EP2767101 - COGNITIVE MOBILE TIME DIVISION DUPLEX AD-HOC NETWORK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.05.2016 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.05.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.06.2016 [2016/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states XG Technology, Inc. 240 S. Pineapple Avenue Suite 701 Sarasota, FL 34236 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2014/34] | For all designated states XG Technology, Inc. 240 S. Pineapple Avenue, Suite 701 Sarasota, FL 34236 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ALAPURANEN, Pertti 2020 Golden Arm Rd. Deltona, FL 32738 / US | [2014/34] | Representative(s) | Carvajal y Urquijo, Isabel, et al Clarke, Modet & Co. Suero de Quiñones, 34-36 28002 Madrid / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2014/34] | Carvajal y Urquijo, Isabel, et al Clarke, Modet & Co. C/ Goya, 11 28001 Madrid / ES | Application number, filing date | 12839607.4 | 08.10.2012 | WO2012US59181 | Priority number, date | US201161545940P | 11.10.2011 Original published format: US 201161545940 P | [2014/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013055614 | Date: | 18.04.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2767101 | Date: | 20.08.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.04.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 18.04.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.05.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H04W4/00, H04W84/20 | [2015/23] | CPC: |
H04L5/1484 (EP,US);
H04L5/0028 (EP,US);
H04L5/005 (EP,US);
H04W40/24 (EP,US);
H04W84/18 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2014/34] | H04W4/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/34] | Title | German: | MOBILES KOGNITIVES ZEITDUPLEX-ADHOC-NETZWERK | [2014/34] | English: | COGNITIVE MOBILE TIME DIVISION DUPLEX AD-HOC NETWORK | [2014/34] | French: | RÉSEAU AD HOC MOBILE COGNITIF À DUPLEXAGE PAR RÉPARTITION DANS LE TEMPS | [2014/34] | Entry into regional phase | 09.04.2014 | National basic fee paid | 09.04.2014 | Search fee paid | 09.04.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.04.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.04.2014 | Examination requested [2014/34] | 01.12.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/23] | 20.01.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2016/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2015 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAY]US2010272083 (ITOH KATSUTOSHI [JP] ET AL) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0048] - [0052] - [0 58] - [0060]; figures 3, 4, 5, 6, 12 * [A] 3 [Y] 2,4,5; | [YA]GB2423891 (ITT MFG ENTERPRISES INC [US]) [Y] 2,4,5 * page 11, line 16 - page 12, line 6 * * page 17, line 29 - line 33 * [A] 1,3; | [A]WO2009053375 (NOKIA SIEMENS NETWORKS OY [FI]; KOLDING TROELS [DK]; FREDERIKSEN FRANK) [A] 1-5 * page 4, line 15 - line 36 * * page 14, line 34 - page 15, line 4; figures 7, 8 * | International search | [Y]US2009279487 (REUMERMAN ET AL.); | [Y]US2007109989 (NAKAGAWA ET AL.); | [Y]US2008317047 (ZENG ET AL.); | [A]US2009303915 (HUANG ET AL.) |