EP2763698 - LIPOSOME COMPOSITIONS COMPRISING AN ADJUVANT THAT ACTIVATES OR INCREASES THE ACTIVITY OF TLR2 AND USES THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.10.2021 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 30.10.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 31.08.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.07.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.03.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.08.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ImmunoVaccine Technologies Inc. 130 Eileen Stubbs Avenue, Suite 19 Dartmouth, Nova Scotia B3B 2C4 / CA | [2020/35] |
Former [2014/33] | For all designated states ImmunoVaccine Technologies Inc. 1344 Summer Street, Suite 412 Halifax, Nova Scotia B3H 0A8 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MANSOUR, Marc 17 Alton Drive Halifax Nova Scotia B3N 1L8 / CA | 02 /
MACDONALD, Lisa Diana 54 Rufus Ave. Halifax Nova Scotia B3N 2L7 / CA | 03 /
WEIR, Genevieve Mary 468 Spring Avenue Dartmouth Nova Scotia B2W 1X8 / CA | 04 /
SAMMATUR, Leeladhar 5225 Archway Irvine California 92618 / US | 05 /
SHARP, Kendall 6038 Leeds Street Halifax Nova Scotia B3K 2T5 / CA | [2020/35] |
Former [2014/34] | 01 /
MANSOUR, Marc 17 Alton Drive Halifax Nova Scotia B3N 1L8 / CA | ||
02 /
MACDONALD, Lisa Diana 54 Rufus Ave. Halifax Nova Scotia B3N 2L7 / CA | |||
03 /
WEIR, Genevieve Mary 468 Spring Avenue Dartmouth Nova Scotia B2W 1X8 / CA | |||
04 /
SAMMATUR, Leeladhar 46 Fathom Court Halifax Nova Scotia B3M 0A7 / CA | |||
05 /
SHARP, Kendall 6038 Leeds Street Halifax Nova Scotia B3K 2T5 / CA | |||
Former [2014/33] | 01 /
MANSOUR, Marc c/o Immunovaccine Technologies Inc. 1819 Granville Street Suite 303 Halifax$ Nova Scotia B3J 3R1 / CA | ||
02 /
MACDONALD, Lisa Diana c/o Immunovaccine Technologies Inc. 1819 Granville Street Suite 303 Halifax Nova Scotia B3J 3R1 / CA | |||
03 /
WEIR, Genevieve Mary c/o Immunovaccine Technologies Inc. 1819 Granville Street Suite 303 Halifax Nova Scotia B3J 3R1 / CA | |||
04 /
SAMMATUR, Leeladhar c/o Immunovaccine Technologies Inc. 1819 Granville Street Suite 303 Halifax Nova Scotia B3J 3R1 / CA | |||
05 /
SHARP, Kendall c/o Immunovaccine Technologies Inc. 1819 Granville Street Suite 303 Halifax Nova Scotia B3J 3R1 / CA | Representative(s) | Comoglio, Elena, et al Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Corso Emilia 8 10152 Torino / IT | [2020/49] |
Former [2014/33] | Comoglio, Elena, et al Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Corso Emilia 8 10152 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 12838879.0 | 05.10.2012 | [2020/49] | WO2012CA50705 | Priority number, date | US201161544020P | 06.10.2011 Original published format: US 201161544020 P | [2014/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013049941 | Date: | 11.04.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2763698 | Date: | 13.08.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.04.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2763698 | Date: | 02.12.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CA | 11.04.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.07.2015 | Classification | IPC: | A61K39/39, A61K9/127, A61P31/00, A61P37/04, A61K39/07, A61K39/02, A61K39/12, A61K39/145, A61K39/00 | [2015/11] | CPC: |
A61K9/127 (EP,US);
A61K39/145 (US);
A61K39/07 (EP,US);
A61K39/099 (EP,US);
A61K39/12 (EP,US);
