EP2753317 - TREATMENT OF DISEASES RELATED TO ALPHA SUBUNITS OF SODIUM CHANNELS, VOLTAGE-GATED (SCNxA) WITH SMALL MOLECULES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.01.2021 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.01.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.09.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.09.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.08.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.07.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.02.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CuRNA, Inc. 4400 Biscayne Boulevard Miami, FL 33137 / US | [2014/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
COLLARD, Joseph 1004 Brooks Lane Delray Beach, Florida 33483 / US | 02 /
KHORKOVA SHERMAN, Olga 18288 SE Heritage Drive Tequesta, Florida 33469 / US | 03 /
HSIAO, Jane H. 4400 Biscayne Boulevard Miami, Florida 33137 / US | [2014/29] | Representative(s) | Gregson, Anna Louise, et al Mathys & Squire The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/09] | Gregson, Anna Louise, et al Mathys & Squire LLP The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | ||
Former [2014/29] | Evenson, Jane Harriet, et al Mathys & Squire LLP The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | Application number, filing date | 12829528.4 | 28.08.2012 | [2020/09] | WO2012US52685 | Priority number, date | US201161531361P | 06.09.2011 Original published format: US 201161531361 P | [2014/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013036403 | Date: | 14.03.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2753317 | Date: | 16.07.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.03.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2753317 | Date: | 26.02.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 14.03.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.03.2015 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/00, A61K38/00, A61K31/135 | [2015/15] | CPC: |
A61K31/135 (EP,US);
A61K31/436 (US);
A61K31/165 (EP,US);
A61K31/365 (EP,US);
A61K31/41 (EP,US);
A61K31/4245 (EP,US);
A61K31/4409 (EP,US);
A61K31/4422 (EP,US);
A61K31/4439 (EP,US);
A61K31/4545 (EP,US);
A61K31/495 (EP,US);
A61K31/496 (EP,US);
A61K31/4985 (EP,US);
A61K31/519 (EP,US);
A61K31/5375 (EP,US);
A61K31/5513 (EP,US);
A61K31/58 (EP,US);
A61K31/64 (EP,US);
A61K31/7048 (EP,US);
A61P1/04 (EP);
A61P13/08 (EP);
A61P13/12 (EP);
A61P15/00 (EP);
A61P15/10 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/06 (EP);
A61P25/08 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
A61P9/04 (EP);
A61P9/12 (EP);
Y02A50/30 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2014/29] | A61K31/00, A61K38/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/29] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BEHANDLUNG VON ERKRANKUNGEN IM ZUSAMMENHANG MIT ALPHA-UNTEREINHEITEN VON NATRIUMKANÄLEN, SPANNUNGSGESTEUERT (SCNXA) MIT KLEINEN MOLEKÜLEN | [2014/29] | English: | TREATMENT OF DISEASES RELATED TO ALPHA SUBUNITS OF SODIUM CHANNELS, VOLTAGE-GATED (SCNxA) WITH SMALL MOLECULES | [2014/29] | French: | TRAITEMENT DE MALADIES LIÉES À DES SOUS-UNITÉS ALPHA DE CANAUX SODIQUES VOLTAGE-DÉPENDANTS (SCNXA) AVEC DE PETITES MOLÉCULES | [2014/29] | Entry into regional phase | 27.03.2014 | National basic fee paid | 27.03.2014 | Search fee paid | 27.03.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.03.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.03.2014 | Examination requested [2014/29] | 02.10.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.06.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.12.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.06.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.12.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.01.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.07.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.08.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.12.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.02.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.07.2019 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 18.09.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.01.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 16.01.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.01.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.06.2016 | Opposition(s) | 27.11.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 28.08.2012 | AL | 26.02.2020 | AT | 26.02.2020 | CY | 26.02.2020 | CZ | 26.02.2020 | DK | 26.02.2020 | EE | 26.02.2020 | ES | 26.02.2020 | FI | 26.02.2020 | HR | 26.02.2020 | IT | 26.02.2020 | LT | 26.02.2020 | LV | 26.02.2020 | MC | 26.02.2020 | MK | 26.02.2020 | MT | 26.02.2020 | NL | 26.02.2020 | PL | 26.02.2020 | RO | 26.02.2020 | RS | 26.02.2020 | SE | 26.02.2020 | SI | 26.02.2020 | SK | 26.02.2020 | SM | 26.02.2020 | TR | 26.02.2020 | BG | 26.05.2020 | NO | 26.05.2020 | GR | 27.05.2020 | IS | 26.06.2020 | PT | 19.07.2020 | LU | 28.08.2020 | BE | 31.08.2020 | CH | 31.08.2020 | LI | 31.08.2020 | [2022/31] |
Former [2022/30] | HU | 28.08.2012 | |
AL | 26.02.2020 | ||
