EP2753337 - COMPOSITIONS INCLUDING BETA-GLUCANS AND METHODS OF USE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.06.2019 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 20.07.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.03.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.03.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.10.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, MK | published on 05.08.2020 [2020/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Biothera, Inc. 3388 Mike Collins Drive Eagan, MN 55121 / US | [2014/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GORDEN, Keith B. 9345 Lake Road Woodbury Minnesota 55125 / US | 02 /
BOSE, Nandita 4390 Merrimac Lane Plymouth Minnesota 55446 / US | 03 /
CHAN, Anissa S.H. 4354 Arden View Court Arden Hills Minnesota 55112 / US | 04 /
GROSSMAN, William J. 208 Mainsail Drive Third Lake Illinois 60030 / US | [2014/29] | Representative(s) | Potter Clarkson Chapel Quarter Mount Street Nottingham NG1 6HQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2018/34] | Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | ||
Former [2014/29] | Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham, NG1 5GG / GB | Application number, filing date | 12829310.7 | 07.09.2012 | [2018/34] | WO2012US54071 | Priority number, date | US201161532647P | 09.09.2011 Original published format: US 201161532647 P | [2014/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013036712 | Date: | 14.03.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2753337 | Date: | 16.07.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.03.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2753337 | Date: | 22.08.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 14.03.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.01.2015 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/716, A61K39/39, A61K39/00, // A61P37/04 | [2017/45] | CPC: |
A61K39/39 (EP,US);
A61K31/4738 (EP,US);
A61K31/7084 (EP,US);
A61K31/716 (EP,US);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P37/04 (EP);
A61K2039/55511 (EP,US);
A61K2039/55561 (EP,US);
A61K2039/55572 (EP,US);
A61K2039/55583 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A61K31/4738, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/7084, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/716, A61K2300/00 (US,EP)
|
Former IPC [2014/29] | A61K31/716, A61K39/39 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/29] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN MIT BETA-GLUCANEN UND VERWENDUNGSVERFAHREN | [2014/29] | English: | COMPOSITIONS INCLUDING BETA-GLUCANS AND METHODS OF USE | [2014/29] | French: | COMPOSITIONS COMPRENANT DES BÊTA-GLUCANES ET LEURS PROCÉDÉS D'UTILISATION | [2014/29] | Entry into regional phase | 08.04.2014 | National basic fee paid | 08.04.2014 | Search fee paid | 08.04.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.04.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.04.2014 | Examination requested [2014/29] | 12.08.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.08.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.02.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.10.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.02.2018 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 23.03.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.07.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 11.07.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.07.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP18162621.9 / EP3354319 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.08.2016 | Opposition(s) | 23.05.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 07.09.2012 | AL | 22.08.2018 | AT | 22.08.2018 | CY | 22.08.2018 | CZ | 22.08.2018 | DK | 22.08.2018 | EE | 22.08.2018 | FI | 22.08.2018 | HR | 22.08.2018 | LT | 22.08.2018 | LV | 22.08.2018 | MC | 22.08.2018 | MK | 22.08.2018 | NL | 22.08.2018 | PL | 22.08.2018 | PT | 22.08.2018 | RO | 22.08.2018 | RS | 22.08.2018 | SE | 22.08.2018 | SI | 22.08.2018 | SK | 22.08.2018 | SM | 22.08.2018 | TR | 22.08.2018 | LU | 07.09.2018 | MT | 07.09.2018 | BE | 30.09.2018 | CH | 30.09.2018 | LI | 30.09.2018 | BG | 22.11.2018 | NO | 22.11.2018 | GR | 23.11.2018 | IS | 22.12.2018 | [2020/31] |
