EP2767486 - MULTILAYER STRUCTURE CONTAINER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.09.2017 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL, IS | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Toyo Seikan Group Holdings, Ltd. 18-1, Higashi-Gotanda 2-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-8627 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2014/34] | For all designated states Toyo Seikan Group Holdings, Ltd. 18-1, Higashi-Gotanda 2-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 1418627 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOMATSU, Ikuo c/o Toyo Seikan Co., Ltd. Technical Headquarters 1-70 Yako 1-chome Tsurumi-ku, Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 230-0001 / JP | 02 /
KIMOTSUKI, Eriko c/o Toyo Seikan Co., Ltd. Technical Headquarters 1-70 Yako 1-chome Tsurumi-ku, Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 230-0001 / JP | 03 /
HONDA, Jou c/o Toyo Seikan Co., Ltd. Technical Headquarters 1-70 Yako 1-chome Tsurumi-ku, Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 230-0001 / JP | [2014/34] | Representative(s) | J A Kemp LLP 80 Turnmill Street London EC1M 5QU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/34] | Raynor, Stuart Andrew J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 12839703.1 | 06.09.2012 | [2016/47] | WO2012JP72715 | Priority number, date | JP20110224194 | 11.10.2011 Original published format: JP 2011224194 | [2014/34] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013054616 | Date: | 18.04.2013 | Language: | JA | [2013/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2767486 | Date: | 20.08.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2767486 | Date: | 23.11.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 18.04.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.03.2015 | Classification | IPC: | B65D65/40, B32B27/32 | [2014/34] | CPC: |
B32B27/32 (EP,KR,US);
B65D1/00 (KR,US);
B65D1/40 (US);
B29C49/04108 (KR);
B32B1/00 (US);
B32B1/08 (EP,KR,US);
B32B27/08 (EP,US);
B32B27/30 (KR,US);
B32B27/306 (EP,US);
B32B27/327 (KR,US);
B32B7/12 (EP,KR,US);
B65D1/02 (US);
B65D1/0215 (EP,US);
B65D65/40 (KR,US);
C08L23/10 (KR);
B32B2250/05 (EP,KR,US);
B32B2250/246 (EP,KR,US);
B32B2250/40 (EP,KR,US);
B32B2270/00 (EP,KR,US);
B32B2307/54 (EP,KR,US);
B32B2307/558 (EP,KR,US);
B32B2307/72 (EP,US);
B32B2307/7244 (EP,KR,US);
B32B2439/60 (EP,KR,US);
B32B2439/70 (EP,KR,US);
Y10T428/1379 (EP,US);
Y10T428/1383 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31855 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31909 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31913 (EP,US);
Y10T428/3192 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/34] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BEHÄLTER MIT MEHRSCHICHTIGER STRUKTUR | [2014/34] | English: | MULTILAYER STRUCTURE CONTAINER | [2014/34] | French: | RÉCIPIENT À STRUCTURE MULTICOUCHE | [2014/34] | Entry into regional phase | 10.03.2014 | Translation filed | 10.03.2014 | National basic fee paid | 10.03.2014 | Search fee paid | 10.03.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.03.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.03.2014 | Examination requested [2014/34] | 19.10.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.06.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.10.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 14.10.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.10.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.06.2016 | Opposition(s) | 24.08.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 06.09.2012 | AL | 23.11.2016 | AT | 23.11.2016 | BE | 23.11.2016 | CY | 23.11.2016 | CZ | 23.11.2016 | DK | 23.11.2016 | EE | 23.11.2016 | ES | 23.11.2016 | FI | 23.11.2016 | HR | 23.11.2016 | IT | 23.11.2016 | LT | 23.11.2016 | LV | 23.11.2016 | MC | 23.11.2016 | MK | 23.11.2016 | NL | 23.11.2016 | PL | 23.11.2016 | RO | 23.11.2016 | RS | 23.11.2016 | SE | 23.11.2016 | SI | 23.11.2016 | SK | 23.11.2016 | SM | 23.11.2016 | TR | 23.11.2016 | BG | 23.02.2017 | NO | 23.02.2017 | GR | 24.02.2017 | IS | 23.03.2017 | PT | 23.03.2017 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 06.09.2012 | |
