EP2752068 - COMMUNICATION TERMINAL, COMMUNICATION METHOD, COMMUNICATION SYSTEM, AND PROGRAM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.07.2020 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.10.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.04.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | [2014/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AKIYOSHI, Ippei c/o NEC CORPORATION 7-1 Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | 02 /
MIZUKOSHI, Yasuhiro c/o NEC CORPORATION 7-1 Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | 03 /
ITOH, Nobuhiko c/o NEC CORPORATION 7-1 Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | [2014/28] | Representative(s) | MacDougall, Alan John Shaw, et al Mathys & Squire The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/28] | MacDougall, Alan John Shaw, et al Mathys & Squire LLP The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | Application number, filing date | 12828223.3 | 31.08.2012 | WO2012JP05524 | Priority number, date | JP20110190294 | 01.09.2011 Original published format: JP 2011190294 | [2014/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013031233 | Date: | 07.03.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2752068 | Date: | 09.07.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.03.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 07.03.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.07.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H04W76/10, // H04L12/24, H04L12/721, H04L12/741, H04W8/26 | [2019/41] | CPC: |
H04L41/00 (EP,US);
H04L45/745 (EP,US);
H04L41/40 (EP);
H04L45/38 (US);
H04L61/25 (US);
H04L61/50 (US);
|
Former IPC [2015/32] | H04W76/02, // H04L12/24, H04L12/721, H04L12/741, H04W8/26 | ||
Former IPC [2014/28] | H04W76/02, H04W12/08, H04W36/14 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/28] | Title | German: | KOMMUNIKATIONSENDGERÄT, KOMMUNIKATIONSVERFAHREN, KOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM UND PROGRAMM | [2014/28] | English: | COMMUNICATION TERMINAL, COMMUNICATION METHOD, COMMUNICATION SYSTEM, AND PROGRAM | [2014/28] | French: | TERMINAL DE COMMUNICATION, PROCÉDÉ DE COMMUNICATION, SYSTÈME DE COMMUNICATION, ET PROGRAMME | [2014/28] | Entry into regional phase | 20.03.2014 | National basic fee paid | 20.03.2014 | Search fee paid | 20.03.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.03.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.03.2014 | Examination requested [2014/28] | 03.02.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.04.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.09.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.10.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.02.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/33] | 26.03.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2020/33] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.04.2018 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2008002686 (VALLI JYRKI [FI], et al) [Y] 6,10,19,23 * abstract * * paragraphs [0001] , [0002] , [0094] - [0100] ** figure 2 *; | [XYI]US2010208698 (LU GUANG [CA], et al) [X] 1,7-9,14,20-22,27,28 * abstract * * paragraphs [0004] - [0006] - [0008] , [0025] , [0027] - [0030] - [0 36] , [0041] , [0042] , [0055] , [0068] , [0073] , [0089] - [0097] * * figures 2, 3, 9, 10 * [Y] 2,6,10,15,19,23 [I] 3-5,11-13,16-18,24-26; | [I]US2011171953 (FACCIN STEFANO [US], et al) [I] 1,14,27,28 * abstract * * paragraphs [0001] - [0011] - [ 224] - [0233] - [0240] - [0249] *; | [X] - LOUREIRO P ET AL, "Policy routing architecture for IP flow mobility in 3GPP's Evolved Packet Core", GLOBECOM WORKSHOPS (GC WKSHPS), 2010 IEEE, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20101206), ISBN 978-1-4244-8863-6, pages 2000 - 2005, XP031859190 [X] 1,14,27,28 * abstract * * sections I, IV.B, V * * figures 1, 3, 5 * | [YA] - CATT, "Pseudo-CR on ANDSF IP address provision in the PCO", 3GPP DRAFT; C1-084761_ANDSF IP ADDRESS PROVISION IN THE PCO_TS24.301, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20081103), no. Shanghai, P.R. China; 20081103, XP050309760 [Y] 2,15 * page 1, sections 1 and 2 * * page 1, section 5.5.1.1, line 5 * * page 4, section 6.5.1.2, lines 11 to 13 * [A] 1,14,27,28 | International search | [X]JP2008098937 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP); | [A]JP2011139430 (NCR CORP) | by applicant | US2008002686 | WO2008095010 | US2010208698 | US2011171953 | JP2011190294 | - "Policy routing architecture for IP flow mobility in 3GPP's Evolved Packet Core", LOUREIRO P ET AL., GLOBECOM WORKSHOPS (GC WKSHPS, IEEE, (20101206), pages 2000 - 2005 | - MCKEOWN, NICK, OPENFLOW: ENABLING INNOVATION IN CAMPUS NETWORKS, (20110816), URL: http://www.openflowswitch.org/documents/openflow-wp-latest.pdf | - OPENFLOW SWITCH SPECIFICATION, (20110816), URL: http://www.openflowswitch.org/documents/openflow-spec-vl. 1.0.pdf |