EP2766421 - STABILIZED LEVULINIC ESTER KETALS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.06.2019 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 29.06.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.03.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 31.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, MK | published on 05.08.2020 [2020/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GFBiochemicals IP Assets B.V. Burgemeester Lemmensstraat 358 6163 JT Geleen / NL | [2018/30] |
Former [2016/20] | For all designated states GFBiochemicals Limited 168, St. Christopher Street Valletta VLT 1467 / MT | ||
Former [2014/34] | For all designated states Segetis, Inc. 680 Mendelsshon Avenue N. Golden Valley, MN 55427 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MULLEN, Brian, D. 825 Amur Circle Delano, MN 55328 / US | 02 /
BADARINARAYANA, Vivek 1510 Zarthan Avenue S. Unit 111 St. Louis Park, MN 55416 / US | 03 /
HALL, Eric, S. 11605 44th Place N. Plymouth, MN 55442 / US | 04 /
TJOSSAS, Matthew, J. 1310 W. 28th Street Apt. 1 Minneapolis, MN 55408 / US | 05 /
LEIBIG, Cora, M. 15892 80th Place N. Maple Grove, MN 55311 / US | [2014/34] | Representative(s) | FRKelly Waterways House Grand Canal Quay Dublin D02 PD39 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/31] | FRKelly 27 Clyde Road Dublin D04 F838 / IE | ||
Former [2014/34] | Jennings, Tara Romaine FRKelly 27 Clyde Road Dublin 4 / IE | Application number, filing date | 12839774.2 | 10.10.2012 | [2018/31] | WO2012US59537 | Priority number, date | US201161545849P | 11.10.2011 Original published format: US 201161545849 P | US201213648252 | 09.10.2012 Original published format: US201213648252 | [2014/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013055781 | Date: | 18.04.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2766421 | Date: | 20.08.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.04.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2766421 | Date: | 01.08.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 18.04.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.06.2015 | Classification | IPC: | C07D317/30, C08K5/156, C08L101/00 | [2018/09] | CPC: |
C07D317/30 (EP,US);
C09D7/48 (EP,US);
C09D7/65 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2014/34] | C08K5/156, C08K5/12, C07D323/00, C08L101/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/34] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STABILISIERTE LEVULINIC-ESTERKETALE | [2014/34] | English: | STABILIZED LEVULINIC ESTER KETALS | [2014/34] | French: | CÉTALS D'ESTERS DE L'ACIDE LÉVULINIQUE STABILISÉS | [2014/34] | Entry into regional phase | 12.05.2014 | National basic fee paid | 12.05.2014 | Search fee paid | 12.05.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.05.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.05.2014 | Examination requested [2014/34] | 16.12.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.03.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.08.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.11.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 16.01.