EP2739128 - APPARATUS, SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR ROW UNIT DOWNFORCE CONTROL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 22.03.2019 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 02.12.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.03.2019 | Revocation of patent | published on 24.04.2019 [2019/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Precision Planting LLC 23207 Townline Road Tremont, IL 61568 / US | [2014/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SAUDER, Derek, A. 14347 N Lake Windermere Road Tremont, IL 61568 / US | 02 /
RADTKE, Ian, R. 281 Circle Shore Drive Washington, IL 61571 / US | 03 /
STOLLER, Jason, J. 1161 County Road 700 N Eureka, IL 61530 / US | [2016/29] |
Former [2014/24] | 01 /
SAUDER, Derek, A. 14347 N Lake Windermere Road Tremont, IL 61568 / US | ||
02 /
RADTKE, Ian, R. 961 County Road 2000 E Secor, IL 61771 / US | |||
03 /
STOLLER, Jason, J. 1045 E Polk Morton, IL 61550 / US | Representative(s) | Barker Brettell LLP 100 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 8QQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/24] | Wightman, David Alexander Barker Brettell LLP 100 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham West Midlands B16 8QQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 12822819.4 | 06.08.2012 | [2016/29] | WO2012US49747 | Priority number, date | US201161515700P | 05.08.2011 Original published format: US 201161515700 P | [2014/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013022835 | Date: | 14.02.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2739128 | Date: | 11.06.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.02.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2739128 | Date: | 20.07.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 14.02.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.05.2015 | Classification | IPC: | A01C5/06, A01C7/18, A01B13/08, A01B63/111, A01B63/114, A01C7/20 | [2015/24] | CPC: |
A01C7/205 (EP,US);
A01B63/114 (US);
A01B13/08 (US);
A01C5/06 (US);
A01C7/18 (US);
A01B63/111 (US)
|
Former IPC [2014/24] | A01C5/06, A01C7/18, A01B13/08, A01B63/111, A01B63/114 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/24] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNGEN, SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUR SCHARDRUCKSTEUERUNG VON REIHENEINHEITEN | [2016/10] | English: | APPARATUS, SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR ROW UNIT DOWNFORCE CONTROL | [2014/24] | French: | ÉQUIPEMENT, SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS DE COMMANDE DE FORCE D'APPUI D'UNITÉS DE RANGÉE | [2014/24] |
Former [2014/24] | VORRICHTUNGEN, SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUR ABTRIEBSSTEUERUNG VON REIHENEINHEITEN | Entry into regional phase | 04.03.2014 | National basic fee paid | 04.03.2014 | Search fee paid | 04.03.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.03.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.06.2013 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 04.03.2014 | Examination requested [2014/24] | 27.11.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.02.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.06.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 08.06.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.06.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP16180249.1 / EP3106012 | EP19211963.4 / EP3653034 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.02.2016 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