Former [2020/28] | HU | 07.09.2012 | |
AL | 22.08.2018 | ||
AT | 22.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 22.08.2018 | ||
DK | 22.08.2018 | ||
EE | 22.08.2018 | ||
FI | 22.08.2018 | ||
HR | 22.08.2018 | ||
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LV | 22.08.2018 | ||
MC | 22.08.2018 | ||
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
PL | 22.08.2018 | ||
PT | 22.08.2018 | ||
RO | 22.08.2018 | ||
RS | 22.08.2018 | ||
SE | 22.08.2018 | ||
SI | 22.08.2018 | ||
SK | 22.08.2018 | ||
SM | 22.08.2018 | ||
TR | 22.08.2018 | ||
LU | 07.09.2018 | ||
MT | 07.09.2018 | ||
BE | 30.09.2018 | ||
CH | 30.09.2018 | ||
LI | 30.09.2018 | ||
BG | 22.11.2018 | ||
NO | 22.11.2018 | ||
GR | 23.11.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 22.08.2018 | |
AT | 22.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 22.08.2018 | ||
DK | 22.08.2018 | ||
EE | 22.08.2018 | ||
FI | 22.08.2018 | ||
HR | 22.08.2018 | ||
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LV | 22.08.2018 | ||
MC | 22.08.2018 | ||
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
PL | 22.08.2018 | ||
RO | 22.08.2018 | ||
RS | 22.08.2018 | ||
SE | 22.08.2018 | ||
SI | 22.08.2018 | ||
SK | 22.08.2018 | ||
SM | 22.08.2018 | ||
TR | 22.08.2018 | ||
LU | 07.09.2018 | ||
MT | 07.09.2018 | ||
BE | 30.09.2018 | ||
CH | 30.09.2018 | ||
LI | 30.09.2018 | ||
BG | 22.11.2018 | ||
NO | 22.11.2018 | ||
GR | 23.11.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AL | 22.08.2018 | |
AT | 22.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 22.08.2018 | ||
DK | 22.08.2018 | ||
EE | 22.08.2018 | ||
FI | 22.08.2018 | ||
HR | 22.08.2018 | ||
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LV | 22.08.2018 | ||
MC | 22.08.2018 | ||
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
PL | 22.08.2018 | ||
RO | 22.08.2018 | ||
RS | 22.08.2018 | ||
SE | 22.08.2018 | ||
SI | 22.08.2018 | ||
SK | 22.08.2018 | ||
SM | 22.08.2018 | ||
LU | 07.09.2018 | ||
MT | 07.09.2018 | ||
BE | 30.09.2018 | ||
CH | 30.09.2018 | ||
LI | 30.09.2018 | ||
BG | 22.11.2018 | ||
NO | 22.11.2018 | ||
GR | 23.11.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AL | 22.08.2018 | |
AT | 22.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 22.08.2018 | ||
DK | 22.08.2018 | ||
EE | 22.08.2018 | ||
FI | 22.08.2018 | ||
HR | 22.08.2018 | ||
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LV | 22.08.2018 | ||
MC | 22.08.2018 | ||
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
PL | 22.08.2018 | ||
RO | 22.08.2018 | ||
RS | 22.08.2018 | ||
SE | 22.08.2018 | ||
SI | 22.08.2018 | ||
SK | 22.08.2018 | ||
SM | 22.08.2018 | ||
LU | 07.09.2018 | ||
BE | 30.09.2018 | ||
CH | 30.09.2018 | ||
LI | 30.09.2018 | ||
BG | 22.11.2018 | ||
NO | 22.11.2018 | ||
GR | 23.11.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/38] | AL | 22.08.2018 | |
AT | 22.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 22.08.2018 | ||
DK | 22.08.2018 | ||
EE | 22.08.2018 | ||
FI | 22.08.2018 | ||
HR | 22.08.2018 | ||
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LV | 22.08.2018 | ||
MC | 22.08.2018 | ||
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
PL | 22.08.2018 | ||
RO | 22.08.2018 | ||
RS | 22.08.2018 | ||
SE | 22.08.2018 | ||
SI | 22.08.2018 | ||
SK | 22.08.2018 | ||
SM | 22.08.2018 | ||
LU | 07.09.2018 | ||
BE | 30.09.2018 | ||
BG | 22.11.2018 | ||
NO | 22.11.2018 | ||
GR | 23.11.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AL | 22.08.2018 | |
AT | 22.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 22.08.2018 | ||
DK | 22.08.2018 | ||
EE | 22.08.2018 | ||
FI | 22.08.2018 | ||
HR | 22.08.2018 | ||
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LV | 22.08.2018 | ||
MC | 22.08.2018 | ||
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
PL | 22.08.2018 | ||
RO | 22.08.2018 | ||
RS | 22.08.2018 | ||
SE | 22.08.2018 | ||
SI | 22.08.2018 | ||
SK | 22.08.2018 | ||
SM | 22.08.2018 | ||
LU | 07.09.2018 | ||
BG | 22.11.2018 | ||
