EP2747691 - SYSTEM FOR LOCATING AND IDENTIFYING FUNCTIONAL NERVES INNERVATING WALL OF ARTERIES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2014/27] | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR LOCATING AND IDENTIFYING FUNCTIONAL NERVES INNERVATING WALL OF ARTERIES AND CATHETERS FOR SAME | ||
[2019/18] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.08.2020 Database last updated on 18.05.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 06.09.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.04.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.10.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SYMAP MEDICAL (SUZHOU) LTD Unit 601, Building B3 218 Xinghu Street Suzhou Industrial Park Suzhou, Jiangsu 215123 / CN | [2019/41] |
Former [2018/14] | For all designated states SYMAP MEDICAL (SUZHOU) LTD Unit 601, Building B3 218 Xinghu Street Suzhou Industrial Park Suzhou, Jiangsu 215123 / CN | ||
Former [2014/27] | For all designated states Symap Holding Limited OMC Chambers, wickhams Cay 1 Road Town Tortola / VG | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WANG, Jie 329 Casper Road Englewood Cliffs, NJ 07632 / US | [2014/27] | Representative(s) | PGA S.p.A., Milano, Succursale di Lugano Via Castagnola, 21c 6900 Lugano / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2019/41] | Sutto, Luca PGA S.P.A., Milano Succursale di Lugano Via Castagnola, 21c 6900 Lugano / CH | ||
Former [2014/27] | Lecca, Patricia S. Cabinet Lecca 21 rue de Fécamp 75012 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 12828954.3 | 24.08.2012 | [2019/41] | WO2012IB54310 | Priority number, date | US201161527893P | 26.08.2011 Original published format: US 201161527893 P | US201261609565P | 12.03.2012 Original published format: US 201261609565 P | [2014/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013030743 | Date: | 07.03.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2747691 | Date: | 02.07.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.03.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2747691 | Date: | 09.10.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 07.03.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.07.2015 | Classification | IPC: | A61B18/14, A61B5/00, A61N1/36, A61B5/0205, A61B5/04, A61B5/20, A61B18/00, A61B18/18 | [2015/34] | CPC: |
A61B18/1492 (EP,RU,US);
A61B18/14 (RU);
A61B18/24 (US);
A61B5/0036 (EP,RU,US);
A61B5/0205 (EP,US);
A61B5/0215 (US);
A61B5/201 (EP,US);
A61B5/24 (US);
A61B5/4833 (EP,US);
A61B5/4836 (US);
A61B5/4893 (EP,US);
A61B5/6852 (US);
A61B5/6853 (US);
A61N7/02 (US);
G16Z99/00 (EP,RU,US);
A61B18/18 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00404 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00434 (EP,RU,US);
A61B2018/00505 (US);
A61B2018/00511 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00577 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00642 (US);
A61B2018/00708 (US);
A61B2018/00791 (US);
A61B2018/00839 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00875 (US);
A61B2018/0212 (RU);
A61B5/024 (US);
A61B5/0538 (US);
A61N1/36117 (EP,US);
A61N2007/003 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2014/27] | A61B18/14, A61B5/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/27] | Title | German: | SYSTEM ZUR ORTUNG UND IDENTIFIZIERUNG VON EINE ARTERIENWAND INNERVIERENDEN FUNKTIONELLEN NERVEN | [2019/18] | English: | SYSTEM FOR LOCATING AND IDENTIFYING FUNCTIONAL NERVES INNERVATING WALL OF ARTERIES | [2019/18] | French: | SYSTÈME POUR LOCALISER ET IDENTIFIER DES NERFS FONCTIONNELS INNERVANT UNE PAROI D'ARTÈRES | [2019/18] |
Former [2014/27] | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR ORTUNG UND IDENTIFIZIERUNG VON EINE ARTERIENWAND INNERVIERENDEN FUNKTIONELLEN NERVEN UND KATHETER DAFÜR | ||
Former [2014/27] | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR LOCATING AND IDENTIFYING FUNCTIONAL NERVES INNERVATING WALL OF ARTERIES AND CATHETERS FOR SAME | ||
