EP2769580 - PCRN ROAMING AGREEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.10.2019 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 16.11.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.07.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.10.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Alcatel Lucent Site Nokia Paris Saclay Route de Villejust 91620 Nozay / FR | [2018/51] |
Former [2018/16] | For all designated states Alcatel Lucent Site Nokia Paris Saclay Route de Villejust 91620 Nozay / FR | ||
Former [2014/35] | For all designated states ALCATEL LUCENT 148/152 route de la Reine 92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VRBASKI, Mira 20 Gateshead Avenue Kanata, Ontario K2K 3A9 / CA | 02 /
YEUNG, Lui 712 Kilmar Crescent Kanata, Ontario K2T 0B1 / CA | 03 /
MANN, Robert 170 Rivington Street Carp, Ontario K0A 1L0 / CA | 04 /
LALSETA, Sachin 55 Nestow Drive Ottawa, Ontario K2G 4M3 / CA | 05 /
MOHEBI-SARMADI, Partoo 812-1100 Ambleside Drive Ottawa, Ontario K2B 8G6 / CA | 06 /
MA, Haiqing 321 Haileybury Street Nepean, Ontario K2J 0N1 / CA | 07 /
SIDDAM, Kalyan Premchand 36 Baypointe Crescent Nepean, Ontario K2G 6R7 / CA | [2014/35] | Representative(s) | Nokia EPO representatives Nokia Technologies Oy Karakaari 7 02610 Espoo / FI | [N/P] |
Former [2018/51] | Nokia EPO representatives Nokia Technologies Oy Karaportti 3 02610 Espoo / FI | ||
Former [2014/35] | Louis Pöhlau Lohrentz Patentanwälte Postfach 30 55 90014 Nürnberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 12841370.5 | 17.10.2012 | [2018/51] | WO2012CA50731 | Priority number, date | US201113275686 | 18.10.2011 Original published format: US201113275686 | [2014/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013056368 | Date: | 25.04.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2769580 | Date: | 27.08.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.04.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2769580 | Date: | 19.12.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CA | 25.04.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.07.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H04W8/12, // H04W8/18, H04W28/24, H04W8/26, H04W76/00 | [2018/25] | CPC: |
H04W8/12 (EP,US);
H04W76/10 (EP,US);
H04W8/18 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2015/35] | H04W28/24, H04W4/26, H04W8/18, H04W8/26, H04W76/02, H04W8/12 | ||
Former IPC [2014/35] | H04W28/24, H04W4/26, H04W8/18, H04W8/26 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/35] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PCRN-ROAMING-VEREINBARUNG | [2014/35] | English: | PCRN ROAMING AGREEMENT | [2014/35] | French: | ACCORD D'ITINÉRANCE POUR UN PCRN | [2014/35] | Entry into regional phase | 19.05.2014 | National basic fee paid | 19.05.2014 | Search fee paid | 19.05.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.05.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.05.2014 | Examination requested [2014/35] | 11.02.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.10.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.02.