EP2857316 - METHOD AND MACHINES FOR TRANSFORMING INITIAL SEALED PACKAGINGS INTO IRREGULAR CUBIC OR POLYHEDRAL PACKAGINGS BY MEANS OF SEALING AND CUTTING FLAPS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.08.2016 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.08.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.09.2016 [2016/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PACK SAVE PLANET, S.L. Zalbides Auzoa, 13 48610 Urduliz - Viscaya / ES | [2014/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LOPEZ-AROSTEGUI SAENZ, Guillermo Zalbides Auzoa, 13 48610 Urduliz (Viscaya) / ES | [2014/30] | Representative(s) | Villamor Muguerza, Jon Gran Via 81 Planta 5, Dpto 9 48011 Bilbao / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2014/41] | Carvajal y Urquijo, Isabel, et al Clarke, Modet & Co. Suero de Quiñones, 34-36 28002 Madrid / ES | ||
Former [2014/30] | Carvajal y Urquijo, Isabel, et al Clarke, Modet & Co. C/ Goya, 11 28001 Madrid / ES | Application number, filing date | 12831334.3 | 13.09.2012 | WO2012ES00261 | Priority number, date | ES20110001023 | 13.09.2011 Original published format: ES 201101023 | ES20110001148 | 18.10.2011 Original published format: ES 201101148 | ES20120000301 | 15.03.2012 Original published format: ES 201200301 | ES20120000401 | 11.04.2012 Original published format: ES 201200401 | ES20120000926 | 10.09.2012 Original published format: ES 201200926 | [2014/30] | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013038037 | Date: | 21.03.2013 | Language: | ES | [2013/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2857316 | Date: | 08.04.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | ES | 21.03.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.08.2015 | Classification | IPC: | B65B3/02, B65D77/06, B65D5/00, B65B61/24 | [2015/38] | CPC: |
B65B61/24 (EP,CN,US);
B65B11/54 (EP,CN,US);
B65B31/04 (EP,CN,US);
B65B51/10 (EP,US);
B65B55/022 (EP,CN,US);
B65D31/02 (EP,US);
B65D31/16 (EP,US);
B65D5/029 (EP,CN,US);
B65D75/008 (EP,US);
B65D75/5877 (EP,US);
B65B2220/08 (EP,CN,US);
B65B2220/18 (EP,CN,US);
|
Former IPC [2014/30] | B65B3/02, B65D77/06, B65D5/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/30] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND MASCHINEN ZUR TRANSFORMIERUNG ANFÄNGLICH ABGEDICHTETER VERPACKUNGEN IN UNREGELMÄSSIGE KUBISCHE ODER POLYEDRISCHE VERPACKUNGEN MITTELS DICHTUNGS- UND SCHNEIDEKLAPPEN | [2014/30] | English: | METHOD AND MACHINES FOR TRANSFORMING INITIAL SEALED PACKAGINGS INTO IRREGULAR CUBIC OR POLYHEDRAL PACKAGINGS BY MEANS OF SEALING AND CUTTING FLAPS | [2014/30] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET MACHINES DESTINÉS À TRANSFORMER DES EMBALLAGES INITIALEMENT SCELLÉS, EN EMBALLAGES CUBIQUES OU POLYÈDRES IRRÉGULIERS PAR SCELLEMENT ET SECTIONNEMENT DE RABATS | [2014/30] | Entry into regional phase | 14.04.2014 | Translation filed | 14.04.2014 | National basic fee paid | 23.10.2014 | Search fee paid | 14.04.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.04.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Deletion: Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/15] | deleted | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.07.2013 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: ES | 14.04.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.04.2014 | Examination requested [2014/30] | 15.03.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/36] | 20.04.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2016/36] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the search fee | 27.11.2014 | Request for further processing filed | 27.11.2014 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 18.12.2014 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]FR1393834 (HOLSTEIN & KAPPERT MASCHF) [I] 1,26,33 * the whole document *; | [I]DE1913258U (HOLSTEIN & KAPPERT MASCHF [DE]) [I] 1,26,33 * the whole document *; | [I]US3332198 (GEORG THESING) [I] 1,26,33 * the whole document *; | [I]AT305900B (HABRA WERK OTT KG [DE]) [I] 1,26,33* the whole document *; | [I]DE1786450 (TETRA PAK AB) [I] 1,26,33 * the whole document *; | [I]FR2566321 (VITTEL EAUX MIN [FR]) [I] 1,26,33 * the whole document *; | [I]EP1555524 (TETRA LAVAL HOLDINGS & FINANCE [CH]) [I] 1,26,33 * the whole document * | International search | [A]US3280531 (GUNTHER MEYER-JAGENBERG); | [A]US3861577 (DRUYTS ROMAIN); | [A]US4094127 (ROMAGNOLI ANDREA); | [A]EP0018758 (ICI PLC [GB]); | [A]US4750313 (KAMMLER ING R [DE], et al); | [A]US5037002 (TSCHANEN M STEPHEN [US]); | [A]WO9634804 (MARTIN PETER JOHN [NZ]); | [A]WO9930972 (DOMINGUEZ MARTIN FRANCISCO JAV [ES]); | [A]DE102005015565 (KRONES AG [DE]); | [A]WO2008101358 (LJUNGCRANTZ BILLY [CH]); | [A]US2011073605 (FU THOMAS Z [US], et al); | [A]EP2308758 (IASOPOR EQUIPAMENTOS DE EMBALAGEM UMIPESSOAL LDA [PT]) |