EP2744307 - APPARATUS FOR PLASMA GENERATION, METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING ROTATING ELECTRODES FOR PLASMA GENERATION APPARATUS, METHOD FOR PLASMA TREATMENT OF SUBSTRATE, AND METHOD FOR FORMING THIN FILM OF MIXED STRUCTURE USING PLASMA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.12.2015 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.12.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.01.2016 [2016/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Korea Institute of Machinery & Materials (Jang-dong) 156 Gajeongbuk-ro Yuseong-gu Daejeon 305-343 / KR | [2014/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAM, Kee-Seok 211-202 Lotte Apt. 62 Yongho-dong Uichang-gu Changwon-si Gyeongsangnam-do 641-041 / KR | 02 /
KWON, Jung-Dae 211-1203 Free Village 2Cha Seongju-dong Seongsan-gu Changwon-si Gyeongsangnam-do 641-111 / KR | 03 /
JEONG, Yong Soo 12-408 Daewoo Apt. 63 Sangnam-dong Seongsan-gu Changwon-si Gyeongsangnam-do 641-091 / KR | 04 /
LEE, Gun Hwan 990 Seokjeong-ri Poseung-Myeon Pyeongtaek-si Gyeonggi-do 451-824 / KR | 05 /
YOON, Jung Heum 803-306 Booyoung 16 Cha 881-2 Bugok-ri Jangyu-myeon Gimhae-si Gyeongsangnam-do 621-833 / KR | 06 /
LEE, Sung Hun 102-204 Jungang Metro Heights 51-1 Guam-dong Masan-si Gyeongsangnam-do 630-500 / KR | 07 /
KIM, Dong Ho 2-802 Gyeongnam Apt. Yangdeok 1-dong Masan-si Gyeongsangnam-do 630-491 / KR | 08 /
KANG, Jae Wook 111-405 Ilsindaedong Free Village Apt. Seongju-dong Seongsan-gu Changwon-si Gyeongsangnam-do 642-940 / KR | 09 /
PARK, SungGyu 502 Korea Institute of Materials Science Apt. Gaeum-dong Seongsan-gu Changwon-si Gyeongsangnam-do 642-110 / KR | 10 /
KIM, Chang Su 301 Korea Institute of Materials Science Apt. Gaeumjeong-dong Seongsan-gu Changwon-si Gyeongsangnam-do 642-110 / KR | [2014/25] | Representative(s) | Tomlinson, Kerry John Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [2014/25] | Application number, filing date | 12821442.6 | 10.08.2012 | WO2012KR06384 | Priority number, date | KR20110079921 | 11.08.2011 Original published format: KR 20110079921 | KR20120037089 | 10.04.2012 Original published format: KR 20120037089 | KR20120077974 | 17.07.2012 Original published format: KR 20120077974 | [2014/25] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2013022306 | Date: | 14.02.2013 | Language: | KO | [2013/07] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2744307 | Date: | 18.06.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 04.04.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.12.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H05H1/34, C23C16/50, H01L21/205, H05H1/24, C23C16/503, C23C16/509, H01J9/02, H01J37/32, H05H1/48 | [2015/03] | CPC: |
H01J37/32541 (EP,US);
C23C16/503 (EP,US);
C23C16/509 (EP,US);
H01J37/32559 (EP,US);
H01J37/32568 (EP,US);
H01J37/32825 (EP,US);
H01J9/022 (US);
H05H1/2431 (EP,US);
H05H1/473 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2014/25] | H05H1/34, C23C16/50, H01L21/205 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/25] | Title | German: | PLASMAERZEUGUNGSVORRICHTUNG, VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG ROTIERENDER ELEKTRODEN FÜR DIE PLASMAERZEUGUNGSVORRICHTUNG, VERFAHREN ZUR PLASMABEHANDLUNG EINES SUBSTRATS UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES DÜNNFILMS AUS EINER MISCHSTRUKTUR MITTELS DES PLASMAS | [2014/25] | English: | APPARATUS FOR PLASMA GENERATION, METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING ROTATING ELECTRODES FOR PLASMA GENERATION APPARATUS, METHOD FOR PLASMA TREATMENT OF SUBSTRATE, AND METHOD FOR FORMING THIN FILM OF MIXED STRUCTURE USING PLASMA | [2014/25] | French: | APPAREIL DE GÉNÉRATION DE PLASMA, PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'ÉLECTRODES ROTATIVES POUR APPAREIL DE GÉNÉRATION DE PLASMA, PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT PAR PLASMA DE SUBSTRAT, ET PROCÉDÉ PERMETTANT DE FORMER UNE COUCHE MINCE DE STRUCTURE MÉLANGÉE AU MOYEN DE PLASMA | [2014/25] | Entry into regional phase | 11.03.2014 | Translation filed | 11.03.2014 | National basic fee paid | 11.03.2014 | Search fee paid | 11.03.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.03.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.03.2014 | Examination requested [2014/25] | 10.09.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.07.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/04] | 10.09.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2016/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2015 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US5935460 (MORI YUZO [JP], et al) [X] 1,5,7 * column 3, line 43 - column 4, line 35 * * column 6, line 66 - column 8, line 3 * * column 11, lines 23-30 * * column 15, lines 38-65; figure 10 * * column 18, line 46 - column 20, line 12; figures 26(d),28(c)-(e) * * column 21, lines 19-54; figures 33(a),33(b) * [I] 2-4,6,8-15; | [A]US6096656 (MATZKE CAROLYN M [US], et al) [A] 1,2,7-15 * column 5, line 41 - column 10, line 33 * * column 12, lines 40-51; figure 5f *; | [A]US6320157 (BLOSS FRITZ [DE], et al) [A] 1,4 * column 4, lines 53-59; figure 2a *; | [A]US2002100556 (KIM STEVEN [US], et al) [A] 1,3 * paragraph [0058]; figure 5 *; | [A]WO02065820 (SE PLASMA INC [KR]) [A] 1,6* page 10, lines 10-18 * | International search | [Y]JP2002115073 (KOBE STEEL LTD, et al); | [Y]KR20020066467 (SE PLASMA INC [KR]); | [X]JP2003142415 (SHARP KK, et al) |