EP2686906 - LOW SIDELOBE REFLECTOR ANTENNA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.12.2020 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 10.01.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.08.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.11.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CommScope Technologies LLC 1100 CommScope Place SE Hickory, NC 28602 / US | [2015/21] |
Former [2014/04] | For all designated states Andrew LLC 1100 CommScope Place SE Hickory, NC 28602 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SIMMS, Stephen Flat K 12 Fulmer Dr. Dunfermline Fife KY11 8JY / GB | 02 /
BRANDAU, Ronald 14613 W. 163rd St. Homer Glen, Illinois 60491 / US | 03 /
SYED, Junaid 16 sandwell Cresent Kircaldy Fife KY1 1GH / GB | 04 /
COLE, Douglas John Viewfield House Gairneyburn Lane Powmill Dollar Fife FK14 7PW / GB | 05 /
HILLS, Christopher 11 Liverton Dr. Glenrothes Fife KY6 3PA / GB | [2014/04] | Representative(s) | Maikowski & Ninnemann Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 15 09 20 10671 Berlin / DE | [2020/07] |
Former [2014/04] | Schröder, Christoph, et al Patentanwälte Maikowski & Ninnemann Postfach 150920 10671 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 12828814.9 | 11.06.2012 | [2020/07] | WO2012US41884 | Priority number, date | US201113224066 | 01.09.2011 Original published format: US201113224066 | US201113229829 | 12.09.2011 Original published format: US201113229829 | [2014/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013032557 | Date: | 07.03.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2686906 | Date: | 22.01.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.03.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2686906 | Date: | 12.02.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 07.03.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.11.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H01Q15/16, H01Q19/10, H01Q19/13, H01Q1/42, H01Q17/00, H01Q19/02 | [2014/51] | CPC: |
H01Q17/001 (EP,US);
H01Q19/10 (KR);
H01Q1/42 (EP,US);
H01Q15/16 (KR);
H01Q19/026 (EP,US);
H01Q19/134 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49016 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2014/04] | H01Q15/16, H01Q19/10 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/04] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | REFLEKTORANTENNE MIT NIEDRIGEN NEBENKEULEN | [2014/04] | English: | LOW SIDELOBE REFLECTOR ANTENNA | [2014/04] | French: | ANTENNE À RÉFLECTEUR À LOBES SECONDAIRES FAIBLES | [2014/04] | Entry into regional phase | 18.10.2013 | National basic fee paid | 18.10.2013 | Search fee paid | 18.10.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.10.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.10.2013 | Examination requested [2014/04] | 28.05.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.11.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.05.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.08.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.12.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 19.12.