EP2744974 - TUBING PRESSURE INSENSITIVE PRESSURE COMPENSATED ACTUATOR FOR A DOWNHOLE TOOL AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.03.2020 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.04.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.11.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Baker Hughes, a GE company, LLC 17021 Aldine Westfield Houston, TX 77073 / US | [2019/23] |
Former [2019/10] | For all designated states Baker Hughes, a GE company, LLC P.O. Box 4740 Houston, TX 77210-4740 / US | ||
Former [2014/26] | For all designated states Baker Hughes Incorporated P.O. Box 4740 Houston, TX 77210-4740 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SLOAN, James T. 16417 E. 47th Street Tulsa, Oklahoma 74134 / US | 02 /
GARR, Ronald J. 36912 S. 4214 Road Inola, Oklahoma 74036 / US | 03 /
MCDANIEL, Robert 18419 Brackenfield Drive Spring, Texas 77388 / US | 04 /
HOPMANN, Don A. 2704 County Road 237 Alvin, Texas 77511 / US | 05 /
SCHNEIDER, David E. 28259 Nancy Lane Conroe, Texas 77385 / US | [2014/26] | Representative(s) | BRP Renaud & Partner mbB Rechtsanwälte Patentanwälte Steuerberater Königstraße 28 70173 Stuttgart / DE | [2019/19] |
Former [2014/26] | Mabey, Katherine Frances Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 12824284.9 | 03.08.2012 | [2019/19] | WO2012US49439 | Priority number, date | US201113210999 | 16.08.2011 Original published format: US201113210999 | [2014/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2013025368 | Date: | 21.02.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/08] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2744974 | Date: | 25.06.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.02.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2744974 | Date: | 08.05.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/19] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP2744974 | Date: | 26.06.2019 | [2019/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 18.04.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.10.2015 | Classification | IPC: | E21B34/10, C25F3/02, C25F7/00, E21B34/14, E21B34/00 | [2018/49] | CPC: |
E21B34/10 (EP,US);
C25F3/02 (EP,US);
C25F7/00 (EP,US);
E21B34/101 (EP,US);
E21B2200/05 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2014/26] | E21B34/10 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/26] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GEGEN ROHRDRUCK UNEMPFINDLICHER UND DRUCKKOMPENSIERTER AKTUATOR FÜR EIN BOHRLOCHWERKZEUG UND VERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2014/26] | English: | TUBING PRESSURE INSENSITIVE PRESSURE COMPENSATED ACTUATOR FOR A DOWNHOLE TOOL AND METHOD | [2014/26] | French: | ACTIONNEUR RÉGULÉ PAR UNE PRESSION INSENSIBLE À UNE PRESSION DES TIGES DE PRODUCTION POUR UN OUTIL DE FOND DE TROU ET PROCÉDÉ | [2014/26] | Entry into regional phase | 12.02.2014 | National basic fee paid | 12.02.2014 | Search fee paid | 12.02.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.02.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.02.2014 | Examination requested [2014/26] | 09.05.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.03.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.07.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.11.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.03.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 28.03.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.03.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.03.2018 | Opposition(s) | 11.02.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 03.08.2012 | AL | 08.05.2019 | AT | 08.05.2019 | CY | 08.05.2019 | CZ | 08.05.2019 | EE | 08.05.2019 | ES | 08.05.2019 | FI | 08.05.2019 | HR | 08.05.2019 | LT | 08.05.2019 | LV | 08.05.2019 | MC | 08.05.2019 | MK | 08.05.2019 | MT | 08.05.2019 | PL | 08.05.2019 | RO | 08.05.2019 | RS | 08.05.2019 | SE | 08.05.2019 | SI | 08.05.2019 | SK | 08.05.2019 | SM | 08.05.2019 | TR | 08.05.2019 | IE | 03.08.2019 | LU | 03.08.2019 | BG | 08.08.2019 | GR | 09.08.2019 | BE | 31.08.2019 | CH | 31.08.2019 | LI | 31.08.2019 | IS | 08.09.2019 | PT | 08.09.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 03.08.2012 | |
AL | 08.05.2019 | ||
