EP2768390 - IMPLANTABLE OXIMETRIC MEASUREMENT APPARATUS AND METHOD OF USE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.08.2021 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 29.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.08.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.09.2021 [2021/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Incube Labs, LLC 2051 Ringwood Avenue San Jose, CA 95131 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2014/35] | For all designated states Incube Labs, Llc 2051 Ringwood Avenue San Jose, CA 95131 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
IMRAN, Mir 12894 Brendel Drive Los Altos Hills, CA 94022 / US | [2014/35] | Representative(s) | Forrest, Stuart, et al WP Thompson 138 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/35] | Clark, Jane Anne Mathys & Squire LLP The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | Application number, filing date | 12840942.2 | 22.10.2012 | WO2012US61394 | Priority number, date | US201161627999P | 21.10.2011 Original published format: US 201161627999 P | [2014/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013059832 | Date: | 25.04.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2768390 | Date: | 27.08.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.04.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 25.04.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.08.2015 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/145, A61B5/1459 | [2014/35] | CPC: |
A61B5/1459 (EP,US);
A61B5/0031 (EP,US);
A61B2560/063 (EP,US);
A61B2562/162 (EP,US);
A61B5/14551 (EP,US);
A61B5/6861 (EP,US);
A61B5/6884 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/35] | Title | German: | IMPLANTIERBARE OXYMETRISCHE MESSVORRICHTUNG UND VERWENDUNGSVERFAHREN | [2014/35] | English: | IMPLANTABLE OXIMETRIC MEASUREMENT APPARATUS AND METHOD OF USE | [2014/35] | French: | APPAREIL DE MESURE OXYMÉTRIQUE IMPLANTABLE ET SON PROCÉDÉ D'UTILISATION | [2014/35] | Entry into regional phase | 30.04.2014 | National basic fee paid | 30.04.2014 | Search fee paid | 30.04.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.04.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.04.2014 | Examination requested [2014/35] | 18.03.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.06.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.10.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.01.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.05.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.05.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/39] | 26.05.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2021/39] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.06.2018 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2020 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2007027371 (BENARON DAVID A [US], et al) [X] 1-6,8-11,14,15 * paragraphs [0041] , [0063] - [0072]; figure 1; claim 9 * [I] 7,12,13; | [A]US2004176669 (COLVIN ARTHUR E [US]) [A] 1,3,4 * paragraph [0170] *; | [A]US2003004457 (ANDERSSON STIG O [US]) [A] 3,4 * abstract *; | [A]US2010331868 (BARDY GUST H [US]) [A] 3,4 * abstract * | International search | [Y]US2009292212 (FERREN BRAN [US], et al); | [Y]US2011190600 (MCKENNA EDWARD M [US], et al); | [A]US2010312188 (ROBERTSON TIMOTHY [US], et al); | [A]US2010185142 (KAMEN DEAN [US], et al) | by applicant | US2007027371 |