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.12.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.11.2018 | Opposition(s) | 13.11.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 11.06.2012 | AL | 12.02.2020 | AT | 12.02.2020 | CY | 12.02.2020 | CZ | 12.02.2020 | DK | 12.02.2020 | EE | 12.02.2020 | ES | 12.02.2020 | FI | 12.02.2020 | HR | 12.02.2020 | IT | 12.02.2020 | LT | 12.02.2020 | LV | 12.02.2020 | MC | 12.02.2020 | MK | 12.02.2020 | MT | 12.02.2020 | NL | 12.02.2020 | PL | 12.02.2020 | RO | 12.02.2020 | RS | 12.02.2020 | SI | 12.02.2020 | SK | 12.02.2020 | SM | 12.02.2020 | TR | 12.02.2020 | BG | 12.05.2020 | NO | 12.05.2020 | GR | 13.05.2020 | GB | 11.06.2020 | IE | 11.06.2020 | LU | 11.06.2020 | IS | 12.06.2020 | BE | 30.06.2020 | CH | 30.06.2020 | LI | 30.06.2020 | PT | 05.07.2020 | [2022/31] |
Former [2022/30] | HU | 11.06.2012 | |
AL | 12.02.2020 | ||
AT | 12.02.2020 | ||
CY | 12.02.2020 | ||
CZ | 12.02.2020 | ||
DK | 12.02.2020 | ||
EE | 12.02.2020 | ||
ES | 12.02.2020 | ||
FI | 12.02.2020 | ||
HR | 12.02.2020 | ||
IT | 12.02.2020 | ||
LT | 12.02.2020 | ||
LV | 12.02.2020 | ||
MC | 12.02.2020 | ||
MT | 12.02.2020 | ||
NL | 12.02.2020 | ||
PL | 12.02.2020 | ||
RO | 12.02.2020 | ||
RS | 12.02.2020 | ||
SI | 12.02.2020 | ||
SK | 12.02.2020 | ||
SM | 12.02.2020 | ||
TR | 12.02.2020 | ||
BG | 12.05.2020 | ||
NO | 12.05.2020 | ||
GR | 13.05.2020 | ||
GB | 11.06.2020 | ||
IE | 11.06.2020 | ||
LU | 11.06.2020 | ||
IS | 12.06.2020 | ||
BE | 30.06.2020 | ||
CH | 30.06.2020 | ||
LI | 30.06.2020 | ||
PT | 05.07.2020 | ||
Former [2022/27] | HU | 11.06.2012 | |
AT | 12.02.2020 | ||
CY | 12.02.2020 | ||
CZ | 12.02.2020 | ||
DK | 12.02.2020 | ||
EE | 12.02.2020 | ||
ES | 12.02.2020 | ||
FI | 12.02.2020 | ||
HR | 12.02.2020 | ||
IT | 12.02.2020 | ||
LT | 12.02.2020 | ||
LV | 12.02.2020 | ||
MC | 12.02.2020 | ||
MT | 12.02.2020 | ||
NL | 12.02.2020 | ||
PL | 12.02.2020 | ||
RO | 12.02.2020 | ||
RS | 12.02.2020 | ||
SI | 12.02.2020 | ||
SK | 12.02.2020 | ||
SM | 12.02.2020 | ||
TR | 12.02.2020 | ||
BG | 12.05.2020 | ||
NO | 12.05.2020 | ||
GR | 13.05.2020 | ||
GB | 11.06.2020 | ||
IE | 11.06.2020 | ||
LU | 11.06.2020 | ||
IS | 12.06.2020 | ||
BE | 30.06.2020 | ||
CH | 30.06.2020 | ||
LI | 30.06.2020 | ||
PT | 05.07.2020 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AT | 12.02.2020 | |
CZ | 12.02.2020 | ||
DK | 12.02.2020 | ||
EE | 12.02.2020 | ||
ES | 12.02.2020 | ||
FI | 12.02.2020 | ||
HR | 12.02.2020 | ||
IT | 12.02.2020 | ||
LT | 12.02.2020 | ||
LV | 12.02.2020 | ||
MC | 12.02.2020 | ||
NL | 12.02.2020 | ||
PL | 12.02.2020 | ||
RO | 12.02.2020 | ||
RS | 12.02.2020 | ||
SI | 12.02.2020 | ||
SK | 12.02.2020 | ||
SM | 12.02.2020 | ||
TR | 12.02.2020 | ||
BG | 12.05.2020 | ||
NO | 12.05.2020 | ||
GR | 13.05.2020 | ||
GB | 11.06.2020 | ||
IE | 11.06.2020 | ||
LU | 11.06.2020 | ||
IS | 12.06.2020 | ||
BE | 30.06.2020 | ||
CH | 30.06.2020 | ||
LI | 30.06.2020 | ||
PT | 05.07.2020 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AT | 12.02.2020 | |
CZ | 12.02.2020 | ||
DK | 12.02.2020 | ||
EE | 12.02.2020 | ||
ES | 12.02.2020 | ||
