EP2794148 - CRYSTALLIZER FOR CONTINUOUS CASTING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.01.2017 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Danieli & C. Officine Meccaniche, S.p.A. Via Nazionale 41 33042 Buttrio / IT | [2014/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RINALDI, Marco Piazzale Unità d'Italia 3 I-33100 Udine / IT | 02 /
MOTTA, Marco, Mauro V.lo III del Partigiano 3 I-20845 Sovico / IT | [2016/10] |
Former [2014/44] | 01 /
RINALDI, Marco Piazzale Unità d'Italia 3 I-33100 Udine / IT | ||
02 /
MOTTA, Marco, Mauro V.1o III del Partigiano 3 I-20845 Sovico / IT | Representative(s) | Petraz, Gilberto Luigi, et al GLP S.r.l. Viale Europa Unita, 171 33100 Udine / IT | [2014/44] | Application number, filing date | 12820891.5 | 21.12.2012 | [2016/10] | WO2012IB02769 | Priority number, date | IT2011UD00211 | 23.12.2011 Original published format: IT UD20110211 | [2014/44] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2013093605 | Date: | 27.06.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/26] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2794148 | Date: | 29.10.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.06.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2794148 | Date: | 09.03.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.01.2014 | Classification | IPC: | B22D11/041, B22D11/055, B22D11/07 | [2014/44] | CPC: |
B22D11/1243 (EP,US);
B22D11/041 (EP,RU,US);
B22D11/055 (EP,US);
B22D11/07 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/44] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KRISTALLISATOR ZUM STRANGGIESSEN | [2014/44] | English: | CRYSTALLIZER FOR CONTINUOUS CASTING | [2014/44] | French: | CRISTALLISEUR POUR COULAGE CONTINU | [2014/44] | Entry into regional phase | 30.06.2014 | National basic fee paid | 30.06.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.06.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.06.2014 | Examination requested [2014/44] | 25.09.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.12.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 29.12.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.12.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.09.2015 | Opposition(s) | 12.12.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 21.12.2012 | AL | 09.03.2016 | BE | 09.03.2016 | CY | 09.03.2016 | CZ | 09.03.2016 | DK | 09.03.2016 | EE | 09.03.2016 | FI | 09.03.2016 | HR | 09.03.2016 | LT | 09.03.2016 | LV | 09.03.2016 | MC | 09.03.2016 | MK | 09.03.2016 | NL | 09.03.2016 | PL | 09.03.2016 | RO | 09.03.2016 | RS | 09.03.2016 | SE | 09.03.2016 | SI | 09.03.2016 | SK | 09.03.2016 | SM | 09.03.2016 | BG | 09.06.2016 | NO | 09.06.2016 | GR | 10.06.2016 | IS | 09.07.2016 | PT | 11.07.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/30] | HU | 21.12.2012 | |
BE | 09.03.2016 | ||
CY | 09.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 09.03.2016 | ||
DK | 09.03.2016 | ||
EE | 09.03.2016 | ||
FI | 09.03.2016 | ||
HR | 09.03.2016 | ||
LT | 09.03.2016 | ||
LV | 09.03.2016 | ||
MC | 09.03.2016 | ||
MK | 09.03.2016 | ||
NL | 09.03.2016 | ||
PL | 09.03.2016 | ||
RO | 09.03.2016 | ||
RS | 09.03.2016 | ||
SE | 09.03.2016 | ||
SI | 09.03.2016 | ||
SK | 09.03.2016 | ||
SM | 09.03.2016 | ||
BG | 09.06.2016 | ||
NO | 09.06.2016 | ||
GR | 10.06.2016 | ||
IS | 09.07.2016 | ||
PT | 11.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/47] | BE | 09.03.2016 | |
CZ | 09.03.2016 | ||
DK | 09.03.2016 | ||
EE | 09.03.2016 | ||
FI | 09.03.2016 | ||
HR | 09.03.2016 | ||
LT | 09.03.2016 | ||
LV | 09.03.2016 | ||
MC | 09.03.2016 | ||
NL | 09.03.2016 | ||
PL | 09.03.2016 | ||
RO | 09.03.2016 | ||
RS | 09.03.2016 | ||
SE | 09.03.2016 | ||
SI | 09.03.2016 | ||
SK | 09.03.2016 | ||
SM | 09.03.2016 | ||
BG | 09.06.2016 | ||
NO | 09.06.2016 | ||
GR | 10.06.2016 | ||
IS | 09.07.2016 | ||
PT | 11.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | BE | 09.03.2016 | |
CZ | 09.03.2016 | ||
DK | 09.03.2016 | ||
EE | 09.03.2016 | ||
FI | 09.03.2016 | ||
HR | 09.03.2016 | ||
LT | 09.03.2016 | ||
LV | 09.03.2016 | ||
NL | 09.03.2016 | ||
PL | 09.03.2016 | ||
