EP2741119 - LIGHT SOURCE DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.08.2018 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.09.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 31.08.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.07.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.03.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Olympus Corporation 2951 Ishikawa-machi Hachioji-shi Tokyo 192-8507 / JP | [2017/01] |
Former [2014/24] | For all designated states Olympus Corporation 43-2, Hatagaya 2-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0072 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ITO, Takeshi OLYMPUS INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY SERVICES CO., LTD: 2-3 Kuboyama-cho Hachioji-shi Tokyo 192-8512 / JP | 02 /
YAMAMOTO, Eiji OLYMPUS INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY SERVICES CO., LTD: 2-3 Kuboyama-cho Hachioji-shi Tokyo 192-8512 / JP | 03 /
NISHIO, Masahiro OLYMPUS INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY SERVICES CO., LTD: 2-3 Kuboyama-cho Hachioji-shi Tokyo 192-8512 / JP | [2014/24] | Representative(s) | Winter, Brandl - Partnerschaft mbB Alois-Steinecker-Straße 22 85354 Freising / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/43] | Winter, Brandl, Fürniss, Hübner, Röss, Kaiser, Polte - Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Alois-Steinecker-Strasse 22 85354 Freising / DE | ||
Former [2014/24] | Winter, Brandl, Fürniss, Hübner, Röss, Kaiser, Polte - Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Alois-Steinecker-Strasse 22 85354 Freising / DE | Application number, filing date | 12820296.7 | 31.07.2012 | [2017/43] | WO2012JP69480 | Priority number, date | JP20110169506 | 02.08.2011 Original published format: JP 2011169506 | [2014/24] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013018803 | Date: | 07.02.2013 | Language: | JA | [2013/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2741119 | Date: | 11.06.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2741119 | Date: | 25.10.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 07.02.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.12.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G02B23/26, A61B1/06 | [2014/24] | CPC: |
A61B1/05 (EP,US);
G02B6/0005 (US);
A61B1/0653 (EP,US);
A61B1/0669 (EP,US);
F21V31/00 (US);
G02B23/2469 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/24] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LICHTQUELLENVORRICHTUNG | [2014/24] | English: | LIGHT SOURCE DEVICE | [2014/24] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE SOURCE DE LUMIÈRE | [2014/24] | Entry into regional phase | 30.01.2014 | Translation filed | 30.01.2014 | National basic fee paid | 30.01.2014 | Search fee paid | 30.01.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.01.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.01.2014 | Examination requested [2014/24] | 15.07.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.06.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.11.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.03.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.07.2017 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 13.07.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 13.07.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.09.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.09.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.06.2016 | Opposition(s) | 26.07.