EP2722845 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR GENERATING DOWNMIX SIGNAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2014/17] | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR GENERATING AND RESTORING DOWNMIX SIGNAL | ||
[2015/33] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.12.2016 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2016/06] |
Former [2014/17] | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WU, Wenhai Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | 02 /
MIAO, Lei Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | 03 /
LANG, Yue Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | 04 /
VIRETTE, David Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2014/17] | Representative(s) | Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/17] | Lord, Michael Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | Application number, filing date | 12834659.0 | 27.09.2012 | [2016/06] | WO2012CN82180 | Priority number, date | CN201110289391 | 27.09.2011 Original published format: CN201110289391 | [2014/17] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013044826 | Date: | 04.04.2013 | Language: | ZH | [2013/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2722845 | Date: | 23.04.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2722845 | Date: | 10.02.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 04.04.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.07.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G10L19/008, G10L19/02 | [2014/33] | CPC: |
G10L19/008 (EP,US);
H04S3/02 (US);
G10L19/02 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2014/17] | G10L19/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/17] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR ERZEUGUNG VON ABWÄRTSMISCHSIGNALEN | [2015/33] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR GENERATING DOWNMIX SIGNAL | [2015/33] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE GÉNÉRATION DE SIGNAL DE MIXAGE RÉDUCTEUR | [2015/33] |
Former [2014/17] | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR ERZEUGUNG UND WIEDERHERSTELLUNG VON ABWÄRTSMISCHSIGNALEN | ||
Former [2014/17] | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR GENERATING AND RESTORING DOWNMIX SIGNAL | ||
Former [2014/17] | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE GÉNÉRATION ET DE RESTAURATION DE SIGNAL DE MIXAGE RÉDUCTEUR | Entry into regional phase | 20.01.2014 | Translation filed | 20.01.2014 | National basic fee paid | 20.01.2014 | Search fee paid | 20.01.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.01.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.01.2014 | Examination requested [2014/17] | 07.01.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.07.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.12.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 07.12.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.12.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.07.2015 | Opposition(s) | 11.11.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 27.09.2012 | AL | 10.02.2016 | AT | 10.02.2016 | BE | 10.02.2016 | CY | 10.02.2016 | CZ | 10.02.2016 | DK | 10.02.2016 | EE | 10.02.2016 | FI | 10.02.2016 | HR | 10.02.2016 | LT | 10.02.2016 | LV | 10.02.2016 | MC | 10.02.2016 | MK | 10.02.2016 | PL | 10.02.2016 | RO | 10.02.2016 | RS | 10.02.2016 | SI | 10.02.2016 | SK | 10.02.2016 | SM | 10.02.2016 | TR | 10.02.2016 | BG | 10.05.2016 | NO | 10.05.2016 | GR | 11.05.2016 | IS | 10.06.2016 | PT | 13.06.2016 | IE | 27.09.2016 | LU | 27.09.2016 | CH | 30.09.2016 | LI | 30.09.2016 | MT | 30.09.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/45] | HU | 27.09.2012 | |