FI | 12.02.2020 | ||
HR | 12.02.2020 | ||
IT | 12.02.2020 | ||
LT | 12.02.2020 | ||
LV | 12.02.2020 | ||
MC | 12.02.2020 | ||
NL | 12.02.2020 | ||
PL | 12.02.2020 | ||
RO | 12.02.2020 | ||
RS | 12.02.2020 | ||
SI | 12.02.2020 | ||
SK | 12.02.2020 | ||
SM | 12.02.2020 | ||
BG | 12.05.2020 | ||
NO | 12.05.2020 | ||
GR | 13.05.2020 | ||
GB | 11.06.2020 | ||
IE | 11.06.2020 | ||
LU | 11.06.2020 | ||
IS | 12.06.2020 | ||
BE | 30.06.2020 | ||
CH | 30.06.2020 | ||
LI | 30.06.2020 | ||
PT | 05.07.2020 | ||
Former [2021/22] | AT | 12.02.2020 | |
CZ | 12.02.2020 | ||
DK | 12.02.2020 | ||
EE | 12.02.2020 | ||
ES | 12.02.2020 | ||
FI | 12.02.2020 | ||
HR | 12.02.2020 | ||
IT | 12.02.2020 | ||
LT | 12.02.2020 | ||
LV | 12.02.2020 | ||
MC | 12.02.2020 | ||
NL | 12.02.2020 | ||
PL | 12.02.2020 | ||
RO | 12.02.2020 | ||
RS | 12.02.2020 | ||
SI | 12.02.2020 | ||
SK | 12.02.2020 | ||
SM | 12.02.2020 | ||
BG | 12.05.2020 | ||
NO | 12.05.2020 | ||
GR | 13.05.2020 | ||
GB | 11.06.2020 | ||
IE | 11.06.2020 | ||
LU | 11.06.2020 | ||
IS | 12.06.2020 | ||
CH | 30.06.2020 | ||
LI | 30.06.2020 | ||
PT | 05.07.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | AT | 12.02.2020 | |
CZ | 12.02.2020 | ||
DK | 12.02.2020 | ||
EE | 12.02.2020 | ||
ES | 12.02.2020 | ||
FI | 12.02.2020 | ||
HR | 12.02.2020 | ||
IT | 12.02.2020 | ||
LT | 12.02.2020 | ||
LV | 12.02.2020 | ||
MC | 12.02.2020 | ||
NL | 12.02.2020 | ||
PL | 12.02.2020 | ||
RO | 12.02.2020 | ||
RS | 12.02.2020 | ||
SI | 12.02.2020 | ||
SK | 12.02.2020 | ||
SM | 12.02.2020 | ||
BG | 12.05.2020 | ||
NO | 12.05.2020 | ||
GR | 13.05.2020 | ||
IE | 11.06.2020 | ||
LU | 11.06.2020 | ||
IS | 12.06.2020 | ||
CH | 30.06.2020 | ||
LI | 30.06.2020 | ||
PT | 05.07.2020 | ||
Former [2021/15] | AT | 12.02.2020 | |
CZ | 12.02.2020 | ||
DK | 12.02.2020 | ||
EE | 12.02.2020 | ||
ES | 12.02.2020 | ||
FI | 12.02.2020 | ||
HR | 12.02.2020 | ||
IT | 12.02.2020 | ||
LT | 12.02.2020 | ||
LV | 12.02.2020 | ||
MC | 12.02.2020 | ||
NL | 12.02.2020 | ||
PL | 12.02.2020 | ||
RO | 12.02.2020 | ||
RS | 12.02.2020 | ||
SI | 12.02.2020 | ||
SK | 12.02.2020 | ||
SM | 12.02.2020 | ||
BG | 12.05.2020 | ||
NO | 12.05.2020 | ||
GR | 13.05.2020 | ||
LU | 11.06.2020 | ||
IS | 12.06.2020 | ||
PT | 05.07.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AT | 12.02.2020 | |
CZ | 12.02.2020 | ||
DK | 12.02.2020 | ||
EE | 12.02.2020 | ||
ES | 12.02.2020 | ||
FI | 12.02.2020 | ||
HR | 12.02.2020 | ||
IT | 12.02.2020 | ||
LT | 12.02.2020 | ||
LV | 12.02.2020 | ||
MC | 12.02.2020 | ||
NL | 12.02.2020 | ||
PL | 12.02.2020 | ||
RO | 12.02.2020 | ||
RS | 12.02.2020 | ||
SI | 12.02.2020 | ||
SK | 12.02.2020 | ||
SM | 12.02.2020 | ||
BG | 12.05.2020 | ||
NO | 12.05.2020 | ||
GR | 13.05.2020 | ||
IS | 12.06.2020 | ||
PT | 05.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | CZ | 12.02.2020 | |
DK | 12.02.2020 | ||
EE | 12.02.2020 | ||
ES | 12.02.2020 | ||
FI | 12.02.2020 | ||
HR | 12.02.2020 | ||
LT | 12.02.2020 | ||
LV | 12.02.2020 | ||
NL | 12.02.2020 | ||
RO | 12.02.2020 | ||
RS | 12.02.2020 | ||
SK | 12.02.2020 | ||
SM | 12.02.2020 | ||
BG | 12.05.2020 | ||
