EP2762323 - THERMAL TRANSFER SHEET [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.07.2016 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 21.11.2018 [2018/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dai Nippon Printing Co., Ltd. 1-1, Ichigaya-Kagacho 1-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo, 162-8001 / JP | [2015/48] |
Former [2014/32] | For all designated states Dai Nippon Printing Co., Ltd. 1-1, Ichigaya-kagacho 1-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo-to 162-8001 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUZUKI Tomoko c/o Dai Nippon Printing Co. Ltd. 1-1 Ichigaya-kagacho 1-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 162-8001 / JP | 02 /
KOBAYASHI Yoshimasa c/o Dai Nippon Printing Co. Ltd. 1-1 Ichigaya-kagacho 1-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 162-8001 / JP | 03 /
SAKAMOTO Kano c/o Dai Nippon Printing Co. Ltd. 1-1 Ichigaya-kagacho 1-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 162-8001 / JP | [2014/32] | Representative(s) | Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Grillparzerstraße 14 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/32] | Viering, Jentschura & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Grillparzerstrasse 14 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12836348.8 | 26.09.2012 | [2015/39] | WO2012JP74648 | Priority number, date | JP20110218137 | 30.09.2011 Original published format: JP 2011218137 | JP20120201010 | 12.09.2012 Original published format: JP 2012201010 | [2014/32] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013047560 | Date: | 04.04.2013 | Language: | JA | [2013/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2762323 | Date: | 06.08.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2762323 | Date: | 23.09.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 04.04.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.01.2015 | Classification | IPC: | B41M5/44, B41M5/42 | [2015/09] | CPC: |
B41M5/44 (EP,US);
B32B5/16 (US);
B41M2205/02 (US);
B41M2205/04 (US);
B41M2205/34 (EP,US);
B41M2205/36 (EP,US);
B41M5/42 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2014/32] | B41M5/382, B41M5/26, B41M5/40 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/32] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WÄRMEÜBERTRAGUNGSFOLIE | [2014/32] | English: | THERMAL TRANSFER SHEET | [2014/32] | French: | FEUILLE DE TRANSFERT THERMIQUE | [2014/32] | Entry into regional phase | 20.03.2014 | Translation filed | 20.03.2014 | National basic fee paid | 20.03.2014 | Search fee paid | 20.03.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.03.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.03.2014 | Examination requested [2014/32] | 13.04.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.08.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 11.08.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.08.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.04.2015 | Opposition(s) | 24.06.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 26.09.2012 | AL | 23.09.2015 | AT | 23.09.2015 | BG | 23.09.2015 | CY | 23.09.2015 | CZ | 23.09.2015 | DK | 23.09.2015 | EE | 23.09.2015 | ES | 23.09.2015 | FI | 23.09.2015 | HR | 23.09.2015 | IT | 23.09.2015 | LT | 23.09.2015 | LV | 23.09.2015 | MC | 23.09.2015 | MK | 23.09.2015 | MT | 23.09.2015 | NL | 23.09.2015 | PL | 23.09.2015 | RO | 23.09.2015 | RS | 23.09.2015 | SE | 23.09.2015 | SI | 23.09.2015 | SK | 23.09.2015 | SM | 23.09.2015 | TR | 23.09.2015 | IE | 26.09.2015 | LU | 26.09.2015 | BE | 30.09.2015 | CH | 30.09.2015 | LI | 30.09.2015 | NO | 23.12.2015 | GR | 24.12.2015 | IS | 23.01.2016 | PT | 25.01.2016 | [2018/47] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 26.09.2012 | |
