EP2760087 - WATERPROOF STRUCTURE FOR CABLE CONNECTOR, PLUG CONNECTOR USING SAME AND RECEPTACLE CONNECTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 11.09.2015 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.09.2015 | Withdrawal of application | published on 14.10.2015 [2015/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Yamaichi Electronics Co., Ltd. 2-16-2 Minamikamata Ota-ku Tokyo 144-8581 / JP | [2014/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Toshiyuki SOMEYA c/o YAMAICHI ELECTRONICS CO. LTD. 3-28-7 Nakamagome Ota-ku Tokyo 143-8515 / JP | [2014/31] | Representative(s) | Hoefer & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Pilgersheimer Strasse 20 81543 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/31] | Hoefer & Partner Pilgersheimer Strasse 20 81543 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12833754.0 | 21.09.2012 | WO2012JP74267 | Priority number, date | JP20110207491 | 22.09.2011 Original published format: JP 2011207491 | [2014/31] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013042776 | Date: | 28.03.2013 | Language: | JA | [2013/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2760087 | Date: | 30.07.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 28.03.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.04.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H01R13/52, H01R4/48, H01R13/58, H01R13/59, H01R13/502 | [2015/22] | CPC: |
H01R13/5205 (EP);
H01R13/5812 (EP);
H01R13/502 (EP);
H01R13/59 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2014/31] | H01R13/52, H01R4/48 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/31] | Title | German: | WASSERDICHTE STRUKTUR FÜR KABELVERBINDER, STECKVERBINDER DAMIT UND BUCHSENSTECKER | [2014/31] | English: | WATERPROOF STRUCTURE FOR CABLE CONNECTOR, PLUG CONNECTOR USING SAME AND RECEPTACLE CONNECTOR | [2014/31] | French: | STRUCTURE ETANCHE POUR RACCORD DE CABLE, FICHE DE CONNEXION UTILISANT CELLE-CI, ET CONNECTEUR DE PRISE | [2014/31] | Entry into regional phase | 22.04.2014 | Translation filed | 22.04.2014 | National basic fee paid | 22.04.2014 | Search fee paid | 22.04.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.04.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.04.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.04.2014 | Examination requested [2014/31] | 07.09.2015 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2015/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAY]WO2008105675 (SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC NEW ZEALAND [NZ]; WICKENS IAIN MICHAEL [NZ]) [X] 1,3,5,7,9,11 * page 4, line 24 - page 8, line 14 * * figures 1-7 * [A] 2,6,10 [Y] 4,8,12; | [Y]WO2010066399 (PHOENIX CONTACT GMBH & CO [DE]; GIEFERS STEFAN [DE]; SAGDIC MEHMET [DE) [Y] 4,12 * page 17, line 23 - page 19, line 3 * * figures 1, 2 *; | [Y]WO03036762 (WIELAND ELECTRIC GMBH [DE]; STOSCH UWE [DE]; VILLINGER BEAT [CH]; BLOE) [Y] 8 * page 10, line 11 - line 26 * * figures 2, 3 * | International search | [X]WO2010066399 (PHOENIX CONTACT GMBH & CO [DE], et al); | [Y]WO2011021297 (YUKITA ELECTRIC WIRE CO LTD [JP], et al); | [Y]JP2001160431 (OMRON TATEISI ELECTRONICS CO); | [A]JP2007134332 (WEIDMUELLER INTERFACE); | [A]JPH0534672U (OMRON CORP.) | by applicant | JP2002298656 |