EP2758238 - A METHOD OF MOULDING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.11.2016 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.11.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.12.2016 [2016/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fischer Technology Pte. Ltd. 12 Loyang Way 4 Loyang Industrial Estate Singapore 507602 / SG | [2014/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEONG, Chee Seng 1 Sirat Road Singapore 545747 / SG | 02 /
CHUA, Sze Lam Blk 155 Yishun Street 11, 05-102 Singapore 760 155 / SG | [2014/31] | Representative(s) | Talbot-Ponsonby, Daniel Frederick Marks & Clerk LLP 2nd Floor, Wytham Court 11 West Way Oxford OX2 0JB / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/31] | Talbot-Ponsonby, Daniel Frederick Marks & Clerk LLP Fletcher House Heatley Road The Oxford Science Park Oxford OX4 4GE / GB | Application number, filing date | 12832793.9 | 09.10.2012 | WO2012SG00379 | Priority number, date | SG20110007618 | 18.10.2011 Original published format: SG 201107618 | WO2012SG00295 | 21.08.2012 Original published format: PCT/SG2012/000295 | [2014/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013058708 | Date: | 25.04.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2758238 | Date: | 30.07.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.04.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AT | 25.04.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.08.2014 | Classification | IPC: | B32B27/08, B32B37/18, H03K17/96, B29C45/14 | [2014/31] | CPC: |
H03K17/9622 (EP,US);
B32B37/18 (KR);
H05K3/10 (US);
B29C45/14 (KR);
H03K17/96 (KR);
H05K7/02 (US);
B29C45/14811 (EP,US);
B29C45/1671 (EP,US);
B29C53/04 (EP,US);
B29L2031/3437 (EP,US);
B32B2457/00 (EP,US);
H03K2217/960755 (EP,US);
H03K2217/960785 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49117 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49155 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49156 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/31] | Title | German: | FORMUNGSVERFAHREN | [2014/31] | English: | A METHOD OF MOULDING | [2014/31] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE MOULAGE | [2014/31] | Entry into regional phase | 28.03.2013 | National basic fee paid | 28.03.2013 | Search fee paid | 28.03.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.03.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.03.2013 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: AT | 28.03.2013 | Examination requested [2014/31] | 12.01.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.05.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.09.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.01.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.07.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/51] | 18.08.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2016/51] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.05.2015 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [X]EP2322345 (BAYER MATERIALSCIENCE AG [DE]); | [X]WO2008131305 (INK LOGIX LLC [US], et al); | [A]JP2009009859 (TDK CORP) | by applicant | WO2009128856 | WO2008131305 |