EP2751837 - MERGED LEGS AND SEMI-FLEXIBLE ANCHORING FOR MEMS DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.05.2021 Database last updated on 24.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 19.06.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.02.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cavendish Kinetics Inc. 3833 North 1st Street San Jose, CA 95134 / US | [2014/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VAN KAMPEN, Robertus Petrus Spanjaardwaard 25 5236 XR 's-Hertogenbosch / NL | 02 /
UNAMUNO, Anartz Le Bron de Vexelastraat 31 6042 AN Roermond / NL | 03 /
KNIPE, Richard L. 4101 County Road 1006 McKinney, TX 75071 / US | 04 /
GADDI, Roberto Dr. Ariensstraat 1 5213 VS 's-Hertogenbosch / NL | 05 /
MAHAMEED, Rashed 9200 SW Graphite Terrace Beaverton, OR 97007 / US | [2020/30] |
Former [2014/29] | 01 /
VAN KAMPEN, Robertus Petrus Spanjaardwaard 25 NL-5236 XR 's-Hertogenbosch / NL | ||
02 /
UNAMUNO, Anartz Le Bron de Vexelastraat 31 NL-6042 AN Roermond / NL | |||
03 /
KNIPE, Richard L. 4101 County Road 1006 McKinney, Texas 75071 / US | |||
04 /
GADDI, Roberto Dr. Ariensstraat 1 NL-5213 VS 's-Hertogenbosch / NL | |||
05 /
MAHAMEED, Rashed 9200 SW Graphite Terrace Beaverton, Oregon 97007 / US | |||
Former [2014/28] | 01 /
VAN KAMPEN, Robertus Petrus Spanjaardwaard 25 NL-5236 XR 's-Hertogenbosch / NL | ||
02 /
UNAMUNO, Anartz Le Bron de Vexelastraat 31 NL-6042 AN Roermond / NL | |||
03 /
KNIPE, Richard L. 4101 County Road 1006 McKinney, Texas 75071 / US | |||
04 /
GADDI, Roberto Reggestraat 10 NL-5215 GV 's-Hertogenbosch / NL | |||
05 /
MAHAMEED, Rashed 9200 SW Graphite Terrace Beaverton, Oregon 97007 / US | Representative(s) | Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [2020/30] |
Former [2014/28] | Haley, Stephen Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | Application number, filing date | 12827352.1 | 04.09.2012 | [2020/30] | WO2012US53699 | Priority number, date | US201161530533P | 02.09.2011 Original published format: US 201161530533 P | [2014/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013033722 | Date: | 07.03.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2751837 | Date: | 09.07.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.03.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2751837 | Date: | 22.07.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 07.03.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.03.2015 | Classification | IPC: | B81B7/04, H01L27/14 | [2020/09] | CPC: |
B81B7/04 (EP,US);
H01H59/0009 (US);
B81B3/0097 (US);
B81B2201/018 (EP,US);
B81B2203/0109 (EP,US);
B81B2203/0118 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2014/28] | H01L27/14 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/28] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FUSONIERTE BEINE UND HALBFLEXIBLE VERANKERUNG FÜR MEMS-VORRICHTUNG | [2014/28] | English: | MERGED LEGS AND SEMI-FLEXIBLE ANCHORING FOR MEMS DEVICE | [2014/28] | French: | PIEDS FUSIONNÉS ET ANCRAGE SEMI-FLEXIBLE POUR DISPOSITIF MEMS | [2014/28] | Entry into regional phase | 03.03.2014 | National basic fee paid | 03.03.2014 | Search fee paid | 03.03.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.03.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.03.2014 | Examination requested [2014/28] | 02.10.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.11.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.02.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.08.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.01.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.02.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.06.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.02.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.06.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 15.06.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.06.