A61K39/39 (EP,US);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P31/00 (EP);
A61P31/04 (EP);
A61P31/12 (EP);
A61P31/16 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P37/04 (EP);
A61P37/08 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61K2039/5252 (EP,US);
A61K2039/55511 (EP,US);
A61K2039/55555 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2014/33] | A61K39/39, A61K9/127, A61P31/00, A61P37/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/33] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LIPOSOMZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN MIT EINEM ADJUVANS ZUR AKTIVIERUNG ODER STEIGERUNG DER AKTIVITÄT VON TLR2 UND VERWENDUNGEN DAVON | [2014/33] | English: | LIPOSOME COMPOSITIONS COMPRISING AN ADJUVANT THAT ACTIVATES OR INCREASES THE ACTIVITY OF TLR2 AND USES THEREOF | [2014/33] | French: | COMPOSITIONS LIPOSOMALES COMPRENANT UN ADJUVANT QUI ACTIVE OU ACCROÎT L'ACTIVITÉ DE TLR2 ET UTILISATIONS ASSOCIÉES | [2014/33] | Entry into regional phase | 06.05.2014 | National basic fee paid | 06.05.2014 | Search fee paid | 06.05.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.05.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.05.2014 | Examination requested [2014/33] | 27.01.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.08.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.12.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.05.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.11.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.11.2019 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 14.11.2019 | 14.11.2019 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 12.03.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.07.2020 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 17.07.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 17.07.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 31.08.2020 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 31.08.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.08.2017 | Opposition(s) | 03.09.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 05.10.2012 | AL | 02.12.2020 | AT | 02.12.2020 | CY | 02.12.2020 | CZ | 02.12.2020 | DK | 02.12.2020 | EE | 02.12.2020 | FI | 02.12.2020 | HR | 02.12.2020 | LT | 02.12.2020 | LV | 02.12.2020 | MC | 02.12.2020 | MK | 02.12.2020 | PL | 02.12.2020 | RO | 02.12.2020 | RS | 02.12.2020 | SE | 02.12.2020 | SI | 02.12.2020 | SK | 02.12.2020 | SM | 02.12.2020 | BG | 02.03.2021 | NO | 02.03.2021 | GR | 03.03.2021 | IS | 02.04.2021 | PT | 05.04.2021 | [2024/22] |
Former [2023/28] | HU | 05.10.2012 | |
AL | 02.12.2020 | ||
AT | 02.12.2020 | ||
CY | 02.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 02.12.2020 | ||
DK | 02.12.2020 | ||
EE | 02.12.2020 | ||
FI | 02.12.2020 | ||
HR | 02.12.2020 | ||
LT | 02.12.2020 | ||
LV | 02.12.2020 | ||
MC | 02.12.2020 | ||
PL | 02.12.2020 | ||
RO | 02.12.2020 | ||
RS | 02.12.2020 | ||
SE | 02.12.2020 | ||
SI | 02.12.2020 | ||
SK | 02.12.2020 | ||
SM | 02.12.2020 | ||
BG | 02.03.2021 | ||
NO | 02.03.2021 | ||
GR | 03.03.2021 | ||
IS | 02.04.2021 | ||
PT | 05.04.2021 | ||
Former [2023/24] | AL | 02.12.2020 | |
AT | 02.12.2020 | ||
CY | 02.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 02.12.2020 | ||
DK | 02.12.2020 | ||
EE | 02.12.2020 | ||
FI | 02.12.2020 | ||
HR | 02.12.2020 | ||
LT | 02.12.2020 | ||
LV | 02.12.2020 | ||
MC | 02.12.2020 | ||
PL | 02.12.2020 | ||
