EP2759837 - REAGENT CONTAINER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.06.2018 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.06.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.07.2018 [2018/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fujibo Holdings Inc. 1-18-12, Ningyo-cho Nihonbashi Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-0013 / JP | For all designated states NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | [2014/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
INOUE Masahide c/o Fujibo Textiles, Inc. 961, OazaIkushi Oita-shi, Oita 870-8541 / JP | 02 /
ASOGAWA Minoru c/o NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | 03 /
MISHINA Yoshinori c/o NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | [2014/31] | Representative(s) | Sticht, Andreas Kraus & Weisert Patentanwälte PartGmbB Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/31] | Sticht, Andreas Kraus & Weisert Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12833824.1 | 10.07.2012 | WO2012JP67552 | Priority number, date | JP20110204327 | 20.09.2011 Original published format: JP 2011204327 | [2014/31] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013042435 | Date: | 28.03.2013 | Language: | JA | [2013/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2759837 | Date: | 30.07.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 28.03.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.04.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G01N35/02, G01N37/00, B01L3/00, G01N1/00 | [2015/21] | CPC: |
B01L3/523 (EP,US);
B01L3/52 (US);
B01L2200/027 (EP,US);
B01L2200/0605 (US);
B01L2200/0684 (US);
B01L2200/0689 (EP,US);
B01L2200/16 (US);
B01L2300/044 (US);
B01L2300/123 (US);
B01L2400/0481 (US);
B01L2400/0683 (EP,US);
B01L3/502715 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2014/31] | G01N35/02, G01N37/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/31] | Title | German: | REAGENZBEHÄLTER | [2014/31] | English: | REAGENT CONTAINER | [2014/31] | French: | CONTENANT DE RÉACTIF | [2014/31] | Entry into regional phase | 03.04.2014 | Translation filed | 03.04.2014 | National basic fee paid | 03.04.2014 | Search fee paid | 03.04.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.04.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.04.2014 | Examination requested [2014/31] | 11.11.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.10.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.02.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.02.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/27] | 28.02.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2018/27] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.10.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2017 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2004005246 (EFTHIMIADIS ANN [CA], et al) [X] 1-6,8 * paragraphs [0049] - [0057]; figures 1-9 *; | [X]JP2006335366 (PENTEL KK) [X] 1-6,8 * paragraphs [0001] , [0012]; figures 1-26 *; | [X]WO2008038653 (SHIN CORP [JP], et al) [X] 1-6,8 * paragraphs [0058] - [0063]; figures 1-6 *; | [X]US2008260581 (ROSMAN ESA [FI], et al) [X] 1-6,8 * paragraphs [0057] - [0062]; figures 1-6 *; | [I]US2011002812 (ASOGAWA MINORU [JP], et al) [I] 1-8* paragraphs [0036] - [0055]; figures 1-6 * | International search | [A]JPS63191061 (LE ASOSHIETSU INC DE); | [A]JPH07503794 (ABAXIS, INC.); | [A]JP2005512071 (THE TECHNOLOGY PARTNERSHIP PLC.); | [A]JP2006308366 (HITACHI HIGH TECH CORP); | [Y]JP2006335366 (PENTEL KK); | [Y]JP2007500850 (BAYER HEALTHCARE, L.L.C.); | [Y]WO2009035062 (NEC CORP [JP], et al) | by applicant | WO2009035062 |