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.07.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.11.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 05.11.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.11.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.10.2017 | Opposition(s) | 20.09.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 17.10.2012 | AL | 19.12.2018 | AT | 19.12.2018 | CY | 19.12.2018 | CZ | 19.12.2018 | DK | 19.12.2018 | EE | 19.12.2018 | ES | 19.12.2018 | FI | 19.12.2018 | HR | 19.12.2018 | IT | 19.12.2018 | LT | 19.12.2018 | LV | 19.12.2018 | MC | 19.12.2018 | MK | 19.12.2018 | MT | 19.12.2018 | NL | 19.12.2018 | PL | 19.12.2018 | RO | 19.12.2018 | RS | 19.12.2018 | SE | 19.12.2018 | SI | 19.12.2018 | SK | 19.12.2018 | SM | 19.12.2018 | TR | 19.12.2018 | BG | 19.03.2019 | NO | 19.03.2019 | GR | 20.03.2019 | IS | 19.04.2019 | PT | 19.04.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 17.10.2012 | |
AL | 19.12.2018 | ||
AT | 19.12.2018 | ||
CY | 19.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 19.12.2018 | ||
DK | 19.12.2018 | ||
EE | 19.12.2018 | ||
ES | 19.12.2018 | ||
FI | 19.12.2018 | ||
HR | 19.12.2018 | ||
IT | 19.12.2018 | ||
LT | 19.12.2018 | ||
LV | 19.12.2018 | ||
MC | 19.12.2018 | ||
MT | 19.12.2018 | ||
NL | 19.12.2018 | ||
PL | 19.12.2018 | ||
RO | 19.12.2018 | ||
RS | 19.12.2018 | ||
SE | 19.12.2018 | ||
SI | 19.12.2018 | ||
SK | 19.12.2018 | ||
SM | 19.12.2018 | ||
TR | 19.12.2018 | ||
BG | 19.03.2019 | ||
NO | 19.03.2019 | ||
GR | 20.03.2019 | ||
IS | 19.04.2019 | ||
PT | 19.04.2019 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 17.10.2012 | |
AL | 19.12.2018 | ||
AT | 19.12.2018 | ||
CY | 19.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 19.12.2018 | ||
DK | 19.12.2018 | ||
EE | 19.12.2018 | ||
ES | 19.12.2018 | ||
FI | 19.12.2018 | ||
HR | 19.12.2018 | ||
IT | 19.12.2018 | ||
LT | 19.12.2018 | ||
LV | 19.12.2018 | ||
MC | 19.12.2018 | ||
NL | 19.12.2018 | ||
PL | 19.12.2018 | ||
RO | 19.12.2018 | ||
RS | 19.12.2018 | ||
SE | 19.12.2018 | ||
SI | 19.12.2018 | ||
SK | 19.12.2018 | ||
SM | 19.12.2018 | ||
TR | 19.12.2018 | ||
BG | 19.03.2019 | ||
NO | 19.03.2019 | ||
GR | 20.03.2019 | ||
IS | 19.04.2019 | ||
PT | 19.04.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 19.12.2018 | |
AT | 19.12.2018 | ||
CY | 19.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 19.12.2018 | ||
DK | 19.12.2018 | ||
EE | 19.12.2018 | ||
ES | 19.12.2018 | ||
FI | 19.12.2018 | ||
HR | 19.12.2018 | ||
IT | 19.12.2018 | ||
LT | 19.12.2018 | ||
LV | 19.12.2018 | ||
MC | 19.12.2018 | ||
NL | 19.12.2018 | ||
PL | 19.12.2018 | ||
RO | 19.12.2018 | ||
RS | 19.12.2018 | ||
SE | 19.12.2018 | ||
SI | 19.12.2018 | ||
SK | 19.12.2018 | ||
SM | 19.12.2018 | ||
TR | 19.12.2018 | ||
BG | 19.03.2019 | ||
NO | 19.03.2019 | ||
GR | 20.03.2019 | ||
IS | 19.04.2019 | ||
PT | 19.04.2019 | ||
Former [2020/29] | AL | 19.12.2018 | |
AT | 19.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 19.12.2018 | ||
DK | 19.12.2018 | ||
EE | 19.12.2018 | ||
ES | 19.12.2018 | ||