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.11.2016 | Opposition(s) | 23.04.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 04.09.2012 | AL | 22.07.2020 | AT | 22.07.2020 | CY | 22.07.2020 | CZ | 22.07.2020 | DK | 22.07.2020 | EE | 22.07.2020 | ES | 22.07.2020 | FI | 22.07.2020 | HR | 22.07.2020 | LT | 22.07.2020 | LV | 22.07.2020 | MC | 22.07.2020 | MK | 22.07.2020 | MT | 22.07.2020 | PL | 22.07.2020 | RO | 22.07.2020 | RS | 22.07.2020 | SE | 22.07.2020 | SI | 22.07.2020 | SK | 22.07.2020 | SM | 22.07.2020 | TR | 22.07.2020 | LU | 04.09.2020 | BE | 30.09.2020 | CH | 30.09.2020 | LI | 30.09.2020 | BG | 22.10.2020 | NO | 22.10.2020 | GR | 23.10.2020 | IS | 22.11.2020 | PT | 23.11.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 04.09.2012 | |
AL | 22.07.2020 | ||
AT | 22.07.2020 | ||
CY | 22.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 22.07.2020 | ||
DK | 22.07.2020 | ||
EE | 22.07.2020 | ||
ES | 22.07.2020 | ||
FI | 22.07.2020 | ||
HR | 22.07.2020 | ||
LT | 22.07.2020 | ||
LV | 22.07.2020 | ||
MC | 22.07.2020 | ||
MT | 22.07.2020 | ||
PL | 22.07.2020 | ||
RO | 22.07.2020 | ||
RS | 22.07.2020 | ||
SE | 22.07.2020 | ||
SI | 22.07.2020 | ||
SK | 22.07.2020 | ||
SM | 22.07.2020 | ||
TR | 22.07.2020 | ||
LU | 04.09.2020 | ||
BE | 30.09.2020 | ||
CH | 30.09.2020 | ||
LI | 30.09.2020 | ||
BG | 22.10.2020 | ||
NO | 22.10.2020 | ||
GR | 23.10.2020 | ||
IS | 22.11.2020 | ||
PT | 23.11.2020 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AL | 22.07.2020 | |
AT | 22.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 22.07.2020 | ||
DK | 22.07.2020 | ||
EE | 22.07.2020 | ||
ES | 22.07.2020 | ||
FI | 22.07.2020 | ||
HR | 22.07.2020 | ||
LT | 22.07.2020 | ||
LV | 22.07.2020 | ||
MC | 22.07.2020 | ||
PL | 22.07.2020 | ||
RO | 22.07.2020 | ||
RS | 22.07.2020 | ||
SE | 22.07.2020 | ||
SI | 22.07.2020 | ||
SK | 22.07.2020 | ||
SM | 22.07.2020 | ||
TR | 22.07.2020 | ||
LU | 04.09.2020 | ||
BE | 30.09.2020 | ||
CH | 30.09.2020 | ||
LI | 30.09.2020 | ||
BG | 22.10.2020 | ||
NO | 22.10.2020 | ||
GR | 23.10.2020 | ||
IS | 22.11.2020 | ||
PT | 23.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AL | 22.07.2020 | |
AT | 22.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 22.07.2020 | ||
DK | 22.07.2020 | ||
EE | 22.07.2020 | ||
ES | 22.07.2020 | ||
FI | 22.07.2020 | ||
HR | 22.07.2020 | ||
LT | 22.07.2020 | ||
LV | 22.07.2020 | ||
MC | 22.07.2020 | ||
PL | 22.07.2020 | ||
RO | 22.07.2020 | ||
RS | 22.07.2020 | ||
SE | 22.07.2020 | ||
SI | 22.07.2020 | ||
SK | 22.07.2020 | ||
SM | 22.07.2020 | ||
LU | 04.09.2020 | ||
BE | 30.09.2020 | ||
CH | 30.09.2020 | ||
LI | 30.09.2020 | ||
BG | 22.10.2020 | ||
NO | 22.10.2020 | ||
GR | 23.10.2020 | ||
IS | 22.11.2020 | ||
PT | 23.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AL | 22.07.2020 | |
AT | 22.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 22.07.2020 | ||
DK | 22.07.2020 | ||
EE | 22.07.2020 | ||
ES | 22.07.2020 | ||
FI | 22.07.2020 | ||
HR | 22.07.2020 | ||
LT | 22.07.2020 | ||
LV | 22.07.2020 | ||
MC | 22.07.2020 | ||
PL | 22.07.2020 | ||
RO | 22.07.2020 | ||
RS | 22.07.2020 | ||
SE | 22.07.2020 | ||
SI | 22.07.2020 | ||
SK | 22.07.2020 | ||
SM | 22.07.2020 | ||
LU | 04.09.2020 | ||
BE | 30.09.2020 | ||
BG | 22.10.2020 | ||
NO | 22.10.2020 | ||
GR | 23.10.2020 | ||
IS | 22.11.2020 | ||
PT | 23.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/28] | AL | 22.07.2020 | |
AT | 22.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 22.07.2020 | ||
DK | 22.07.2020 | ||
EE | 22.07.2020 | ||
ES | 22.07.2020 | ||
FI | 22.07.2020 | ||
HR | 22.07.2020 | ||
LT | 22.07.2020 | ||
LV | 22.07.2020 | ||
MC | 22.07.2020 | ||
PL | 22.07.2020 | ||
RO | 22.07.2020 | ||
RS | 22.07.2020 | ||
SE | 22.07.2020 | ||
SK | 22.07.2020 | ||
SM | 22.07.2020 | ||
LU | 04.09.2020 | ||
BG | 22.10.2020 | ||
NO | 22.10.2020 | ||
GR | 23.10.2020 | ||
IS | 22.11.2020 | ||