AT | 26.02.2020 | ||
CY | 26.02.2020 | ||
CZ | 26.02.2020 | ||
DK | 26.02.2020 | ||
EE | 26.02.2020 | ||
ES | 26.02.2020 | ||
FI | 26.02.2020 | ||
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
IT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
MC | 26.02.2020 | ||
MT | 26.02.2020 | ||
NL | 26.02.2020 | ||
PL | 26.02.2020 | ||
RO | 26.02.2020 | ||
RS | 26.02.2020 | ||
SE | 26.02.2020 | ||
SI | 26.02.2020 | ||
SK | 26.02.2020 | ||
SM | 26.02.2020 | ||
TR | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
NO | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IS | 26.06.2020 | ||
PT | 19.07.2020 | ||
LU | 28.08.2020 | ||
BE | 31.08.2020 | ||
CH | 31.08.2020 | ||
LI | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2022/27] | HU | 28.08.2012 | |
AT | 26.02.2020 | ||
CY | 26.02.2020 | ||
CZ | 26.02.2020 | ||
DK | 26.02.2020 | ||
EE | 26.02.2020 | ||
ES | 26.02.2020 | ||
FI | 26.02.2020 | ||
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
IT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
MC | 26.02.2020 | ||
MT | 26.02.2020 | ||
NL | 26.02.2020 | ||
PL | 26.02.2020 | ||
RO | 26.02.2020 | ||
RS | 26.02.2020 | ||
SE | 26.02.2020 | ||
SI | 26.02.2020 | ||
SK | 26.02.2020 | ||
SM | 26.02.2020 | ||
TR | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
NO | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IS | 26.06.2020 | ||
PT | 19.07.2020 | ||
LU | 28.08.2020 | ||
BE | 31.08.2020 | ||
CH | 31.08.2020 | ||
LI | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AT | 26.02.2020 | |
CZ | 26.02.2020 | ||
DK | 26.02.2020 | ||
EE | 26.02.2020 | ||
ES | 26.02.2020 | ||
FI | 26.02.2020 | ||
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
IT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
MC | 26.02.2020 | ||
NL | 26.02.2020 | ||
PL | 26.02.2020 | ||
RO | 26.02.2020 | ||
RS | 26.02.2020 | ||
SE | 26.02.2020 | ||
SI | 26.02.2020 | ||
SK | 26.02.2020 | ||
SM | 26.02.2020 | ||
TR | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
NO | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IS | 26.06.2020 | ||
PT | 19.07.2020 | ||
LU | 28.08.2020 | ||
BE | 31.08.2020 | ||
CH | 31.08.2020 | ||
LI | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AT | 26.02.2020 | |
CZ | 26.02.2020 | ||
DK | 26.02.2020 | ||
EE | 26.02.2020 | ||
ES | 26.02.2020 | ||
FI | 26.02.2020 | ||
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
IT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
MC | 26.02.2020 | ||
NL | 26.02.2020 | ||
PL | 26.02.2020 | ||
RO | 26.02.2020 | ||
RS | 26.02.2020 | ||
SE | 26.02.2020 | ||
SI | 26.02.2020 | ||
SK | 26.02.2020 | ||
SM | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
NO | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IS | 26.06.2020 | ||
PT | 19.07.2020 | ||
LU | 28.08.2020 | ||
BE | 31.08.2020 | ||
CH | 31.08.2020 | ||
LI | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | AT | 26.02.2020 | |
CZ | 26.02.2020 | ||
DK | 26.02.2020 | ||
EE | 26.02.2020 | ||
ES | 26.02.2020 | ||
FI | 26.02.2020 | ||
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
IT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
MC | 26.02.2020 | ||
NL | 26.02.2020 | ||
PL | 26.02.2020 | ||
RO | 26.02.2020 | ||
RS | 26.02.2020 | ||
SE | 26.02.2020 | ||
SI | 26.02.2020 | ||
SK | 26.02.2020 | ||
SM | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
NO | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IS | 26.06.2020 | ||
PT | 19.07.2020 | ||
LU | 28.08.2020 | ||
CH | 31.08.2020 | ||
LI | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/18] | AT | 26.02.2020 | |
CZ | 26.02.2020 | ||
DK | 26.02.2020 | ||
EE | 26.02.2020 | ||
ES | 26.02.2020 | ||
FI | 26.02.2020 | ||
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
IT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
MC | 26.02.2020 | ||
NL | 26.02.2020 | ||
PL | 26.02.2020 | ||
RO | 26.02.2020 | ||
RS | 26.02.2020 | ||
SE | 26.02.2020 | ||
SI | 26.02.2020 | ||
SK | 26.02.2020 | ||
SM | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
NO | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IS | 26.06.2020 | ||
PT | 19.07.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AT | 26.02.2020 | |
CZ | 26.02.2020 | ||
DK | 26.02.2020 | ||
EE | 26.02.2020 | ||
ES | 26.02.2020 | ||
FI | 26.02.2020 | ||
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
IT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
NL | 26.02.2020 | ||
PL | 26.02.2020 | ||
RO | 26.02.2020 | ||
RS | 26.02.2020 | ||
SE | 26.02.2020 | ||
SI | 26.02.2020 | ||
SK | 26.02.2020 | ||
SM | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
NO | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IS | 26.06.2020 | ||
PT | 19.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | CZ | 26.02.2020 | |
DK | 26.02.2020 | ||
EE | 26.02.2020 | ||
ES | 26.02.2020 | ||
FI | 26.02.2020 | ||
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
LT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
NL | 26.02.2020 | ||
RO | 26.02.2020 | ||
RS | 26.02.2020 | ||
SE | 26.02.2020 | ||
SK | 26.02.2020 | ||
SM | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
