EP2749349 - MICRO FLUID DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 10.01.2020 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.01.2020 | Refusal of application | published on 12.02.2020 [2020/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [2014/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TACHIBANA, Hiroaki c/o Panasonic Corporation Intellectual Property Center Planning and Management Group 7F OBP Panasonic Tower, 2-1-61, Shiromi Chuo-ku Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 02 /
TSUJI, Koji c/o Panasonic Corporation Intellectual Property Center Planning and Management Group 7F OBP Panasonic Tower, 2-1-61, Shiromi Chuo-ku Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 03 /
SAIJO, Takashi c/o Panasonic Corporation Intellectual Property Center Planning and Management Group 7F OBP Panasonic Tower, 2-1-61, Shiromi Chuo-ku Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 04 /
TAMIYA, Eiichi c/o OSAKA UNIVERSITY 2-1, Yamadaoka Suita-shi Osaka 565-0871 / JP | 05 /
SAITO, Masato c/o OSAKA UNIVERSITY 2-1, Yamadaoka Suita-shi Osaka 565-0871 / JP | [2014/27] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/27] | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12825200.4 | 21.08.2012 | WO2012JP05236 | Priority number, date | JP20110180318 | 22.08.2011 Original published format: JP 2011180318 | [2014/27] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013027393 | Date: | 28.02.2013 | Language: | JA | [2013/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2749349 | Date: | 02.07.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 28.02.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.05.2014 | Classification | IPC: | B01J19/00, C12M1/00, C12M1/38, G01N35/00, G01N35/08, G01N37/00, B01L3/00, B01L7/00 | [2014/27] | CPC: |
B01J19/0093 (EP,US);
B01J19/24 (KR);
B01L7/52 (US);
B01L3/502707 (EP,US);
B01L7/525 (EP,US);
C12M1/38 (KR);
C12Q1/6844 (US);
G01N35/08 (KR);
B01J2219/00783 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00828 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00831 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00853 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00869 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00873 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00912 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00957 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00961 (EP,US);
B01L2300/0645 (EP,US);
B01L2300/0816 (EP,US);
B01L2300/0883 (EP,US);
B01L2300/0887 (EP,US);
B01L2300/0893 (EP,US);
B01L2300/1827 (EP,US);
C12M23/16 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/27] | Title | German: | MIKROFLUIDISCHE VORRICHTUNG | [2014/27] | English: | MICRO FLUID DEVICE | [2014/27] | French: | DISPOSITIF MICROFLUIDIQUE | [2014/27] | Entry into regional phase | 19.02.2014 | Translation filed | 19.02.2014 | National basic fee paid | 19.02.2014 | Search fee paid | 19.02.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.02.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.02.2014 | Examination requested [2014/27] | 02.12.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.12.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.04.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.09.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2020/07] | 30.09.2019 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2020/07] | 17.10.2019 | Date of oral proceedings | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.12.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]EP0504435 (ONISCHENKO ANATOLY MIKHAILOVIC [SU]) [X] 1,2,6,9 * abstract * * column 5, line 39 - column 6, line 20; figure .; claim - * * paragraph [0039]; figure -; claim - * [I] 4,8,10; | [XI]WO2004073863 (IMP COLLEGE INNOVATIONS LTD [GB], et al) [X] 1-7,9,10 * abstract * * page 1, line 3 - line 6 * * page 3, line 12 - line 27 * * page 5, line 2 - page 7, line 9 * * page 9, line 4 - line 7 * * page 10, line 15 - page 11, line 7 * * page 13, line 4 - line 11; figures 1, 4a; claim - * [I] 8; | [X]WO2005094981 (AGILENT TECHNOLOGIES INC [US], et al) [X] 1-10 * abstract * * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0033] * * paragraph [0039] * * paragraph [0042]; figure -; claim - *; | [XI]US2011097763 (POLLACK MICHAEL G [US], et al) [X] 1-7,9,10 * abstract * * paragraph [0087] - paragraph [0092] * * paragraph [0132] - paragraph [0133]; figures 1, 2, 19, 20; claim - *[I] 8 | International search | [X]JP2004194652 (DAINIPPON INK & CHEMICALS, et al); | [Y]JP2004532003 (GENSET S.A.); | [X]JP2006271216 (DAINIPPON INK & CHEMICALS); | [Y]JP2006292472 (KONICA MINOLTA MED & GRAPHIC); | [X]JP2009189295 (CANON KK); | [X]JP2010535511 (CELULA, INC.) | by applicant | JP2002018271 |