FI | 19.12.2018 | ||
HR | 19.12.2018 | ||
IT | 19.12.2018 | ||
LT | 19.12.2018 | ||
LV | 19.12.2018 | ||
MC | 19.12.2018 | ||
NL | 19.12.2018 | ||
PL | 19.12.2018 | ||
RO | 19.12.2018 | ||
RS | 19.12.2018 | ||
SE | 19.12.2018 | ||
SI | 19.12.2018 | ||
SK | 19.12.2018 | ||
SM | 19.12.2018 | ||
TR | 19.12.2018 | ||
BG | 19.03.2019 | ||
NO | 19.03.2019 | ||
GR | 20.03.2019 | ||
IS | 19.04.2019 | ||
PT | 19.04.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 19.12.2018 | |
AT | 19.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 19.12.2018 | ||
DK | 19.12.2018 | ||
EE | 19.12.2018 | ||
ES | 19.12.2018 | ||
FI | 19.12.2018 | ||
HR | 19.12.2018 | ||
IT | 19.12.2018 | ||
LT | 19.12.2018 | ||
LV | 19.12.2018 | ||
NL | 19.12.2018 | ||
PL | 19.12.2018 | ||
RO | 19.12.2018 | ||
RS | 19.12.2018 | ||
SE | 19.12.2018 | ||
SI | 19.12.2018 | ||
SK | 19.12.2018 | ||
SM | 19.12.2018 | ||
TR | 19.12.2018 | ||
BG | 19.03.2019 | ||
NO | 19.03.2019 | ||
GR | 20.03.2019 | ||
IS | 19.04.2019 | ||
PT | 19.04.2019 | ||
Former [2020/13] | AL | 19.12.2018 | |
AT | 19.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 19.12.2018 | ||
DK | 19.12.2018 | ||
EE | 19.12.2018 | ||
ES | 19.12.2018 | ||
FI | 19.12.2018 | ||
HR | 19.12.2018 | ||
IT | 19.12.2018 | ||
LT | 19.12.2018 | ||
LV | 19.12.2018 | ||
NL | 19.12.2018 | ||
PL | 19.12.2018 | ||
RO | 19.12.2018 | ||
RS | 19.12.2018 | ||
SE | 19.12.2018 | ||
SI | 19.12.2018 | ||
SK | 19.12.2018 | ||
SM | 19.12.2018 | ||
BG | 19.03.2019 | ||
NO | 19.03.2019 | ||
GR | 20.03.2019 | ||
IS | 19.04.2019 | ||
PT | 19.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | AL | 19.12.2018 | |
AT | 19.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 19.12.2018 | ||
DK | 19.12.2018 | ||
EE | 19.12.2018 | ||
ES | 19.12.2018 | ||
FI | 19.12.2018 | ||
HR | 19.12.2018 | ||
IT | 19.12.2018 | ||
LT | 19.12.2018 | ||
LV | 19.12.2018 | ||
NL | 19.12.2018 | ||
PL | 19.12.2018 | ||
RO | 19.12.2018 | ||
RS | 19.12.2018 | ||
SE | 19.12.2018 | ||
SK | 19.12.2018 | ||
SM | 19.12.2018 | ||
BG | 19.03.2019 | ||
NO | 19.03.2019 | ||
GR | 20.03.2019 | ||
IS | 19.04.2019 | ||
PT | 19.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/46] | AL | 19.12.2018 | |
AT | 19.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 19.12.2018 | ||
EE | 19.12.2018 | ||
ES | 19.12.2018 | ||
FI | 19.12.2018 | ||
HR | 19.12.2018 | ||
IT | 19.12.2018 | ||
LT | 19.12.2018 | ||
LV | 19.12.2018 | ||
NL | 19.12.2018 | ||
PL | 19.12.2018 | ||
RO | 19.12.2018 | ||
RS | 19.12.2018 | ||
SE | 19.12.2018 | ||
SK | 19.12.2018 | ||
SM | 19.12.2018 | ||
BG | 19.03.2019 | ||
NO | 19.03.2019 | ||
GR | 20.03.2019 | ||
IS | 19.04.2019 | ||
PT | 19.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/39] | AL | 19.12.2018 | |
CZ | 19.12.2018 | ||
EE | 19.12.2018 | ||
ES | 19.12.2018 | ||
FI | 19.12.2018 | ||
HR | 19.12.2018 | ||
IT | 19.12.2018 | ||
LT | 19.12.2018 | ||
LV | 19.12.2018 | ||
NL | 19.12.2018 | ||
PL | 19.12.2018 | ||
RO | 19.12.2018 | ||
RS | 19.12.2018 | ||
SE | 19.12.2018 | ||
SK | 19.12.2018 | ||
SM | 19.12.2018 | ||
BG | 19.03.2019 | ||
NO | 19.03.2019 | ||