RO | 02.12.2020 | ||
RS | 02.12.2020 | ||
SE | 02.12.2020 | ||
SI | 02.12.2020 | ||
SK | 02.12.2020 | ||
SM | 02.12.2020 | ||
BG | 02.03.2021 | ||
NO | 02.03.2021 | ||
GR | 03.03.2021 | ||
IS | 02.04.2021 | ||
PT | 05.04.2021 | ||
Former [2022/33] | AL | 02.12.2020 | |
AT | 02.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 02.12.2020 | ||
DK | 02.12.2020 | ||
EE | 02.12.2020 | ||
FI | 02.12.2020 | ||
HR | 02.12.2020 | ||
LT | 02.12.2020 | ||
LV | 02.12.2020 | ||
MC | 02.12.2020 | ||
PL | 02.12.2020 | ||
RO | 02.12.2020 | ||
RS | 02.12.2020 | ||
SE | 02.12.2020 | ||
SI | 02.12.2020 | ||
SK | 02.12.2020 | ||
SM | 02.12.2020 | ||
BG | 02.03.2021 | ||
NO | 02.03.2021 | ||
GR | 03.03.2021 | ||
IS | 02.04.2021 | ||
PT | 05.04.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AL | 02.12.2020 | |
AT | 02.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 02.12.2020 | ||
DK | 02.12.2020 | ||
EE | 02.12.2020 | ||
FI | 02.12.2020 | ||
HR | 02.12.2020 | ||
LT | 02.12.2020 | ||
LV | 02.12.2020 | ||
PL | 02.12.2020 | ||
RO | 02.12.2020 | ||
RS | 02.12.2020 | ||
SE | 02.12.2020 | ||
SI | 02.12.2020 | ||
SK | 02.12.2020 | ||
SM | 02.12.2020 | ||
BG | 02.03.2021 | ||
NO | 02.03.2021 | ||
GR | 03.03.2021 | ||
IS | 02.04.2021 | ||
PT | 05.04.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 02.12.2020 | |
AT | 02.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 02.12.2020 | ||
DK | 02.12.2020 | ||
EE | 02.12.2020 | ||
FI | 02.12.2020 | ||
HR | 02.12.2020 | ||
LT | 02.12.2020 | ||
LV | 02.12.2020 | ||
PL | 02.12.2020 | ||
RO | 02.12.2020 | ||
RS | 02.12.2020 | ||
SE | 02.12.2020 | ||
SI | 02.12.2020 | ||
SK | 02.12.2020 | ||
SM | 02.12.2020 | ||
BG | 02.03.2021 | ||
NO | 02.03.2021 | ||
GR | 03.03.2021 | ||
PT | 05.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | AL | 02.12.2020 | |
AT | 02.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 02.12.2020 | ||
DK | 02.12.2020 | ||
EE | 02.12.2020 | ||
FI | 02.12.2020 | ||
HR | 02.12.2020 | ||
LT | 02.12.2020 | ||
LV | 02.12.2020 | ||
PL | 02.12.2020 | ||
RO | 02.12.2020 | ||
RS | 02.12.2020 | ||
SE | 02.12.2020 | ||
SI | 02.12.2020 | ||
SK | 02.12.2020 | ||
SM | 02.12.2020 | ||
BG | 02.03.2021 | ||
NO | 02.03.2021 | ||
GR | 03.03.2021 | ||
IS | 02.04.2021 | ||
PT | 05.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/45] | AL | 02.12.2020 | |
AT | 02.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 02.12.2020 | ||
EE | 02.12.2020 | ||
FI | 02.12.2020 | ||
HR | 02.12.2020 | ||
LT | 02.12.2020 | ||
LV | 02.12.2020 | ||
PL | 02.12.2020 | ||
RO | 02.12.2020 | ||
RS | 02.12.2020 | ||
SE | 02.12.2020 | ||
SK | 02.12.2020 | ||
SM | 02.12.2020 | ||
BG | 02.03.2021 | ||
NO | 02.03.2021 | ||
GR | 03.03.2021 | ||
IS | 02.04.2021 | ||
PT | 05.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/42] | AT | 02.12.2020 | |
CZ | 02.12.2020 | ||
EE | 02.12.2020 | ||
FI | 02.12.2020 | ||
HR | 02.12.2020 | ||
LT | 02.12.2020 | ||
LV | 02.12.2020 | ||
PL | 02.12.2020 | ||
RO | 02.12.2020 | ||
RS | 02.12.2020 | ||
SE | 02.12.2020 | ||
SK | 02.12.2020 | ||
SM | 02.12.2020 | ||
BG | 02.03.2021 | ||
NO | 02.03.2021 | ||
GR | 03.03.2021 | ||
IS | 02.04.2021 | ||
PT | 05.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AT | 02.12.2020 | |
CZ | 02.12.2020 | ||
EE | 02.12.2020 | ||
FI | 02.12.2020 | ||
HR | 02.12.2020 | ||
LT | 02.12.2020 | ||
LV | 02.12.2020 | ||
PL | 02.12.2020 | ||
RO | 02.12.2020 | ||
RS | 02.12.2020 | ||