20.04.2017
ADMISSIBLE Amazonen-Werke H. Dreyer GmbH & Co. KG Am Amazonenwerk 9-13 49205 Hasbergen-Gaste / DE Opponent's representative Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2017/21] | 29.05.2017 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 04.10.2017 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 16.10.2018 | Date of oral proceedings | 16.10.2018 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2019/17] | 03.12.2018 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 03.12.2018 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 20.07.2016 | BE | 20.07.2016 | CY | 20.07.2016 | DK | 20.07.2016 | EE | 20.07.2016 | FI | 20.07.2016 | HR | 20.07.2016 | LT | 20.07.2016 | LV | 20.07.2016 | MC | 20.07.2016 | MK | 20.07.2016 | NL | 20.07.2016 | PL | 20.07.2016 | RS | 20.07.2016 | SE | 20.07.2016 | SI | 20.07.2016 | SK | 20.07.2016 | SM | 20.07.2016 | TR | 20.07.2016 | IE | 06.08.2016 | LU | 06.08.2016 | CH | 31.08.2016 | LI | 31.08.2016 | MT | 31.08.2016 | NO | 20.10.2016 | GR | 21.10.2016 | IS | 20.11.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/45] | BE | 20.07.2016 | |
CY | 20.07.2016 | ||
DK | 20.07.2016 | ||
EE | 20.07.2016 | ||
FI | 20.07.2016 | ||
HR | 20.07.2016 | ||
LT | 20.07.2016 | ||
LV | 20.07.2016 | ||
MC | 20.07.2016 | ||
MK | 20.07.2016 | ||
NL | 20.07.2016 | ||
PL | 20.07.2016 | ||
RS | 20.07.2016 | ||
SE | 20.07.2016 | ||
SI | 20.07.2016 | ||
SK | 20.07.2016 | ||
SM | 20.07.2016 | ||
TR | 20.07.2016 | ||
IE | 06.08.2016 | ||
LU | 06.08.2016 | ||
CH | 31.08.2016 | ||
LI | 31.08.2016 | ||
MT | 31.08.2016 | ||
NO | 20.10.2016 | ||
GR | 21.10.2016 | ||
IS | 20.11.2016 | ||
Former [2018/31] | BE | 20.07.2016 | |
CY | 20.07.2016 | ||
DK | 20.07.2016 | ||
EE | 20.07.2016 | ||
FI | 20.07.2016 | ||
HR | 20.07.2016 | ||
LT | 20.07.2016 | ||
LV | 20.07.2016 | ||
MC | 20.07.2016 | ||
MK | 20.07.2016 | ||
NL | 20.07.2016 | ||
PL | 20.07.2016 | ||
RS | 20.07.2016 | ||
SE | 20.07.2016 | ||
SI | 20.07.2016 | ||
SK | 20.07.2016 | ||
SM | 20.07.2016 | ||
IE | 06.08.2016 | ||
LU | 06.08.2016 | ||
CH | 31.08.2016 | ||
LI | 31.08.2016 | ||
MT | 31.08.2016 | ||
NO | 20.10.2016 | ||
GR | 21.10.2016 | ||
IS | 20.11.2016 | ||
Former [2018/29] | BE | 20.07.2016 | |
CY | 20.07.2016 | ||
DK | 20.07.2016 | ||
EE | 20.07.2016 | ||
FI | 20.07.2016 | ||
HR | 20.07.2016 | ||
LT | 20.07.2016 | ||
LV | 20.07.2016 | ||
MC | 20.07.2016 | ||
MK | 20.07.2016 | ||
NL | 20.07.2016 | ||
PL | 20.07.2016 | ||
RS | 20.07.2016 | ||
SE | 20.07.2016 | ||
SI | 20.07.2016 | ||
SK | 20.07.2016 | ||
SM | 20.07.2016 | ||
IE | 06.08.2016 | ||
LU | 06.08.2016 | ||
CH | 31.08.2016 | ||
LI | 31.08.2016 | ||
NO | 20.10.2016 | ||
GR | 21.10.2016 | ||
IS | 20.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | BE | 20.07.2016 | |
DK | 20.07.2016 | ||
EE | 20.07.2016 | ||
FI | 20.07.2016 | ||
HR | 20.07.2016 | ||
LT | 20.07.2016 | ||
LV | 20.07.2016 | ||
MC | 20.07.2016 | ||
NL | 20.07.2016 | ||
PL | 20.07.2016 | ||
RS | 20.07.2016 | ||
SE | 20.07.2016 | ||
SI | 20.07.2016 | ||
SK | 20.07.2016 | ||
SM | 20.07.2016 | ||