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.03.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.06.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 14.06.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.06.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 31.03.2017 | Opposition(s) | 03.05.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2017 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   19.01.2018 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 10.10.2012 | AL | 01.08.2018 | AT | 01.08.2018 | CY | 01.08.2018 | CZ | 01.08.2018 | DK | 01.08.2018 | EE | 01.08.2018 | ES | 01.08.2018 | FI | 01.08.2018 | HR | 01.08.2018 | IT | 01.08.2018 | LT | 01.08.2018 | LV | 01.08.2018 | MC | 01.08.2018 | MK | 01.08.2018 | NL | 01.08.2018 | PL | 01.08.2018 | PT | 01.08.2018 | RO | 01.08.2018 | RS | 01.08.2018 | SE | 01.08.2018 | SI | 01.08.2018 | SK | 01.08.2018 | SM | 01.08.2018 | TR | 01.08.2018 | IE | 10.10.2018 | LU | 10.10.2018 | MT | 10.10.2018 | BE | 31.10.2018 | CH | 31.10.2018 | LI | 31.10.2018 | BG | 01.11.2018 | NO | 01.11.2018 | GR | 02.11.2018 | IS | 01.12.2018 | [2020/31] |
Former [2020/30] | HU | 10.10.2012 | |
AL | 01.08.2018 | ||
AT | 01.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 01.08.2018 | ||
DK | 01.08.2018 | ||
EE | 01.08.2018 | ||
ES | 01.08.2018 | ||
FI | 01.08.2018 | ||
HR | 01.08.2018 | ||
IT | 01.08.2018 | ||
LT | 01.08.2018 | ||
LV | 01.08.2018 | ||
MC | 01.08.2018 | ||
NL | 01.08.2018 | ||
PL | 01.08.2018 | ||
PT | 01.08.2018 | ||
RO | 01.08.2018 | ||
RS | 01.08.2018 | ||
SE | 01.08.2018 | ||
SI | 01.08.2018 | ||
SK | 01.08.2018 | ||
SM | 01.08.2018 | ||
TR | 01.08.2018 | ||
IE | 10.10.2018 | ||
LU | 10.10.2018 | ||
MT | 10.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
CH | 31.10.2018 | ||
LI | 31.10.2018 | ||
BG | 01.11.2018 | ||
NO | 01.11.2018 | ||
GR | 02.11.2018 | ||
IS | 01.12.2018 | ||
Former [2020/28] | AL | 01.08.2018 | |
AT | 01.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 01.08.2018 | ||
DK | 01.08.2018 | ||
EE | 01.08.2018 | ||
ES | 01.08.2018 | ||
FI | 01.08.2018 | ||
HR | 01.08.2018 | ||
IT | 01.08.2018 | ||
LT | 01.08.2018 | ||
LV | 01.08.2018 | ||
MC | 01.08.2018 | ||
NL | 01.08.2018 | ||
PL | 01.08.2018 | ||
PT | 01.08.2018 | ||
RO | 01.08.2018 | ||
RS | 01.08.2018 | ||
SE | 01.08.2018 | ||
SI | 01.08.2018 | ||
SK | 01.08.2018 | ||
SM | 01.08.2018 | ||
TR | 01.08.2018 | ||
IE | 10.10.2018 | ||
LU | 10.10.2018 | ||
MT | 10.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
CH | 31.10.2018 | ||
LI | 31.10.2018 | ||
BG | 01.11.2018 | ||
NO | 01.11.2018 | ||
GR | 02.11.2018 | ||
IS | 01.12.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AL | 01.08.2018 | |
AT | 01.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 01.08.2018 | ||
DK | 01.08.2018 | ||
EE | 01.08.2018 | ||
ES | 01.08.2018 | ||
FI | 01.08.2018 | ||
HR | 01.08.2018 | ||
IT | 01.08.2018 | ||
LT | 01.08.2018 | ||
LV | 01.08.2018 | ||
MC | 01.08.2018 | ||
NL | 01.08.2018 | ||
PL | 01.08.2018 | ||
RO | 01.08.2018 | ||
RS | 01.08.2018 | ||
SE | 01.08.2018 | ||
SI | 01.08.2018 | ||
SK | 01.08.2018 | ||
