EP2756355 - LATENT ELECTROSTATIC IMAGE DEVELOPING TONER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.03.2017 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ricoh Company, Ltd. 3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | [2014/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MIKI, Tomoharu c/o Ricoh Company Ltd. 3-6 Nakamagome 1-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | 02 /
KADOTA, Takuya c/o Ricoh Company Ltd. 3-6 Nakamagome 1-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | 03 /
MIKURIYA, Yoshihiro c/o Ricoh Company Ltd. 3-6 Nakamagome 1-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | 04 /
NOZAKI, Tsuyoshi c/o Ricoh Company Ltd. 3-6 Nakamagome 1-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | 05 /
ISHIKAWA, Yoshimichi c/o Ricoh Company Ltd. 3-6 Nakamagome 1-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | 06 /
FUWA, Kazuoki c/o Ricoh Company Ltd. 3-6 Nakamagome 1-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | 07 /
FUKAO, Tomohiro c/o Ricoh Company Ltd. 3-6 Nakamagome 1-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | [2014/30] | Representative(s) | Lamb, Martin John Carstairs Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2016/20] | Lamb, Martin John Carstairs Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | ||
Former [2014/30] | Lamb, Martin John Carstairs Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 12831560.3 | 12.09.2012 | [2016/20] | WO2012JP73971 | Priority number, date | JP20110202699 | 16.09.2011 Original published format: JP 2011202699 | JP20110202776 | 16.09.2011 Original published format: JP 2011202776 | JP20120198546 | 10.09.2012 Original published format: JP 2012198546 | [2014/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013039257 | Date: | 21.03.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2756355 | Date: | 23.07.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.03.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2756355 | Date: | 18.05.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 21.03.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.01.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G03G9/08, G03G9/087, G03G15/08, G03G9/093, G03G9/097 | [2015/09] | CPC: |
G03G9/09321 (EP,US);
G03G9/0825 (US);
G03G9/08755 (US);
G03G9/08795 (EP,US);
G03G9/09342 (EP,US);
G03G9/0935 (EP,US);
G03G9/09371 (EP,US);
G03G9/09392 (EP,US);
G03G9/09716 (EP,US);
G03G2215/0634 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2014/30] | G03G9/08, G03G9/087, G03G15/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/30] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TONER ZUR ENTWICKLUNG LATENTER ELEKTROSTATISCHER BILDER | [2014/30] | English: | LATENT ELECTROSTATIC IMAGE DEVELOPING TONER | [2014/30] | French: | TONER DE DÉVELOPPEMENT D'IMAGE ÉLECTROSTATIQUE LATENTE | [2014/30] | Entry into regional phase | 31.03.2014 | National basic fee paid | 31.03.2014 | Search fee paid | 31.03.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.03.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.03.2014 | Examination requested [2014/30] | 08.05.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.01.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.04.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 07.04.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.04.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.01.2016 | Opposition(s) | 21.02.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 12.09.2012 | AL | 18.05.2016 | AT | 18.05.2016 | BE | 18.05.2016 | BG | 18.05.2016 | CY | 18.05.2016 | CZ | 18.05.2016 | DK | 18.05.2016 | EE | 18.05.2016 | FI | 18.05.2016 | HR | 18.05.2016 | IS | 18.05.2016 | LT | 18.05.2016 | LV | 18.05.2016 | MC | 18.05.2016 | MK | 18.05.2016 | PL | 18.05.2016 | RO | 18.05.2016 | RS | 18.05.2016 | SE | 18.05.2016 | SI | 18.05.2016 | SK | 18.05.2016 | SM | 18.05.2016 | TR | 18.05.2016 | NO | 18.08.2016 | GR | 19.08.2016 | IE | 12.09.2016 | LU | 12.09.2016 | PT | 19.09.2016 | CH | 30.09.2016 | LI | 30.09.2016 | MT | 30.09.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/45] | HU | 12.09.2012 | |