AT | 10.02.2016 | ||
BE | 10.02.2016 | ||
CY | 10.02.2016 | ||
CZ | 10.02.2016 | ||
DK | 10.02.2016 | ||
EE | 10.02.2016 | ||
FI | 10.02.2016 | ||
HR | 10.02.2016 | ||
LT | 10.02.2016 | ||
LV | 10.02.2016 | ||
MC | 10.02.2016 | ||
MK | 10.02.2016 | ||
PL | 10.02.2016 | ||
RO | 10.02.2016 | ||
RS | 10.02.2016 | ||
SI | 10.02.2016 | ||
SK | 10.02.2016 | ||
SM | 10.02.2016 | ||
TR | 10.02.2016 | ||
BG | 10.05.2016 | ||
NO | 10.05.2016 | ||
GR | 11.05.2016 | ||
IS | 10.06.2016 | ||
PT | 13.06.2016 | ||
IE | 27.09.2016 | ||
LU | 27.09.2016 | ||
CH | 30.09.2016 | ||
LI | 30.09.2016 | ||
MT | 30.09.2016 | ||
Former [2018/31] | HU | 27.09.2012 | |
AT | 10.02.2016 | ||
BE | 10.02.2016 | ||
CY | 10.02.2016 | ||
CZ | 10.02.2016 | ||
DK | 10.02.2016 | ||
EE | 10.02.2016 | ||
FI | 10.02.2016 | ||
HR | 10.02.2016 | ||
LT | 10.02.2016 | ||
LV | 10.02.2016 | ||
MC | 10.02.2016 | ||
MK | 10.02.2016 | ||
PL | 10.02.2016 | ||
RO | 10.02.2016 | ||
RS | 10.02.2016 | ||
SI | 10.02.2016 | ||
SK | 10.02.2016 | ||
SM | 10.02.2016 | ||
BG | 10.05.2016 | ||
NO | 10.05.2016 | ||
GR | 11.05.2016 | ||
IS | 10.06.2016 | ||
PT | 13.06.2016 | ||
IE | 27.09.2016 | ||
LU | 27.09.2016 | ||
CH | 30.09.2016 | ||
LI | 30.09.2016 | ||
MT | 30.09.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 27.09.2012 | |
AT | 10.02.2016 | ||
BE | 10.02.2016 | ||
CY | 10.02.2016 | ||
CZ | 10.02.2016 | ||
DK | 10.02.2016 | ||
EE | 10.02.2016 | ||
FI | 10.02.2016 | ||
HR | 10.02.2016 | ||
LT | 10.02.2016 | ||
LV | 10.02.2016 | ||
MC | 10.02.2016 | ||
MK | 10.02.2016 | ||
PL | 10.02.2016 | ||
RO | 10.02.2016 | ||
RS | 10.02.2016 | ||
SI | 10.02.2016 | ||
SK | 10.02.2016 | ||
SM | 10.02.2016 | ||
BG | 10.05.2016 | ||
NO | 10.05.2016 | ||
GR | 11.05.2016 | ||
IS | 10.06.2016 | ||
PT | 13.06.2016 | ||
IE | 27.09.2016 | ||
LU | 27.09.2016 | ||
CH | 30.09.2016 | ||
LI | 30.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/41] | AT | 10.02.2016 | |
BE | 10.02.2016 | ||
CZ | 10.02.2016 | ||
DK | 10.02.2016 | ||
EE | 10.02.2016 | ||
FI | 10.02.2016 | ||
HR | 10.02.2016 | ||
LT | 10.02.2016 | ||
LV | 10.02.2016 | ||
MC | 10.02.2016 | ||
PL | 10.02.2016 | ||
RO | 10.02.2016 | ||
RS | 10.02.2016 | ||
SI | 10.02.2016 | ||
SK | 10.02.2016 | ||
SM | 10.02.2016 | ||
BG | 10.05.2016 | ||
NO | 10.05.2016 | ||
GR | 11.05.2016 | ||
IS | 10.06.2016 | ||
PT | 13.06.2016 | ||
IE | 27.09.2016 | ||
LU | 27.09.2016 | ||
CH | 30.09.2016 | ||
LI | 30.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/31] | AT | 10.02.2016 | |
BE | 10.02.2016 | ||
CZ | 10.02.2016 | ||
DK | 10.02.2016 | ||
EE | 10.02.2016 | ||
FI | 10.02.2016 | ||
HR | 10.02.2016 | ||
LT | 10.02.2016 | ||
LV | 10.02.2016 | ||
MC | 10.02.2016 | ||
PL | 10.02.2016 | ||
RO | 10.02.2016 | ||
RS | 10.02.2016 | ||
SI | 10.02.2016 | ||
SK | 10.02.2016 | ||
SM | 10.02.2016 | ||
BG | 10.05.2016 | ||
NO | 10.05.2016 | ||
GR | 11.05.2016 | ||
IS | 10.06.2016 | ||
PT | 13.06.2016 | ||
Former [2017/16] | AT | 10.02.2016 | |
BE | 10.02.2016 | ||
CZ | 10.02.2016 | ||
DK | 10.02.2016 | ||
EE | 10.02.2016 | ||
FI | 10.02.2016 | ||
HR | 10.02.2016 | ||
LT | 10.02.2016 | ||
LV | 10.02.2016 | ||
PL | 10.02.2016 | ||
RO | 10.02.2016 | ||