SM | 01.08.2018 | ||
TR | 01.08.2018 | ||
IE | 10.10.2018 | ||
LU | 10.10.2018 | ||
MT | 10.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
CH | 31.10.2018 | ||
LI | 31.10.2018 | ||
BG | 01.11.2018 | ||
NO | 01.11.2018 | ||
GR | 02.11.2018 | ||
IS | 01.12.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AL | 01.08.2018 | |
AT | 01.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 01.08.2018 | ||
DK | 01.08.2018 | ||
EE | 01.08.2018 | ||
ES | 01.08.2018 | ||
FI | 01.08.2018 | ||
HR | 01.08.2018 | ||
IT | 01.08.2018 | ||
LT | 01.08.2018 | ||
LV | 01.08.2018 | ||
MC | 01.08.2018 | ||
NL | 01.08.2018 | ||
PL | 01.08.2018 | ||
RO | 01.08.2018 | ||
RS | 01.08.2018 | ||
SE | 01.08.2018 | ||
SI | 01.08.2018 | ||
SK | 01.08.2018 | ||
SM | 01.08.2018 | ||
IE | 10.10.2018 | ||
LU | 10.10.2018 | ||
MT | 10.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
CH | 31.10.2018 | ||
LI | 31.10.2018 | ||
BG | 01.11.2018 | ||
NO | 01.11.2018 | ||
GR | 02.11.2018 | ||
IS | 01.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/48] | AL | 01.08.2018 | |
AT | 01.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 01.08.2018 | ||
DK | 01.08.2018 | ||
EE | 01.08.2018 | ||
ES | 01.08.2018 | ||
FI | 01.08.2018 | ||
HR | 01.08.2018 | ||
IT | 01.08.2018 | ||
LT | 01.08.2018 | ||
LV | 01.08.2018 | ||
MC | 01.08.2018 | ||
NL | 01.08.2018 | ||
PL | 01.08.2018 | ||
RO | 01.08.2018 | ||
RS | 01.08.2018 | ||
SE | 01.08.2018 | ||
SI | 01.08.2018 | ||
SK | 01.08.2018 | ||
SM | 01.08.2018 | ||
IE | 10.10.2018 | ||
LU | 10.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
CH | 31.10.2018 | ||
LI | 31.10.2018 | ||
BG | 01.11.2018 | ||
NO | 01.11.2018 | ||
GR | 02.11.2018 | ||
IS | 01.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AL | 01.08.2018 | |
AT | 01.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 01.08.2018 | ||
DK | 01.08.2018 | ||
EE | 01.08.2018 | ||
ES | 01.08.2018 | ||
FI | 01.08.2018 | ||
HR | 01.08.2018 | ||
IT | 01.08.2018 | ||
LT | 01.08.2018 | ||
LV | 01.08.2018 | ||
MC | 01.08.2018 | ||
NL | 01.08.2018 | ||
PL | 01.08.2018 | ||
RO | 01.08.2018 | ||
RS | 01.08.2018 | ||
SE | 01.08.2018 | ||
SI | 01.08.2018 | ||
SK | 01.08.2018 | ||
SM | 01.08.2018 | ||
LU | 10.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
CH | 31.10.2018 | ||
LI | 31.10.2018 | ||
BG | 01.11.2018 | ||
NO | 01.11.2018 | ||
GR | 02.11.2018 | ||
IS | 01.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/38] | AL | 01.08.2018 | |
AT | 01.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 01.08.2018 | ||
DK | 01.08.2018 | ||
EE | 01.08.2018 | ||
ES | 01.08.2018 | ||
FI | 01.08.2018 | ||
HR | 01.08.2018 | ||
IT | 01.08.2018 | ||
LT | 01.08.2018 | ||
LV | 01.08.2018 | ||
MC | 01.08.2018 | ||
NL | 01.08.2018 | ||
PL | 01.08.2018 | ||
RO | 01.08.2018 | ||
RS | 01.08.2018 | ||
SE | 01.08.2018 | ||
SI | 01.08.2018 | ||
SK | 01.08.2018 | ||
SM | 01.08.2018 | ||
LU | 10.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
BG | 01.11.2018 | ||
NO | 01.11.2018 | ||
GR | 02.11.2018 | ||
IS | 01.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AL | 01.08.2018 | |