AT | 18.05.2016 | ||
BE | 18.05.2016 | ||
BG | 18.05.2016 | ||
CY | 18.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 18.05.2016 | ||
DK | 18.05.2016 | ||
EE | 18.05.2016 | ||
FI | 18.05.2016 | ||
HR | 18.05.2016 | ||
IS | 18.05.2016 | ||
LT | 18.05.2016 | ||
LV | 18.05.2016 | ||
MC | 18.05.2016 | ||
MK | 18.05.2016 | ||
PL | 18.05.2016 | ||
RO | 18.05.2016 | ||
RS | 18.05.2016 | ||
SE | 18.05.2016 | ||
SI | 18.05.2016 | ||
SK | 18.05.2016 | ||
SM | 18.05.2016 | ||
TR | 18.05.2016 | ||
NO | 18.08.2016 | ||
GR | 19.08.2016 | ||
IE | 12.09.2016 | ||
LU | 12.09.2016 | ||
PT | 19.09.2016 | ||
CH | 30.09.2016 | ||
LI | 30.09.2016 | ||
MT | 30.09.2016 | ||
Former [2018/38] | HU | 12.09.2012 | |
AT | 18.05.2016 | ||
BE | 18.05.2016 | ||
BG | 18.05.2016 | ||
CY | 18.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 18.05.2016 | ||
DK | 18.05.2016 | ||
EE | 18.05.2016 | ||
FI | 18.05.2016 | ||
HR | 18.05.2016 | ||
IS | 18.05.2016 | ||
LT | 18.05.2016 | ||
LV | 18.05.2016 | ||
MC | 18.05.2016 | ||
MK | 18.05.2016 | ||
PL | 18.05.2016 | ||
RO | 18.05.2016 | ||
RS | 18.05.2016 | ||
SE | 18.05.2016 | ||
SI | 18.05.2016 | ||
SK | 18.05.2016 | ||
SM | 18.05.2016 | ||
NO | 18.08.2016 | ||
GR | 19.08.2016 | ||
IE | 12.09.2016 | ||
LU | 12.09.2016 | ||
PT | 19.09.2016 | ||
CH | 30.09.2016 | ||
LI | 30.09.2016 | ||
MT | 30.09.2016 | ||
Former [2018/31] | HU | 12.09.2012 | |
AT | 18.05.2016 | ||
BE | 18.05.2016 | ||
CY | 18.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 18.05.2016 | ||
DK | 18.05.2016 | ||
EE | 18.05.2016 | ||
FI | 18.05.2016 | ||
HR | 18.05.2016 | ||
IS | 18.05.2016 | ||
LT | 18.05.2016 | ||
LV | 18.05.2016 | ||
MC | 18.05.2016 | ||
MK | 18.05.2016 | ||
PL | 18.05.2016 | ||
RO | 18.05.2016 | ||
RS | 18.05.2016 | ||
SE | 18.05.2016 | ||
SI | 18.05.2016 | ||
SK | 18.05.2016 | ||
SM | 18.05.2016 | ||
NO | 18.08.2016 | ||
GR | 19.08.2016 | ||
IE | 12.09.2016 | ||
LU | 12.09.2016 | ||
PT | 19.09.2016 | ||
CH | 30.09.2016 | ||
LI | 30.09.2016 | ||
MT | 30.09.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 12.09.2012 | |
AT | 18.05.2016 | ||
BE | 18.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 18.05.2016 | ||
DK | 18.05.2016 | ||
EE | 18.05.2016 | ||
FI | 18.05.2016 | ||
HR | 18.05.2016 | ||
LT | 18.05.2016 | ||
LV | 18.05.2016 | ||
MC | 18.05.2016 | ||
MK | 18.05.2016 | ||
PL | 18.05.2016 | ||
RO | 18.05.2016 | ||
RS | 18.05.2016 | ||
SE | 18.05.2016 | ||
SI | 18.05.2016 | ||
SK | 18.05.2016 | ||
SM | 18.05.2016 | ||
NO | 18.08.2016 | ||
GR | 19.08.2016 | ||
IE | 12.09.2016 | ||
LU | 12.09.2016 | ||
PT | 19.09.2016 | ||
CH | 30.09.2016 | ||
LI | 30.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/41] | AT | 18.05.2016 | |
BE | 18.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 18.05.2016 | ||
DK | 18.05.2016 | ||
EE | 18.05.2016 | ||
FI | 18.05.2016 | ||
HR | 18.05.2016 | ||
LT | 18.05.2016 | ||
LV | 18.05.2016 | ||
MC | 18.05.2016 | ||
PL | 18.05.2016 | ||
RO | 18.05.2016 | ||
RS | 18.05.2016 | ||
SE | 18.05.2016 | ||
SI | 18.05.2016 | ||
SK | 18.05.2016 | ||
SM | 18.05.2016 | ||
NO | 18.08.2016 | ||
GR | 19.08.2016 | ||
IE | 12.09.2016 | ||
LU | 12.09.2016 | ||
PT | 19.09.2016 | ||
CH | 30.09.2016 | ||
LI | 30.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 18.05.2016 | |
BE | 18.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 18.05.2016 | ||
DK | 18.05.2016 | ||
EE | 18.05.2016 | ||
FI | 18.05.2016 | ||
HR | 18.05.2016 | ||
LT | 18.05.2016 | ||
LV | 18.05.2016 | ||
MC | 18.05.2016 | ||
PL | 18.05.2016 | ||
RO | 18.05.2016 | ||
RS | 18.05.2016 | ||
SE | 18.05.2016 | ||
SI | 18.05.2016 | ||
