EP2767396 - NEAR INFRARED BLOCKING FILM AND NEAR INFRARED BLOCKING BODY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.10.2020 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.10.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.11.2020 [2020/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Konica Minolta, Inc. 2-7-2 Marunouchi Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-7015 / JP | [2014/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NOJIMA, Takahiko c/o Konica Minolta, Inc. 2-7-2 Marunouchi Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-7015 / JP | [2014/34] | Representative(s) | Gille Hrabal Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Patentanwälte Brucknerstraße 20 40593 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/34] | Gille Hrabal Brucknerstrasse 20 40593 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 12839382.4 | 12.10.2012 | WO2012JP76511 | Priority number, date | JP20110225156 | 12.10.2011 Original published format: JP 2011225156 | [2014/34] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013054912 | Date: | 18.04.2013 | Language: | JA | [2013/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2767396 | Date: | 20.08.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 18.04.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.03.2015 | Classification | IPC: | B32B27/18, B32B7/02, G02B5/28, G02B5/20 | [2015/18] | CPC: |
B32B27/08 (EP,US);
G02B5/282 (US);
B32B27/20 (EP,US);
B32B27/306 (EP,US);
G02B5/208 (EP,US);
G02B5/281 (EP,US);
B32B2250/24 (EP,US);
B32B2264/102 (EP,US);
B32B2307/418 (EP,US);
B32B2307/71 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2014/34] | B32B27/18, B32B7/02, G02B5/28 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/34] | Title | German: | NAHINFRAROTSPERRFILM UND NAHINFRAROTSPERRKÖRPER | [2014/34] | English: | NEAR INFRARED BLOCKING FILM AND NEAR INFRARED BLOCKING BODY | [2014/34] | French: | FILM DE BLOCAGE DE L'INFRAROUGE PROCHE ET CORPS DE BLOCAGE DE L'INFRAROUGE PROCHE | [2014/34] | Entry into regional phase | 11.04.2014 | Translation filed | 11.04.2014 | National basic fee paid | 11.04.2014 | Search fee paid | 11.04.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.04.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.04.2014 | Examination requested [2014/34] | 15.10.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.03.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.07.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.11.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.06.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/45] | 24.06.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2020/45] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.03.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]JP2009086659 (MITSUBISHI CHEM CORP) [X] 1,3,4,6,7,9,11,12 * abstract * [Y] 2,5,10 [I] 8; | [YA]EP1591804 (SDC TECHNOLOGIES ASIA LTD [JP]) [Y] 10 * paragraphs [0033] , [0037] * [A] 1; | [Y]EP2138462 (TAYCA CORP [JP]) [Y] 2 * paragraphs [0033] , [0037] *; | [Y]US2010208349 (BEER ROBERT [CH], et al) [Y] 5 * paragraphs [0093] - [0095] * | [ ] - "JP2009086659 HEAT RAY SHIELDING FILM AND LAMINATED BODY THEREOF", (20150316), URL: http://tfly.internal.epo.org/index.html?num=EP2767396&type=PN&FAM1=EP2767396/TXPEPEA&FAM2=US2014233092/TXPUSEA&FAM3=WO2013054912/TXPWOTEA&FAM4=CN104053546/TXPCNEA, (20150316), XP055176811 [ ] * paragraphs [0001] , [0059] - [0069] - [0093] - [0099] - [0105] , [0146]; figures 5,6 * | International search | [A]JP2009544491 (ILFORD IMAGING SWITZERLAND GMBH); | [A]JP2009086659 (MITSUBISHI CHEM CORP); | [A]JP2004169018 (JSR CORP); | [AP]WO2012014654 (KONICA MINOLTA HOLDINGS INC [JP], et al) | by applicant | JP2003266577 | JP2004123766 | JPH08110401 | JP2000053421 | JP2000063119 | JP2000204301 | JP4550753B | JPS61237681 | JPS63307979 | JPH07285265 | JPH079758 | JPH0825795 | JPS6110483 | JPS5774193 | JPS5787988 | JPS62261476 | JPS5774192 | JPS5787989 | JPS6072785 | JPS61146591 | JPH0195091 | JPH0313376 | JPS5942993 | JPS5952689 | JPS62280069 | JPS61242871 | JPH04219266 | JPS5714091 | JPS60219083 | JPS60219084 | JPS6120792 | JPS61188183 | JPS6317807 | JPH0493284 | JPH05278324 | JPH0692011 | JPH06183134 | JPH06297830 | JPH0781214 | JPH07101142 | JPH07179029 | JPH07137431 | WO9426530 | US2761419 | US2761791 | JPH11335121 | JP2011225156 | - "Items 72 to 75", Science Photograph Manual (Upper Part), MARUZEN CO., LTD. | - Basic Silver-halide Photography of Photographing Engineering, CORONA PUBLISHING CO., LTD., pages 119 - 124 | - "Item IX", RESEARCH DISCLOSURE, (197812), vol. 176, no. 17643 | - "Food Industry", Biochemistry Encyclopedia, TOKYO KAGAKU DOJIN CO., LTD, (1988), vol. 31, page 21 |