AT | 01.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 01.08.2018 | ||
DK | 01.08.2018 | ||
EE | 01.08.2018 | ||
ES | 01.08.2018 | ||
FI | 01.08.2018 | ||
HR | 01.08.2018 | ||
IT | 01.08.2018 | ||
LT | 01.08.2018 | ||
LV | 01.08.2018 | ||
MC | 01.08.2018 | ||
NL | 01.08.2018 | ||
PL | 01.08.2018 | ||
RO | 01.08.2018 | ||
RS | 01.08.2018 | ||
SE | 01.08.2018 | ||
SI | 01.08.2018 | ||
SK | 01.08.2018 | ||
SM | 01.08.2018 | ||
LU | 10.10.2018 | ||
BG | 01.11.2018 | ||
NO | 01.11.2018 | ||
GR | 02.11.2018 | ||
IS | 01.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/30] | AL | 01.08.2018 | |
AT | 01.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 01.08.2018 | ||
DK | 01.08.2018 | ||
EE | 01.08.2018 | ||
ES | 01.08.2018 | ||
FI | 01.08.2018 | ||
HR | 01.08.2018 | ||
IT | 01.08.2018 | ||
LT | 01.08.2018 | ||
LV | 01.08.2018 | ||
MC | 01.08.2018 | ||
NL | 01.08.2018 | ||
PL | 01.08.2018 | ||
RO | 01.08.2018 | ||
RS | 01.08.2018 | ||
SE | 01.08.2018 | ||
SK | 01.08.2018 | ||
SM | 01.08.2018 | ||
LU | 10.10.2018 | ||
BG | 01.11.2018 | ||
NO | 01.11.2018 | ||
GR | 02.11.2018 | ||
IS | 01.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/28] | AL | 01.08.2018 | |
AT | 01.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 01.08.2018 | ||
DK | 01.08.2018 | ||
EE | 01.08.2018 | ||
ES | 01.08.2018 | ||
FI | 01.08.2018 | ||
HR | 01.08.2018 | ||
IT | 01.08.2018 | ||
LT | 01.08.2018 | ||
LV | 01.08.2018 | ||
MC | 01.08.2018 | ||
NL | 01.08.2018 | ||
PL | 01.08.2018 | ||
RO | 01.08.2018 | ||
RS | 01.08.2018 | ||
SE | 01.08.2018 | ||
SK | 01.08.2018 | ||
SM | 01.08.2018 | ||
BG | 01.11.2018 | ||
NO | 01.11.2018 | ||
GR | 02.11.2018 | ||
IS | 01.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 01.08.2018 | |
AT | 01.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 01.08.2018 | ||
DK | 01.08.2018 | ||
EE | 01.08.2018 | ||
ES | 01.08.2018 | ||
FI | 01.08.2018 | ||
HR | 01.08.2018 | ||
IT | 01.08.2018 | ||
LT | 01.08.2018 | ||
LV | 01.08.2018 | ||
NL | 01.08.2018 | ||
PL | 01.08.2018 | ||
RO | 01.08.2018 | ||
RS | 01.08.2018 | ||
SE | 01.08.2018 | ||
SK | 01.08.2018 | ||
SM | 01.08.2018 | ||
BG | 01.11.2018 | ||
NO | 01.11.2018 | ||
GR | 02.11.2018 | ||
IS | 01.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/23] | AL | 01.08.2018 | |
AT | 01.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 01.08.2018 | ||
EE | 01.08.2018 | ||
ES | 01.08.2018 | ||
FI | 01.08.2018 | ||
HR | 01.08.2018 | ||
IT | 01.08.2018 | ||
LT | 01.08.2018 | ||
LV | 01.08.2018 | ||
NL | 01.08.2018 | ||
PL | 01.08.2018 | ||
RO | 01.08.2018 | ||
RS | 01.08.2018 | ||
SE | 01.08.2018 | ||
SK | 01.08.2018 | ||
BG | 01.11.2018 | ||
NO | 01.11.2018 | ||
GR | 02.11.2018 | ||
IS | 01.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/22] | AL | 01.08.2018 | |
AT | 01.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 01.08.2018 | ||
FI | 01.08.2018 | ||
HR | 01.08.2018 | ||
IT | 01.08.2018 | ||
LT | 01.08.2018 | ||
LV | 01.08.2018 | ||
NL | 01.08.2018 | ||
PL | 01.08.2018 | ||
RO | 01.08.2018 | ||
RS | 01.08.2018 | ||
SE | 01.08.2018 | ||
BG | 01.11.2018 | ||
NO | 01.11.2018 | ||
GR | 02.11.2018 | ||