AT | 08.05.2019 | ||
CY | 08.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 08.05.2019 | ||
EE | 08.05.2019 | ||
ES | 08.05.2019 | ||
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
HR | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LV | 08.05.2019 | ||
MC | 08.05.2019 | ||
MT | 08.05.2019 | ||
PL | 08.05.2019 | ||
RO | 08.05.2019 | ||
RS | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
SI | 08.05.2019 | ||
SK | 08.05.2019 | ||
SM | 08.05.2019 | ||
TR | 08.05.2019 | ||
IE | 03.08.2019 | ||
LU | 03.08.2019 | ||
BG | 08.08.2019 | ||
GR | 09.08.2019 | ||
BE | 31.08.2019 | ||
CH | 31.08.2019 | ||
LI | 31.08.2019 | ||
IS | 08.09.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2021/33] | HU | 03.08.2012 | |
AL | 08.05.2019 | ||
AT | 08.05.2019 | ||
CY | 08.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 08.05.2019 | ||
EE | 08.05.2019 | ||
ES | 08.05.2019 | ||
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
HR | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LV | 08.05.2019 | ||
MC | 08.05.2019 | ||
PL | 08.05.2019 | ||
RO | 08.05.2019 | ||
RS | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
SI | 08.05.2019 | ||
SK | 08.05.2019 | ||
SM | 08.05.2019 | ||
TR | 08.05.2019 | ||
IE | 03.08.2019 | ||
LU | 03.08.2019 | ||
BG | 08.08.2019 | ||
GR | 09.08.2019 | ||
BE | 31.08.2019 | ||
CH | 31.08.2019 | ||
LI | 31.08.2019 | ||
IS | 08.09.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2021/31] | AL | 08.05.2019 | |
AT | 08.05.2019 | ||
CY | 08.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 08.05.2019 | ||
EE | 08.05.2019 | ||
ES | 08.05.2019 | ||
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
HR | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LV | 08.05.2019 | ||
MC | 08.05.2019 | ||
PL | 08.05.2019 | ||
RO | 08.05.2019 | ||
RS | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
SI | 08.05.2019 | ||
SK | 08.05.2019 | ||
SM | 08.05.2019 | ||
TR | 08.05.2019 | ||
IE | 03.08.2019 | ||
LU | 03.08.2019 | ||
BG | 08.08.2019 | ||
GR | 09.08.2019 | ||
BE | 31.08.2019 | ||
CH | 31.08.2019 | ||
LI | 31.08.2019 | ||
IS | 08.09.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 08.05.2019 | |
AT | 08.05.2019 | ||
CY | 08.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 08.05.2019 | ||
EE | 08.05.2019 | ||
ES | 08.05.2019 | ||
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
HR | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LV | 08.05.2019 | ||
MC | 08.05.2019 | ||
PL | 08.05.2019 | ||
RO | 08.05.2019 | ||
RS | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
SI | 08.05.2019 | ||
SK | 08.05.2019 | ||
SM | 08.05.2019 | ||
TR | 08.05.2019 | ||
IE | 03.08.2019 | ||
LU | 03.08.2019 | ||
BG | 08.08.2019 | ||
GR | 09.08.2019 | ||
BE | 31.08.2019 | ||
CH | 31.08.2019 | ||
LI | 31.08.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/38] | AL | 08.05.2019 | |
AT | 08.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 08.05.2019 | ||
EE | 08.05.2019 | ||
ES | 08.05.2019 | ||
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
HR | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LV | 08.05.2019 | ||
MC | 08.05.2019 | ||
PL | 08.05.2019 | ||
RO | 08.05.2019 | ||
RS | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
SI | 08.05.2019 | ||
SK | 08.05.2019 | ||
SM | 08.05.2019 | ||
TR | 08.05.2019 | ||
IE | 03.08.2019 | ||
LU | 03.08.2019 | ||
BG | 08.08.2019 | ||
GR | 09.08.2019 | ||
BE | 31.08.2019 | ||
CH | 31.08.2019 | ||
LI | 31.08.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 08.05.2019 | |
AT | 08.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 08.05.2019 | ||
EE | 08.05.2019 | ||
ES | 08.05.2019 | ||
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
HR | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LV | 08.05.2019 | ||
MC | 08.05.2019 | ||
PL | 08.05.2019 | ||
RO | 08.05.2019 | ||
RS | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
SI | 08.05.2019 | ||
SK | 08.05.2019 | ||
SM | 08.05.2019 | ||
TR | 08.05.2019 | ||
IE | 03.08.2019 | ||
LU | 03.08.2019 | ||
BG | 08.08.2019 | ||
GR | 09.08.2019 | ||
CH | 31.08.2019 | ||
LI | 31.08.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AL | 08.05.2019 | |
AT | 08.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 08.05.2019 | ||