AT | 23.09.2015 | ||
BG | 23.09.2015 | ||
CY | 23.09.2015 | ||
CZ | 23.09.2015 | ||
DK | 23.09.2015 | ||
EE | 23.09.2015 | ||
ES | 23.09.2015 | ||
FI | 23.09.2015 | ||
HR | 23.09.2015 | ||
IT | 23.09.2015 | ||
LT | 23.09.2015 | ||
LV | 23.09.2015 | ||
MC | 23.09.2015 | ||
MK | 23.09.2015 | ||
MT | 23.09.2015 | ||
NL | 23.09.2015 | ||
PL | 23.09.2015 | ||
RO | 23.09.2015 | ||
RS | 23.09.2015 | ||
SE | 23.09.2015 | ||
SI | 23.09.2015 | ||
SK | 23.09.2015 | ||
SM | 23.09.2015 | ||
TR | 23.09.2015 | ||
IE | 26.09.2015 | ||
LU | 26.09.2015 | ||
BE | 30.09.2015 | ||
CH | 30.09.2015 | ||
LI | 30.09.2015 | ||
NO | 23.12.2015 | ||
GR | 24.12.2015 | ||
IS | 23.01.2016 | ||
PT | 25.01.2016 | ||
Former [2018/02] | HU | 26.09.2012 | |
AT | 23.09.2015 | ||
BG | 23.09.2015 | ||
CY | 23.09.2015 | ||
CZ | 23.09.2015 | ||
DK | 23.09.2015 | ||
EE | 23.09.2015 | ||
ES | 23.09.2015 | ||
FI | 23.09.2015 | ||
HR | 23.09.2015 | ||
IT | 23.09.2015 | ||
LT | 23.09.2015 | ||
LV | 23.09.2015 | ||
MC | 23.09.2015 | ||
MT | 23.09.2015 | ||
NL | 23.09.2015 | ||
PL | 23.09.2015 | ||
RO | 23.09.2015 | ||
RS | 23.09.2015 | ||
SE | 23.09.2015 | ||
SI | 23.09.2015 | ||
SK | 23.09.2015 | ||
SM | 23.09.2015 | ||
IE | 26.09.2015 | ||
LU | 26.09.2015 | ||
BE | 30.09.2015 | ||
CH | 30.09.2015 | ||
LI | 30.09.2015 | ||
NO | 23.12.2015 | ||
GR | 24.12.2015 | ||
IS | 23.01.2016 | ||
PT | 25.01.2016 | ||
Former [2017/39] | HU | 26.09.2012 | |
AT | 23.09.2015 | ||
BG | 23.09.2015 | ||
CY | 23.09.2015 | ||
CZ | 23.09.2015 | ||
DK | 23.09.2015 | ||
EE | 23.09.2015 | ||
ES | 23.09.2015 | ||
FI | 23.09.2015 | ||
HR | 23.09.2015 | ||
IT | 23.09.2015 | ||
LT | 23.09.2015 | ||
LV | 23.09.2015 | ||
MC | 23.09.2015 | ||
MT | 23.09.2015 | ||
NL | 23.09.2015 | ||
PL | 23.09.2015 | ||
RO | 23.09.2015 | ||
RS | 23.09.2015 | ||
SE | 23.09.2015 | ||
SI | 23.09.2015 | ||
SK | 23.09.2015 | ||
SM | 23.09.2015 | ||
IE | 26.09.2015 | ||
BE | 30.09.2015 | ||
CH | 30.09.2015 | ||
LI | 30.09.2015 | ||
NO | 23.12.2015 | ||
GR | 24.12.2015 | ||
IS | 23.01.2016 | ||
PT | 25.01.2016 | ||
Former [2017/22] | AT | 23.09.2015 | |
CZ | 23.09.2015 | ||
DK | 23.09.2015 | ||
EE | 23.09.2015 | ||
ES | 23.09.2015 | ||
FI | 23.09.2015 | ||
HR | 23.09.2015 | ||
IT | 23.09.2015 | ||
LT | 23.09.2015 | ||
LV | 23.09.2015 | ||
MC | 23.09.2015 | ||
MT | 23.09.2015 | ||
NL | 23.09.2015 | ||
PL | 23.09.2015 | ||
RO | 23.09.2015 | ||
RS | 23.09.2015 | ||
SE | 23.09.2015 | ||
SI | 23.09.2015 | ||
SK | 23.09.2015 | ||
IE | 26.09.2015 | ||
CH | 30.09.2015 | ||
LI | 30.09.2015 | ||
NO | 23.12.2015 | ||
GR | 24.12.2015 | ||
IS | 23.01.2016 | ||
PT | 25.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | AT | 23.09.2015 | |
CZ | 23.09.2015 | ||
DK | 23.09.2015 | ||
EE | 23.09.2015 | ||
ES | 23.09.2015 | ||
FI | 23.09.2015 | ||
HR | 23.09.2015 | ||
IT | 23.09.2015 | ||
LT | 23.09.2015 | ||
LV | 23.09.2015 | ||
MC | 23.09.2015 | ||
NL | 23.09.2015 | ||
PL | 23.09.2015 | ||
RO | 23.09.2015 | ||
RS | 23.09.2015 | ||
SE | 23.09.2015 | ||
SI | 23.09.2015 | ||
SK | 23.09.2015 | ||
IE | 26.09.2015 | ||
CH | 30.09.2015 | ||
LI | 30.09.2015 | ||
NO | 23.12.2015 | ||
GR | 24.12.2015 | ||
IS | 23.01.2016 | ||
PT | 25.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | AT | 23.09.2015 | |
CZ | 23.09.2015 | ||
DK | 23.09.2015 | ||
EE | 23.09.2015 | ||
ES | 23.09.2015 | ||
FI | 23.09.2015 | ||
HR | 23.09.2015 | ||
IT | 23.09.2015 | ||
LT | 23.09.2015 | ||
LV | 23.09.2015 | ||
MC | 23.09.2015 | ||
NL | 23.09.2015 | ||
PL | 23.09.2015 | ||
RO | 23.09.2015 | ||
RS | 23.09.2015 | ||
SE | 23.09.2015 | ||
SK | 23.09.2015 | ||
IE | 26.09.2015 | ||
CH | 30.09.2015 | ||
