EP2756382 - OPTIMIZED MATRIX AND VECTOR OPERATIONS IN INSTRUCTION LIMITED ALGORITHMS THAT PERFORM EOS CALCULATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 25.12.2020 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 06.05.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.12.2020 | Refusal of application | published on 27.01.2021 [2021/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ExxonMobil Upstream Research Company 22777 Springwoods Village Parkway Spring, TX 77389 / US | [2021/01] |
Former [2019/46] | For all designated states ExxonMobil Upstream Research Company 22777 Springwoods Village Parkway Spring TX 77389 / US | ||
Former [2015/50] | For all designated states ExxonMobil Upstream Research Company 22777 Springwoods Village Parkway Spring TX 77389 / US | ||
For all designated states Haugen, Kjetil 7171 Buffalo Speedway Apt. 629 Houston, TX 77025 / US | |||
Former [2014/30] | For all designated states Exxonmobil Upstream Research Company 3120 Buffalo Speedway Houston, TX 77098-2189 / US | ||
For all designated states Haugen, Kjetil 7171 Buffalo Speedway Apt. 629 Houston, TX 77025 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAUGEN, Kjetil 7171 Buffalo Speedway Apt. 629 Houston, TX 77025 / US | [2014/30] | Representative(s) | Uexküll & Stolberg Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Beselerstraße 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/30] | Troch, Geneviève, et al ExxonMobil Chemical Europe Inc. IP Law Hermeslaan 2 1831 Machelen / BE | Application number, filing date | 12832637.8 | 23.07.2012 | WO2012US47860 | Priority number, date | US201161535131P | 15.09.2011 Original published format: US 201161535131 P | [2014/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013039606 | Date: | 21.03.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2756382 | Date: | 23.07.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.03.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 21.03.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.06.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/16, G06F7/60, G06G7/48, G06F12/08 | [2015/31] | CPC: |
G06F17/16 (EP,US);
G06F7/60 (US);
G06F12/0875 (US);
G06F9/30014 (EP);
G06F9/30036 (EP,US);
G06F9/3851 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2014/30] | G06F7/60 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/30] | Title | German: | OPTIMIERTE MATRIX UND VEKTOROPERATIONEN BEI BEFEHLSBEGRENZTEN ALGORITHMEN ZUR DURCHFÜHRUNG VON EOS-BERECHNUNGEN | [2014/30] | English: | OPTIMIZED MATRIX AND VECTOR OPERATIONS IN INSTRUCTION LIMITED ALGORITHMS THAT PERFORM EOS CALCULATIONS | [2014/30] | French: | OPÉRATIONS MATRICIELLES ET VECTORIELLES OPTIMISÉES DANS DES ALGORITHMES À INSTRUCTIONS LIMITÉES QUI EFFECTUENT DES CALCULS EOS | [2014/30] | Entry into regional phase | 10.04.2014 | National basic fee paid | 10.04.2014 | Search fee paid | 10.04.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.04.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.04.2014 | Examination requested [2014/30] | 07.03.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 28.04.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.05.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.08.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.09.2020 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 22.09.2020 | 08.09.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2021/04] | 18.09.2020 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2021/04] | 22.09.2020 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.05.2019 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to indicate the wish to proceed further with the application | 28.04.2016 | Request for further processing filed | 28.04.2016 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 10.06.2016 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 28.04.2016 | Request for further processing filed | 28.04.2016 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 10.06.2016 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 09.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2020 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2007282582 (SAAF FREDRIK E [NL]); | International search | [A]US2002177986 (MOECKEL GEORGE P [US], et al); | [A]US2007255779 (WATTS JAMES W III [US]); | [A]US2007282582 (SAAF FREDRIK E [NL]); | [A]US7526418 (PITA JORGE A [SA], et al); | [Y]US2009306943 (ABDEL-KHALIK HANY S [US], et al); | [A]US2011066285 (XU GANG [US], et al); | [A]US7937359 (ZHANG LIHUA [US], et al); | [P]US2012004892 (PITA JORGE A [SA], et al); | [T]US2012203515 (PITA JORGE A [SA], et al); |