NO | 12.05.2020 | ||
GR | 13.05.2020 | ||
IS | 12.06.2020 | ||
PT | 05.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/49] | CZ | 12.02.2020 | |
DK | 12.02.2020 | ||
ES | 12.02.2020 | ||
FI | 12.02.2020 | ||
HR | 12.02.2020 | ||
LT | 12.02.2020 | ||
LV | 12.02.2020 | ||
NL | 12.02.2020 | ||
RO | 12.02.2020 | ||
RS | 12.02.2020 | ||
SK | 12.02.2020 | ||
SM | 12.02.2020 | ||
BG | 12.05.2020 | ||
NO | 12.05.2020 | ||
GR | 13.05.2020 | ||
IS | 12.06.2020 | ||
PT | 05.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | DK | 12.02.2020 | |
ES | 12.02.2020 | ||
FI | 12.02.2020 | ||
HR | 12.02.2020 | ||
LT | 12.02.2020 | ||
LV | 12.02.2020 | ||
NL | 12.02.2020 | ||
RO | 12.02.2020 | ||
RS | 12.02.2020 | ||
SM | 12.02.2020 | ||
BG | 12.05.2020 | ||
NO | 12.05.2020 | ||
GR | 13.05.2020 | ||
IS | 12.06.2020 | ||
PT | 05.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | DK | 12.02.2020 | |
ES | 12.02.2020 | ||
FI | 12.02.2020 | ||
HR | 12.02.2020 | ||
LT | 12.02.2020 | ||
LV | 12.02.2020 | ||
NL | 12.02.2020 | ||
RS | 12.02.2020 | ||
BG | 12.05.2020 | ||
NO | 12.05.2020 | ||
GR | 13.05.2020 | ||
IS | 12.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/45] | FI | 12.02.2020 | |
HR | 12.02.2020 | ||
LV | 12.02.2020 | ||
NL | 12.02.2020 | ||
RS | 12.02.2020 | ||
BG | 12.05.2020 | ||
NO | 12.05.2020 | ||
GR | 13.05.2020 | ||
IS | 12.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/40] | FI | 12.02.2020 | |
HR | 12.02.2020 | ||
LV | 12.02.2020 | ||
RS | 12.02.2020 | ||
BG | 12.05.2020 | ||
NO | 12.05.2020 | ||
GR | 13.05.2020 | ||
IS | 12.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/39] | FI | 12.02.2020 | |
HR | 12.02.2020 | ||
LV | 12.02.2020 | ||
RS | 12.02.2020 | ||
BG | 12.05.2020 | ||
NO | 12.05.2020 | ||
GR | 13.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/38] | FI | 12.02.2020 | |
HR | 12.02.2020 | ||
LV | 12.02.2020 | ||
RS | 12.02.2020 | ||
NO | 12.05.2020 | ||
GR | 13.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | FI | 12.02.2020 | |
HR | 12.02.2020 | ||
LV | 12.02.2020 | ||
RS | 12.02.2020 | ||
NO | 12.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | FI | 12.02.2020 | |
NO | 12.05.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE8218480U (SIEMENS AG) [A] 10,11* page 4, line 5 - page 5, line 13; figure 2; claim 4 *; | [Y]US2002008670 (SHARMAN DAVID SEYMOUR [US]) [Y] 1-15 * paragraphs [0023] , [0024] , [0025]; figures 3,7 *; | [A]US2005062663 (HILLS CHRIS [GB]) [A] 3-9 * paragraphs [0054] - [0061]; figures 4,5,8 *; | [Y]WO2011073844 (HILLS CHRIS [GB], et al) [Y] 1-15 * page 7, line 19 - page 10, line 17 * * page 14, lines 6-20; figures 1,3,5,7 *; | [Y]WO2011085650 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN], et al) [Y] 1-15 * the whole document * | International search | [A]US5973652 (SANFORD JOHN R [US], et al); | [A]US2002008670 (SHARMAN DAVID SEYMOUR [US]); | [A]US2005007288 (TUAU DENIS [FR], et al); | [A]US2005017916 (LEWRY MATTHEW [GB], et al) | Examination | US2001005180 | US2005017916 | by applicant | DE8218480U | US2002008670 | US2005062663 | US6919855 | WO2011073844 | WO2011085650 |