EP2744887 - DEVICE AND METHOD TO ACCURATELY AND EASILY ASSEMBLE GLASS SLIDES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 01.09.2017 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.09.2017 | Withdrawal of application | published on 04.10.2017 [2017/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Somalogic, Inc. 2945 Wilderness Place Boulder, CO 80301 / US | [2014/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ALDRED, Jeff 1750 55th Street Unit B Boulder, CO 80301 / US | 02 /
KEENEY, Tracy, R. 5340 Bowersox Pkwy Firestone, CO 80504 / US | 03 /
VAUGHT, Jonathan 3340 Broadway St. Boulder, CO 80304 / US | 04 /
BOCK, Chris 4929 Raleigh St. Denver, CO 80212 / US | 05 /
KRAEMER, Stephan 4780 West Moorhead Circle Boulder, CO 80305 / US | 06 /
FOREMAN, Alexis Stuart 7722 Devonshire Court Boulder, CO 80301 / US | [2014/26] | Representative(s) | Clegg, Richard Ian Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/26] | Clegg, Richard Ian Mewburn Ellis LLP 33 Gutter Lane London EC2V 8AS / GB | Application number, filing date | 12823662.7 | 17.08.2012 | WO2012US51400 | Priority number, date | US201161525056P | 18.08.2011 Original published format: US 201161525056 P | [2014/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013026013 | Date: | 21.02.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2744887 | Date: | 25.06.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.02.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 21.02.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.05.2015 | Classification | IPC: | C12M1/34, B01L9/00, B23P19/04, B23P19/10, B25B11/00, B25B11/02, G02B21/34 | [2015/23] | CPC: |
B01L9/52 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B01L9/02 (US);
B23P19/04 (CN,US);
B23P19/10 (KR,US);
B25B11/005 (CN,US);
B25B11/02 (CN,US);
G02B21/34 (EP,CN,US);
B01L2200/025 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B01L2300/043 (EP,US);
B01L2300/0636 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B01L2300/0822 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B25B11/007 (US);
Y10T29/4978 (EP,US);
Y10T29/4984 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49902 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49998 (EP,US);
Y10T29/53 (EP,US);
Y10T29/53191 (EP,US);
Y10T29/53961 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2014/26] | C12M1/34 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/26] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR GENAUEN UND EINFACHEN MONTAGE VON OBJEKTTRÄGERN | [2014/26] | English: | DEVICE AND METHOD TO ACCURATELY AND EASILY ASSEMBLE GLASS SLIDES | [2014/26] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ POUR MONTER DE MANIÈRE PRÉCISE ET FACILE DES LAMES DE VERRE | [2014/26] | Entry into regional phase | 18.03.2014 | National basic fee paid | 18.03.2014 | Search fee paid | 18.03.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.03.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.03.2014 | Examination requested [2014/26] | 04.12.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.08.2017 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2017/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]US2003013184 (STREIT WOLFGANG [AT], et al) [X] 1,5,14 * paragraph [0033] - paragraph [0034] * * figures 7A, 7B * [Y] 15-19,21 [I] 2-4,6,7,13; | [XYI]US2008286753 (ERICKSON PAGE A [US], et al) [X] 1,2,14 * paragraph [0084] - paragraph [0092] * * figures 4, 8, 11-18 * [Y] 15-19,21 [I] 3,4,6,7,13; | [XYI]US2010167943 (ADEY NILS [US], et al) [X] 1,5,14 * paragraphs [0009] , [0066] , [0067] * * figures 13, 14 * [Y] 15-19,21 [I] 2-4,6,13; | [Y]US2010178668 (ELLIOT STUART [AU], et al) [Y] 15-19,21 * paragraphs [0064] , [0120] , [0123] , [0126] , [0127] , [0202] ** figures 2, 3, 6, 7, 8, 9 * | International search | [A]US5451500 (STAPLETON MARILYN J [US]); | [A]US2003013184 (STREIT WOLFGANG [AT], et al); | [A]US7838283 (ERICKSON PAGE A [US], et al) | by applicant | US2003013184 | US2008286753 | US2010167943 | US2010178668 |