IS | 01.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/21] | AL | 01.08.2018 | |
AT | 01.08.2018 | ||
FI | 01.08.2018 | ||
HR | 01.08.2018 | ||
IT | 01.08.2018 | ||
LT | 01.08.2018 | ||
LV | 01.08.2018 | ||
NL | 01.08.2018 | ||
PL | 01.08.2018 | ||
RS | 01.08.2018 | ||
SE | 01.08.2018 | ||
BG | 01.11.2018 | ||
NO | 01.11.2018 | ||
GR | 02.11.2018 | ||
IS | 01.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AL | 01.08.2018 | |
AT | 01.08.2018 | ||
FI | 01.08.2018 | ||
HR | 01.08.2018 | ||
LT | 01.08.2018 | ||
LV | 01.08.2018 | ||
NL | 01.08.2018 | ||
PL | 01.08.2018 | ||
RS | 01.08.2018 | ||
SE | 01.08.2018 | ||
BG | 01.11.2018 | ||
NO | 01.11.2018 | ||
GR | 02.11.2018 | ||
IS | 01.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | AT | 01.08.2018 | |
FI | 01.08.2018 | ||
HR | 01.08.2018 | ||
LT | 01.08.2018 | ||
NL | 01.08.2018 | ||
PL | 01.08.2018 | ||
RS | 01.08.2018 | ||
SE | 01.08.2018 | ||
BG | 01.11.2018 | ||
NO | 01.11.2018 | ||
GR | 02.11.2018 | ||
IS | 01.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | AT | 01.08.2018 | |
FI | 01.08.2018 | ||
LT | 01.08.2018 | ||
NL | 01.08.2018 | ||
PL | 01.08.2018 | ||
RS | 01.08.2018 | ||
SE | 01.08.2018 | ||
BG | 01.11.2018 | ||
NO | 01.11.2018 | ||
GR | 02.11.2018 | ||
IS | 01.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | FI | 01.08.2018 | |
LT | 01.08.2018 | ||
NL | 01.08.2018 | ||
NO | 01.11.2018 | ||
IS | 01.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | FI | 01.08.2018 | |
LT | 01.08.2018 | ||
NO | 01.11.2018 | ||
IS | 01.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/07] | LT | 01.08.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4737426 (ROTH MARTIN [CH]) [X] 1,3,4,9,10,13,15 * Column 10, example 1. *; | [XI]WO2010151558 (SEGETIS INC [US], et al) [X] 1-5,15 * Claims 8, 35; page 28, example 2; page 9, line to page 10, line 5; page 18, line 23 to page 19, line 20; page 20, lines 16-32. * [I] 9-13; | [XP]WO2012065114 (SEGETIS INC [US], et al) [XP] 1-5,15 * Pages 41-42, paragraphs 00124-00125: examples 33-35. *; | [A] - Ciba Inc., "Ciba IRGAFOS 168", (19990901), pages 1 - 2, URL: http://shanghaiguanan.com/pic/2014916113835287.pdf, (20150520), XP055190389 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | International search | [A]WO2009032905 (SEGETIS INC [US], et al); | [A]WO2010036884 (SEGETIS INC [US], et al); | [X]WO2010151558 (SEGETIS INC [US], et al); | [A]WO2011032095 (SEGETIS INC [US], et al); | [A] - LEIBIG, C. ET AL., "Cellulosic-derived levulinic ketal esters: a new building block", RENEWABLE AND SUSTAINABLE POLYMERS. AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, (20110421), pages 111 - 116, XP055160966 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/bk-2011-1063.ch007 | by applicant | SU722912 | JPH022989 | US5998092 | US2008242721 | WO2009048874 | - CAREY, F. A.; SUNDBERG, R. J., Advanced Organic Chemistry Part B: Reactions and Synthesis, Plenum Press, (19830000), page 544 | - CHIRILA, Revistade Chimie, (19770000), vol. 28, no. 8, pages 730 - 733 | - GELAS, Carbohydrate Research, (19730000), vol. 30, no. 1, pages 21 - 34 | WO2008US75225 | WO2008US79083 | WO2008US79337 |