EP2801198 - PROCESSING 3D IMAGE SEQUENCES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.08.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 08.09.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.05.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.03.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.02.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.09.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU, MC | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states InterDigital Madison Patent Holdings, SAS 3 rue du Colonel Moll 75017 Paris / FR | [2022/44] |
Former [2018/40] | For all designated states InterDigital Madison Patent Holdings 3 rue du Colonel Moll 75017 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2017/21] | For all designated states Thomson Licensing DTV 1-5, rue Jeanne d'Arc 92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR | ||
Former [2014/46] | For all designated states Thomson Licensing 1-5 rue Jeanne d'Arc 92130 Issy Les Moulineaux / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ROUTHIER, Pierre Hughes c/o Technicolor 6040 Sunset Blvd Hollywood, CA 90028 / US | 02 /
REDMANN, William Gibbens c/o Technicolor 2233 North Ontario Street Burbank, CA 91505 / US | 03 /
DOYEN, Didier c/o TECHNICOLOR R&D France 975 avenue des Champs Blancs CS 17616 35576 Cesson-Sévigné / FR | [2014/46] | Representative(s) | Interdigital Immeuble ZEN 2 845 A, avenue des Champs Blancs 35510 Cesson-Sévigné / FR | [2023/41] |
Former [2014/46] | Huchet, Anne Technicolor 1-5 rue Jeanne d'Arc 92130 Issy-Les-Moulineaux / FR | Application number, filing date | 12824849.9 | 20.12.2012 | [2023/41] | WO2012IB02927 | Priority number, date | US201261583105P | 04.01.2012 Original published format: US 201261583105 P | US201261583462P | 05.01.2012 Original published format: US 201261583462 P | US201261584123P | 06.01.2012 Original published format: US 201261584123 P | [2014/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2013102790 | Date: | 11.07.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/28] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2801198 | Date: | 12.11.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.07.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2801198 | Date: | 11.10.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.12.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.09.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H04N13/144, G06T7/593, H04N13/128 | [2019/41] | CPC: |
H04N13/128 (EP,US);
G06T7/593 (EP,US);
H04N13/144 (EP,US);
G06T2207/10021 (US);
H04N2213/002 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2014/46] | H04N13/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/46] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERARBEITUNG VON 3D-BILDSEQUENZEN | [2014/46] | English: | PROCESSING 3D IMAGE SEQUENCES | [2014/46] | French: | TRAITEMENT DE SÉQUENCES D'IMAGES 3D | [2014/46] | Entry into regional phase | 18.07.2014 | National basic fee paid | 18.07.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.07.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.07.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.07.2014 | Examination requested [2014/46] | 05.09.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division to which search results under Rule 164(2) EPC are annexed (Time limit: M06) [2019/41] | 05.09.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.02.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.09.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.01.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.05.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M05) | 21.09.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.02.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.03.2023 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 25.05.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.08.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 30.08.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 30.08.