SK | 18.05.2016 | ||
SM | 18.05.2016 | ||
NO | 18.08.2016 | ||
GR | 19.08.2016 | ||
IE | 12.09.2016 | ||
PT | 19.09.2016 | ||
CH | 30.09.2016 | ||
LI | 30.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/31] | AT | 18.05.2016 | |
BE | 18.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 18.05.2016 | ||
DK | 18.05.2016 | ||
EE | 18.05.2016 | ||
FI | 18.05.2016 | ||
HR | 18.05.2016 | ||
LT | 18.05.2016 | ||
LV | 18.05.2016 | ||
MC | 18.05.2016 | ||
PL | 18.05.2016 | ||
RO | 18.05.2016 | ||
RS | 18.05.2016 | ||
SE | 18.05.2016 | ||
SI | 18.05.2016 | ||
SK | 18.05.2016 | ||
SM | 18.05.2016 | ||
NO | 18.08.2016 | ||
GR | 19.08.2016 | ||
PT | 19.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | AT | 18.05.2016 | |
BE | 18.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 18.05.2016 | ||
DK | 18.05.2016 | ||
EE | 18.05.2016 | ||
FI | 18.05.2016 | ||
HR | 18.05.2016 | ||
LT | 18.05.2016 | ||
LV | 18.05.2016 | ||
PL | 18.05.2016 | ||
RO | 18.05.2016 | ||
RS | 18.05.2016 | ||
SE | 18.05.2016 | ||
SK | 18.05.2016 | ||
SM | 18.05.2016 | ||
NO | 18.08.2016 | ||
GR | 19.08.2016 | ||
PT | 19.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | BE | 18.05.2016 | |
CZ | 18.05.2016 | ||
DK | 18.05.2016 | ||
EE | 18.05.2016 | ||
FI | 18.05.2016 | ||
HR | 18.05.2016 | ||
LT | 18.05.2016 | ||
LV | 18.05.2016 | ||
PL | 18.05.2016 | ||
RO | 18.05.2016 | ||
RS | 18.05.2016 | ||
SE | 18.05.2016 | ||
SK | 18.05.2016 | ||
NO | 18.08.2016 | ||
GR | 19.08.2016 | ||
PT | 19.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | CZ | 18.05.2016 | |
DK | 18.05.2016 | ||
EE | 18.05.2016 | ||
FI | 18.05.2016 | ||
HR | 18.05.2016 | ||
LT | 18.05.2016 | ||
LV | 18.05.2016 | ||
RO | 18.05.2016 | ||
RS | 18.05.2016 | ||
SE | 18.05.2016 | ||
NO | 18.08.2016 | ||
GR | 19.08.2016 | ||
PT | 19.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | DK | 18.05.2016 | |
FI | 18.05.2016 | ||
HR | 18.05.2016 | ||
LT | 18.05.2016 | ||
LV | 18.05.2016 | ||
RS | 18.05.2016 | ||
SE | 18.05.2016 | ||
NO | 18.08.2016 | ||
GR | 19.08.2016 | ||
PT | 19.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/52] | FI | 18.05.2016 | |
HR | 18.05.2016 | ||
LT | 18.05.2016 | ||
LV | 18.05.2016 | ||
RS | 18.05.2016 | ||
SE | 18.05.2016 | ||
NO | 18.08.2016 | ||
GR | 19.08.2016 | ||
PT | 19.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/51] | FI | 18.05.2016 | |
HR | 18.05.2016 | ||
LT | 18.05.2016 | ||
LV | 18.05.2016 | ||
RS | 18.05.2016 | ||
NO | 18.08.2016 | ||
GR | 19.08.2016 | ||
PT | 19.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | FI | 18.05.2016 | |
HR | 18.05.2016 | ||
LT | 18.05.2016 | ||
LV | 18.05.2016 | ||
RS | 18.05.2016 | ||
NO | 18.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | FI | 18.05.2016 | |
LT | 18.05.2016 | ||
NO | 18.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | LT | 18.05.2016 | |
NO | 18.08.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5914210 (DEMIZU ICHIRO [JP], et al) [A] 11* column 8, line 50 - column 10, line 7 *; | [X]US2010266947 (MAEZAWA NOBUHIRO [JP]) [X] 1-3,7-10,13-15 * paragraph [0007] * * paragraph [0008]; claims 1-7 * * paragraph [0078] - paragraph [0079] *; | [XI]WO2011052794 (RICOH CO LTD [JP], et al) [X] 1-10,12-15 * page 50, line 10 - page 59, line 2 * * page 35, line 16 - page 37, line 4 * * page 34, line 8 - page 35, line 15 * * examples * * claims 1-15 * [I] 11; | [XI]US2011164901 (YAMAMOTO ATSUSHI [JP], et al) [X] 1-10,12-15 * paragraph [0100] - paragraph [0117] * * paragraph [0192] - paragraph [0202] * * paragraph [0012] * [I] 11 | International search | [Y]JP2002148851 (TOMOEGAWA PAPER CO LTD); | [Y]JP2008145885 (SHARP KK); | [X]JP2008268872 (RICOH KK); | [X]JP2011095286 (RICOH CO LTD); | [X]JP2011123483 (RICOH CO LTD); | [XE]JP2012208492 (RICOH CO LTD) | by applicant | JPH0433096B | JP2005084183 | JP2005099233 | JP2008089670 | WO2011052794 | US2011164901 | US2011266947 |