EP2748700 - METHODS, APPARATUSES, AND COMPUTER PROGRAM PRODUCTS FOR COMPRESSION OF VISUAL SPACE FOR FACILITATING THE DISPLAY OF CONTENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.02.2016 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.02.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.03.2016 [2016/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nokia Technologies Oy Karaportti 3 02610 Espoo / FI | [2015/32] |
Former [2014/27] | For all designated states Nokia Corporation Karakaari 7 02610 Espoo / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ARRASVUORI, Juha Kruutinkuja 2 B 13 FI-33710 Tampere / FI | [2014/27] | Representative(s) | Nokia EPO representatives Nokia Technologies Oy Karakaari 7 02610 Espoo / FI | [N/P] |
Former [2014/27] | Tognetty, Virpi Maria Nokia Corporation Intellectual Property Department Karakaari 7 02160 Espoo / FI | Application number, filing date | 12826203.7 | 20.08.2012 | WO2012FI50796 | Priority number, date | US201113217060 | 24.08.2011 Original published format: US201113217060 | [2014/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013026957 | Date: | 28.02.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2748700 | Date: | 02.07.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.02.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | FI | 28.02.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.03.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/0482, G06F3/041, G06F3/0488 | [2014/27] | CPC: |
G06T3/053 (EP,US);
G06F3/0485 (EP,US);
G06F3/0488 (EP,US);
G06F3/04886 (EP,US);
G06F2203/04806 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/27] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN, VORRICHTUNGEN UND COMPUTERPROGRAMMPRODUKTE FÜR EINE KOMPRIMIERUNG VON SICHTFLÄCHEN ZUR ERLEICHTERUNG DER ANZEIGE VON INHALTEN | [2014/27] | English: | METHODS, APPARATUSES, AND COMPUTER PROGRAM PRODUCTS FOR COMPRESSION OF VISUAL SPACE FOR FACILITATING THE DISPLAY OF CONTENT | [2014/27] | French: | PROCÉDÉS, APPAREILS ET PRODUITS PROGRAMME D'ORDINATEUR POUR LA COMPRESSION D'UN ESPACE VISUEL POUR FACILITER L'AFFICHAGE D'UN CONTENU | [2014/27] | Entry into regional phase | 07.02.2014 | National basic fee paid | 07.02.2014 | Search fee paid | 07.02.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.02.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.02.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.02.2014 | Examination requested [2014/27] | 07.10.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/13] | 12.11.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2016/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2015 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US6833851 (BRUNK SCOTT [US]) [X] 1-13 * column 1, lines 51-67 * * column 3, line 38 - column 4, line 32 ** figures 3-8 *; | [X]US2009009535 (IWAMOTO TARO [JP], et al) [X] 1-13 * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0021] * * paragraph [0036] * * paragraph [0039] - paragraph [0067] * * paragraph [0074] - paragraph [0081] * * figures 2,4-7 *; | [X]EP2343503 (NAVIGON AG [DE]) [X] 1-13 * paragraph [0009] - paragraph [0018] * * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0029] * * figures 1,2 * | International search | [A]US7075512 (FABRE GILLES [FR], et al); | [A]EP2079052 (RESEARCH IN MOTION LTD [CA]); | [A]US2010302176 (NIKULA JARMO ANTERO [FI], et al) |