GR | 20.03.2019 | ||
IS | 19.04.2019 | ||
PT | 19.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AL | 19.12.2018 | |
CZ | 19.12.2018 | ||
EE | 19.12.2018 | ||
ES | 19.12.2018 | ||
FI | 19.12.2018 | ||
HR | 19.12.2018 | ||
IT | 19.12.2018 | ||
LT | 19.12.2018 | ||
LV | 19.12.2018 | ||
NL | 19.12.2018 | ||
PL | 19.12.2018 | ||
RO | 19.12.2018 | ||
RS | 19.12.2018 | ||
SE | 19.12.2018 | ||
SM | 19.12.2018 | ||
BG | 19.03.2019 | ||
NO | 19.03.2019 | ||
GR | 20.03.2019 | ||
PT | 19.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/35] | AL | 19.12.2018 | |
CZ | 19.12.2018 | ||
ES | 19.12.2018 | ||
FI | 19.12.2018 | ||
HR | 19.12.2018 | ||
IT | 19.12.2018 | ||
LT | 19.12.2018 | ||
LV | 19.12.2018 | ||
NL | 19.12.2018 | ||
PL | 19.12.2018 | ||
RS | 19.12.2018 | ||
SE | 19.12.2018 | ||
BG | 19.03.2019 | ||
NO | 19.03.2019 | ||
GR | 20.03.2019 | ||
PT | 19.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | AL | 19.12.2018 | |
FI | 19.12.2018 | ||
HR | 19.12.2018 | ||
IT | 19.12.2018 | ||
LT | 19.12.2018 | ||
LV | 19.12.2018 | ||
NL | 19.12.2018 | ||
RS | 19.12.2018 | ||
SE | 19.12.2018 | ||
BG | 19.03.2019 | ||
NO | 19.03.2019 | ||
GR | 20.03.2019 | ||
PT | 19.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/33] | AL | 19.12.2018 | |
FI | 19.12.2018 | ||
HR | 19.12.2018 | ||
LT | 19.12.2018 | ||
LV | 19.12.2018 | ||
NL | 19.12.2018 | ||
RS | 19.12.2018 | ||
SE | 19.12.2018 | ||
BG | 19.03.2019 | ||
NO | 19.03.2019 | ||
GR | 20.03.2019 | ||
PT | 19.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/30] | AL | 19.12.2018 | |
FI | 19.12.2018 | ||
HR | 19.12.2018 | ||
LT | 19.12.2018 | ||
LV | 19.12.2018 | ||
NL | 19.12.2018 | ||
RS | 19.12.2018 | ||
SE | 19.12.2018 | ||
BG | 19.03.2019 | ||
NO | 19.03.2019 | ||
GR | 20.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 19.12.2018 | |
FI | 19.12.2018 | ||
HR | 19.12.2018 | ||
LT | 19.12.2018 | ||
LV | 19.12.2018 | ||
RS | 19.12.2018 | ||
SE | 19.12.2018 | ||
BG | 19.03.2019 | ||
NO | 19.03.2019 | ||
GR | 20.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/25] | FI | 19.12.2018 | |
HR | 19.12.2018 | ||
LT | 19.12.2018 | ||
LV | 19.12.2018 | ||
RS | 19.12.2018 | ||
SE | 19.12.2018 | ||
BG | 19.03.2019 | ||
NO | 19.03.2019 | ||
GR | 20.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/23] | FI | 19.12.2018 | |
HR | 19.12.2018 | ||
LT | 19.12.2018 | ||
LV | 19.12.2018 | ||
BG | 19.03.2019 | ||
NO | 19.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/22] | FI | 19.12.2018 | |
LT | 19.12.2018 | ||
BG | 19.03.2019 | ||
NO | 19.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/21] | FI | 19.12.2018 | |
LT | 19.12.2018 | ||
NO | 19.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/20] | LT | 19.12.2018 | |