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 31.07.2012 | AL | 25.10.2017 | AT | 25.10.2017 | CY | 25.10.2017 | CZ | 25.10.2017 | DK | 25.10.2017 | EE | 25.10.2017 | ES | 25.10.2017 | FI | 25.10.2017 | HR | 25.10.2017 | IT | 25.10.2017 | LT | 25.10.2017 | LV | 25.10.2017 | MC | 25.10.2017 | MK | 25.10.2017 | NL | 25.10.2017 | PL | 25.10.2017 | PT | 25.10.2017 | RO | 25.10.2017 | RS | 25.10.2017 | SE | 25.10.2017 | SI | 25.10.2017 | SK | 25.10.2017 | SM | 25.10.2017 | TR | 25.10.2017 | BG | 25.01.2018 | NO | 25.01.2018 | GR | 26.01.2018 | IS | 25.02.2018 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 31.07.2012 | |
AT | 25.10.2017 | ||
CY | 25.10.2017 | ||
CZ | 25.10.2017 | ||
DK | 25.10.2017 | ||
EE | 25.10.2017 | ||
ES | 25.10.2017 | ||
FI | 25.10.2017 | ||
HR | 25.10.2017 | ||
IT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LV | 25.10.2017 | ||
MC | 25.10.2017 | ||
MK | 25.10.2017 | ||
NL | 25.10.2017 | ||
PL | 25.10.2017 | ||
PT | 25.10.2017 | ||
RO | 25.10.2017 | ||
RS | 25.10.2017 | ||
SE | 25.10.2017 | ||
SI | 25.10.2017 | ||
SK | 25.10.2017 | ||
SM | 25.10.2017 | ||
TR | 25.10.2017 | ||
BG | 25.01.2018 | ||
NO | 25.01.2018 | ||
GR | 26.01.2018 | ||
IS | 25.02.2018 | ||
Former [2020/28] | HU | 31.07.2012 | |
AT | 25.10.2017 | ||
CY | 25.10.2017 | ||
CZ | 25.10.2017 | ||
DK | 25.10.2017 | ||
EE | 25.10.2017 | ||
ES | 25.10.2017 | ||
FI | 25.10.2017 | ||
HR | 25.10.2017 | ||
IT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LV | 25.10.2017 | ||
MC | 25.10.2017 | ||
NL | 25.10.2017 | ||
PL | 25.10.2017 | ||
PT | 25.10.2017 | ||
RO | 25.10.2017 | ||
RS | 25.10.2017 | ||
SE | 25.10.2017 | ||
SI | 25.10.2017 | ||
SK | 25.10.2017 | ||
SM | 25.10.2017 | ||
TR | 25.10.2017 | ||
BG | 25.01.2018 | ||
NO | 25.01.2018 | ||
GR | 26.01.2018 | ||
IS | 25.02.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AT | 25.10.2017 | |
CY | 25.10.2017 | ||
CZ | 25.10.2017 | ||
DK | 25.10.2017 | ||
EE | 25.10.2017 | ||
ES | 25.10.2017 | ||
FI | 25.10.2017 | ||
HR | 25.10.2017 | ||
IT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LV | 25.10.2017 | ||
MC | 25.10.2017 | ||
NL | 25.10.2017 | ||
PL | 25.10.2017 | ||
RO | 25.10.2017 | ||
RS | 25.10.2017 | ||
SE | 25.10.2017 | ||
SI | 25.10.2017 | ||
SK | 25.10.2017 | ||
SM | 25.10.2017 | ||
TR | 25.10.2017 | ||
BG | 25.01.2018 | ||
NO | 25.01.2018 | ||
GR | 26.01.2018 | ||
IS | 25.02.2018 | ||
Former [2019/15] | AT | 25.10.2017 | |
CY | 25.10.2017 | ||
CZ | 25.10.2017 | ||
DK | 25.10.2017 | ||
EE | 25.10.2017 | ||
ES | 25.10.2017 | ||
FI | 25.10.2017 | ||
HR | 25.10.2017 | ||
IT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LV | 25.10.2017 | ||
MC | 25.10.2017 | ||
NL | 25.10.2017 | ||
PL | 25.10.2017 | ||
RO | 25.10.2017 | ||
RS | 25.10.2017 | ||
SE | 25.10.2017 | ||
SI | 25.10.2017 | ||
SK | 25.10.2017 | ||
SM | 25.10.2017 | ||
BG | 25.01.2018 | ||
NO | 25.01.2018 | ||
GR | 26.01.2018 | ||
IS | 25.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AT | 25.10.2017 | |
CY | 25.10.2017 | ||
CZ | 25.10.2017 | ||
DK | 25.10.2017 | ||
EE | 25.10.2017 | ||
ES | 25.10.2017 | ||
FI | 25.10.2017 | ||
HR | 25.10.2017 | ||
IT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LV | 25.10.2017 | ||
NL | 25.10.2017 | ||
PL | 25.10.2017 | ||
RO | 25.10.2017 | ||
RS | 25.10.2017 | ||
SE | 25.10.2017 | ||
SI | 25.10.2017 | ||
SK | 25.10.2017 | ||
SM | 25.10.2017 | ||
BG | 25.01.2018 | ||
NO | 25.01.2018 | ||
GR | 26.01.2018 | ||