NO | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IS | 26.06.2020 | ||
PT | 19.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/49] | CZ | 26.02.2020 | |
DK | 26.02.2020 | ||
ES | 26.02.2020 | ||
FI | 26.02.2020 | ||
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
LT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
NL | 26.02.2020 | ||
RO | 26.02.2020 | ||
RS | 26.02.2020 | ||
SE | 26.02.2020 | ||
SK | 26.02.2020 | ||
SM | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
NO | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IS | 26.06.2020 | ||
PT | 19.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | DK | 26.02.2020 | |
ES | 26.02.2020 | ||
FI | 26.02.2020 | ||
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
LT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
NL | 26.02.2020 | ||
RO | 26.02.2020 | ||
RS | 26.02.2020 | ||
SE | 26.02.2020 | ||
SM | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
NO | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IS | 26.06.2020 | ||
PT | 19.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | DK | 26.02.2020 | |
ES | 26.02.2020 | ||
FI | 26.02.2020 | ||
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
LT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
NL | 26.02.2020 | ||
RS | 26.02.2020 | ||
SE | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
NO | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IS | 26.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/45] | FI | 26.02.2020 | |
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
NL | 26.02.2020 | ||
RS | 26.02.2020 | ||
SE | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
NO | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IS | 26.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/40] | FI | 26.02.2020 | |
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
RS | 26.02.2020 | ||
SE | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
NO | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IS | 26.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/39] | FI | 26.02.2020 | |
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
RS | 26.02.2020 | ||
SE | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
NO | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/38] | FI | 26.02.2020 | |
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
RS | 26.02.2020 | ||
SE | 26.02.2020 | ||
NO | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | FI | 26.02.2020 | |
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
RS | 26.02.2020 | ||
SE | 26.02.2020 | ||
NO | 26.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | FI | 26.02.2020 | |
NO | 26.05.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO0138564 (UNIV MCGILL [CA], et al) [X] 1-4,6-10,13 * claim 12 and Examples *; | [X]US2003055036 (WERNER PETER [US], et al) [X] 1-4,6,11,12 * claims 1, 3, 5 *; | [X] - S MOUSSAOUI, "The Antioxidant Ebselen Prevents Neurotoxicity and Clinical Symptoms in a Primate Model of Parkinson's Disease", EXPERIMENTAL NEUROLOGY, (20001201), vol. 166, no. 2, doi:10.1006/exnr.2000.7516, ISSN 0014-4886, pages 235 - 245, XP055171445 [X] 1-4,6,11,12,15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/exnr.2000.7516 | [X] - JW WARD, "Pinacidil monotherapy for hypertension.", BRITISH JOURNAL OF CLINICAL PHARMACOLOGY, (19840801), vol. 18, no. 2, doi:10.1111/j.1365-2125.1984.tb02456.x, ISSN 0306-5251, pages 223 - 225, XP055171453 [X] 1-3,5,6,12,15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1365-2125.1984.tb02456.x | International search | [X] - YAMAMOTO ET AL., "Up-regulation of sodium channel subunit mRNAs and their cell surface expression by antiepileptic valproic acid: activation of calcium channel and catecholamine secretion in adrenal chromaffin cells", J. NEUROCHEM., (199704), vol. 68, no. 4, pages 1655 - 1662, XP055146846 | [X] - DUFF ET AL., "Class I and IV Antiarrhythmic Drugs and Cytosolic Calcium Regulate mRNA Encoding the Sodium Channel alpha Subunit in Rat Cardiac Muscle", MOL. PHARMACOL., (199210), vol. 42, no. 4, pages 570 - 574, XP008173646 | [A] - CATTERALL ET AL., "International Union of Pharmacology. XLVII. Nomenclature and structure-function relationships of voltage-gated sodium channels", PHARMACOL. REV., (200512), vol. 57, no. 4, pages 397 - 409, XP055146853 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1124/pr.57.4.4 | Examination | WO2011163499 | - FUJIWARA ET AL, "Clinical spectrum of mutations in SCN1A gene: Severe myoclonic epilepsy in infancy and related epilepsies", EPILEPSY RESEARCH, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 70, doi:10.1016/J.EPLEPSYRES.2006.01.019, ISSN 0920-1211, (20060801), pages 223 - 230, (20060801), XP025114867 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.eplepsyres.2006.01.019 | - SCHEFFER I E ET AL, "Dravet syndrome or genetic (generalized) epilepsy with febrile seizures plus?", BRAIN AND DEVELOPMENT, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 31, no. 5, doi:10.1016/J.BRAINDEV.2009.01.001, ISSN 0387-7604, (20090501), pages 394 - 400, (20090208), XP026053272 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.braindev.2009.01.001 |