RS | 10.02.2016 | ||
SI | 10.02.2016 | ||
SK | 10.02.2016 | ||
SM | 10.02.2016 | ||
BG | 10.05.2016 | ||
NO | 10.05.2016 | ||
GR | 11.05.2016 | ||
IS | 10.06.2016 | ||
PT | 13.06.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 10.02.2016 | |
BE | 10.02.2016 | ||
CZ | 10.02.2016 | ||
DK | 10.02.2016 | ||
EE | 10.02.2016 | ||
FI | 10.02.2016 | ||
HR | 10.02.2016 | ||
LT | 10.02.2016 | ||
LV | 10.02.2016 | ||
PL | 10.02.2016 | ||
RO | 10.02.2016 | ||
RS | 10.02.2016 | ||
SK | 10.02.2016 | ||
SM | 10.02.2016 | ||
NO | 10.05.2016 | ||
GR | 11.05.2016 | ||
IS | 10.06.2016 | ||
PT | 13.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | AT | 10.02.2016 | |
CZ | 10.02.2016 | ||
DK | 10.02.2016 | ||
EE | 10.02.2016 | ||
FI | 10.02.2016 | ||
HR | 10.02.2016 | ||
LT | 10.02.2016 | ||
LV | 10.02.2016 | ||
PL | 10.02.2016 | ||
RO | 10.02.2016 | ||
RS | 10.02.2016 | ||
SK | 10.02.2016 | ||
SM | 10.02.2016 | ||
NO | 10.05.2016 | ||
GR | 11.05.2016 | ||
IS | 10.06.2016 | ||
PT | 13.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | AT | 10.02.2016 | |
DK | 10.02.2016 | ||
EE | 10.02.2016 | ||
FI | 10.02.2016 | ||
HR | 10.02.2016 | ||
LT | 10.02.2016 | ||
LV | 10.02.2016 | ||
PL | 10.02.2016 | ||
RS | 10.02.2016 | ||
NO | 10.05.2016 | ||
GR | 11.05.2016 | ||
IS | 10.06.2016 | ||
PT | 13.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | AT | 10.02.2016 | |
DK | 10.02.2016 | ||
FI | 10.02.2016 | ||
HR | 10.02.2016 | ||
LT | 10.02.2016 | ||
LV | 10.02.2016 | ||
PL | 10.02.2016 | ||
RS | 10.02.2016 | ||
NO | 10.05.2016 | ||
GR | 11.05.2016 | ||
IS | 10.06.2016 | ||
PT | 13.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | AT | 10.02.2016 | |
FI | 10.02.2016 | ||
HR | 10.02.2016 | ||
LT | 10.02.2016 | ||
LV | 10.02.2016 | ||
PL | 10.02.2016 | ||
RS | 10.02.2016 | ||
NO | 10.05.2016 | ||
GR | 11.05.2016 | ||
IS | 10.06.2016 | ||
PT | 13.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/38] | AT | 10.02.2016 | |
FI | 10.02.2016 | ||
HR | 10.02.2016 | ||
LT | 10.02.2016 | ||
PL | 10.02.2016 | ||
NO | 10.05.2016 | ||
GR | 11.05.2016 | ||
IS | 10.06.2016 | ||
PT | 13.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 10.02.2016 | |
FI | 10.02.2016 | ||
HR | 10.02.2016 | ||
LT | 10.02.2016 | ||
PL | 10.02.2016 | ||
NO | 10.05.2016 | ||
GR | 11.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/35] | FI | 10.02.2016 | |
HR | 10.02.2016 | ||
NO | 10.05.2016 | ||
GR | 11.05.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP2352152 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS LTD [KR]) [X] 15-17* paragraph [0061] - paragraph [0075] *; | [XA]CN102157149 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD) [X] 1-3,5,8-10,12,15-17 * abstract * [A] 4,6,7,11,13,14; | [X]CN102157150 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD) [X] 15-17 * abstract *; | [P]US2012189127 (WU WENHAI [CN], et al) [P] * paragraph [0065] - paragraph [0075] *; | US2012308018 [ ] (MIAO LEI [CN], et al) [ ] * paragraphs [0047] , [0048] , [0053] - [0055] - [0058] - [0068] - [0082] - [0087] * | International search | [A]US2009210236 (MOON HAN-GIL [KR], et al); | [X]CN102157149 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD); | [A]CN102157152 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD); | [A]CN102157150 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD); | [A]CN102165519 (LG ELECTRONICS INC); | [XP]CN102446507 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD) |