SE | 02.12.2020 | ||
SK | 02.12.2020 | ||
SM | 02.12.2020 | ||
BG | 02.03.2021 | ||
NO | 02.03.2021 | ||
GR | 03.03.2021 | ||
PT | 05.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | CZ | 02.12.2020 | |
EE | 02.12.2020 | ||
FI | 02.12.2020 | ||
HR | 02.12.2020 | ||
LT | 02.12.2020 | ||
LV | 02.12.2020 | ||
PL | 02.12.2020 | ||
RO | 02.12.2020 | ||
RS | 02.12.2020 | ||
SE | 02.12.2020 | ||
SK | 02.12.2020 | ||
SM | 02.12.2020 | ||
BG | 02.03.2021 | ||
NO | 02.03.2021 | ||
GR | 03.03.2021 | ||
PT | 05.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/35] | CZ | 02.12.2020 | |
FI | 02.12.2020 | ||
HR | 02.12.2020 | ||
LT | 02.12.2020 | ||
LV | 02.12.2020 | ||
PL | 02.12.2020 | ||
RO | 02.12.2020 | ||
RS | 02.12.2020 | ||
SE | 02.12.2020 | ||
SK | 02.12.2020 | ||
SM | 02.12.2020 | ||
BG | 02.03.2021 | ||
NO | 02.03.2021 | ||
GR | 03.03.2021 | ||
PT | 05.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/34] | CZ | 02.12.2020 | |
FI | 02.12.2020 | ||
HR | 02.12.2020 | ||
LT | 02.12.2020 | ||
LV | 02.12.2020 | ||
PL | 02.12.2020 | ||
RS | 02.12.2020 | ||
SE | 02.12.2020 | ||
SM | 02.12.2020 | ||
BG | 02.03.2021 | ||
NO | 02.03.2021 | ||
GR | 03.03.2021 | ||
PT | 05.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/33] | FI | 02.12.2020 | |
HR | 02.12.2020 | ||
LT | 02.12.2020 | ||
LV | 02.12.2020 | ||
PL | 02.12.2020 | ||
RS | 02.12.2020 | ||
SE | 02.12.2020 | ||
SM | 02.12.2020 | ||
BG | 02.03.2021 | ||
NO | 02.03.2021 | ||
GR | 03.03.2021 | ||
PT | 05.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/32] | FI | 02.12.2020 | |
HR | 02.12.2020 | ||
LV | 02.12.2020 | ||
PL | 02.12.2020 | ||
RS | 02.12.2020 | ||
SE | 02.12.2020 | ||
SM | 02.12.2020 | ||
BG | 02.03.2021 | ||
NO | 02.03.2021 | ||
GR | 03.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/28] | FI | 02.12.2020 | |
HR | 02.12.2020 | ||
LV | 02.12.2020 | ||
PL | 02.12.2020 | ||
RS | 02.12.2020 | ||
SE | 02.12.2020 | ||
BG | 02.03.2021 | ||
NO | 02.03.2021 | ||
GR | 03.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/25] | FI | 02.12.2020 | |
LV | 02.12.2020 | ||
PL | 02.12.2020 | ||
RS | 02.12.2020 | ||
SE | 02.12.2020 | ||
BG | 02.03.2021 | ||
NO | 02.03.2021 | ||
GR | 03.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/24] | FI | 02.12.2020 | |
LV | 02.12.2020 | ||
RS | 02.12.2020 | ||
SE | 02.12.2020 | ||
BG | 02.03.2021 | ||
NO | 02.03.2021 | ||
GR | 03.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/23] | FI | 02.12.2020 | |
LV | 02.12.2020 | ||
RS | 02.12.2020 | ||
SE | 02.12.2020 | ||
NO | 02.03.2021 | ||
GR | 03.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/22] | FI | 02.12.2020 | |
RS | 02.12.2020 | ||
NO | 02.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/20] | FI | 02.12.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI] - SUZANNE M. BAL ET AL, "Co-encapsulation of antigen and Toll-like receptor ligand in cationic liposomes affects the quality of the immune response in mice after intradermal vaccination", VACCINE, (20110101), vol. 29, no. 5, doi:10.1016/j.vaccine.2010.11.061, ISSN 0264-410X, pages 1045 - 1052, XP055165405 [X] 1-6,8,9,12-17 * abstract * * paragraphs [02.3] , [ 2.6] , [ 2.7]; figure 5 * * paragraph [0004] * [Y] 1-17 [I] 1-17 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.vaccine.2010.11.061 | [XYI] - M. MANSOUR ET AL, "Improved Efficacy of a Licensed Acellular Pertussis Vaccine, Reformulated in an Adjuvant Emulsion