IE | 06.08.2016 | ||
LU | 06.08.2016 | ||
CH | 31.08.2016 | ||
LI | 31.08.2016 | ||
NO | 20.10.2016 | ||
GR | 21.10.2016 | ||
IS | 20.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/34] | BE | 20.07.2016 | |
DK | 20.07.2016 | ||
EE | 20.07.2016 | ||
FI | 20.07.2016 | ||
HR | 20.07.2016 | ||
LT | 20.07.2016 | ||
LV | 20.07.2016 | ||
MC | 20.07.2016 | ||
NL | 20.07.2016 | ||
PL | 20.07.2016 | ||
RS | 20.07.2016 | ||
SE | 20.07.2016 | ||
SK | 20.07.2016 | ||
SM | 20.07.2016 | ||
IE | 06.08.2016 | ||
CH | 31.08.2016 | ||
LI | 31.08.2016 | ||
NO | 20.10.2016 | ||
GR | 21.10.2016 | ||
IS | 20.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/25] | BE | 20.07.2016 | |
DK | 20.07.2016 | ||
EE | 20.07.2016 | ||
FI | 20.07.2016 | ||
HR | 20.07.2016 | ||
LT | 20.07.2016 | ||
LV | 20.07.2016 | ||
MC | 20.07.2016 | ||
NL | 20.07.2016 | ||
PL | 20.07.2016 | ||
RS | 20.07.2016 | ||
SE | 20.07.2016 | ||
SK | 20.07.2016 | ||
SM | 20.07.2016 | ||
CH | 31.08.2016 | ||
LI | 31.08.2016 | ||
NO | 20.10.2016 | ||
GR | 21.10.2016 | ||
IS | 20.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/21] | BE | 20.07.2016 | |
FI | 20.07.2016 | ||
HR | 20.07.2016 | ||
LT | 20.07.2016 | ||
LV | 20.07.2016 | ||
MC | 20.07.2016 | ||
NL | 20.07.2016 | ||
PL | 20.07.2016 | ||
RS | 20.07.2016 | ||
SE | 20.07.2016 | ||
CH | 31.08.2016 | ||
LI | 31.08.2016 | ||
NO | 20.10.2016 | ||
GR | 21.10.2016 | ||
IS | 20.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/13] | BE | 20.07.2016 | |
FI | 20.07.2016 | ||
HR | 20.07.2016 | ||
LT | 20.07.2016 | ||
LV | 20.07.2016 | ||
NL | 20.07.2016 | ||
PL | 20.07.2016 | ||
RS | 20.07.2016 | ||
SE | 20.07.2016 | ||
NO | 20.10.2016 | ||
GR | 21.10.2016 | ||
IS | 20.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | BE | 20.07.2016 | |
FI | 20.07.2016 | ||
HR | 20.07.2016 | ||
LT | 20.07.2016 | ||
NL | 20.07.2016 | ||
PL | 20.07.2016 | ||
RS | 20.07.2016 | ||
SE | 20.07.2016 | ||
NO | 20.10.2016 | ||
GR | 21.10.2016 | ||
IS | 20.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | BE | 20.07.2016 | |
FI | 20.07.2016 | ||
HR | 20.07.2016 | ||
LT | 20.07.2016 | ||
NL | 20.07.2016 | ||
PL | 20.07.2016 | ||
RS | 20.07.2016 | ||
SE | 20.07.2016 | ||
NO | 20.10.2016 | ||
IS | 20.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | FI | 20.07.2016 | |
LT | 20.07.2016 | ||
NL | 20.07.2016 | ||
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
NO | 20.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | LT | 20.07.2016 | |
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | BE | 31.08.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE19844395 (AMAZONEN WERKE DREYER H [DE]) [A] 1-15* column 4, line 39 - column 8, line 30; figures 6-9 * | International search | [Y]US5562165 (JANELLE LUC [CA], et al); | [Y]US6003455 (FLAMME DAVID [US], et al); | [Y]WO2008086283 (PREC PLANTING INC [US], et al); | [E]US8275525 (KOWALCHUK TREVOR [CA], et al) | Examination | US6389999 | by applicant | DE19844395 | Opposition | EP0063025 | US4648466 | US5065681 | DE4123836 | US5562165 | US6003455 | DE19844395 | US6253692 | US6389999 | US2003159577 | US6701857 | US6827029 | DE10330869 | DE10336684 | DE102006057782 | WO2008086238 | EP2025215 | US8275525 | US8857530 | - "Hydraulikprobleme: Pfiffige Wege aus der Ölkrise", Fachzeitschrift top agrar, (20070100), pages 106 - 109, XP055374763 |