NO | 22.11.2018 | ||
GR | 23.11.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/30] | AL | 22.08.2018 | |
AT | 22.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 22.08.2018 | ||
DK | 22.08.2018 | ||
EE | 22.08.2018 | ||
FI | 22.08.2018 | ||
HR | 22.08.2018 | ||
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LV | 22.08.2018 | ||
MC | 22.08.2018 | ||
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
PL | 22.08.2018 | ||
RO | 22.08.2018 | ||
RS | 22.08.2018 | ||
SE | 22.08.2018 | ||
SK | 22.08.2018 | ||
SM | 22.08.2018 | ||
LU | 07.09.2018 | ||
BG | 22.11.2018 | ||
NO | 22.11.2018 | ||
GR | 23.11.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/28] | AL | 22.08.2018 | |
AT | 22.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 22.08.2018 | ||
DK | 22.08.2018 | ||
EE | 22.08.2018 | ||
FI | 22.08.2018 | ||
HR | 22.08.2018 | ||
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LV | 22.08.2018 | ||
MC | 22.08.2018 | ||
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
PL | 22.08.2018 | ||
RO | 22.08.2018 | ||
RS | 22.08.2018 | ||
SE | 22.08.2018 | ||
SK | 22.08.2018 | ||
SM | 22.08.2018 | ||
BG | 22.11.2018 | ||
NO | 22.11.2018 | ||
GR | 23.11.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 22.08.2018 | |
AT | 22.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 22.08.2018 | ||
DK | 22.08.2018 | ||
EE | 22.08.2018 | ||
FI | 22.08.2018 | ||
HR | 22.08.2018 | ||
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LV | 22.08.2018 | ||
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
PL | 22.08.2018 | ||
RO | 22.08.2018 | ||
RS | 22.08.2018 | ||
SE | 22.08.2018 | ||
SK | 22.08.2018 | ||
SM | 22.08.2018 | ||
BG | 22.11.2018 | ||
NO | 22.11.2018 | ||
GR | 23.11.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/23] | AL | 22.08.2018 | |
AT | 22.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 22.08.2018 | ||
EE | 22.08.2018 | ||
FI | 22.08.2018 | ||
HR | 22.08.2018 | ||
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LV | 22.08.2018 | ||
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
PL | 22.08.2018 | ||
RO | 22.08.2018 | ||
RS | 22.08.2018 | ||
SE | 22.08.2018 | ||
SK | 22.08.2018 | ||
BG | 22.11.2018 | ||
NO | 22.11.2018 | ||
GR | 23.11.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/22] | AL | 22.08.2018 | |
CZ | 22.08.2018 | ||
FI | 22.08.2018 | ||
HR | 22.08.2018 | ||
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LV | 22.08.2018 | ||
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
PL | 22.08.2018 | ||
RO | 22.08.2018 | ||
RS | 22.08.2018 | ||
SE | 22.08.2018 | ||
BG | 22.11.2018 | ||
NO | 22.11.2018 | ||
GR | 23.11.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AL | 22.08.2018 | |
FI | 22.08.2018 | ||
HR | 22.08.2018 | ||
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LV | 22.08.2018 | ||
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
RS | 22.08.2018 | ||
SE | 22.08.2018 | ||
BG | 22.11.2018 | ||
NO | 22.11.2018 | ||
GR | 23.11.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | FI | 22.08.2018 | |
HR | 22.08.2018 | ||
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
RS | 22.08.2018 | ||
SE | 22.08.2018 | ||
BG | 22.11.2018 | ||
NO | 22.11.2018 | ||
GR | 23.11.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | FI | 22.08.2018 | |
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
RS | 22.08.2018 | ||
SE | 22.08.2018 | ||
BG | 22.11.2018 | ||
NO | 22.11.2018 | ||
GR | 23.11.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | FI | 22.08.2018 | |
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
NO | 22.11.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | FI | 22.08.2018 | |
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