of Liposomes in Oil, in a Murine Model", CLINICAL AND VACCINE IMMUNOLOGY, (20070822), vol. 14, no. 10, doi:10.1128/CVI.00143-07, ISSN 1556-6811, pages 1381 - 1383, XP055025140 [X] 1-10,12-17 * page 1383 * [Y] 1-17 [I] 1-17 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/CVI.00143-07 | [IY] - DAFTARIAN P ET AL, "Eradication of established HPV 16-expressing tumors by a single administration of a vaccine composed of a liposome-encapsulated CTL-T helper fusion peptide in a water-in-oil emulsion", VACCINE, ELSEVIER LTD, GB, vol. 24, no. 24, doi:10.1016/J.VACCINE.2006.03.079, ISSN 0264-410X, (20060612), pages 5235 - 5244, (20060612), XP028010677 [I] 1-10,12,13,16 * abstract * * material & methods * [Y] 1-17 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.vaccine.2006.03.079 | [YP] - "Biochemicals Catalogue 2012 NEW: Tools for Toll-like receptor research Lipopeptides for Toll-like receptor 1 and 2 research Pam Cys-SKKKK and analogues 3", (20120328), URL: http://web.archive.org/web/20120328203424/http://www.microcollections.de/pdf/EMC Biochemicals 2012.pdf, (20150611), XP055195149 [YP] 1-17 * page 5 - page 7 * | [Y] - WILLIAM A ROSE ET AL, "FSL-1, a bacterial-derived toll-like receptor 2/6 agonist, enhances resistance to experimental HSV-2 infection", VIROLOGY JOURNAL, (20090101), vol. 6, no. 1, doi:10.1186/1743-422X-6-195, ISSN 1743-422X, page 195, XP055194654 [Y] 1-17 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1186/1743-422X-6-195 | [Y] - FOLKERT STEINHAGEN ET AL, "TLR-based immune adjuvants", VACCINE, ELSEVIER LTD, GB, vol. 29, no. 17, doi:10.1016/J.VACCINE.2010.08.002, ISSN 0264-410X, (20100801), pages 3341 - 3355, (20100807), XP028380413 [Y] 1-17 * p 3342, par 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.vaccine.2010.08.002 | [A] - KARKADA M ET AL, "A liposome-based platform, VacciMax<(>R), and its modified water-free platform DepoVax(TM) enhance efficacy of in vivo nucleic acid delivery", VACCINE, ELSEVIER LTD, GB, vol. 28, no. 38, ISSN 0264-410X, (20100831), pages 6176 - 6182, (20100723), XP027211923 [A] 1-17 * the whole document * | [A] - WEIGUANG ZENG ET AL, "Structural requirement for the agonist activity of the TLR2 ligand Pam2Cys", AMINO ACIDS ; THE FORUM FOR AMINO ACID AND PROTEIN RESEARCH, SPRINGER-VERLAG, VI, (20100121), vol. 39, no. 2, ISSN 1438-2199, pages 471 - 480, XP019853783 [A] 1-17 * the whole document * | [A] - MOYLE PETER M ET AL, "Self-adjuvanting lipopeptide vaccines", CURRENT MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, BENTHAM SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, NL, (20080101), vol. 15, no. 5, doi:10.2174/092986708783503249, ISSN 0929-8673, pages 506 - 516, XP009104575 [A] 1-17 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.2174/092986708783503249 | [A] - "Bacterial lipopeptides activate Toll-like receptors 1,2 and 6", Bacterial lipopeptides activate Toll-like receptors 1,2 and 6, (20030416), XP055195656 [A] 1 * abstract * | International search | [X]CA2542212 (IMMUNOVACCINE TECHNOLOGIES INC [CA]); | [X]CA2622464 (IMMUNOVACCINE TECHNOLOGIES INC [CA]); | [X] - HEURTAULT, B. ET AL., "Liposome-based systems for anti-tumor vaccination: influence of lipopeptide adjuvants.", J. LIPOSOME RESEARCH., (2006), vol. 16, pages 205 - 213, XP008173217 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1080/08982100600848736 | [Y] - MANSOUR, M. ET AL., "Improved efficacy of a licensed