LI | 30.09.2015 | ||
NO | 23.12.2015 | ||
GR | 24.12.2015 | ||
IS | 23.01.2016 | ||
PT | 25.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/33] | AT | 23.09.2015 | |
CZ | 23.09.2015 | ||
EE | 23.09.2015 | ||
ES | 23.09.2015 | ||
FI | 23.09.2015 | ||
HR | 23.09.2015 | ||
IT | 23.09.2015 | ||
LT | 23.09.2015 | ||
LV | 23.09.2015 | ||
MC | 23.09.2015 | ||
NL | 23.09.2015 | ||
PL | 23.09.2015 | ||
RO | 23.09.2015 | ||
RS | 23.09.2015 | ||
SE | 23.09.2015 | ||
SK | 23.09.2015 | ||
IE | 26.09.2015 | ||
CH | 30.09.2015 | ||
LI | 30.09.2015 | ||
NO | 23.12.2015 | ||
GR | 24.12.2015 | ||
IS | 23.01.2016 | ||
PT | 25.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 23.09.2015 | |
CZ | 23.09.2015 | ||
EE | 23.09.2015 | ||
ES | 23.09.2015 | ||
FI | 23.09.2015 | ||
HR | 23.09.2015 | ||
IT | 23.09.2015 | ||
LT | 23.09.2015 | ||
LV | 23.09.2015 | ||
MC | 23.09.2015 | ||
NL | 23.09.2015 | ||
PL | 23.09.2015 | ||
RO | 23.09.2015 | ||
RS | 23.09.2015 | ||
SE | 23.09.2015 | ||
SK | 23.09.2015 | ||
NO | 23.12.2015 | ||
GR | 24.12.2015 | ||
IS | 23.01.2016 | ||
PT | 25.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 23.09.2015 | |
CZ | 23.09.2015 | ||
EE | 23.09.2015 | ||
ES | 23.09.2015 | ||
FI | 23.09.2015 | ||
HR | 23.09.2015 | ||
IT | 23.09.2015 | ||
LT | 23.09.2015 | ||
LV | 23.09.2015 | ||
NL | 23.09.2015 | ||
PL | 23.09.2015 | ||
RO | 23.09.2015 | ||
RS | 23.09.2015 | ||
SE | 23.09.2015 | ||
SK | 23.09.2015 | ||
NO | 23.12.2015 | ||
GR | 24.12.2015 | ||
IS | 23.01.2016 | ||
PT | 25.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/23] | CZ | 23.09.2015 | |
EE | 23.09.2015 | ||
ES | 23.09.2015 | ||
FI | 23.09.2015 | ||
HR | 23.09.2015 | ||
IT | 23.09.2015 | ||
LT | 23.09.2015 | ||
LV | 23.09.2015 | ||
NL | 23.09.2015 | ||
RO | 23.09.2015 | ||
RS | 23.09.2015 | ||
SE | 23.09.2015 | ||
SK | 23.09.2015 | ||
NO | 23.12.2015 | ||
GR | 24.12.2015 | ||
IS | 23.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/22] | CZ | 23.09.2015 | |
EE | 23.09.2015 | ||
ES | 23.09.2015 | ||
FI | 23.09.2015 | ||
HR | 23.09.2015 | ||
IT | 23.09.2015 | ||
LT | 23.09.2015 | ||
LV | 23.09.2015 | ||
NL | 23.09.2015 | ||
RS | 23.09.2015 | ||
SE | 23.09.2015 | ||
NO | 23.12.2015 | ||
GR | 24.12.2015 | ||
IS | 23.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/21] | ES | 23.09.2015 | |
FI | 23.09.2015 | ||
HR | 23.09.2015 | ||
IT | 23.09.2015 | ||
LT | 23.09.2015 | ||
LV | 23.09.2015 | ||
NL | 23.09.2015 | ||
RS | 23.09.2015 | ||
SE | 23.09.2015 | ||
NO | 23.12.2015 | ||
GR | 24.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | ES | 23.09.2015 | |
FI | 23.09.2015 | ||
HR | 23.09.2015 | ||
LT | 23.09.2015 | ||
LV | 23.09.2015 | ||
NL | 23.09.2015 | ||
RS | 23.09.2015 | ||
SE | 23.09.2015 | ||
NO | 23.12.2015 | ||
GR | 24.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/14] | FI | 23.09.2015 | |
HR | 23.09.2015 | ||
LT | 23.09.2015 | ||
LV | 23.09.2015 | ||
NL | 23.09.2015 | ||
RS | 23.09.2015 | ||
SE | 23.09.2015 | ||
NO | 23.12.2015 | ||
GR | 24.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | FI | 23.09.2015 | |
HR | 23.09.2015 | ||
LT | 23.09.2015 | ||
LV | 23.09.2015 | ||
RS | 23.09.2015 | ||
SE | 23.09.2015 | ||
NO | 23.12.2015 | ||
GR | 24.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | FI | 23.09.2015 | |
LT | 23.09.2015 | ||
LV | 23.09.2015 | ||
NO | 23.12.2015 | ||
GR | 24.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/08] | LT | 23.09.2015 | |
NO | 23.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | LT | 23.09.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [A]JPH10138649 (MITSUBISHI CHEM CORP); | [A]JPH07329439 (UNION KEMIKAA KK); | [A]JP2005119154 (KONICA MINOLTA MED & GRAPHIC) | by applicant | JP2007307764 |