NO | 22.11.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/07] | LT | 22.08.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY] - HAIBIN HUANG ET AL, "Distinct Patterns of Dendritic Cell Cytokine Release Stimulated by Fungal -Glucans and Toll-Like Receptor Agonists", INFECTION AND IMMUNITY, AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR MICROBIOLOGY, US, vol. 77, no. 5, doi:10.1128/IAI.00086-09, ISSN 0019-9567, (20090501), pages 1774 - 1781, (20090309), XP007915686 [X] 1 * abstract; last full § of p. 1776; Fig. 4; p. 1776, last full sentence of col. 1 * [Y] 1-15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/IAI.00086-09 | [XY] - SELVARAJ V ET AL, "Adjuvant and immunostimulatory effects of beta-glucan administration in combination with lipopolysaccharide enhances survival and some immune parameters in carp challenged with Aeromonas hydrophila", VETERINARY IMMUNOLOGY AND IMMUNOPATHOLOGY, ELSEVIER BV, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 114, no. 1-2, doi:10.1016/J.VETIMM.2006.06.011, ISSN 0165-2427, (20061115), pages 15 - 24, (20061115), XP024998912 [X] 1,3,4,8-12 * abstract; Fig. 2; * [Y] 1-15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.vetimm.2006.06.011 | [Y] - JUN LI ET AL, "Effects of [beta]-glucan extracted from Saccharomyces cerevisiae on humoral and cellular immunity in weaned piglets", ARCHIVES OF ANIMAL NUTRITION, (20051001), vol. 59, no. 5, doi:10.1080/17450390500247832, ISSN 1745-039X, pages 303 - 312, XP055163111 [Y] 1-15 * abstract; p. 307: section 3.1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1080/17450390500247832 | [Y] - H. T. L. LAI ET AL, "Effects of dust and airborne dust components on antibody responses, body weight gain, and heart morphology of broilers", POULTRY SCIENCE, (20090817), vol. 88, no. 9, doi:10.3382/ps.2009-00129, ISSN 0032-5791, pages 1838 - 1849, XP055163217 [Y] 1-15 * table I; see 1840, col. 1, l. 12 of second § * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.3382/ps.2009-00129 | [Y] - TOKUNAKA K ET AL, "Immunopharmacological and immunotoxicological activities of a water-soluble (1->3)-beta-D-glucan, CSBG from Candida spp", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF IMMUNOPHARMACOLOGY, ELMSFORD,NY, US, (20000501), vol. 22, no. 5, doi:10.1016/S0192-0561(99)00093-4, ISSN 0192-0561, pages 383 - 394, XP002264610 [Y] 1-15 * Fig. 3; p. 387, section 3.2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0192-0561(99)00093-4 | International search | [Y]US6143883 (LEHMANN JOACHIM [US], et al); | [Y]US2004127458 (HUNTER KENNETH W [US], et al); | [Y]US2008160089 (VITIELLO MARIA A [US], et al); | [Y]US2008167268 (YAN JUN [US]); | [Y] - HARNACK ET AL., "Oral administration of a soluble 1-3, 1-6 beta-glucan during prophylactic survivin peptide vaccination diminishes growth of a B cell lymphoma in mice", INTERNATIONAL IMMUNOPHARMACOLOGY, (2009), vol. 9, pages 1298 - 1303, XP026614224 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.intimp.2009.07.013 | Examination | WO2006119395 | - ANA-LUCIA FUENTES ET AL, "Laminarin, a soluble beta-glucan, inhibits macrophage phagocytosis of zymosan but has no effect on lipopolysaccharide mediated augmentation of phagocytosis", INTERNATIONAL IMMUNOPHARMACOLOGY, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 11, no. 11, doi:10.1016/J.INTIMP.2011.08.005, ISSN 1567-5769, (20110803), pages 1939 - 1945, (20110811), XP028326780 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.intimp.2011.08.005 | - Charlotte Sissener Engstad ET AL, "The effect of soluble [beta]-1,3-glucan and lipopolysaccharide on cytokine production and coagulation activation in whole blood", INTERNATIONAL IMMUNOPHARMACOLOGY, NL, (20021001), vol. 2, no. 11, doi:10.1016/S1567-5769(02)00134-0, ISSN 1567-5769, pages 1585 - 1597, XP055295070 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1567-5769(02)00134-0 | - FRASNELLI MATTHIAS E ET AL, "TLR2 modulates inflammation in zymosan-induced arthritis in mice", ARTHRITIS RESEARCH, CURRENT SCIENCE, LONDON, GB, (20050121), vol. 7, no. 2, doi:10.1186/AR1494, ISSN 1465-9905, pages R370 - R379, XP021011575 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1186/ar1494 | - Shunsuke Hida ET AL, "Cell Wall [beta]-Glucan Derived from Candida albicans Acts as a Trigger for Autoimmune Arthritis in SKG Mice", BIOLOGICAL & PHARMACEUTICAL BULLETIN (OF JAPAN), JP, (20070101), vol. 30, no. 8, doi:10.1248/bpb.30.1589, ISSN 0918-6158, pages 1589 - 1592, XP055295192 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1248/bpb.30.1589 |