EP2718845 - A SOCIAL NETWORK GRAPH BASED SENSOR DATA ANALYTICS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 06.09.2019 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2019 | Refusal of application | published on 09.10.2019 [2019/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tata Consultancy Services Ltd. Nirmal Building, 9th Floor Nariman Point Mumbai 400 021, Maharashtra / IN | [2014/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PAL, Arpan Tata Consultancy Services Plot A2 M2&N2 Sector V, Block GP, Salt Lake Electronics Complex Kolkata West Bengal 700091 / IN | 02 /
BHAUMIK, Chirabrata Tata Consultancy Services Plot A2 M2&N2 Sector V, Block GP, Salt Lake Electronics Complex Kolkata West Bengal 700091 / IN | 03 /
GHOSE, Avik Tata Consultancy Services Plot A2 M2&N2 Sector V, Block GP, Salt Lake Electronics Complex Kolkata West Bengal 700091 / IN | 04 /
SINHA, Priyanka Tata Consultancy Services Plot A2 M2&N2 Sector V, Block GP, Salt Lake Electronics Complex Kolkata West Bengal 700091 / IN | [2014/16] | Representative(s) | Lloyd, Patrick Alexander Desmond Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/16] | Lloyd, Patrick Alexander Desmond Reddie & Grose LLP 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 12838887.3 | 04.06.2012 | WO2012IN00392 | Priority number, date | IN2011MUM1691 | 09.06.2011 Original published format: IN 1691MU2011 | [2017/16] |
Former [2014/16] | INMM16912011 | 09.06.2011 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2013051009 | Date: | 11.04.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/15] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2718845 | Date: | 16.04.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.04.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 04.07.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.01.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q30/02, G06Q50/00 | [2015/09] | CPC: |
G06Q30/0201 (EP,US);
H04L67/535 (US);
G06Q50/01 (EP,US);
H04W4/70 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2014/16] | G06F17/18 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/16] | Title | German: | AUF GRAPHIKEN IN EINEM SOZIALEN NETZWERK BASIERENDE SENSORDATENANALYSE | [2014/16] | English: | A SOCIAL NETWORK GRAPH BASED SENSOR DATA ANALYTICS | [2014/16] | French: | ANALYSE DE DONNÉES DE DÉTECTION BASÉE SUR UN GRAPHIQUE DE RÉSEAU SOCIAL | [2014/16] | Entry into regional phase | 06.01.2014 | National basic fee paid | 06.01.2014 | Search fee paid | 06.01.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.01.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.01.2014 | Examination requested [2014/16] | 20.08.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.12.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.05.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.05.2019 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 14.05.2019 | 14.05.2019 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 21.05.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2019/41] | 31.05.2019 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2019/41] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.12.2015 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2019 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [Y]WO0124047 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL]); | [Y]US2009254633 (OLIVE BENTLEY J [US]); | [Y]US2010023300 (FARRY MICHAEL [US], et al); | [Y]US2011072052 (SKARIN BRUCE [US], et al) |