RO | 09.03.2016 | ||
RS | 09.03.2016 | ||
SE | 09.03.2016 | ||
SI | 09.03.2016 | ||
SK | 09.03.2016 | ||
SM | 09.03.2016 | ||
BG | 09.06.2016 | ||
NO | 09.06.2016 | ||
GR | 10.06.2016 | ||
IS | 09.07.2016 | ||
PT | 11.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/19] | BE | 09.03.2016 | |
CZ | 09.03.2016 | ||
DK | 09.03.2016 | ||
EE | 09.03.2016 | ||
FI | 09.03.2016 | ||
HR | 09.03.2016 | ||
LT | 09.03.2016 | ||
LV | 09.03.2016 | ||
NL | 09.03.2016 | ||
PL | 09.03.2016 | ||
RO | 09.03.2016 | ||
RS | 09.03.2016 | ||
SE | 09.03.2016 | ||
SK | 09.03.2016 | ||
SM | 09.03.2016 | ||
BG | 09.06.2016 | ||
NO | 09.06.2016 | ||
GR | 10.06.2016 | ||
IS | 09.07.2016 | ||
PT | 11.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | BE | 09.03.2016 | |
CZ | 09.03.2016 | ||
DK | 09.03.2016 | ||
EE | 09.03.2016 | ||
FI | 09.03.2016 | ||
HR | 09.03.2016 | ||
LT | 09.03.2016 | ||
LV | 09.03.2016 | ||
NL | 09.03.2016 | ||
PL | 09.03.2016 | ||
RO | 09.03.2016 | ||
RS | 09.03.2016 | ||
SE | 09.03.2016 | ||
SK | 09.03.2016 | ||
SM | 09.03.2016 | ||
NO | 09.06.2016 | ||
GR | 10.06.2016 | ||
IS | 09.07.2016 | ||
PT | 11.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | BE | 09.03.2016 | |
CZ | 09.03.2016 | ||
EE | 09.03.2016 | ||
FI | 09.03.2016 | ||
HR | 09.03.2016 | ||
LT | 09.03.2016 | ||
LV | 09.03.2016 | ||
NL | 09.03.2016 | ||
PL | 09.03.2016 | ||
RO | 09.03.2016 | ||
RS | 09.03.2016 | ||
SE | 09.03.2016 | ||
SK | 09.03.2016 | ||
SM | 09.03.2016 | ||
NO | 09.06.2016 | ||
GR | 10.06.2016 | ||
IS | 09.07.2016 | ||
PT | 11.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/51] | CZ | 09.03.2016 | |
EE | 09.03.2016 | ||
FI | 09.03.2016 | ||
HR | 09.03.2016 | ||
LT | 09.03.2016 | ||
LV | 09.03.2016 | ||
NL | 09.03.2016 | ||
PL | 09.03.2016 | ||
RO | 09.03.2016 | ||
RS | 09.03.2016 | ||
SE | 09.03.2016 | ||
SK | 09.03.2016 | ||
SM | 09.03.2016 | ||
NO | 09.06.2016 | ||
GR | 10.06.2016 | ||
IS | 09.07.2016 | ||
PT | 11.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | CZ | 09.03.2016 | |
EE | 09.03.2016 | ||
FI | 09.03.2016 | ||
HR | 09.03.2016 | ||
LT | 09.03.2016 | ||
LV | 09.03.2016 | ||
NL | 09.03.2016 | ||
PL | 09.03.2016 | ||
RO | 09.03.2016 | ||
RS | 09.03.2016 | ||
SE | 09.03.2016 | ||
SK | 09.03.2016 | ||
SM | 09.03.2016 | ||
NO | 09.06.2016 | ||
GR | 10.06.2016 | ||
IS | 09.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | EE | 09.03.2016 | |
FI | 09.03.2016 | ||
HR | 09.03.2016 | ||
LT | 09.03.2016 | ||
LV | 09.03.2016 | ||
NL | 09.03.2016 | ||
PL | 09.03.2016 | ||
RS | 09.03.2016 | ||
SE | 09.03.2016 | ||
NO | 09.06.2016 | ||
GR | 10.06.2016 | ||
IS | 09.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/48] | FI | 09.03.2016 | |
HR | 09.03.2016 | ||
LT | 09.03.2016 | ||
LV | 09.03.2016 | ||
NL | 09.03.2016 | ||
PL | 09.03.2016 | ||
RS | 09.03.2016 | ||
SE | 09.03.2016 | ||
NO | 09.06.2016 | ||
GR | 10.06.2016 | ||
IS | 09.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/40] | FI | 09.03.2016 | |
HR | 09.03.2016 | ||
LT | 09.03.2016 | ||
LV | 09.03.2016 | ||
NL | 09.03.2016 | ||
PL | 09.03.2016 | ||
RS | 09.03.2016 | ||
SE | 09.03.2016 | ||
NO | 09.06.2016 | ||
GR | 10.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | FI | 09.03.2016 | |
HR | 09.03.2016 | ||
LT | 09.03.2016 | ||
LV | 09.03.2016 | ||
PL | 09.03.2016 | ||
RS | 09.03.2016 | ||
SE | 09.03.2016 | ||
NO | 09.06.2016 | ||
GR | 10.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | FI | 09.03.2016 | |
HR | 09.03.2016 | ||
LT | 09.03.2016 | ||
PL | 09.03.2016 | ||
NO | 09.06.2016 | ||
GR | 10.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/35] | FI | 09.03.2016 | |
HR | 09.03.2016 | ||
NO | 09.06.2016 | ||
GR | 10.06.2016 | Cited in | International search | [A]JPH08206786 (SHINKO METAL PROD) [A] 1-13 * abstract *; | [A]EP1792676 (KM EUROPA METAL AG [DE]) [A] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [A]GB2177331 (OUTOKUMPU OY) [A] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2008017711 (DANIELI OFF MECC [IT], et al) [A] 1-13 * the whole document * | by applicant | US6024162 | JPH08206786 | JPH11746 | EP1792676 | EP1795281 | GB2177331 | JPH09225593 |