AT | 23.11.2016 | ||
BE | 23.11.2016 | ||
CY | 23.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 23.11.2016 | ||
DK | 23.11.2016 | ||
EE | 23.11.2016 | ||
ES | 23.11.2016 | ||
FI | 23.11.2016 | ||
HR | 23.11.2016 | ||
IT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LV | 23.11.2016 | ||
MC | 23.11.2016 | ||
MK | 23.11.2016 | ||
NL | 23.11.2016 | ||
PL | 23.11.2016 | ||
RO | 23.11.2016 | ||
RS | 23.11.2016 | ||
SE | 23.11.2016 | ||
SI | 23.11.2016 | ||
SK | 23.11.2016 | ||
SM | 23.11.2016 | ||
TR | 23.11.2016 | ||
BG | 23.02.2017 | ||
NO | 23.02.2017 | ||
GR | 24.02.2017 | ||
PT | 23.03.2017 | ||
Former [2019/51] | HU | 06.09.2012 | |
AT | 23.11.2016 | ||
BE | 23.11.2016 | ||
CY | 23.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 23.11.2016 | ||
DK | 23.11.2016 | ||
EE | 23.11.2016 | ||
ES | 23.11.2016 | ||
FI | 23.11.2016 | ||
HR | 23.11.2016 | ||
IT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LV | 23.11.2016 | ||
MC | 23.11.2016 | ||
MK | 23.11.2016 | ||
NL | 23.11.2016 | ||
PL | 23.11.2016 | ||
RO | 23.11.2016 | ||
RS | 23.11.2016 | ||
SE | 23.11.2016 | ||
SI | 23.11.2016 | ||
SK | 23.11.2016 | ||
SM | 23.11.2016 | ||
BG | 23.02.2017 | ||
NO | 23.02.2017 | ||
GR | 24.02.2017 | ||
PT | 23.03.2017 | ||
Former [2019/47] | HU | 06.09.2012 | |
AT | 23.11.2016 | ||
BE | 23.11.2016 | ||
CY | 23.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 23.11.2016 | ||
DK | 23.11.2016 | ||
EE | 23.11.2016 | ||
ES | 23.11.2016 | ||
FI | 23.11.2016 | ||
HR | 23.11.2016 | ||
IT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LV | 23.11.2016 | ||
MC | 23.11.2016 | ||
NL | 23.11.2016 | ||
PL | 23.11.2016 | ||
RO | 23.11.2016 | ||
RS | 23.11.2016 | ||
SE | 23.11.2016 | ||
SI | 23.11.2016 | ||
SK | 23.11.2016 | ||
SM | 23.11.2016 | ||
BG | 23.02.2017 | ||
NO | 23.02.2017 | ||
GR | 24.02.2017 | ||
PT | 23.03.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 06.09.2012 | |
AT | 23.11.2016 | ||
BE | 23.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 23.11.2016 | ||
DK | 23.11.2016 | ||
EE | 23.11.2016 | ||
ES | 23.11.2016 | ||
FI | 23.11.2016 | ||
HR | 23.11.2016 | ||
IT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LV | 23.11.2016 | ||
MC | 23.11.2016 | ||
NL | 23.11.2016 | ||
PL | 23.11.2016 | ||
RO | 23.11.2016 | ||
RS | 23.11.2016 | ||
SE | 23.11.2016 | ||
SI | 23.11.2016 | ||
SK | 23.11.2016 | ||
SM | 23.11.2016 | ||
BG | 23.02.2017 | ||
NO | 23.02.2017 | ||
GR | 24.02.2017 | ||
PT | 23.03.2017 | ||
Former [2018/29] | AT | 23.11.2016 | |
BE | 23.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 23.11.2016 | ||
DK | 23.11.2016 | ||
EE | 23.11.2016 | ||
ES | 23.11.2016 | ||
FI | 23.11.2016 | ||
HR | 23.11.2016 | ||
IT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LV | 23.11.2016 | ||
MC | 23.11.2016 | ||
NL | 23.11.2016 | ||
PL | 23.11.2016 | ||
RO | 23.11.2016 | ||
RS | 23.11.2016 | ||
SE | 23.11.2016 | ||
SI | 23.11.2016 | ||
SK | 23.11.2016 | ||
SM | 23.11.2016 | ||
BG | 23.02.2017 | ||
NO | 23.02.2017 | ||
GR | 24.02.2017 | ||
PT | 23.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/52] | AT | 23.11.2016 | |
