EP2763315 - ELASTIC WAVE DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.07.2020 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.07.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Murata Manufacturing Co., Ltd. 10-1, Higashikotari 1-chome Nagaokakyo-shi, Kyoto 617-8555 / JP | [2014/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KANDO, Hajime c/o MURATA MANUFACTURING CO. LTD. 10-1 Higashikotari 1-chome Nagaokakyo-shi Kyoto 617-8555 / JP | 02 /
IWAMOTO, Hideki c/o MURATA MANUFACTURING CO. LTD. 10-1 Higashikotari 1-chome Nagaokakyo-shi Kyoto 617-8555 / JP | [2014/32] | Representative(s) | Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2014/32] | Thévenet, Jean-Bruno, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 12835346.3 | 24.09.2012 | WO2012JP74385 | Priority number, date | JP20110216939 | 30.09.2011 Original published format: JP 2011216939 | [2014/32] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013047433 | Date: | 04.04.2013 | Language: | JA | [2013/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2763315 | Date: | 06.08.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 04.04.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.09.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H03H9/02 | [2015/41] | CPC: |
H03H9/02574 (EP,US);
H03H9/17 (US);
H03H9/0222 (EP,US);
H03H9/02559 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2014/32] | H03H9/145 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/32] | Title | German: | ELASTISCHE WELLENVORRICHTUNG | [2014/32] | English: | ELASTIC WAVE DEVICE | [2014/32] | French: | DISPOSITIF À ONDES ÉLASTIQUES | [2014/32] | Entry into regional phase | 27.03.2014 | Translation filed | 27.03.2014 | National basic fee paid | 27.03.2014 | Search fee paid | 27.03.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.03.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.03.2014 | Examination requested [2014/32] | 04.04.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.07.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.11.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.11.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01) | 14.12.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.07.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.11.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/33] | 15.01.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2020/33] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.07.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 20.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]JP2001196896 (SEIKO EPSON CORP) [X] 1,3,5,6 * figures 1,2 * * paragraphs [0025] , [0026] , [0028] , [0029] * [I] 2,4,7; | [XI]US2009267449 (GOTO REI [JP], et al) [X] 1,3,5-7 * paragraph [0029]; figure 1 * [I] 2,4; | [XI]WO2010131606 (MURATA MANUFACTURING CO [JP], et al) [X] 1,3,5-7 * figure 2 * [I] 2,4; | [A]US2011037344 (YAMANE TAKASHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-7 * paragraphs [0058] , [0059] , [0063]; figure 1a *; | [XI]WO2011074464 (MURATA MANUFACTURING CO [JP], et al) [X] 1,3,5-7 * figure 1a * [I] 2,4; | [E]WO2013031651 (MURATA MANUFACTURING CO [JP], et al) [E] 1,3,5-7* figure 1a *; | [E]EP2658123 (MURATA MANUFACTURING CO [JP]) [E] 1,3,5-7 * paragraph [0036]; figure 1 * | International search | [A]WO0128090 (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES [JP], et al); | [A]JP2001196896 (SEIKO EPSON CORP); | [A]JP2007228225 (SEIKO EPSON CORP) | by applicant | JP2004282232 | - J.J. CAMPBELL; W.R. JONES, "A method for estimating optimal cuts and propagation directions for excitation and propagation directions for excitation of piezoelectric surface waves", IEEE TRANS. SONICS AND ULTRASON., (1968), vol. SU-15, pages 209 - 217, XP008045799 | - "Finite element method analysis of piezoelectric waveguide with a periodic structure", TRANSACTIONS OF THE INSTITUTE OF ELECTRONICS, INFORMATION AND COMMUNICATION ENGINEERS, (198501), vol. J68-C, no. 1, pages 21 - 27 |