acellular pertussis vaccine, reformulated in an adjuvant emulsion of liposomes in oil, in a murine model.", CLIN. VACCINE IMMUNOL., (200710), vol. 14, no. 10, pages 1381 - 1383, XP055025140 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/CVI.00143-07 | [Y] - THUENG-IN, K. ET AL., "Heterosubtypic immunity to influenza mediated by liposome adjuvanted H5N1 recombinant protein vaccines.", VACCINE., (2010), vol. 28, pages 6765 - 6777, XP027267150 | Examination | WO2007041832 | WO2009072767 | WO2009146523 | US2010209452 | - Martina Barrenschee ET AL, "Effects of the TLR2 Agonists MALP-2 and Pam3Cys in Isolated Mouse Lungs", PLoS ONE, (20101116), vol. 5, no. 11, doi:10.1371/journal.pone.0013889, page e13889, XP055394881 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1371/journal.pone.0013889 | - KARKADA M ET AL, "A liposome-based platform, VacciMax^(R), and its modified water-free platform DepoVax(TM) enhance efficacy of in vivo nucleic acid delivery", VACCINE, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 28, no. 38, ISSN 0264-410X, (20100831), pages 6176 - 6182, (20100723), XP027211923 | - GENEVIEVE M. WEIR ET AL, "Combination of poly I:C and Pam3CSK4 enhances activation of B cells in vitro and boosts antibody responses to protein vaccines in vivo", PLOS ONE, (20170629), vol. 12, no. 6, doi:10.1371/journal.pone.0180073, page e0180073, XP055562079 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1371/journal.pone.0180073 | - Folkert Steinhagen ET AL, "TLR-based immune adjuvants", Vaccine, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20110401), vol. 29, no. 17, doi:10.1016/j.vaccine.2010.08.002, ISSN 0264-410X, pages 3341 - 3355, XP055562166 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.vaccine.2010.08.002 | - BESSLER W G ET AL, "BACTERIAL CELL WALL COMPONENTS AS IMMUNOMODULATORS-I LIPOPETPTIDES AS ADJUVANTS FRO PARENTERAL AND ORAL IMMUNIZATION", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF IMMUNOPHARMACOLOGY, ELMSFORD,NY, US, (19970101), vol. 19, no. 9/10, doi:10.1016/S0192-0561(97)00054-4, ISSN 0192-0561, pages 547 - 550, XP001015712 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0192-0561(97)00054-4 | - Steven A. Rosenberg ET AL, "Different Adjuvanticity of Incomplete Freund?s Adjuvant Derived From Beef or Vegetable Components in Melanoma Patients Immunized With a Peptide Vaccine", Journal of Immunotherapy, (20100701), vol. 33, no. 6, doi:10.1097/CJI.0b013e3181dac9de, ISSN 1524-9557, pages 626 - 629, XP055097740 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1097/CJI.0b013e3181dac9de | - KARKADA MOHAN ET AL, "A novel breast/ovarian cancer peptide vaccine platform that promotes specific type-1 but not Treg/Tr1-type responses", JOURNAL OF IMMUNOTHERAPY, RAVEN PRESS, NEW YORK, NY, US, (20100401), vol. 33, no. 3, doi:10.1097/CJI.0B013E3181C1F1E9, ISSN 1053-8550, pages 250 - 261, XP008152974 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1097/CJI.0b013e3181c1f1e9 | - FRANSEN F ET AL, "Agonists of toll-like receptors 3, 4, 7, and 9 are candidates for use as adjuvants in an outer membrane vaccine against Neisseria meningitidis serogroup B", INFECTION AND IMMUNITY, AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR MICROBIOLOGY, US, vol. 75, no. 12, doi:10.1128/IAI.00846-07, ISSN 0019-9567, (20071201), pages 5939 - 5946, (20071001), XP002717175 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/IAI.00846-07 |