NO | 19.03.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2011161504 (ZHOU XIAOYUN [CN], et al) [I] 1-14 * abstract ** paragraphs [0006] , [0022] - [0024] - [0041] - [0047] - [0054] , [0104] - [0112] *; | [I]US2011173332 (LI YAN [CN], et al) [I] 1-14 * abstract * * paragraphs [0005] - [0017] - [0045] - [0067] *; | [I] - HUAWEI ET AL, "Clarifications on PCRF/BPCF discovery for H(e)NB scenario and enhancement to S9 interface", 3GPP DRAFT; S2-112032 WAS 2025 1492 1704 BPCF PCRF DISCOVERY, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20110415), vol. SA WG2, no. Bratislava, Slovakia; 20110411 - 20110415, XP050631662 [I] 1-14 * chapter 11, chapter 1.2, chapter 1.3, chapter 5.1.2.3, chapter 5.1.3.2.3, chapter 5.2.2.1.2.3, chapter 5.2.2.1.4 * | [I] - HUAWEI ET AL, "TS 23.819: Tunnel flow description information for the QoS treatment in BBF", 3GPP DRAFT; S2-113125.ZIP:S2-113125_FOR TS_TUNNEL FLOW DESCRIPTION INFORMATION FOR THE QOS TREATMENT IN BBF, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20110705), vol. SA WG2, no. Naantali; 20110711, XP050552599 [I] 1-14 * chapter 2.1, chapter 2.2, chapter 2.4, chapter 5.2, chapter 8.1.1 * | International search | [A]EP1898591 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]); | [A]WO2010034195 (LIU JIAN [CN], et al); | [A]WO2010133239 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE], et al); | [X]WO2011020514 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE], et al); | [X]US2011161504 (ZHOU XIAOYUN [CN], et al); | [X] - "3rd Generation Partnership Projects, Technical Specification Group Services and System Aspects; Policy and charging control architecture (Release 8)", 3GPP TS 23.203 V8.3.1 (2008-09), (200809), URL: http://www.quintillion.co.jp/3GPP/Specs/23203-831.pdf, XP055149131 | [X] - "3rd Generation Partnership Project; Technical Specification Group Core Network and Terminals; Policy and Charging Control signalling flows and Quality of Service (QoS) parameter mapping (Release 8)", 3GPP TS 29.213 V8.12.0 (2011-09), (201109), URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Specs/archive/29_series129.213/29213-8c0.zip, XP050554232 | [A] - "3rd Generation Partnership Project Technical Specification Group Core Network and Terminals. Policy and Charging Control over Gx reference point (Release 9)", 3GPP TS 29.212 V9.3.0 (2010-06), (201006), URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Specs/archive/29series/29.212/29212-930.zip, XP050441924 | [A] - "3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT TECHNICAL SPECIFICATION G roup Core Network and Terminals; Policy and Charging Control over S9 reference point Stage 3 (Release 10)", 3GPP TS 29.215 V10.2.0 (2011-06), (201106), URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Specs/archive/29series/29.215/29215-a20.zip, XP050552959 | [A] - "3rd Generation Partnership Project, Technical Specification Group Core Network and Terminals; Policy and Charging Control over Rl reference point (Release 9)", 3GPP TS 29.214 V9.2.0 (2009-12), (200912), URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Specs/archive/29series/29.214/29214-920.zip, XP050401212 | by applicant | US2011117 | US2011173332 | - "Clarifications on PCRF/BPCF discovery for H(e)NB scenario and enhancement to S9 interface", HUAWEI et al., 3GPP DRAFT; S2-112032 WAS 2025 1492 1704 BPCF PCRF DISCOVERY, MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE, (20110411), pages 1 - 14 |