Former [2014/27] | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ POUR LOCALISER ET IDENTIFIER DES NERFS FONCTIONNELS INNERVANT UNE PAROI D'ARTÈRES ET CATHÉTERS CORRESPONDANTS | Entry into regional phase | 24.03.2014 | National basic fee paid | 24.03.2014 | Search fee paid | 24.03.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.03.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.03.2014 | Examination requested [2014/27] | 04.02.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.10.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.01.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.04.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.08.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 22.08.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.08.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP19201983.4 / EP3659537 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.10.2018 | Opposition(s) | 10.07.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 24.08.2012 | AL | 09.10.2019 | AT | 09.10.2019 | CY | 09.10.2019 | CZ | 09.10.2019 | DK | 09.10.2019 | EE | 09.10.2019 | FI | 09.10.2019 | HR | 09.10.2019 | LT | 09.10.2019 | LV | 09.10.2019 | MC | 09.10.2019 | MK | 09.10.2019 | MT | 09.10.2019 | NL | 09.10.2019 | PL | 09.10.2019 | RO | 09.10.2019 | RS | 09.10.2019 | SE | 09.10.2019 | SI | 09.10.2019 | SK | 09.10.2019 | SM | 09.10.2019 | TR | 09.10.2019 | BG | 09.01.2020 | NO | 09.01.2020 | GR | 10.01.2020 | IS | 09.02.2020 | PT | 10.02.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 24.08.2012 | |
AL | 09.10.2019 | ||
AT | 09.10.2019 | ||
CY | 09.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 09.10.2019 | ||
DK | 09.10.2019 | ||
EE | 09.10.2019 | ||
FI | 09.10.2019 | ||
HR | 09.10.2019 | ||
LT | 09.10.2019 | ||
LV | 09.10.2019 | ||
MC | 09.10.2019 | ||
MT | 09.10.2019 | ||
NL | 09.10.2019 | ||
PL | 09.10.2019 | ||
RO | 09.10.2019 | ||
RS | 09.10.2019 | ||
SE | 09.10.2019 | ||
SI | 09.10.2019 | ||
SK | 09.10.2019 | ||
SM | 09.10.2019 | ||
TR | 09.10.2019 | ||
BG | 09.01.2020 | ||
NO | 09.01.2020 | ||
GR | 10.01.2020 | ||
IS | 09.02.2020 | ||
PT | 10.02.2020 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AL | 09.10.2019 | |
AT | 09.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 09.10.2019 | ||
DK | 09.10.2019 | ||
EE | 09.10.2019 | ||
FI | 09.10.2019 | ||
HR | 09.10.2019 | ||
LT | 09.10.2019 | ||
LV | 09.10.2019 | ||
MC | 09.10.2019 | ||
NL | 09.10.2019 | ||
PL | 09.10.2019 | ||
RO | 09.10.2019 | ||
RS | 09.10.2019 | ||
SE | 09.10.2019 | ||
SI | 09.10.2019 | ||
SK | 09.10.2019 | ||
SM | 09.10.2019 | ||
TR | 09.10.2019 | ||
BG | 09.01.2020 | ||
NO | 09.01.2020 | ||
GR | 10.01.2020 | ||
IS | 09.02.2020 | ||
PT | 10.02.2020 | ||
Former [2021/18] | AL | 09.10.2019 | |
AT | 09.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 09.10.2019 | ||
DK | 09.10.2019 | ||
EE | 09.10.2019 | ||
FI | 09.10.2019 | ||
HR | 09.10.2019 | ||
LT | 09.10.2019 | ||
LV | 09.10.2019 | ||
MC | 09.10.2019 | ||
NL | 09.10.2019 | ||
PL | 09.10.2019 | ||
RO | 09.10.2019 | ||
RS | 09.10.2019 | ||
SE | 09.10.2019 | ||
SI | 09.10.2019 | ||
SK | 09.10.2019 | ||
SM | 09.10.2019 | ||
BG | 09.01.2020 | ||
NO | 09.01.2020 | ||
GR | 10.01.2020 | ||
IS | 09.02.2020 | ||
PT | 10.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | AL | 09.10.2019 | |
AT | 09.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 09.10.2019 | ||
DK | 09.10.2019 | ||
EE | 09.10.2019 | ||
FI | 09.10.2019 | ||
HR | 09.10.2019 | ||
LT | 09.10.2019 | ||
LV | 09.10.2019 | ||
NL | 09.10.2019 | ||
PL | 09.10.2019 | ||
RO | 09.10.2019 | ||
RS | 09.10.2019 | ||
SE | 09.10.2019 | ||
SI | 09.10.2019 | ||
SK | 09.10.2019 | ||
SM | 09.10.2019 | ||
BG | 09.01.2020 | ||
NO | 09.01.2020 | ||
GR | 10.01.2020 | ||
IS | 09.02.2020 | ||