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.09.2019 | Opposition(s) | 12.07.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 24.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 23.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 26.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 11.10.2023 | CZ | 11.10.2023 | DK | 11.10.2023 | EE | 11.10.2023 | ES | 11.10.2023 | HR | 11.10.2023 | IT | 11.10.2023 | LT | 11.10.2023 | LV | 11.10.2023 | MC | 11.10.2023 | PL | 11.10.2023 | RO | 11.10.2023 | RS | 11.10.2023 | SE | 11.10.2023 | SK | 11.10.2023 | SM | 11.10.2023 | LU | 20.12.2023 | BG | 11.01.2024 | NO | 11.01.2024 | GR | 12.01.2024 | IS | 11.02.2024 | PT | 12.02.2024 | [2024/40] |
Former [2024/36] | AT | 11.10.2023 | |
CZ | 11.10.2023 | ||
DK | 11.10.2023 | ||
EE | 11.10.2023 | ||
ES | 11.10.2023 | ||
HR | 11.10.2023 | ||
IT | 11.10.2023 | ||
LT | 11.10.2023 | ||
LV | 11.10.2023 | ||
PL | 11.10.2023 | ||
RO | 11.10.2023 | ||
RS | 11.10.2023 | ||
SE | 11.10.2023 | ||
SK | 11.10.2023 | ||
SM | 11.10.2023 | ||
BG | 11.01.2024 | ||
NO | 11.01.2024 | ||
GR | 12.01.2024 | ||
IS | 11.02.2024 | ||
PT | 12.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/35] | AT | 11.10.2023 | |
CZ | 11.10.2023 | ||
DK | 11.10.2023 | ||
EE | 11.10.2023 | ||
ES | 11.10.2023 | ||
HR | 11.10.2023 | ||
LT | 11.10.2023 | ||
LV | 11.10.2023 | ||
PL | 11.10.2023 | ||
RO | 11.10.2023 | ||
RS | 11.10.2023 | ||
SE | 11.10.2023 | ||
SM | 11.10.2023 | ||
BG | 11.01.2024 | ||
NO | 11.01.2024 | ||
GR | 12.01.2024 | ||
IS | 11.02.2024 | ||
PT | 12.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | AT | 11.10.2023 | |
DK | 11.10.2023 | ||
EE | 11.10.2023 | ||
ES | 11.10.2023 | ||
HR | 11.10.2023 | ||
LT | 11.10.2023 | ||
LV | 11.10.2023 | ||
PL | 11.10.2023 | ||
RS | 11.10.2023 | ||
SE | 11.10.2023 | ||
SM | 11.10.2023 | ||
BG | 11.01.2024 | ||
NO | 11.01.2024 | ||
GR | 12.01.2024 | ||
IS | 11.02.2024 | ||
PT | 12.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | AT | 11.10.2023 | |
DK | 11.10.2023 | ||
ES | 11.10.2023 | ||
HR | 11.10.2023 | ||
LT | 11.10.2023 | ||
LV | 11.10.2023 | ||
PL | 11.10.2023 | ||
RS | 11.10.2023 | ||
SE | 11.10.2023 | ||
SM | 11.10.2023 | ||
BG | 11.01.2024 | ||
NO | 11.01.2024 | ||
GR | 12.01.2024 | ||
IS | 11.02.2024 | ||
PT | 12.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/26] | AT | 11.10.2023 | |
ES | 11.10.2023 | ||
HR | 11.10.2023 | ||
LT | 11.10.2023 | ||
LV | 11.10.2023 | ||
PL | 11.10.2023 | ||
RS | 11.10.2023 | ||
SE | 11.10.2023 | ||
BG | 11.01.2024 | ||
NO | 11.01.2024 | ||
GR | 12.01.2024 | ||
IS | 11.02.2024 | ||
PT | 12.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/25] | AT | 11.10.2023 | |
ES | 11.10.2023 | ||
HR | 11.10.2023 | ||
LT | 11.10.2023 | ||
PL | 11.10.2023 | ||
RS | 11.10.2023 | ||
SE | 11.10.2023 | ||
BG | 11.01.2024 | ||
NO | 11.01.2024 | ||
GR | 12.01.2024 | ||
IS | 11.02.2024 | ||
PT | 12.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/24] | AT | 11.10.2023 | |
ES | 11.10.2023 | ||
HR | 11.10.2023 | ||
LT | 11.10.2023 | ||
RS | 11.10.2023 | ||
SE | 11.10.2023 | ||
BG | 11.01.2024 | ||
NO | 11.01.2024 | ||
GR | 12.01.2024 | ||
IS | 11.02.2024 | ||
PT | 12.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 11.10.2023 | |
ES | 11.10.2023 | ||
LT | 11.10.2023 | ||
BG | 11.01.2024 | ||
GR | 12.01.2024 | ||
IS | 11.02.2024 | ||
PT | 12.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | LT | 11.10.2023 | |
BG | 11.01.2024 | ||
GR | 12.01.2024 | ||
IS | 11.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 12.01.2024 | |
IS | 11.02.2024 | Cited in | International search | [X]US2005219239 (MASHITANI KEN [JP], et al) [X] 1-3,23-25,27 * paragraphs [0018] , [ 102] * * paragraphs [0105] - [0108] *; | [X]US2008112616 (KOO JAE-PHIL [KR], et al) [X] 1,2,23-25,27 * paragraphs [0056] - [0061] * * paragraphs [0081] , [0090] *; | [X]US2011081042 (KIM YUN-TAE [KR], et al) [X] 1-3,23-25,27 * paragraphs [0060] - [0063] ** paragraphs [0088] - [0089] * | Examination | EP0963122 | JP2005167310 | US2005219239 | US2007236493 | US2008112616 | WO2011114567 | US2012320047 |