BE | 23.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 23.11.2016 | ||
DK | 23.11.2016 | ||
EE | 23.11.2016 | ||
ES | 23.11.2016 | ||
FI | 23.11.2016 | ||
HR | 23.11.2016 | ||
IT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LV | 23.11.2016 | ||
NL | 23.11.2016 | ||
PL | 23.11.2016 | ||
RO | 23.11.2016 | ||
RS | 23.11.2016 | ||
SE | 23.11.2016 | ||
SI | 23.11.2016 | ||
SK | 23.11.2016 | ||
SM | 23.11.2016 | ||
BG | 23.02.2017 | ||
NO | 23.02.2017 | ||
GR | 24.02.2017 | ||
PT | 23.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/38] | AT | 23.11.2016 | |
BE | 23.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 23.11.2016 | ||
DK | 23.11.2016 | ||
EE | 23.11.2016 | ||
ES | 23.11.2016 | ||
FI | 23.11.2016 | ||
HR | 23.11.2016 | ||
IT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LV | 23.11.2016 | ||
NL | 23.11.2016 | ||
PL | 23.11.2016 | ||
RO | 23.11.2016 | ||
RS | 23.11.2016 | ||
SE | 23.11.2016 | ||
SK | 23.11.2016 | ||
SM | 23.11.2016 | ||
BG | 23.02.2017 | ||
NO | 23.02.2017 | ||
GR | 24.02.2017 | ||
PT | 23.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 23.11.2016 | |
BE | 23.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 23.11.2016 | ||
DK | 23.11.2016 | ||
EE | 23.11.2016 | ||
ES | 23.11.2016 | ||
FI | 23.11.2016 | ||
HR | 23.11.2016 | ||
IT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LV | 23.11.2016 | ||
NL | 23.11.2016 | ||
PL | 23.11.2016 | ||
RO | 23.11.2016 | ||
RS | 23.11.2016 | ||
SE | 23.11.2016 | ||
SK | 23.11.2016 | ||
SM | 23.11.2016 | ||
NO | 23.02.2017 | ||
GR | 24.02.2017 | ||
PT | 23.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/36] | AT | 23.11.2016 | |
BE | 23.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 23.11.2016 | ||
DK | 23.11.2016 | ||
EE | 23.11.2016 | ||
ES | 23.11.2016 | ||
FI | 23.11.2016 | ||
HR | 23.11.2016 | ||
LT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LV | 23.11.2016 | ||
NL | 23.11.2016 | ||
PL | 23.11.2016 | ||
RO | 23.11.2016 | ||
RS | 23.11.2016 | ||
SE | 23.11.2016 | ||
SK | 23.11.2016 | ||
NO | 23.02.2017 | ||
GR | 24.02.2017 | ||
PT | 23.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/33] | AT | 23.11.2016 | |
DK | 23.11.2016 | ||
ES | 23.11.2016 | ||
FI | 23.11.2016 | ||
HR | 23.11.2016 | ||
LT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LV | 23.11.2016 | ||
NL | 23.11.2016 | ||
PL | 23.11.2016 | ||
RS | 23.11.2016 | ||
SE | 23.11.2016 | ||
NO | 23.02.2017 | ||
GR | 24.02.2017 | ||
PT | 23.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/26] | AT | 23.11.2016 | |
ES | 23.11.2016 | ||
FI | 23.11.2016 | ||
HR | 23.11.2016 | ||
LT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LV | 23.11.2016 | ||
NL | 23.11.2016 | ||
PL | 23.11.2016 | ||
RS | 23.11.2016 | ||
SE | 23.11.2016 | ||
NO | 23.02.2017 | ||
GR | 24.02.2017 | ||
PT | 23.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/12] | LV | 23.11.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2081723 (ACC CHEM CO, et al) [A] 1,2 * claims 1, 6 *; | [IA]EP0179639 (OWENS ILLINOIS INC [US]) [I] 1,3-5 * page 7, line 26 - page 8, line 5 * * page 3, line 9 - line 18 * * claim 3 * [A] 2; | [A]WO0114123 (LOCTITE CORP [US], et al) [A] 1-5 * page 6, line 5 - page 7, line 4 * * page 7, line 25 - page 8, line 6 * * page 9, line 1 - line 8 *; | [A]WO2007047134 (EXXONMOBIL OIL CORP [US], et al) [A] 1* claims 1, 5, 10 * | International search | [A]JPS5753578 (CHEMPLEX CO); | [A]JPS58103569 (CHEMPLEX CO); | [A]JPS5981167 (TOYO SEIKAN KAISHA LTD); | [A]JPH01217091 (NISSHIN STEEL CO LTD); | [A]WO2010029968 (TOYO SEIKAN KAISHA LTD [JP], et al); | [A]WO2010103985 (TOYO SEIKAN KAISHA LTD [JP], et al) | by applicant | JP2003266619 | JP2010189052 | JP2011025964 |