PT | 10.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 09.10.2019 | |
AT | 09.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 09.10.2019 | ||
DK | 09.10.2019 | ||
EE | 09.10.2019 | ||
FI | 09.10.2019 | ||
HR | 09.10.2019 | ||
LT | 09.10.2019 | ||
LV | 09.10.2019 | ||
NL | 09.10.2019 | ||
PL | 09.10.2019 | ||
RO | 09.10.2019 | ||
RS | 09.10.2019 | ||
SE | 09.10.2019 | ||
SK | 09.10.2019 | ||
SM | 09.10.2019 | ||
BG | 09.01.2020 | ||
NO | 09.01.2020 | ||
GR | 10.01.2020 | ||
IS | 09.02.2020 | ||
PT | 10.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 09.10.2019 | |
AT | 09.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 09.10.2019 | ||
DK | 09.10.2019 | ||
EE | 09.10.2019 | ||
FI | 09.10.2019 | ||
HR | 09.10.2019 | ||
LT | 09.10.2019 | ||
LV | 09.10.2019 | ||
NL | 09.10.2019 | ||
PL | 09.10.2019 | ||
RO | 09.10.2019 | ||
RS | 09.10.2019 | ||
SE | 09.10.2019 | ||
BG | 09.01.2020 | ||
NO | 09.01.2020 | ||
GR | 10.01.2020 | ||
IS | 09.02.2020 | ||
PT | 10.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | AL | 09.10.2019 | |
AT | 09.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 09.10.2019 | ||
FI | 09.10.2019 | ||
HR | 09.10.2019 | ||
LT | 09.10.2019 | ||
LV | 09.10.2019 | ||
NL | 09.10.2019 | ||
PL | 09.10.2019 | ||
RO | 09.10.2019 | ||
RS | 09.10.2019 | ||
SE | 09.10.2019 | ||
BG | 09.01.2020 | ||
NO | 09.01.2020 | ||
GR | 10.01.2020 | ||
PT | 10.02.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/32] | AL | 09.10.2019 | |
AT | 09.10.2019 | ||
FI | 09.10.2019 | ||
HR | 09.10.2019 | ||
LT | 09.10.2019 | ||
LV | 09.10.2019 | ||
NL | 09.10.2019 | ||
PL | 09.10.2019 | ||
RS | 09.10.2019 | ||
SE | 09.10.2019 | ||
BG | 09.01.2020 | ||
NO | 09.01.2020 | ||
GR | 10.01.2020 | ||
PT | 10.02.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AT | 09.10.2019 | |
FI | 09.10.2019 | ||
HR | 09.10.2019 | ||
LT | 09.10.2019 | ||
LV | 09.10.2019 | ||
NL | 09.10.2019 | ||
PL | 09.10.2019 | ||
RS | 09.10.2019 | ||
SE | 09.10.2019 | ||
BG | 09.01.2020 | ||
NO | 09.01.2020 | ||
GR | 10.01.2020 | ||
PT | 10.02.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | AT | 09.10.2019 | |
FI | 09.10.2019 | ||
LT | 09.10.2019 | ||
LV | 09.10.2019 | ||
NL | 09.10.2019 | ||
PL | 09.10.2019 | ||
SE | 09.10.2019 | ||
BG | 09.01.2020 | ||
NO | 09.01.2020 | ||
GR | 10.01.2020 | ||
PT | 10.02.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | AT | 09.10.2019 | |
FI | 09.10.2019 | ||
LT | 09.10.2019 | ||
LV | 09.10.2019 | ||
NL | 09.10.2019 | ||
PL | 09.10.2019 | ||
SE | 09.10.2019 | ||
BG | 09.01.2020 | ||
NO | 09.01.2020 | ||
GR | 10.01.2020 | ||
PT | 10.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | FI | 09.10.2019 | |
LT | 09.10.2019 | ||
NL | 09.10.2019 | ||
SE | 09.10.2019 | ||
BG | 09.01.2020 | ||
NO | 09.01.2020 | ||
PT | 10.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/21] | NL | 09.10.2019 | |
NO | 09.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/20] | NL | 09.10.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]US2005033137 (ORAL HAKAN [US], et al) [Y] 3 * paragraph [0050]; figure -; claim - * [A] 1,2,4-14; | [A]US2005149132 (LIBBUS IMAD [US]) [A] 1-14 * paragraphs [0044] - [0046]; figure -; claim - *; | [IY]WO2006041881 (ARDIAN INC [US], et al) [I] 1,2,4-14 * paragraphs [0038] , [0039] , [0049] , [0098] - [0100] - [0043] , [0083] - [0094]; figure -; claim - * [Y] 3; | [A]WO2006044694 (PALO ALTO INVESTORS [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * page 49, lines 23-32; figure -; claim - *; | [A]WO2010051480 (MEDTRONIC INC [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [A]JP2011505193 (ST JUDE ET AL) [A] 1-14* the whole document * | International search | [X]WO2006041881 (ARDIAN INC [US], et al); | [X]CN101610735 (ARDIAN INC [US]); | [X]CN201469401U (XIAOQING LIU, et al); | [XP]US2011306851 (WANG JIE [US]) | by applicant | WO2006041881 | US2011306851 | - Medical devices, (20120222), pages 1 - 2 |