EE | 08.05.2019 | ||
ES | 08.05.2019 | ||
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
HR | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LV | 08.05.2019 | ||
MC | 08.05.2019 | ||
PL | 08.05.2019 | ||
RO | 08.05.2019 | ||
RS | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
SI | 08.05.2019 | ||
SK | 08.05.2019 | ||
SM | 08.05.2019 | ||
TR | 08.05.2019 | ||
LU | 03.08.2019 | ||
BG | 08.08.2019 | ||
GR | 09.08.2019 | ||
CH | 31.08.2019 | ||
LI | 31.08.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 08.05.2019 | |
AT | 08.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 08.05.2019 | ||
EE | 08.05.2019 | ||
ES | 08.05.2019 | ||
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
HR | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LV | 08.05.2019 | ||
RO | 08.05.2019 | ||
RS | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
SK | 08.05.2019 | ||
SM | 08.05.2019 | ||
TR | 08.05.2019 | ||
BG | 08.08.2019 | ||
GR | 09.08.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/14] | AL | 08.05.2019 | |
AT | 08.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 08.05.2019 | ||
EE | 08.05.2019 | ||
ES | 08.05.2019 | ||
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
HR | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LV | 08.05.2019 | ||
RO | 08.05.2019 | ||
RS | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
SK | 08.05.2019 | ||
SM | 08.05.2019 | ||
BG | 08.08.2019 | ||
GR | 09.08.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AL | 08.05.2019 | |
AT | 08.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 08.05.2019 | ||
EE | 08.05.2019 | ||
ES | 08.05.2019 | ||
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
HR | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LV | 08.05.2019 | ||
RO | 08.05.2019 | ||
RS | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
SK | 08.05.2019 | ||
BG | 08.08.2019 | ||
GR | 09.08.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | AL | 08.05.2019 | |
AT | 08.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 08.05.2019 | ||
ES | 08.05.2019 | ||
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
HR | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LV | 08.05.2019 | ||
RO | 08.05.2019 | ||
RS | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
BG | 08.08.2019 | ||
GR | 09.08.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AL | 08.05.2019 | |
CZ | 08.05.2019 | ||
ES | 08.05.2019 | ||
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
HR | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LV | 08.05.2019 | ||
RS | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
BG | 08.08.2019 | ||
GR | 09.08.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 08.05.2019 | |
ES | 08.05.2019 | ||
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
HR | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LV | 08.05.2019 | ||
RS | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
BG | 08.08.2019 | ||
GR | 09.08.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AL | 08.05.2019 | |
ES | 08.05.2019 | ||
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
HR | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LV | 08.05.2019 | ||
RS | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
GR | 09.08.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AL | 08.05.2019 | |
ES | 08.05.2019 | ||
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
HR | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | ES | 08.05.2019 | |
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | ES | 08.05.2019 | |
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5259456 (EDWARDS JEFFREY C [GB], et al) [A] 1-13,15 * abstract *; | [Y]GB2309241 (BAKER HUGHES INC [US]) [Y] 1-13,15 * figure 3 *; | [A]US2006196669 (LAUDERDALE DONALD P [US], et al) [A] 1-13,15* abstract *; | [Y]US2009250206 (LAKE GARY B [US], et al) [Y] 1-13,15 * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0018]; figure 3 * | International search | [A]US4062406 (AKKERMAN NEIL H, et al); | [A]US4444266 (PRINGLE RONALD E [US]); | [A]US5058682 (PRINGLE RONALD E [US]); | [A]US2006196669 (LAUDERDALE DONALD P [US], et al) | by applicant | US5259456 | GB2309241 | US2006196669 | US2009250206 |