IS | 25.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | AT | 25.10.2017 | |
CY | 25.10.2017 | ||
CZ | 25.10.2017 | ||
DK | 25.10.2017 | ||
EE | 25.10.2017 | ||
ES | 25.10.2017 | ||
FI | 25.10.2017 | ||
HR | 25.10.2017 | ||
IT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LV | 25.10.2017 | ||
NL | 25.10.2017 | ||
PL | 25.10.2017 | ||
RO | 25.10.2017 | ||
RS | 25.10.2017 | ||
SE | 25.10.2017 | ||
SK | 25.10.2017 | ||
SM | 25.10.2017 | ||
BG | 25.01.2018 | ||
NO | 25.01.2018 | ||
GR | 26.01.2018 | ||
IS | 25.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 25.10.2017 | |
CY | 25.10.2017 | ||
CZ | 25.10.2017 | ||
DK | 25.10.2017 | ||
EE | 25.10.2017 | ||
ES | 25.10.2017 | ||
FI | 25.10.2017 | ||
HR | 25.10.2017 | ||
IT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LV | 25.10.2017 | ||
NL | 25.10.2017 | ||
PL | 25.10.2017 | ||
RS | 25.10.2017 | ||
SE | 25.10.2017 | ||
SK | 25.10.2017 | ||
SM | 25.10.2017 | ||
BG | 25.01.2018 | ||
NO | 25.01.2018 | ||
GR | 26.01.2018 | ||
IS | 25.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | AT | 25.10.2017 | |
CY | 25.10.2017 | ||
CZ | 25.10.2017 | ||
DK | 25.10.2017 | ||
EE | 25.10.2017 | ||
ES | 25.10.2017 | ||
FI | 25.10.2017 | ||
HR | 25.10.2017 | ||
LT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LV | 25.10.2017 | ||
NL | 25.10.2017 | ||
PL | 25.10.2017 | ||
RS | 25.10.2017 | ||
SE | 25.10.2017 | ||
SK | 25.10.2017 | ||
SM | 25.10.2017 | ||
BG | 25.01.2018 | ||
NO | 25.01.2018 | ||
GR | 26.01.2018 | ||
IS | 25.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | AT | 25.10.2017 | |
CY | 25.10.2017 | ||
CZ | 25.10.2017 | ||
DK | 25.10.2017 | ||
EE | 25.10.2017 | ||
ES | 25.10.2017 | ||
FI | 25.10.2017 | ||
HR | 25.10.2017 | ||
LT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LV | 25.10.2017 | ||
NL | 25.10.2017 | ||
RS | 25.10.2017 | ||
SE | 25.10.2017 | ||
SK | 25.10.2017 | ||
BG | 25.01.2018 | ||
NO | 25.01.2018 | ||
GR | 26.01.2018 | ||
IS | 25.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/24] | AT | 25.10.2017 | |
ES | 25.10.2017 | ||
FI | 25.10.2017 | ||
HR | 25.10.2017 | ||
LT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LV | 25.10.2017 | ||
NL | 25.10.2017 | ||
RS | 25.10.2017 | ||
SE | 25.10.2017 | ||
BG | 25.01.2018 | ||
NO | 25.01.2018 | ||
GR | 26.01.2018 | ||
IS | 25.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/23] | AT | 25.10.2017 | |
ES | 25.10.2017 | ||
FI | 25.10.2017 | ||
HR | 25.10.2017 | ||
LT | 25.10.2017 | ||
NL | 25.10.2017 | ||
RS | 25.10.2017 | ||
SE | 25.10.2017 | ||
NO | 25.01.2018 | ||
GR | 26.01.2018 | ||
IS | 25.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/22] | ES | 25.10.2017 | |
FI | 25.10.2017 | ||
LT | 25.10.2017 | ||
NL | 25.10.2017 | ||
NO | 25.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/17] | NL | 25.10.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2006257079 (OHTSUKA KENICHIRO [JP], et al) [Y] 2-17* paragraph [0060] - paragraph [0094] *; | [Y]EP1867272 (OLYMPUS MEDICAL SYSTEMS CORP [JP], et al) [Y] 1-20 * paragraph [0052] *; | [Y]WO2011004801 (FUJIFILM CORP [JP], et al) [Y] 1-20 * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0021]; figures 1,2 * | International search | [Y]JPH01164406U (JAPAN AVIATION ELECTRONICS INDUSTRY LTD.); | [Y]JPH08254658 (SHIMADZU CORP); | [Y]JPH10137184 (OLYMPUS OPTICAL CO); | [Y]JP2001215362 (NIPPON ELECTRIC ENG); | [Y]JP2003225196 (OLYMPUS OPTICAL CO); | [Y]JP2006317890 (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES) | by applicant | JP2005205195 |