PT | 23.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/27] | AL | 22.07.2020 | |
AT | 22.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 22.07.2020 | ||
DK | 22.07.2020 | ||
EE | 22.07.2020 | ||
ES | 22.07.2020 | ||
FI | 22.07.2020 | ||
HR | 22.07.2020 | ||
LT | 22.07.2020 | ||
LV | 22.07.2020 | ||
MC | 22.07.2020 | ||
PL | 22.07.2020 | ||
RO | 22.07.2020 | ||
RS | 22.07.2020 | ||
SE | 22.07.2020 | ||
SM | 22.07.2020 | ||
LU | 04.09.2020 | ||
BG | 22.10.2020 | ||
NO | 22.10.2020 | ||
GR | 23.10.2020 | ||
IS | 22.11.2020 | ||
PT | 23.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/25] | AL | 22.07.2020 | |
AT | 22.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 22.07.2020 | ||
DK | 22.07.2020 | ||
EE | 22.07.2020 | ||
ES | 22.07.2020 | ||
FI | 22.07.2020 | ||
HR | 22.07.2020 | ||
LT | 22.07.2020 | ||
LV | 22.07.2020 | ||
MC | 22.07.2020 | ||
PL | 22.07.2020 | ||
RO | 22.07.2020 | ||
RS | 22.07.2020 | ||
SE | 22.07.2020 | ||
SM | 22.07.2020 | ||
BG | 22.10.2020 | ||
NO | 22.10.2020 | ||
GR | 23.10.2020 | ||
IS | 22.11.2020 | ||
PT | 23.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/23] | AT | 22.07.2020 | |
CZ | 22.07.2020 | ||
DK | 22.07.2020 | ||
EE | 22.07.2020 | ||
ES | 22.07.2020 | ||
FI | 22.07.2020 | ||
HR | 22.07.2020 | ||
LT | 22.07.2020 | ||
LV | 22.07.2020 | ||
MC | 22.07.2020 | ||
PL | 22.07.2020 | ||
RO | 22.07.2020 | ||
RS | 22.07.2020 | ||
SE | 22.07.2020 | ||
SM | 22.07.2020 | ||
BG | 22.10.2020 | ||
NO | 22.10.2020 | ||
GR | 23.10.2020 | ||
IS | 22.11.2020 | ||
PT | 23.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/22] | AT | 22.07.2020 | |
CZ | 22.07.2020 | ||
DK | 22.07.2020 | ||
EE | 22.07.2020 | ||
ES | 22.07.2020 | ||
FI | 22.07.2020 | ||
HR | 22.07.2020 | ||
LT | 22.07.2020 | ||
LV | 22.07.2020 | ||
PL | 22.07.2020 | ||
RO | 22.07.2020 | ||
RS | 22.07.2020 | ||
SE | 22.07.2020 | ||
BG | 22.10.2020 | ||
NO | 22.10.2020 | ||
GR | 23.10.2020 | ||
IS | 22.11.2020 | ||
PT | 23.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | AT | 22.07.2020 | |
DK | 22.07.2020 | ||
ES | 22.07.2020 | ||
FI | 22.07.2020 | ||
HR | 22.07.2020 | ||
LT | 22.07.2020 | ||
LV | 22.07.2020 | ||
PL | 22.07.2020 | ||
RS | 22.07.2020 | ||
SE | 22.07.2020 | ||
BG | 22.10.2020 | ||
NO | 22.10.2020 | ||
GR | 23.10.2020 | ||
IS | 22.11.2020 | ||
PT | 23.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AT | 22.07.2020 | |
ES | 22.07.2020 | ||
FI | 22.07.2020 | ||
HR | 22.07.2020 | ||
LT | 22.07.2020 | ||
LV | 22.07.2020 | ||
PL | 22.07.2020 | ||
RS | 22.07.2020 | ||
SE | 22.07.2020 | ||
BG | 22.10.2020 | ||
NO | 22.10.2020 | ||
GR | 23.10.2020 | ||
IS | 22.11.2020 | ||
PT | 23.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AT | 22.07.2020 | |
ES | 22.07.2020 | ||
FI | 22.07.2020 | ||
LT | 22.07.2020 | ||
SE | 22.07.2020 | ||
BG | 22.10.2020 | ||
NO | 22.10.2020 | ||
GR | 23.10.2020 | ||
PT | 23.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | ES | 22.07.2020 | |
FI | 22.07.2020 | ||
LT | 22.07.2020 | ||
SE | 22.07.2020 | ||
BG | 22.10.2020 | ||
NO | 22.10.2020 | ||
PT | 23.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/07] | FI | 22.07.2020 | |
LT | 22.07.2020 | ||
NO | 22.10.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US6788175 (PROPHET ERIC M [US]) [A] 5,7,14,15* column 5 - column 6; figures 6a-6f *; | [X]US2011140570 (MASUNAGA TAKAYUKI [JP], et al) [X] 1-3,5,7,11-15 * paragraph [0003] - paragraph [0053]; figures 1-3 * | International search | [A]US6000280 (MILLER SCOTT A [US], et al); | [Y]US2004050675 (FENG MILTON [US], et al); | [A]US6815866 (LEE HEE-JOONG [KR]); | [Y]US7321275 (CHOU TSUNG-KUAN ALLEN [US], et al); | [Y]US2009256297 (GEISBERGER AARON A [US]); | [Y]US2010116632 (SMITH CHARLES GORDON [GB], et al); | [A]US7728703 (KIM JONG-SEOK [KR], et al); | [Y]US2010187076 (GOGGIN RAYMOND [IE], et al) | Examination | US6000280 | US2004061579 | by applicant | US6788175 | US2011140570 |