,US);
A61B34/37 (EP,US);
A61B34/74 (EP,US);
A61B34/76 (EP,US);
A61B34/77 (EP,US);
A61B46/10 (EP,US);
B25J13/02 (EP,US);
B25J9/1689 (EP,US);
A61B17/068 (US);
A61B2017/00119 (US);
A61B2017/00477 (US);
A61B2017/00482 (US);
A61B46/23 (EP,US);
Y10S901/08 (EP,US);
Y10S901/09 (EP,US);
Y10S901/30 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2014/24] | A61B19/00, B25J3/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/24] | Title | German: | CHIRURGISCHES INSTRUMENT | [2019/41] | English: | SURGICAL INSTRUMENT | [2019/41] | French: | INSTRUMENT CHIRURGICAL | [2019/41] |
Former [2014/24] | CHIRURGISCHES INSTRUMENT UND STEUERVERFAHREN DAFÜR | ||
Former [2014/24] | SURGICAL INSTRUMENT AND CONTROL METHOD THEREOF | ||
Former [2014/24] | INSTRUMENT CHIRURGICAL ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE | Entry into regional phase | 18.02.2014 | National basic fee paid | 18.02.2014 | Search fee paid | 18.02.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.02.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.02.2014 | Examination requested [2014/24] | 31.08.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.09.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.02.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.09.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.01.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/33] | 04.03.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2020/33] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.09.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1728475 (TYCO HEALTHCARE [US]) [A] 1-6 * paragraphs [0047] - [0057]; figures 1-6B * * paragraph [0098]; figures 17-18 * * paragraphs [0103] - [0109] *; | [A]JP2008093270 (TERUMO CORP, et al) [A] 1-6 * paragraphs [0027] - [0042]; figures 1-3 * * paragraphs [0109] - [0111]; figures 16-17C ** paragraphs [0116] - [0123]; figures 17A-18C *; | [IAY]US2009057369 (SMITH KEVIN W [US], et al) [I] 1,2,4,5 * paragraphs [0105] - [0115]; figures 1-3 * * paragraphs [0131] - [0132]; figures 17-23 * * paragraphs [0139] - [0170]; figures 28, 29 * [A] 6 [Y] 3; | [Y]WO2009089614 (UNIV WESTERN ONTARIO [CA], et al) [Y] 3 * page 8, line 31 - page 9, line 32 * * page 15, line 35 - page 19, line 14; figures 10-12 * | International search | [A]JP2005511185 (COMPUTER MOTION INC.); | [A]JP2006321027 (HITACHI LTD); | [A]JP2010076012 (TOSHIBA CORP); | [A]WO2010109932 (OLYMPUS MEDICAL SYSTEMS CORP [JP], et al) | by applicant | US2009057369 | JP2010076012 |