EP2748718 - SYSTEM TO IDENTIFY MULTIPLE COPYRIGHT INFRINGEMENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.06.2019 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.03.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.06.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 31.07.2019 [2019/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Steele, Robert 3100 Donald Douglas Loop North Santa Monica, CA 90405 / US | [2014/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2014/27] | Representative(s) | Zech, Stefan Markus Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/27] | Zech, Stefan Markus Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12825160.0 | 24.08.2012 | WO2012US52325 | Priority number, date | US201161526946P | 24.08.2011 Original published format: US 201161526946 P | [2014/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2013028997 | Date: | 28.02.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/09] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2748718 | Date: | 02.07.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.02.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 18.04.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.05.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G06F15/18, G06F21/00, H04L29/06, G06Q30/00, G06Q50/18 | [2015/04] | CPC: |
G06Q30/00 (EP,US);
G06Q50/184 (EP,US);
H04L63/14 (EP,US);
H04L2463/103 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2014/27] | G06F15/18, G06F21/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/27] | Title | German: | SYSTEM ZUR IDENTIFIZIERUNG MEHRERER URHEBERRECHTSVERLETZUNGEN | [2014/27] | English: | SYSTEM TO IDENTIFY MULTIPLE COPYRIGHT INFRINGEMENTS | [2014/27] | French: | SYSTÈME POUR IDENTIFIER DE MULTIPLES VIOLATIONS DE DROITS D'AUTEUR | [2014/27] | Entry into regional phase | 20.03.2014 | National basic fee paid | 20.03.2014 | Search fee paid | 20.03.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.03.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.03.2014 | Examination requested [2014/27] | 18.11.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.03.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/31] | 25.03.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2019/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2016 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   27.02.2017 | 31.08.2018 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO0211033 (COPYRIGHT NET INC [US]) [A] 1-7,11-15 * page 26, line 4 - line 26 *; | [E]WO2012135855 (STEELE ROBERT [US]) [E] 1-7,11-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0056] * * paragraph [0064] - paragraph [0065] *; | [A] - MICHAEL PIATEK TADAYOSHI KOHNO, "Challenges and Directions for Monitoring P2P File Sharing Networks - or - Why My Printer Received a DMCA Takedow", USENIX,, (20080716), pages 1 - 7, XP061010226 [A] 1-7,11-15 * Abstract Section 2.3 Sections 3 and 4 and subsections * | [A] - STEVENS LE BLOND ET AL, "Spying the World from your Laptop", USENIX,, (20100407), pages 1 - 8, XP061009041 [A] 1-7,11-15 * Abstract Section 6 and subsections * | International search | [A]JP2002366531 (JAPAN SCIENCE & TECH CORP); | [A]KR20030015742 (BIZMODELINE CO LTD [KR]); | [A]KR20080039324 (NEW 21 COMMUNITY CO LTD [KR]); | [A]US2010071068 (BAUSCHERT THOMAS [DE], et al) |